Bilski v. Kappos
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-964

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bernard L. Bilski and Rand A. Warsaw, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Michael Jakes +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 mike.jakes@finnegan.com
No Logo David J. Kappos, Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo David J. Kappos, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Malcolm L. Stewart +1 202 514 2201 malcolm.l.stewart@usjoj.gov
No Logo 20 Law and Business Professors, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Lemley +1 650 723 4605 mlemley@law.stanford.edu
No Logo Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Tethys Bioscience, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Boyd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen I. Boyd +1 650 521 5930 +1 650 521 5931 boyd@turnerboyd.com
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn Beth Lamm +1 202 626 3605 +1 202 639 9355 clamm@whitecase.com
No Logo American Insurance Association, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R Myers +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 james.myers@ropesgray.com
No Logo American Intellectual Property Law Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William K West, Jr. +1 202 783 0800 +1 202 783 6610 westw@howrey.com
No Logo American Medical Association, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine J. Strandburg +1 212 998 6269 katherine.strandburg@nyu.edu
No Logo Anne E. Barschall, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Anne E Barschall Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Elizabeth Barschall +1 914 332 1019 aebarschall@yahoo.com
No Logo Association Internationale Pour la Protection de la Propriete Intellectuelle, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Mark Halligan +1 312 425 3900 +1 312 425 3909 rmhalligan@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Austin Intellectual Property Law Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Claire Kuhn +1 512 731 1847 jenkuhn@austin.rr.com
No Logo AwakenIP, LLC, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by The Thornton Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel H. Thornton +1 706 266 6836
No Logo Bank of America Corporation, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Biotechnology Industry Organization, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Anthony Figg +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 efigg@rfem.com
No Logo Bloomberg LP, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelsey I Nix +1 212 728 8256 +1 212 728 9256 knix@willkie.com
No Logo Borland Software Corporation, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Kokka & Backus, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott S. Kokka +1 650 566 9921 lyao@kokkalaw.com
No Logo Boston Patent Law Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Bromberg & Sunstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel R. Leeman +1 617 443 9292 +1 617 443 0004 jleeman@bromsun.com
No Logo Business Software Alliance, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Caris Diagnostics, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon A. Schor +1 212 999 5800
No Logo Center for Advanced Study and Research in Intellectual Property, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard H. Stern +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 RStern@khhte.com
No Logo Computer & Communications Industry Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn B. Manishin +1 202 776 7813 +1 202 478 2875 gbmanishin@duanemorris.com
No Logo Conejo Valley Bar Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Socal IP Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Charles Sereboff +8052 301 350 x220 +1 805 230 1355 ssereboff@socalip.com
No Logo Dolby Laboratories, Inc., et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John L. Cooper +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 jcooper@fbm.com
No Logo Double Rock Corporation, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Amster Rothstein & Ebenstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Robert Macedo +1 212 336 8074 +1 212 336 8001 cmacedo@arelaw.com
No Logo Dr.Ananda Chakrabarty, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space F. Scott Kieff +1 202 558 6667
No Logo Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Andrew L. Schlafly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Layton Schlafly +1 908 719 8608 +1 212 214 0354 aschlafly@aol.com
No Logo Eleven Law Professors, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Justice in Capital Cases

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua D. Sarnoff +1 312 362 6326 jsarnoff@depaul.edu
No Logo Entrepreneurial and Consumer Advocates, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by U.C. Berkeley School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M. Schultz +1 510 642 1957
No Logo Entrepreneurial Software Companies, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Greene Sterne +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540
No Logo Federal Circuit Bar Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by ELIZABETH M. ROESEL, ESQ.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. McKeown +20 202 202 2624
No Logo Federation International Des Conseils En Propriete Industrielle, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Eaton & Van Winkle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maxim H Waldbaum +1 212 561 3610 +1 212 753 5044 MWaldbaum@evw.com
No Logo Foundation for a Free Information Infrastructure, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Hopkins & Carley ALC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allonn Emanuel Levy +1 408 286 9800 +1 408 998 4790 alevy@hopkinscarley.com
No Logo Franklin Pierce Law Center, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by PROFESSOR OF LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas G. Field +1 603 513 5147

Toggle Switch Represented by University of New Hampshire School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Marie McCrackin +1 603 228 1541 mccrackin@law.unh.edu
No Logo Free Software Foundation, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Cohen +1 617 345 3000 jcohen@burnslev.com
No Logo Gary W. Odom and Jordan M. Kuhn, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Johnathan E. Mansfield +1 503 222 9981 +1 503 796 2900 jmansfield@schwabe.com
No Logo Georgia Biomedical Partnership, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnall Golden Gregory, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Kitchens +1 404 873 8644 +1 404 873 8501 william.kitchens@agg.com
No Logo Houston Intellectual Property Law Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard L. Speight

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard L. Speight +1 713 881 9600 +1 713 715 7384 howard@hspeight.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Cook Alex McFarron Manzo Cummings & Mehler, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward David Manzo +1 312 236 8500 +1 312 236 8176 emanzo@cookalex.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Owners Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Leonard Graff +1 212 318 6019 +1 212 230 7860 glgraff@graffadr.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Section of the Nevada State Bar, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Ryan +1 775 824 0104 +1 775 824 0107 rcryan@hollandhart.com
No Logo International Business Machines Corporation in support of neithr party, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Internet Retailers, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
No Logo JOHN P. SUTTON, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P Sutton +1 530 477 8538 johnpsutton@earthlink.net
No Logo John Sutton, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P Sutton +1 530 477 8538 johnpsutton@earthlink.net
No Logo Knowledge Ecology International, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael H. Davis,. +1 917 771 0235
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Philips Interlectual Property & Standards

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack E. Haken +1 914 945 6000
No Logo Law Professor Kevin Emerson Collins, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington University School Of Law In St. Louis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Emerson Collins +1 812 856 1841
No Logo Legal OnRamp, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catriona M. Collins +1 646 321 8443
No Logo Mark Landesmann, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SHAUN R. SNADER +1 202 672 5300
No Logo Medistem, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Latimer Mayberry & Matthews

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Allison Matthews +1 434 525 1141
Medtronic, Inc. Medtronic, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)
Unknown Role, Antivirals, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cambridge Heart, Inc.
Unknown Role, Tengion, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence M. Sung +1 202 346 8000 lsung@dl.com
No Logo Microsoft Corporation, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Perry +1 202 887 3667 +1 202 530 9696 mperry@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Monogram Biosciences, Inc., et al, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Narinder S. Banait +1 650 335 7818 nbanait@fenwick.com
Novartis Corporation Novartis Corporation, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington, D.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Lamken +1 202 639 7978 +1 202 639 7890 jlamken@mololamken.com
No Logo On Time Systems Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stuart P. Meyer +1 650 858 7286 +1 650 858 7286 smeyer@fenwick.com
No Logo Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry J. Roper +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 527 0484 hroper@jenner.com
No Logo Profesor Lee A. Hollaar, and IEEE-USA, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Parsons Behle & Latimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Bennion +1 801 532 1234 dbennion@parsonsbehle.com
No Logo Professors Peter S. Menell and Michael J. Meurer, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by UC Berkeley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Menell +1 510 642 5489 pmenell@law.berkeley.edu
No Logo Prometheus Laboratories, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P Bress +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 rick.bress@lw.com
No Logo Raymond C. Meiers, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Macmillan Sobanski & Todd, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard S Macmillan docketing@mstfirm.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Red Hat, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert H. Tiller +1 919 754 4232 rtiller@redhat.com
No Logo Regulatory Datacorp., et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Duffy +1 202 639 7000
No Logo Robert R. Sachs and Daniel R. Brownstone, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert R. Sachs +1 650 988 8500 rsachs@fenwick.com
No Logo San Diego Intellectual Property Law Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C Laurenson +1 949 759 5269 +1 949 721 6910 laurensonr@howrey.com
No Logo Software Freedom Law Center [, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Software Freedom Law Center, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eben Moglen +1 212 461 1900 moglen@softwarefreedom.org
No Logo Telecommunications Systems, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Greenspoon +1 312 431 3800 +1 312 551 9501 rpg@fg-law.com
No Logo Teles Ag, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS S. BIEMER +1 215 575 7025 +1 215 575 7200 tbiemer@dilworthlaw.com
No Logo Timothy F. McDonough, Ph.D., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M Lamoreaux +1 214 747 2012 + 214 747 3212 w.lamoreaux@tx.rr.com
No Logo University of South Florida, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Saliwanchik Lloyd & Saliwanchik, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeff Lloyd +1 352 375 8100 JL@slspatents.com
No Logo Washington State Patent Law Association, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodcock Washburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Knudsen +1 206 332 1380 pknudsen@woodcock.com
No Logo William Mitchell College of Law Intellectual Property Institute, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by William Mitchell College of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Carl Moy +1 651 290 6344
Yahoo, Inc. Yahoo, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Launch Media, Inc.
Google, Inc. Unknown Role, Google, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hortonworks, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Wiltshire Grannis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Wright +1 202 730 1300
No Logo Accenture and Pitney Bowes Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meredith Martin Addy +1 312 577 1251 +1 312 577 1370 maddy@steptoe.com
No Logo Software & Infomation Industry Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott E. Bain +1 202 789 4492 +1 202 289 7097 sbain@siia.net
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 2007-1130
Lower Court Decision Date 10/30/2008
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 102 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 101 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Aug 13 2010
      LREF
      Blank 100 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Jul 30 2010
        LREF
        Blank 99 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Jun 28 2010
          LREF
          Blank 98 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Nov 9 2009
            LREF
            Blank 97 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Oct 26 2009
              LREF
              Blank 96 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Oct 2 2009
                LREF
                Blank 95 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Oct 2 2009
                  LREF
                  Blank 94 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Oct 2 2009
                    LREF
                    Blank 93 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                    Oct 2 2009
                      LREF
                      Blank 92 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                      Oct 2 2009
                        LREF
                        Blank 91 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                        Oct 2 2009
                          LREF
                          Blank 90 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                          Oct 2 2009
                            LREF
                            Blank 89 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                            Oct 2 2009
                              LREF
                              Blank 88 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                              Oct 2 2009
                                LREF
                                Blank 87 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                Oct 2 2009
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 86 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                  Oct 2 2009
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 85 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of Bank of America Corporation, et al.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 84 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                      Brief amicus curiae of William Mitchell College of Law Intellectual Property Institute filed. (Distributed)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 83 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Tethys Bioscience, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 82 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                          Brief amicus curiae of Software & Information Industry Association filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 81 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Microsoft Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 80 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of Eleven Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 79 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of Software Freedom Law Center filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Red Hat, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of Internet Retailers filed. (Distributed)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Center for Advanced Study and Research in Intellectual Property, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Section of the Nevada State Bar filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Brief of respondent David J. Kappos, Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office filed. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of Profesor Lee A. Hollaar, and IEEE-USA filed. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                              CIRCULATED.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Record received from U.S.C.A. for Federal Circuit. (1 Box)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, November 9, 2009
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of John Sutton filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Dolby Laboratories, Inc., et al. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Ananda Chakrabarty filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Law Professor Kevin Emerson Collins in support of neither party filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Franklin Pierce Law Center filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Houston Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Novartis Corporation filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Borland Software Corporation filed.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Propriete Industrielle in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Double Rock Corporation, et al. filed.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of AwakenIP, LLC filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of University of South Florida filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Regulatory Datacorp., et al. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Legal OnRamp in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Robert R. Sachs and Daniel R. Brownstone in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Medtronic, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Teles AG in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of San Diego Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of 20 Law and Business Professors in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Business Software Alliance in support of affirmance filed.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Prometheus Laboratories Inc. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of International Business Machines Corporation in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Biotechnology Industry Organization, et al. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Austin Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Yahoo! Inc. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Entrepreneurial Software Companies in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Raymond C. Meiers in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Washington State Patent Law Association filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Georgia Biomedical Partnership, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Boston Patent Law Association filed.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Accenture and Pitney Bowes Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Association Internationale Pour la Protection de la Propriete Intellectuelle, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Caris Diagnostics, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Monogram Biosciences, Inc., et al in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of On Time Systems, Inc., in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Conejo Valley Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Brief of petitioners Bernard L. Bilski and Rand A. Warsaw filed.
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Gary W. Odom and Jordan M. Kuhn in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Telecommunications Systems, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Timothy F. McDonough, Ph.D. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    The time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 25, 2009.
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 30, 2009.
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2009.
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Reply of petitioners Bernard L. Bilski and Rand A. Warsaw filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Brief of respondent John J. Doll, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Acting Director, Patent and Trademark Office in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 1, 2009.
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Borland Software Corporation filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Boston Patent Law Association filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Franklin Pierce Law Center filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Accenture and Pitney Bowes Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Anne E. Barschall filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Medistem, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of John P. Sutton filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 1, 2009.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Conejo Valley Bar Association in support of Neither Party filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 245 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?