Stop the Beach Renourishment, Inc. v. Florida Dept. of Environmental Protection
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-1151

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stop the Beach Renourishment, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Hopping, Green & Sams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Kent Safriet +1 850 222 7500 kents@hgslaw.com
No Logo Florida Department of Environmental Protection, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Makar +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 410 2672 smakar@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Walton County and City of Destin, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Merrill +1 203 436 8990 tmerri@law.columbia.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler White Boggs, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hala A. Sandridge +1 813 222 1127 +1 813 229 8313 hsandrid@fowlerwhite.com
No Logo American Civil Rights Union, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Rights Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Ferrara +1 703 582 8466
No Logo American Planning Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ENVIRONMENTAL AND NATURAL RESOURCES LAW CLINIC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Echeverria +1 802 831 1386 JEcheverria@vermontlaw.edu
No Logo Brevard County, Florida, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott L. Knox +1 321 633 2090
No Logo California, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Lawrence Siegel +1 916 323 9259 Dan.Siegel@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony T. Caso +1 714 628 2666 caso@chapman.edu
No Logo Citizens for Constitutional Property Rights Legal Foundation, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Linowes and Blocher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Delaney +1 301 961 5115
No Logo Coalition for Property Rights, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray Robinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Menelaos K. Papalas +1 904 632 8484 manny.papalas@gray-robinson.com
No Logo Coastal States Organization, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Defenders of Eastern Washington and Idaho

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Michael Frank +1 510 642 8305
No Logo Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Geoffrey Smith +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 dsmith@kirkland.com
No Logo Florida Shore and Beach Preservation Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Stroud & Deutsch PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary K. Oldehoff +1 561 826 2800 goldehoff@lsdlaw.net
No Logo National Association of Counties, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Ruda +1 202 365 1363 rmruda@hotmail.com
No Logo National Association of Home Builders, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Association of Home Builders

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Ward +1 202 266 8230 +1 202 266 8161 tward@nahb.org
No Logo New England Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by New England Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin G. Robbins +1 617 695 3660 benrobbins@nelfonline.org
No Logo New Jersey Land Title Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lomurro, Davison, Eastman and Muñoz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Fasano +1 732 462 7170 mfasano@lomurrolaw.com
No Logo Oregonians in Action Legal Center, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Joe Willis +1 503 222 9981
No Logo Owners' Counsel of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert H. Thomas +1 808 531 8031 rht@hawaiilawyer.com
No Logo Pacific Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Geoffrey Gieseler +1 772 781 7787
No Logo Save Our Beaches, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon L. Goessling shannon@southeasternlegal.org
No Logo Save Our Shoreline, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith, Martin, Powers & Knier, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Powers +1 989 892 4861
No Logo Stop the Beach Renourishment, Inc. v. Florida Department of Environmental Protection, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Surfrider Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by CLEARSPIRE LAW Company, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Walter Mikoni +1 202 595 2045 +1 202 296 1044 j.mikoni@clearspire.com
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court Supreme Court of Florida
Lower Court Case No(s). SC06-1447, SC06-1449
Lower Court Decision Date 9/29/2008
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 51 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
Record returned to Supreme Court of Florida.
    LREF
    Blank 50 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 49 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
      Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Scalia, J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered the opinion of the Court with respect to Parts I, IV, and V, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined, and an opinion with respect to Parts II and III, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Sotomayor, J., joined. Breyer, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Ginsburg, J., joined. Stevens, J., took no part in the decision of the case.
        LREF
        Blank 48 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
        Argued. For petitioner: D. Kent Safriet, Tallahassee, Fla. For respondents: Scott D. Makar, Solicitor General, Tallahassee, Fla.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
          LREF
          Blank 47 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
          Record received from Supreme Court of Florida. (1 box)
            LREF
            Blank 46 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
            Reply of petitioner Stop the Beach Renourishment, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 45 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
              Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                LREF
                Blank 44 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Counties, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 43 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                  Brief amici curiae of American Planning Association, et al. filed. (Distributed).
                    LREF
                    Blank 42 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                    Brief amici curiae of Florida Shore and Beach Preservation Association, et al. filed. (Distributed).
                      LREF
                      Blank 41 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                      Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                        LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of Coastal States Organization filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 38 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of Surfrider Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 37 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                              Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 36 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Owners' Counsel of America out of time GRANTED.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                  CIRCULATED
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 34 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                    Brief of respondents Walton County and City of Destin filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                      Brief of respondents Florida Department of Environmental Protection, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                        SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, December 2, 2009.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 31 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of Brevard County, Florida filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 30 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                            Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Owners' Counsel of America.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of Coalition for Property Rights, Inc. filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Save Our Shoreline filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amicus curiae of New Jersey Land Title Association filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of Save Our Beaches, et al. filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Citizens for Constitutional Property Rights Legal Foundation, Inc. filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Oregonians in Action Legal Center filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief of petitioner Stop the Beach Renourishment, Inc. filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              The time within which to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including September 28, 2009.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 13, 2009.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation GRANTED.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 11, 2009.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 4, 2009.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Reply of petitioner Stop the Beach Renourishment, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2009.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief of respondents Walton County, and City of Destin in opposition filed.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief of respondent Florida Department of Environmental Protection in opposition filed.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 30, 2009, for all respondents.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2009)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 367 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?