FCC v. Fox Television Stations, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-582

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Federal Communications Commission, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo ABC, Inc., Respondent
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Radio Holdings, Inc.
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Officer/Director, Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Corn-Revere +1 202 973 4200 +1 202 973 4499 bobcornrevere@dwt.com
No Logo Center for Creative Voices in Media, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Jay Schwartzman +1 202 232 4300
Fox Television Stations, Inc. Fox Television Stations, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo NBC Universal, Inc., and NBC Telemundo License Company,CBS Broadcasting Inc., and ABC, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miguel A. Estrada +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539
No Logo ABC Television Affiliates Associationl., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brooks Pierce

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wade H. Hargrove +1 919 839 0300 whargrove@brookspierce.com
No Logo Alliance Defense Fund and Family Research Council, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alliance Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin W Bull +1 480 444 0020 +1 480 444 0028 bbull@telladf.org
No Logo American Academy of Pediatrics, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela J. Campbell +1 202 662 9535 ipr-efiling@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo American Center for Law & Justice, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Other Party
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marjorie Heins +1 212 496 1311
No Logo California Broadcasters Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sivas, Deborah Ann

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen M. Sullivan +1 650 725 9875
No Logo Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C Eastman +1 714 628 2587 +1 714 844 4817 jeastman@chapman.edu
No Logo Center for Democracy & Technology, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Burnett Morris, Jr. +1 202 637 9800 +1 202 637 0968 jmorris@cdt.org
No Logo Decency Enforcement Center for Television, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. North +1 906 643 6348
No Logo Former FCC Commissioners and Officials, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TIMOTHY K. LEWIS +1 202 419 4216 tlewis@schnader.com
No Logo Free Press, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ammorigroup.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Ammori +1 202 505 3680 marvin@ammorigroup.com
No Logo Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression and the Media Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Jefferson Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. O'Neil +1 434 295 4784
No Logo Morality In Media, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morality In Media, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Stacey Whitehead +1 212 870 3216
No Logo National Assocation of Broadcasters and Radio-Television News Directors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6006
No Logo National Religious Broadccasters, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Religious Broadcasters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig L. Parshall +1 703 330 7000 cparshall@nrb.org
No Logo Parents Television Council, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Long & Leahy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert R Sparks, Jr +1 703 848 4700 rrsparks@sparkscraig.com
No Logo Public Broadcasters, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Long - PHV +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 778 5612 rlong@cov.com
Time Warner, Inc. Time Warner, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Landau +1 202 879 5087 +1 202 654 9532 clandau@kirkland.com
Related Case 07A155
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-1760-ag, 06-2750-ag, 06-5358-ag
Lower Court Decision Date 6/4/2007
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.C.A. for 2nd Circuit.
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 46 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
      Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Scalia, J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered the opinion of the Court with respect to Parts I, II, III-A through III-D, and IV, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined, and an opinion with respect to Part III-E, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion. Kennedy, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the the judgment. Stevens, J., and Ginsburg, J., filed dissenting opinions. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Stevens, Souter, and Ginsburg, JJ., joined.
        LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
        Argued. For petitioners: Gregory G. Garre, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For respondents: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D.C.
          LREF
          Blank 44 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
          Reply of petitioners Federal Communications Commission, et al. filed. (Distributed)
            LREF
            Blank 43 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
            Record received from U.S.C.A. for the 2nd Circuit. (1 box)
              LREF
              Blank 42 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
              Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy & Technology, et al. filed. (Distributed).
                LREF
                Blank 41 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, November 4, 2008.
                  LREF
                  Blank 40 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                  Brief amici curiae of Former FCC Commissioners and Officials filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 39 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                    Brief amicus curiae of ABC Television Affiliates Association filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 37 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of California Broadcasters Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 36 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression and the Media Institute filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 35 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Public Broadcasters filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 34 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                              Brief amicus curiae of Time Warner Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 33 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of National Assocation of Broadcasters and Radio-Television News Directors filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 32 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                  Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either or neither party received from counsel for respondent ABC, Inc.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 31 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                    Brief of respondent Fox Television Stations, Inc. filed. (Distributed).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                      Brief of respondent Center for Creative Voices in Media filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                        Brief of respondents NBC Universal, Inc., and NBC Telemundo License Company, CBS Broadcasting Inc., and ABC, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                          CIRCULATED
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
                                            The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 1, 2008.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 26 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Pediatrics, et al. filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 25 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of Free Press, et al.in support of neither party filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law & Justice, et al. filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Parents Television Council filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of Alliance Defense Fund and Family Research Council filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Morality in Media, Inc. filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of National Religious Broadcasters filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Decency Enforcement Center for Telvision filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Brief of petitioners Federal Communications Commission, et al. filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint appendix filed. Statement of costs filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party, or neither party, received from counsel for respondents, NBC Universal, Inc.,and NBC Telemundo License Company.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 2, 2008.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Petition GRANTED.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 14, 2008.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Reply of petitioners Federal Communications Commission, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 29, 2008.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief of respondents Fox Television Stations, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., and ABC, Inc. in opposition filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief of respondents NBC Universal, Inc., and NBC Telemundo License Company in opposition filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 1, 2008, for all respondents.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 2, 2008, for all respondents.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2007)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          Application (07A155) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until November 1, 2007.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            Application (07A155) to extend further the time from October 4, 2007 to November 1, 2007, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              Application (07A155) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until October 4, 2007.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                Application (07A155) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 2, 2007 to October 4, 2007, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 241 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?