Nken v. Holder
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-681

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jean Marc Nken, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Beaton Verrilli +1 213 683 9507 +1 202 639 6066

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lindsay C. Harrison +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6006 lharrison@jenner.com
No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Respondent
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo American Immigration Lawyers Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson +1 202 663 6390 +1 202 663 6363 paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Law Professors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cecillia Derphine Wang +1 415 343 0775 +1 415 395 0950 cwang@aclu.org
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
Related Case 08A413
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 08-1813
Lower Court Decision Date 11/5/2008
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
Letter of April 24, 2012, from Deputy Solicitor General received. (Distributed)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S. Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
        Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Scalia, Kennedy, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Scalia, J., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas, J., joined.
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
          Argued. For petitioner: Lindsay C. Harrison, Washington, D.C. For respondent: Edwin S. Kneedler, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C.
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
            Reply of petitioner Jean Marc Nken filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
              Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                Brief of respondent Michael B. Mukasey, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                  CIRCULATED.
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                    Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                        Brief of petitioner Jean Marc Nken filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                          Joint appendix filed. Statement of costs received.
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                            Record received from the U.S.C.A. fror the 4th Circuit. (1 envelope and 1 CD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                              SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, January 21, 2009.
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                Petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                  The application for stay presented to The Chief Justice and referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the removal of petitioner is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. In addition, the application for stay is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari (08-681), and the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted limited to the following question: "Whether the decision of a court of appeals to stay an alien's removal pending consideration of the alien's petition for review is governed by the standard set forth in section 242(f)(2) of the Immigration and Nationality Act, 8 U.S.C. Sec. 1252(f)(2), or instead by the traditional test for stays and preliminary injunctive relief." The brief of the petitioner is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m. Friday, December 19, 2008. The brief of the respondent is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m. Wednesday, January 7, 2009. A reply brief, if any, is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m. Wednesday, January 14, 2009.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                    Application (08A413) referred to the Court by The Chief Justice.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 25, 2008.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                        Reply of applicant Jean Marc Nken filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                          Response to application from respondent Michael B. Mukasey filed.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                            Response to application (08A413) requested by The Chief Justice, due November 17, 2008, by 4 p.m.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                              Application (08A413) for stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?