Wyeth v. Levine
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 06-1249

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wyeth, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bert W. Rein +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 brein@wrf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Diana Levine, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Samuel Wolfman +1 202 661 6582 +1 202 662 9634 wolfmanb@law.georgetown.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Frederick +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dfrederick@khhte.com
No Logo AARP, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by KLINE & SPECTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES L. BECKER +1 215 772 1394 +1 215 735 0960 charles.becker@klinespecter.com
No Logo American Association for Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LOUIS MARTIN BOGRAD +1 202 944 2803 +1 202 965 0920 lou.bograd@cclfirm.com
No Logo Anju Budhwani, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
No Logo California Medical Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Collyn Peddie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Collyn A. Peddie +1 713 236 7783 cp@collynpeddie.com
No Logo Canter for State Enforcement of Antitrust and Consumer Protection Laws, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Merrill +1 203 436 8990 tmerri@law.columbia.edu
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Orseck & Untereiner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Edward Untereiner +1 202 775 4500
No Logo Citizens Commission on Human Rights, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Morrison, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kendrick L Moxon +1 213 487 4468 +1 213 487 5385 kmoxon@earthlink.net
No Logo Constitutional Accountability Center, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Constitutional Accountability Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ELIZABETH BONNIE WYDRA +1 714 222 0144 +1 202 296 6895 elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
No Logo Constitutional and Administrative Law Scholars, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Duke University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ernest A. Young +1 919 360 7718 young@law.duke.edu
No Logo Consumers Union of the United States, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumers Union Of United States, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R. Savage +1 415 431 6747
No Logo Daniel Paul Carpenter, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter Coleman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory S Coleman +1 512 533 0150 +1 512 533 0120 gcoleman@yettercoleman.com
No Logo David B. Ross M.D., and Stefan P. Kruszrwski M.D., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Cuker & Berezofsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Quirk +1 215 557 0099 +1 215 557 0673 mquirk@wcblegal.com
No Logo DES Action, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Aaron M. Levine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Maurice Levine +1 202 833 8040 +1 202 833 8046
No Logo DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel E. Troy +1 202 736 8304 +1 202 736 8711 dtroy@sidley.com
No Logo Former FDA Commissioners Dr. Donald Kennedy and Dr. David A. Kessler, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Vladeck +1 202 662 9540 vladeckd@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo Generic Pharmaceutical Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Philip Lefkowitz +1 212 446 4970 +1 212 446 4900 lefkowitz@kirkland.com
No Logo John E. Calfee, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hollingsworth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joe Gregory Hollingsworth +1 202 898 5842 +1 202 682 1639 jhollingsworth@hollingsworthllp.com
No Logo Kim Witczak, Sara Bostock, and Healthy Skepticism, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lanier Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W Mark Lanier +1 713 659 5200 +1 713 659 2204 wml@lanierlawfirm.com
No Logo Members of Congress, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan S. Massey +1 202 686 0457
No Logo National Coalition Against Censorship, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of California, Irvine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erwin Chemerinsky +1 949 824 7722 +1 949 824 7336 eChemerinsky@law.uci.edu
No Logo National Conference Of State Legislatures, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Joan Cabraser +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 ecabraser@lchb.com
No Logo New England Journal of Medicine Editors and Authors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhode Island Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerson Harry Smoger +1 510 531 4529 +1 510 531 4377 jessica@texasinjurylaw.com
No Logo Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Long - PHV +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 778 5612 rlong@cov.com
No Logo Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth S. Geller +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 kgeller@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Senior Citizens League, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by William Olson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John S. Miles +1 703 356 5070
No Logo Texas Medical Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Scully, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Brent Cooper +1 214 712 9521 +1 214 712 9540 brent.cooper@cooperscully.com
No Logo Torts Professors Mark P. Gergen and Michael D. Green, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University Of Texas Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Sturley +1 512 232 1350
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Vermont, et al, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by General Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin O. +1 802 828 3171
No Logo Washington Legal Foundation. et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by SPRIGGS & HOLLINGSWORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Gordon Lasker +1 202 898 5843 +1 202 682 1639 elasker@spriggs.com
Related Case 08A169
Lower Court Supreme Court of Vermont
Lower Court Case No(s). 2004-384
Lower Court Decision Date 10/27/2006
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 73 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
Record returned to the Supreme Court of Vermont.
    LREF
    Blank 72 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
    MANDATE ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 71 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
      Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Stevens, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Kennedy, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Breyer, J., filed a concurring opinion. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, J., joined.
        LREF
        Blank 70 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
        Letter of February 4, 2009, from counsel for the petitioner received. (Distributed)
          LREF
          Blank 69 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
          Trial Transcripts received from the Supreme Court of Vermont. (1 box containing 6 transcripts)
            LREF
            Blank 68 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
            Argued. For petitioner: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D.C.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for Untied States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: David C. Frederick, Washington, D.C.
              LREF
              Blank 67 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
              The Clerk has approved respondent's proposed lodging. 20 copies of congressional staff report of the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform received and distributed.
                LREF
                Blank 66 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                Response from counsel for petitioner to respondent's proposed lodging. Distributed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 65 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                  Letter from counsel for respondent proposing to lodge copies of a newly issued congressional staff report of the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
                    LREF
                    Blank 64 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                    Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 63 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                      Reply of petitioner Wyeth filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 62 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                        Letter, dated August 27, 2008, received from the Acting Solicitor General.
                          LREF
                          Blank 61 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                          Additional record received from the Supreme Court of Vermont. (1 box)
                            LREF
                            Blank 60 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                            Application (08A169) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file a reply brief on the merits until September 15, 2008.
                              LREF
                              Blank 59 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                              Application (08A169) to extend the time to file a reply brief on the merits from September 8, 2008 to September 15, 2008, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                                LREF
                                Blank 58 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, November 3, 2008
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 57 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                  Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Commission on Human Rights filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 56 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of Senior Citizens League filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 55 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                      Brief amicus curiae of Consumers Union of the United States filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 54 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 53 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 52 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of National Coalition Against Censorship filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 51 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of California Medical Association filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 50 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional and Administrative Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of Daniel Paul Carpenter, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of David B. Ross, M.D. and Stefan P. Kruszewski, M.D. filed. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Center for State Enforcement of Antitrust and Consumer Protection Laws, Inc. filed. (Distributed).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amici curiae of Texas Medical Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of New England Journal of Medicine Editors and Authors filed. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amici curiae of Vermont, et al filed. (Distributed)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Anju Budhwani, M.D., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Torts Professors Mark P. Gergen and Michael D. Green filed. (Distributed)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of DES Action filed. (Distributed)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Kim Witczak, Sara Bostock, and Healthy Skepticism filed. (Distributed)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Former FDA Commissioners Dr. Donald Kennedy and Dr. David A. Kessler filed. (Distributed)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Record received from the Supreme Court of Vermont. ( 2 boxes)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  CIRCULATED.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief of respondent Diana Levine filed. (Distributed).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      The time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits is further extended to and including August 7, 2008.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either or neither party received from counsel for the respondent.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of PhRMA and BIO filed.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of John E. Calfee, et al. filed.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Generic Pharmaceutical Association filed.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief of petitioner Wyeth filed.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Joint appendix filed. Statement of costs received.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                The time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 1, 2008.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 27, 2008.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Petition GRANTED. The brief of petitioner is to be filed on or before Monday, February 25, 2008. The brief of respondent is to be filed on or before Monday, March 24, 2008. A reply brief, if any, is to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Letter of January 17, 2008, from counsel for the petitioner received. (Distributed).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Letter of January 17, 2008, from counsel for respondent received. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Letter received from the Solicitor General. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Supplemental brief of petitioner Wyeth filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Supplemental brief of respondent Diana Levine filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 18, 2008.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 17, 2007.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Reply of petitioner Wyeth filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief of respondent Diana Levine in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc., et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 20, 2007.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2007)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 328 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?