Brown v. Plata
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-1233

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen N. Zack +1 312 988 5000 abapresident@abanet.org
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Other Party
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Fathi +1 202 393 4930 +1 202 393 4931 dfathi@npp-aclu.org
No Logo American Psychiatric Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Martin Panner +1 202 326 7921 +1 202 326 7900 apanner@khhte.com
No Logo American Public Health Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Schiavo Blatt +1 202 942 5842 lisa.blatt@aporter.com
No Logo Center on the Administration of Criminal Law and 30 Criminologists, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Christopher Rozendaal +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 JRozendaal@khhte.com
No Logo Corrections and Law Enforcement Personnel, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Anthony Burck +1 202 682 7002 +1 202 857 0940 williamburck@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Greater Stockton Chamber of Commerce, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Herum Crabtree

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven A. Herum +1 209 472 7700 sherum@herumcrabtree.com
No Logo J. Clark Kelso, Receiver for Medical Healthcare for the California State Prisons, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C. Harris +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 gharris@mofo.com
No Logo Louisiana, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RONALD EISENBERG +1 215 686 5700 alexandra.duda@phila.gov
No Logo Prison Fellowship, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES STEWART +1 973 597 2500 +1 973 597 2400 jstewart@lowenstein.com
No Logo Appellee Intervenor California Correctional Peace Officers' Association, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Carroll, Burdick & McDonough LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurie J. Hepler +1 415 743 2218 lhepler@cbmlaw.com
No Logo California State Republican Legislator Intervenors, et al., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Shea Kaufhold +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 skaufhold@kaufholdgaskin.com
No Logo Coleman Plaintiffs-Appellees, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Bancroft PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 pclement@bancroftpllc.com
No Logo Plata Appellees, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Prison Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald H. Specter +1 510 280 2621 +1 510 280 2704 dspecter@prisonlaw.com
No Logo Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Governor of California, et al., Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
Related Case 09A849
Lower Court United States District Courts for the Eastern District and the Northern District of California
Lower Court Case No(s). CIV S-90-0520 LKK JFM P, C01-1351 TEH
Lower Court Decision Date 1/12/2010
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Northern District of California.
    LREF
    Blank 53 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Eastern District of California.
      LREF
      Blank 52 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 51 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
        Adjudged to be AFFIRMED Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Scalia, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas, J., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Roberts, C. J., joined.
          LREF
          Blank 50 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
          Motion for leave to file a supplemental brief after argument filed by appellees GRANTED.
            LREF
            Blank 49 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
            Motion for leave to file a supplemental brief after argument filed by appellants GRANTED.
              LREF
              Blank 48 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
              Motion to file a supplemental brief after argument filed by appellees Plata and Coleman Appellees. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 47 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                Motion to file a supplemental brief after argument filed by appellants Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Governor of California, et al. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 46 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                  Argued. For appellants: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D. C. For appellees: Donald Specter, Berkeley, Cal.
                    LREF
                    Blank 45 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                    Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by J. Clark Kelso, Receiver for Medical Healthcare for the California State Prisons GRANTED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 44 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                      Reply of Intervenors filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 43 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                        Reply of appellants Arnold Schwarzenegger, Governor of California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                          Motion of appellees for divided argument DENIED. An additional ten minutes are allotted to each side for oral argument.
                            LREF
                            Blank 41 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                            Application (10A483) of appellants for leave to file a reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limit granted by Justice Kennedy .
                              LREF
                              Blank 40 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                              Application (10A483) of appellants for leave to file a reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                LREF
                                Blank 39 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                Joint appendix filed (6 volumes). (Statement of costs filed). (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 38 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Corrections and Law Enforcement Personnel filed. (Distributed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of American Public Health Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 36 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                      Joint motion of appellees for divided argument filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 35 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law and 30 Criminologists filed. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 34 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of Prison Fellowship, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                            Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                              Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by J. Clark Kelso, Receiver for Medical Healthcare for the California State Prisons.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 31 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of American Psychiatric Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Trial exhibits received from counsel. (There are sealed documents in these exhibits)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Brief of appellees Plata Appellees filed. (Distributed)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Brief of appellee Appellee Intervenor California Correctional Peace Officers' Association filed. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                          *Brief of Coleman Appellees, footnote 1, p. 4, refers to jurisdictional statement appendix in Case No. 416, filed October 5, 2009.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Brief of Coleman Appellees filed. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                              CIRCULATED
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, November 30, 2010.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Greater Stockton Chamber of Commerce filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, et al. filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief of appellants Arnold Schwarzenegger, Governor of California, et al. filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief of appellees California State Republican Legislator Intervenors, et al. filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Record received from U.S.D.C. for Eastern District of California. (22 boxes)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Record received from U.S.D.C. for Northern District of California (7 boxes). There are sealed documents in this record.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for appellees, counsel for the appellants, and counsel for appellee intervenor.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Counsel for the appellants agrees to file a reply brief on the merits, if any, on or before November 19, 2010.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    The time to file appellees' briefs on the merits is extended to and including October 25, 2010.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      The time to file appellants' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 27, 2010.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        The Clerk has approved use of the deferred joint appendix method.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 10, 2010.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Consolidated opposition of appellants to appellees' motions to dismiss or affirm filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellee Intervenor California Correctional Peace Officers' Association. VIDED.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by Plata Appellees. VIDED.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by Coleman Plaintiffs-Appellees. VIDED.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due May 14, 2010)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Application (09A849) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 12, 2010.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Application (09A849) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from March 20, 2010 to April 12, 2010, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Docket Sheet received from U.S.D.C. for Northern District of California. (1 envelope)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 255 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?