Holder v. Humanitarian Law Project
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-1498

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Petitioner
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Humanitarian Law Project, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David D. Cole +1 202 662 9078 cole@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo Academic Researchers, et al. in support of Humanitarian Law Project, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Burt Neuborne +1 212 998 6730
No Logo Anti-Defamation League in support of Eric Holder, et al.., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Raim +1 202 974 5625 +1 202 974 5602 draim@chadbourne.com
No Logo Carter Center, et al. in support of Humanitarian Law Project, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Goodman +1 212 549 2500 +1 212 549 2680 mgoodman@aclu.org
No Logo Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C Eastman +1 714 628 2587 +1 714 844 4817 jeastman@chapman.edu
No Logo Center on the Administration of Criminal Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Yale Scudder, Jr. +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0411 mscudder@skadden.com
No Logo Constitution Project, and Rutherford Institute in support of Humanitarian Law Project, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Gossett +1 202 263 3384 +1 202 263 5384 dgossett@mayerbrown.com
No Logo James J. Carey, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo John D. Altenburg, Maj. Gen., U.S. Army (Ret.), et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Popeo +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386
No Logo Scholars, Attorneys, and Former Public Officials with Experience in Terrorism-Related Issues, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradford A. Berenson +1 202 736 8000 bberenson@sidley.com
No Logo Victims of the McCarthy Era in support of Humanitarian Law Project, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Arak Freedman +1 202 942 5316 +1 202 942 5999 john.freedman@aporter.com
Related Case 08A846
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 05-56753, 05-56846
Lower Court Decision Date 12/10/2007
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Central District of California.
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
      Adjudged to be AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Scalia, Kennedy, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. VIDED.
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
        Argued. For Humanitarian Law Project, et al.: David D. Cole, Washington, D. C. For Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al.: Elena Kagan, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
          Reply of petitioners Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
            LREF
            Blank 34 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
            Application (09A738) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 16, 2010.
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
              Application (09A738) to extend the time to file a reply brief from February 12, 2010 to February 16, 2010, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                Reply of respondents Humanitarian Law Project, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                  Record received from U.S.D.C. for Central District of California. (1 box)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                    Record received from U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                      Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al. in support of Eric Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al. filed. VIDED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of John D. Altenburg, Maj. Gen., U.S. Army (Ret.), et al. in support of petitioners Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al., filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law in support of Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al., filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                            Brief amici curiae of Scholars, Attorneys, and Former Public Officials with Experience in Terrorism-Related Issues in support of Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al. filed. (Distributed) VIDED.
                              LREF
                              Blank 25 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                              Brief of Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed).
                                LREF
                                Blank 24 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                CIRCULATED.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                  SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 23, 2010.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Carter Center, et al. in support of Humanitarian Law Project, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Victims of the McCarthy Era in support of Humanitarian Law Project, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Constitution Project and the Rutherford Institute in support of Humanitarian Law Project, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of Academic Researchers, et al. in support of Humanitarian Law Project, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of Anti-Defamation League in support of Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al. filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                                              Consent to the filing of amiucs briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for Holder, et al. VIDED.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either partyor of neither party, received from counsel for Humanitarian Law Project, et al. VIDED.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Brief of Humanitarian Law Project, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Joint appendix filed. VIDED. (Statement of costs received)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners in No. 09-89 or in support of neither party are to be filed on or before November 23, 2009. Amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners in No. 08-1498 are to be filed on or before December 29, 2009. VIDED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Motion to amend the briefing schedule GRANTED Petitioners in No. 09-89 will file an opening brief, not to exceed 18,000 words, on or before November 16, 2009. Petitioners in No. 08-1498 will file a response brief, not to exceed 18,000 words, on or before December 22, 2009. Petitioners in No. 09-89 will file a reply brief, not to exceed 12,000 words, on or before January 21, 2010. Petitioners in No. 08-1498 will file a reply brief, not to exceed 12,000 words, on or before February 12, 2010.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Motion to amend the briefing schedule filed by the parties. VIDED.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Petition GRANTED The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 09-89 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2009.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Reply of petitioners Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General, et al. filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief of respondents Humanitarian Law Project, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of James J. Carey, et al. filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2009)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Application (08A846) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 4, 2009.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Application (08A846) to extend further the time from May 5, 2009 to June 4, 2009, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Application (08A846) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 5, 2009.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Application (08A846) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 5, 2009 to May 5, 2009, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 416 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?