Graham v. Florida
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-7412

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Terrance Jamar Graham, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by MILLS & CARLIN PA - JACKSONVILLE FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BRYAN SCOTT GOWDY +1 904 350 0075 +1 904 350 0086 bgowdy@appellate-firm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Mills Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John S Mills +1 904 446 2991 +1 904 240 4431 jmills@mills-appeals.com
No Logo Florida, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward C. Hill +1 850 414 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Makar +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 410 2672 smakar@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael B. deLeeuw +1 212 859 8726 +1 212 859 4000 michael.deleeuw@friedfrank.com
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Thomas Wells +1 312 988 5000
No Logo American Medical Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Rosenkranz +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151 jrosenkranz@orrick.com
No Logo American Psychological Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Spinelli +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Amnesty International, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constance De la +1 415 422 2296 delavega@usfca.edu
Space Michelle Teresa Leighton +1 415 422 3330 mleighton@usfca.edu
No Logo Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony T. Caso +1 714 628 2666 caso@chapman.edu
No Logo Center on Administration of Criminal Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard K. Willard +1 202 429 6263 rwillard@steptoe.com
No Logo Council of Juvenile Correctional Administrators, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corrine Anetra Irish +1 212 513 3455 +1 212 385 9010 corrine.irish@hklaw.com
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Disability Rights Legal Center, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil Michael Soltman +1 213 229 9500 +1 213 625 0248 nsoltman@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Educators, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. GIBBONS +1 973 596 4500 jgibbons@gibbonslaw.com
No Logo Former Juvenile Offenders Charles S. Dutton, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. DeBruin +1 202 639 6015 +1 202 637 6375 ddebruin@jenner.com
No Logo J. Lawrence Aber, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Nickelsburg +1 202 912 5000 +1 202 912 6000 steve.nickelsburg@cliffordchance.com
No Logo Juvenile Law Center, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Juvenile Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marsha L. Levick +1 215 625 0551 mlevick@jlc.org
No Logo Louisiana, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Louisiana Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Duncan +1 225 326 6716 DuncanK@ag.state.la.us
No Logo Mothers Against Murderers Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela C. Vigil +1 305 789 8904 angela.c.vigil@bakernet.com
No Logo NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent M. Southerland +1 212 965 2260 vsoutherland@naacpldf.org
No Logo National District Attorneys Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene Schaerr +1 202 282 5845 +1 202 282 5100 gschaerr@winston.com
No Logo National Organization of Victims of Juvenile Lifers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon L. Goessling shannon@southeasternlegal.org
No Logo Sixteen Members of the United States House of Representatives, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Home School Legal Defense Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Farris +1 540 338 5600 michaelfarris@hslda.org
No Logo Solidarity Center for Law and Justice, P.C., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Solidarity Center for Law & Justice, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Patrick Kelly +1 678 231 1209
No Logo The Sentencing Project, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon M. Pazur
Lower Court District Court of Appeal of Florida, First District
Lower Court Case No(s). 1D06-3190
Lower Court Decision Date 4/10/2008
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 53 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 52 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Jun 18 2010
      LREF
      Blank 51 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Jun 18 2010
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        May 17 2010
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Nov 9 2009
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Oct 14 2009
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Oct 5 2009
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Sep 21 2009
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Sep 21 2009
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                    Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Victims of Juvenile Lifers, et al.
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                      Brief amicus curiae of National District Attorneys Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of Sixteen Members of the United States House of Representatives filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Solidarity Center for Law and Justice, P.C., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                              Brief of respondent Florida filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                Record received from District Court of Appeals of Florida, 1st District. (1 box)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                  Motion for leave to file Volume III of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 36 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                    CIRCULATED.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                      SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, November 9, 2009
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 34 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Juvenile Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 33 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association, et al. in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 32 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 31 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of J. Lawrence Aber, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of Mothers Against Murderers Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of Council of Juvenile Correctional Administrators, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Center on Administration of Criminal Law filed. VIDED.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of Educators, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of The Sentencing Project filed. VIDED.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of Former Juvenile Offenders Charles S. Dutton, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Disability Rights Legal Center filed. VIDED.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. VIDED.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Amnesty International, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Motion for leave to file Volume III of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioner Terrance Jamar Graham.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief of petitioner Terrance Jamar Graham filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Joint appendix filed (three volumes with motion to seal no. III.) (Statement of costs received).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in the support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent. VIDED.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2009.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                The time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 14, 2009.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 16, 2009.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Terrance Jamar Gr (CL Page 162)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 1, 2009.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 24, 2009.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2009.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 6, 2009.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 13, 2009.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Response Requested . (Due January 14, 2009)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2009.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Waiver of right of respondent Florida to respond filed.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 29, 2008)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 326 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?