Camreta v. Greene
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-1454

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bob Camreta, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Kroger +1 503 378 6002 john.r.kroger@doj.state.or.us
Space David B. Thompson +1 503 378 4402 david.b.thompson@doj.state.or.us
Space Mary H. Williams +1 503 378 6002 mary.williams@doj.state.or.us
No Logo James Alford, Deschutes County Deputy Sheriff, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Deschutes County

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher D. Bell +1 541 388 6624 +1 541 617 4748 christopher_bell@co.deschutes.or.us
No Logo Sarah Greene, Personally and as Next Friend of S. G., a Minor, and K. G., a Minor, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn A. Kubitschek +1 212 349 0900 ckubitschek@lanskub.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Mikel R. Miller, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mikel R. Miller +1 541 388 9819 +1 541 317 4987 mike@lawofficeofmikelrmiller.com
No Logo , Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Medpay Systems Inc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space cwright@rctlegal.com
No Logo American Family Rights Association, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Landau +1 202 879 5087 +1 202 654 9532 clandau@kirkland.com
No Logo Battered Women's Resource Center, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren E. Handel +1 212 547 5400 lhandel@mwe.com
No Logo Children's Advocacy Institute, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Center For Public Interest Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Fellmeth +1 619 260 4806 +1 619 260 4753 cpil@sandiego.edu
No Logo Cook County Public Guardian, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Cook County State's Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kass A. Plain 1 +1 +1 +1 kass.plain@cookcountyil.gov
No Logo Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Joseph +1 202 669 5135 +1 202 318 2254 ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
No Logo Family Research Council, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Austin Robert Nimocks +1 202 393 8690 +1 480 444 0028 animocks@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
No Logo Juvenile Law Center, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Juvenile Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marsha L. Levick +1 215 625 0551 mlevick@jlc.org
No Logo National School Boards Association, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francisco M. Negron +1 703 838 6722
No Logo New York University School of Law Family Defense Clinic, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Latham Kerr +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 ckerr@mofo.com
No Logo Society of Catholic Social Scientists, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by President, Society of Catholic Social Scientists

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Krason +1 740 284 5377 catholicsocialscientists@gmail.com
No Logo The United States, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. Kneedler +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
No Logo 1951 West Camelback,

Toggle Switch Represented by Yavapai County Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Counsel of Record1951 Sheila.polk@co.yavapai.az.us
No Logo Diane L. Redleaf ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Family Defense Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diane L. Redleaf +1 312 356 3202 +1 312 251 9801 dredleaf@redleaflawyer.com
No Logo Elizabeth S. Warner ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth S. Warner +1 517 787 3560 eswarner@aol.com
No Logo Gary C. Seiser ,

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of State Hospitals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary C. Seiser +1 858 492 2550 Gary.Seiser@sdcounty.ca.gov
No Logo Foley & Lardner, LLP,
Officially listed as "George E. Quillin "

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GEORGE E. QUILLIN +1 202 672 5300
No Logo John W.,

Toggle Switch Represented by The Rutherford Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. +1 434 978 3888 johnw@rutherford.org
No Logo Kathleen P. Sweeney ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Patricia Sweeney +1 602 542 8625 +1 602 542 8308 Kathleen.Sweeney@azag.gov
No Logo Mathew D. Staver ,

Toggle Switch Represented by LIBERTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Crampton +1 434 592 7000 +1 434 592 7700 court@lc.org
No Logo Michael E. Rosman ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Individual Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. Rosman , +1 202 833 8400 +1 202 833 8410 rosman@cir-usa.org
No Logo Michael Y. Scudder,

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Yale Scudder, Jr. +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0411 mscudder@skadden.com
No Logo Sophia Gabrielle Roach ,

Toggle Switch Represented by sdcda.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sophia Gabrielle Roach +1 619 531 4217 sophia.roach@sdcda.org
No Logo Arizona, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula S Bickett +1 602 542 8304 +1 602 542 8308 paula.bickett@azag.gov
No Logo Center for Law and Education, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda T. Coberly +1 312 558 8768 +1 312 558 5700 lcoberly@winston.com
No Logo Legal Aid Society, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LEGAL AID SOCIETY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R. Banks +1 212 577 3456 +1 212 509 8432 SBANKS@LEGAL-AID.ORG
No Logo Legal Services for Children, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Albert Basinger +1 212 626 4463 +1 212 310 1624 john.basinger@bakermckenzie.com
No Logo Loyola Civitas Childlaw Center, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Loyola University of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce A. Boyer +1 312 915 7940 bboyer@luc.edu
No Logo National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by law.capital.edu Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R Brown +1 614 236 6590 +1 614 236 6956 scarlet86@sbcglobal.net
No Logo National Association of Social Workers, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Margaret Calkins +1 202 672 5300 mcalkins@foley.com
No Logo Pacific Justice Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis Bernard Atchley +1 760 400 0263 dbalaw@yahoo.com
Related Case 10A678
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-35333
Lower Court Decision Date 12/10/2009
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 67 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 66 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Oct 3 2011
      LREF
      Blank 65 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Oct 3 2011
        LREF
        Blank 64 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Jul 27 2011
          LREF
          Blank 63 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Jul 14 2011
            LREF
            Blank 62 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Jul 13 2011
              LREF
              Blank 61 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Jul 12 2011
                LREF
                Blank 60 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Jul 5 2011
                  LREF
                  Blank 59 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Jun 27 2011
                    LREF
                    Blank 58 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                    May 26 2011
                      LREF
                      Blank 57 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                      Mar 1 2011
                        LREF
                        Blank 56 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                        Feb 22 2011
                          LREF
                          Blank 55 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                          Feb 18 2011
                            LREF
                            Blank 54 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                            Feb 18 2011
                              LREF
                              Blank 53 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                              Feb 17 2011
                                LREF
                                Blank 52 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                Jan 31 2011
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 51 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                  Jan 31 2011
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 50 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                    Jan 31 2011
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 49 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                      Jan 31 2011
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 48 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                        Jan 31 2011
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 47 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                          Jan 31 2011
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 46 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                            Jan 31 2011
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 45 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                              Jan 31 2011
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 44 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                Jan 31 2011
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                  Jan 31 2011
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                    Jan 31 2011
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Juvenile Law Center, et al.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amici curiae of Family Research Council, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amici curiae of Battered Women's Resource Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of Pacific Justice Institute, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Center for Individual Rights filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Society of Catholic Social Scientists filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Record from U.S.D.C. for the District of Oregon is electronic.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Record received from U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief of respondents Sarah Greene, Personally and as Next Friend for S. G., a Minor, and K. G., a Minor filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Application (10A678) granted by Justice Kennedy of respondents for leave to file a consolidated brief on the merits in excess of the word limitation.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              CIRCULATED.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Application (10A678) of respondents for leave to file a consolidated brief on the merits in excess of the word limitation, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 24, 2011. VIDED.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, March 1, 2011.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed. VIDED.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of District Attorneys of San Diego County, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Children's Advocacy Institute in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Cook County Public Guardian in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of National Association of Social Workers, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief of petitioner James Alford, Deschutes County Deputy Sheriff filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief of petitioner Bob Camreta filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Joint appendix filed. Statement of costs filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              The time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including December 10, 2010. VIDED
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from cunsel for the respondents. VIDED.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Petition GRANTED The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 09-1478 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 8, 2010.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2010.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief of respondents Sarah Greene, Personally and as Next Friend for S. G., a Minor, and K. G., a Minor in opposition filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 2, 2010.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Prosecuting Attorneys' Advisory Council filed.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2010)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 287 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?