McDonald v. Chicago
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-1521

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Otis McDonald, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Gura & Possessky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Gura +1 703 835 9085 +1 703 997 7665 alan@gurapossessky.com
No Logo City of Chicago, Illinois, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Feldman +1 202 730 1267 wexfeld@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benna Ruth Solomon +1 312 744 7764 benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org
No Logo National Rifle Association of America, Inc., et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Poss +1 617 570 1886 +1 617 523 1231 sposs@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stephen P. Halbrook

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Porter Halbrook +1 703 352 7276 +1 703 359 0938 protell@aol.com
No Logo National Rifle Association, Inc., et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Bancroft PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 pclement@bancroftpllc.com
No Logo Academics for Second Amendment, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Professor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Edward Olson +1 651 523 2142
No Logo American Civil Rights Union, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Rights Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Ferrara +1 703 582 8466
American Legislative Exchange Council American Legislative Exchange Council, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rick A. Haberman +1 616 458 1300
No Logo Anti-defamation League, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leonard M. Niehoff +1 734 418 4246 +1 734 418 4247 lniehoff@honigman.com
No Logo Appelants from the Ninth Circuit Incorporation case of Nordyke v. King, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Donald Kilmer, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr. +1 408 264 8489 +1 408 264 8487 Don@DKLawOffice.com
No Logo Arms Keepers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Theodore Hyman +1 203 954 6607
No Logo Board of Education of the City of Chicago, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Dyke +1 415 984 8200 +1 415 984 8300 cdyke@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Buckeye Firearms Foundation, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. Kenneth Hanson +1 740 363 1213
No Logo Calguns Foundation, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik S. Jaffe +1 202 434 5334
No Logo CALIFORNIA, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zackery Paul Morazzini +1 916 327 8691 +1 916 327 2026 zmorazzini@fppc.ca.gov
No Logo Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony T. Caso +1 714 628 2666 caso@chapman.edu
No Logo English/Early American Historians, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodin MacBride Squeri Day & Lamprey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Goodin +1 415 392 7900 +1 415 398 4321 rgoodin@gmssr.com
No Logo Foundation for Moral Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Foundation for Moral Law, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin D. DuPre +1 334 262 1245 bdupre@morallaw.org
No Logo Goldwater Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldwater Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clint Daniel Bolick +1 602 462 5000 +1 602 256 7045 cbolick@goldwaterinstitute.org
No Logo Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jeffrey Olson +1 703 356 5070 +1 703 356 5085 wjo@mindspring.com
No Logo Heartland Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Carlson +1 847 962 1775
No Logo Historians and Legal Scholars, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda T. Coberly +1 312 558 8768 +1 312 558 5700 lcoberly@winston.com
No Logo Institute for Justice, and Cato Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Institute for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark M. Neily, III +1 703 682 9320 +1 703 682 9321 cneily@ij.org
No Logo International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Independence Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Benjamin Kopel +1 303 279 6536 +1 303 279 4176 david@i2i.org
No Logo Law Professor and Students, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Ohio State University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Aaron Berman +1 614 688 8690 berman.43@osu.edu
No Logo Maryland Arms Collectors' Association, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don Bernard Kates +1 562 216 4444 +1 562 216 4445
No Logo National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence G Keane +1 203 426 1320 +1 203 426 7182 lkeane@nssf.org
No Logo Oak Park Citizens Committee for Handgun Control, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Hochman +1 312 853 7000 rhochman@sidley.com
No Logo Organizations Committed to Protecting the Public's Health, Safety, and Well-Being, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Danielle Cantor +1 213 683 9299 +6834 683 683 4099
No Logo Paragon Foundation, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott & Kienzle, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul M. Kienzle, III +1 505 246 8600 +1 505 246 8682 paul@kienzlelaw.com
No Logo Professors of Philosophy, Criminology, Law and Other Fields, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc James Ayers +1 205 521 8598 mayers@babc.com
No Logo Representatives Carolyn McCarthy, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Milici +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 jmilici@bsfllp.com
No Logo Rocky Mountain Gun Owners, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain States Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Lechner +1 303 292 2021 +2921 292 292 1980 lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
No Logo SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Scott Burdin +1 202 543 8733 +1 202 543 1205 dburdin@safariclub.org
No Logo State Firearm Associations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Blaies & Hightower LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W Hryekewicz +1 817 334 0800 +1 817 334 0574 jwh@bhilaw.com
No Logo Texas, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C. Ho +1 214 698 3264 +1 214 571 2917 James.Ho@oag.state.tx.us
No Logo Thirty-Four California District Attorneys, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Michel & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck D. Michel +1 562 216 4441 +1 562 216 4445 cmichel@michellawyers.com
No Logo Villages of Winnetka and Skokie, Illinois, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by DONAHUE & GOLDBERG, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Thomas Goldberg +1 212 334 8813 david@donahuegoldberg.com
No Logo Women State Legislators and Academics, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Rifle Association of America

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Anne Gervase +1 571 236 1169 sgervase@nrahq.org
No Logo American Center for Law & Justice, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
No Logo American Cities, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry C. Su +1 650 798 3528 +1 650 798 3600 suh@howrey.com
No Logo Association of Prosecuting Attorneys and District Attorneys, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifford M. Sloan +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 8340 cliff.sloan@skadden.com
No Logo Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, et al.,, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson +1 202 663 6390 +1 202 663 6363 paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Cato Institute, and Pacific Legal Foundation, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy M. Sandefur +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 tms@pacificlegal.org
No Logo Conference of Mayors, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Rosenthal +1 714 628 2650 rosentha@chapman.edu
No Logo Constitutional Law Professors, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Constitutional Accountability Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ELIZABETH BONNIE WYDRA +1 714 222 0144 +1 202 296 6895 elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
No Logo Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Andrew L. Schlafly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Layton Schlafly +1 908 719 8608 +1 212 214 0354 aschlafly@aol.com
No Logo Educational Fund to Stop Gun Violence, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Erik Schreiber +1 213 621 6370 +1 213 621 6100 jschreiber@dl.com
No Logo Gun Owners of America, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert William Titus +1 757 467 0616 +1 757 467 0834
No Logo Historians on Early American Legal, Constitutional and Pennsylvania History, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roderick Manley Thompson +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 rthompson@fbm.com
No Logo Illinois, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Scodro +1 312 814 3312 mscodro@atg.state.il.us
No Logo Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER +1 732 549 5600 +1 732 549 1881 dschmutter@greenbaumlaw.com
No Logo NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Payton +1 212 965 2200 jpayton@naacpldf.org
No Logo Professors of Criminal Justice, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Buck Varella +1 617 856 8171
No Logo Rutherford Institute,, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by The Rutherford Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. +1 434 978 3888 johnw@rutherford.org
No Logo State Legislators, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Parker Sweeney +1 410 545 5821 +1 410 694 0181 jsweeney@wcsr.com
No Logo Thirty-Four Professional Historians and Legal Historians, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew M. Shors +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 mshors@omm.com
Related Case 09A579
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 08-4241, 08-4243, 08-4244
Lower Court Decision Date 6/2/2009
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 94 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 93 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Jul 30 2010
      LREF
      Blank 92 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Jun 28 2010
        LREF
        Blank 91 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Mar 2 2010
          LREF
          Blank 90 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Jan 29 2010
            LREF
            Blank 89 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Jan 29 2010
              LREF
              Blank 88 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Jan 25 2010
                LREF
                Blank 87 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Jan 25 2010
                  LREF
                  Blank 86 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Jan 25 2010
                    LREF
                    Blank 85 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                    Jan 12 2010
                      LREF
                      Blank 84 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                      Jan 8 2010
                        LREF
                        Blank 83 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                        Jan 6 2010
                          LREF
                          Blank 82 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                          Jan 6 2010
                            LREF
                            Blank 81 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                            Jan 6 2010
                              LREF
                              Blank 80 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                              Jan 6 2010
                                LREF
                                Blank 79 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                Jan 6 2010
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 78 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                  Jan 6 2010
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 77 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                    Jan 6 2010
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 76 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                      Jan 6 2010
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 75 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                        Jan 6 2010
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 74 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                          Jan 6 2010
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 73 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                            Jan 6 2010
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 72 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                              Jan 6 2010
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 71 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                Jan 6 2010
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                  Jan 6 2010
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                    Jan 6 2010
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                      Jan 6 2010
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                        Jan 6 2010
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                          Jan 5 2010
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                            Jan 5 2010
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                              Jan 4 2010
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                Dec 30 2009
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                  Dec 30 2009
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                    Dec 22 2009
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                      Dec 21 2009
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                        Dec 15 2009
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                          Dec 14 2009
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                            Dec 8 2009
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                              Dec 7 2009
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                Nov 30 2009
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                  Nov 23 2009
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                    Nov 23 2009
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                      Nov 23 2009
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                        Nov 23 2009
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                          Nov 23 2009
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                            Nov 23 2009
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                              Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Nov 23 2009
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, et al.,
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of American Civil Rights Union, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Safari Club International filed.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Calguns Foundation, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Maryland Arms Collectors' Association, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of State Firearm Associations filed.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Appellants from the Ninth Circuit Incorporation case of Nordyke v. King, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, and Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Heartland Institute filed.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Paragon Foundation, Inc. filed.
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Rutherford Institute filed.
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Brief of petitioners Otis McDonald, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Brief of respondents National Rifle Association, Inc., et al. in support of petitioners filed.
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            The time within which to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 30, 2009.
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, conditioned on 10 notice of intent to file, received from counsel for respondents City of Chicago and Village of Oak Park.
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Consent to the filing of amicus briefs. in support of either party or of neither party, conditioned on 7 day written notice of intent to file, received from counsel for respondents National Rifle Association of America, Inc., et al. in support of petitioners.
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party,conditioned on 7 day written notice of intent to file, received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Petition GRANTED.
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2009.
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Reply of petitioners Otis McDonald, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Brief of respondent City of Chicago in opposition filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Professors filed.
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc.,et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, and Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of California filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 5, 2009.
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from Counsel for the petitioners.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Arms Keepers filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 448 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?