Northwest Austin Municipal Util. Dist. No. One v. Holder
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-322

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alaska Native Voters and Tribes, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Thomas Tucker +1 907 276 0680
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Thomas Wells +1 312 988 5000
No Logo Asian American Justice Center, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allegra R Rich +1 312 346 8000 +1 312 269 8869 arich@seyfarth.com
No Logo Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6006
No Logo Constitutional Accountability Center, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford M. Sloan +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 8340 cliff.sloan@skadden.com
No Logo Former Republican Officeholders, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trevor Potter +1 202 862 5092 tpotter@capdale.com
No Logo Honorable Bob Riley, Governor of Alabama, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corey L Maze +1 334 353 4336 +1 334 353 8440 cmaze@ago.state.al.us
No Logo Nathaniel Persily, Stephen Ansolabehere, and Charles Stewart III, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathaniel Alfred Persily +1 917 570 3223 nate@persily.com
No Logo Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore Kevin Cheng +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 tcheng@proskauer.com
No Logo Barbara Lee, Member of Congress, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Community Service Society

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Juan Cartagena +1 212 614 5462
No Logo Civil Rights Clinic at Howard University School of Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard University School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aderson Bellegarde Francois +1 202 806 8065 afrancois@law.howard.edu
No Logo Dr. Abigail Thernstrom and Former Justice Department Officials, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Carvin +1 202 879 7643 +1 202 626 1700 macarvin@jonesday.com
No Logo Georgia Governor Sonny Perdue, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
No Logo Julius Chambers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William D Kissinger +1 415 393 2850 william.kissinger@bingham.com
No Logo Jurisdictions That Have Bailed Out Under the Voting Rights Act, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Campaign Legal Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Gerald Hebert +1 703 567 5873 +5675 567 567 5876 ghebert@campaignlegalcenter.org
No Logo Leadership Conference on Civil Rights, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Michael Hoffman +1 202 346 4116 +1 202 346 4444 mhoffman@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Members of the Texas House of Representatives, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn E. Blais +1 512 232 1334
No Logo Mountain States Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain States Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Scott Detamore +1 303 292 2021 +1 303 292 1980
No Logo Navajo Nation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sacks Tierney PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin S Cohen +1 480 425 2600 +1 480 970 4610 marvin.cohen@sackstierney.com
No Logo Nicholas deB. Katzenbach, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CIVIL JUSTICE CLINIC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel R. Bagenstos +1 314 935 9097 +1 314 935 5356
No Logo North Carolina, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher G. Browning +1 919 716 6900 CBrowning@ncdoj.gov
No Logo Pacific Legal Foundation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Louise Browne +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 slb@pacificlegal.org
No Logo Reps. John Conyers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Susan Karlan +1 650 725 4851 karlan@stanford.edu
No Logo Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation Goldwater Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldwater Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Constantine Dranias +1 602 462 5000 +1 602 256 7045 ndranias@goldwaterinstitute.org
No Logo Southeastern Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon L. Goessling shannon@southeasternlegal.org
No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Appellee
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Intervenor Appellees David Diaz, Lisa Diaz, and Gabriel Diaz, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Mexican American Legal Defense & Educational Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina Perales +1 210 224 5476 +1 210 224 5382 nperales@maldef.org
No Logo Intervenor-Appellees Texas State Conference of NAACP, et al., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson +1 202 663 6390 +1 202 663 6363 paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Intervenors-Appellees Rodney and Nicole Louis, et al., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
No Logo Travis County, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF MAX RENEA HICKS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Renea Hicks +1 512 480 8231 +1 512 480 9105
No Logo Northwest Austin Municipal Utility District Number One, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter Coleman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory S Coleman +1 512 533 0150 +1 512 533 0120 gcoleman@yettercoleman.com
Related Case 08A855
Lower Court United States District Court for the District of Columbia
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-1384
Lower Court Decision Date 5/30/2008
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 57 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ISSUED.
    LREF
    Blank 56 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
    Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Scalia, Kennedy, Souter, Ginsburg, Breyer, and Alito, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment in part and dissenting in part.
      LREF
      Blank 55 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
      Argued. For appellant: Gregory S. Coleman, Austin, Tex. For appellee Holder: Neal K. Katyal, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For intervenor-appellees: Debo P. Adegbile, New York, N.Y.
        LREF
        Blank 54 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
        Reply of appellant Northwest Austin Municipal Utility District Number One filed. (Distributed)
          LREF
          Blank 53 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
          Motion for divided argument filed by respondent GRANTED.
            LREF
            Blank 52 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
            Application (08A855) denied by The Chief Justice.
              LREF
              Blank 51 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
              Application (08A855) for leave to file appellant's reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limitation, submitted to The Chief Justice.
                LREF
                Blank 50 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                Brief amici curiae of Barbara Lee, Member of Congress, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 49 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                  Brief amicus curiae of Honorable Congressman John Lewis filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 48 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                    Brief amici curiae of Nicholas deB. Katzenbach, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 47 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of Reps. John Conyers, Jr., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 46 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 45 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Julius Chambers, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 44 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Jurisdictions That Have Bailed Out Under the Voting Rights Act filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 43 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Navajo Nation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 42 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of Asian American Justice Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 41 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 40 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Former Republican Officeholders filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 39 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Alaska Native Voters and Tribes filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 38 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Leadership Conference on Civil Rights, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 37 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                          Motion for divided argument filed by appellees Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 36 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 35 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of Members of the Texas House of Representatives filed. (Distributed).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Civil Rights Clinic at Howard University School of Law filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Letter from counsel for Intervenors-Appellees Rodney and Nicole Louis, et al. proposing to lodge copies of letters issued by the U.S. Department of Justice.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Brief of appellee Travis County filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Brief of appellees Intervenor-Appellees Texas State Conference of NAACP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Brief of appellees Intervenors-Appellees Rodney and Nicole Louis, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Brief of appellee Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                DISTRIBUTED.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Record from the U.S.D.C. for the District of Columbia is electronically filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of the Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Georgia Governor Sonny Perdue filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Nathaniel Persily, Stephen Ansolabehere, and Charles Stewart III in support of neither party filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Honorable Bob Riley, Governor of Alabama in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Dr. Abigail Thernstrom and Former Justice Department Officials filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation Goldwater Institute filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, April 29, 2009.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief of appellant Northwest Austin Municipal Utility District Number One filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for the Diaz Intervenor-Appellees.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for the appellant.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for all intervenor-appellees (other than the Attorney General of the United States).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                PROBABLE JURISDICTION NOTED The brief of appellant is to be filed on or before Thursday, February 19, 2009. The brief of appellees is to be filed on or before Wednesday, March 18, 2009. A reply brief, if any, is to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2009.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Reply of appellant Northwest Austin Municipal Utility District Number One filed. (Distributed) TBP
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Motion to affirm filed by appellees Intervenor-Appellees Texas State Conference of NAACP, et al.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Motion to affirm filed by appellee Michael B. Mukasey, Attorney General.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 26, 2008, for all appellees.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order further extending time to file response to the jurisdictional statement to and including November 24, 2008, for all appellees.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Order extending time to file response to jurisdictional statement to and including November 10, 2008, for all appellees.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due October 10, 2008)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 256 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?