Dillon v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-6338

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Percy Dillon, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa B. Freeland +1 412 644 6565 +1 412 644 4594 lisa_freeland@fd.org
Space Renee Domenique Pietropaolo +1 412 644 6565 +1 412 644 4594 renee_pietropaolo@fd.org
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leondra Reid Kruger +1 202 514 4038
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Federal Public and Community Defenders, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Baron-Evans +1 617 223 8061 abaronevans@gmail.com
No Logo United States Sentencing Commission, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Frederick +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dfrederick@khhte.com
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cory L. Andrews +1 202 588 0302 candrews@wlf.org
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 08-3397
Lower Court Decision Date 6/10/2009
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Western District of Pennsylvania.
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. for 3rd Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
        Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Kennedy, Thomas, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Stevens, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Alito, J., took no part in the decision of the case.
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
          Argued. For petitioner: Lisa B. Freeland, Federal Public Defender, Pittsburgh, Pa. For respondent: Leondra R. Kruger, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
            Justice Alito is recused in this case.
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
              Reply of petitioner Percy Dillon filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                Brief amicus curiae of United States Sentencing Commission filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                  Record received from U.S.D.C. for Western District of Pennsylvania. (1 box) There are sealed documents in this record.
                    LREF
                    Blank 23 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                    Motion for leave to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                      Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                        Record received from U.S.C.A. for 3rd Circuit. (1 envelope)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                          Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 26, 2010.
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                            CIRCULATED.
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                              Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2010.
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of Federal Public and Community Defenders, et al. filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                  Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                    Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                      Motion for leave to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioner Percy Dillon.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                        Brief of petitioner Percy Dillon filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                          The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including January 25, 2010.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                            The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 22, 2010.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
                                              SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, March 30, 2010.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 4, 2009.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2009.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2009.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Response Requested . (Due October 30, 2009)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2009.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 9, 2009)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?