Merck & Co. v. Reynolds
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-905

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Merck & Co., Inc., et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kannon K. Shanmugam +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 kshanmugam@wc.com
No Logo Richard Reynolds, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Wallace Berger +1 212 554 1403 +1 212 554 1489 MWB@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brower Piven, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A.P. Brower +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 501 0300 brower@browerpiven.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Frederick +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dfrederick@khhte.com
No Logo AARP, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deanne E Maynard +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 dmaynard@mofo.com
No Logo Change to Win and The Change to Win Investment Group, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Alan Isaacson +1 619 231 1058 erici@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
No Logo Council of Institutional Investors, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter Coleman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory S Coleman +1 512 533 0150 +1 512 533 0120 gcoleman@yettercoleman.com
No Logo DRI - the Voice of the Defense Bar, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin C. Newsom +1 205 521 8803 knewsom@babc.com
No Logo Faculty at Law and Business Schools, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by po box 750 Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa L. Casey +780 574 631 5549
No Logo Harlan M. Krumholz and Joseph S. Ross, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Feldman +1 202 730 1267 wexfeld@gmail.com
No Logo Merck & Co., Inc., et al. v. Richard Reynolds, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Malcolm L. Stewart +1 202 514 2201 malcolm.l.stewart@usjoj.gov
No Logo National Association of Shareholder and Consumer Attorneys, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederic S. Fox +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 ffox@kaplanfox.com
No Logo National Coordinating Committee for Multiemployer Plans, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by O'DONOGHUE & O'DONOGHUE LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sally Momsen Tedrow +1 202 362 0041 +1 202 237 1200 stedrow@odonoghuelaw.com
No Logo Ohio, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Ohio Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Charles Mizer +1 614 466 8980 benjamin.c.mizer@usdoj.gov
No Logo Pharmaceutical and Research Manufacturers of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Fredrick Cohn +1 202 736 8000 +1 202 736 8711 jcohn@sidley.com
No Logo Securities Industry And Financial Markets Association, Inc., Other Party
Officially listed as "Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association"

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Douglas Bernstein +1 202 303 1108 +1 202 303 2108 rbernstein@willkie.com
No Logo Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by wizard.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert L Vogel +1 202 537 5900 +1 202 537 5905 robvogel@wizard.net
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven A. Engel +1 202 261 3403 +1 202 261 3143 steven.engel@dechert.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 07-2431. 07-2432
Lower Court Decision Date 9/9/2008
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
Records returned to the USCA for the Third Circuit. (2-boxes)
    LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
      Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Ginsburg, Alito, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. Stevens, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment. Scalia, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Thomas, J., joined.
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
        Argued. For petitioners: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D.C. For respondents: David C. Frederick, Washington, D.C.; and Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
          Letter from counsel for amici Dr. Harlan M. Krumholz and Dr. Joseph S. Ross proposing to lodge copies of a transcript of Dr. Krumholz's testimony cited to in petitioners' reply brief on the merits.
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
            Additional Record received from U.S.C.A. for 3rd Circuit. (1 box)
              LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
              Record for U.S.D.C. for the District of New Jersey is Electronic.
                LREF
                Blank 37 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                Reply of petitioners Merck & Co., Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                  Record received from US.C.A. for Third Circuit. (1 box)
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                    Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 34 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of Faculty at Law and Business Schools filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 33 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 32 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Dr. Harlan M. Krumholz and Dr. Joseph S. Ross filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of Council of Institutional Investors filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Connecticut Retirement Plans and Trust Funds, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 29 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of Ohio, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Change to Win and The Change to Win Investment Group filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Shareholder and Consumer Attorneys filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                      Brief amicus curiae of National Coordinating Committee for Multiemployer Plans filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                        Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                            Brief of respondents Richard Reynolds, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                              The time within which to file respondents' brief on the merits is further extended to and including October 19, 2009.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                CIRCULATED
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                  SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, November 30 2009.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of DRI - the Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical and Research Manufacturers of America filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Brief of petitioners Merck & Co., Inc., et al. filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Joint appendix filed. (Jt. appendix in two volumes). Statement of costs received.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Blanket consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner and counsel for respondent.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    The time within which to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 16, 2009.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 10, 2009.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Petition GRANTED.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Supplemental brief of respondents Richard Reynolds, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Supplemental brief of petitioners Merck & Co., Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 21, 2009.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 24, 2009.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Reply of petitioners Merck & Co., Inc., et al. filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief of respondents Richard Reynolds, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 23, 2009.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2009)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?