Chamber of Commerce of United States of America v. Whiting
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-115

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo Michael B. Whiting, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary R. O'Grady +1 602 542 3333

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Arthur Munns +1 602 542 7997 +1 602 364 3202 christopher.munns@azag.gov
No Logo American Center for Law & Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
No Logo American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinberg, Jacobs & Tolani, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barnaby W. Zall +1 301 231 6943 +1 301 984 1200 bzall@bzall.com
No Logo Asian American Justice Center, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Murray Fong +1 415 983 1000 kevin.fong@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Business Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Dellinger +1 310 553 6700 +1 202 383 5414 wdellinger@omm.com
No Logo Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J. Joseph +1 202 669 5135 +1 202 318 2254 ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
No Logo Equal Employment Advisory Council, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Norris, Tysse, Lampley & Lakis, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Lampley +1 202 629 5600 jlampley@ntll.com
No Logo Immigration Reform Law Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Immigration Reform Law Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Hethmon +1 202 232 5599 +1 202 464 3590 mhethmon@irli.org
No Logo Missouri, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremiah J. Morgan +1 573 751 3321
No Logo National Employment Law Project, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leon O. Dayan +1 202 842 2600 +1 202 842 1888 ldayan@bredhoff.com
No Logo National Immigrant Justice Center, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda T. Coberly +1 312 558 8768 +1 312 558 5700 lcoberly@winston.com
No Logo NumbersUSA Education & Research Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by MCNEIL & RICKS, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. E. McNeil +1 202 256 7441 jmcnrick@yahoo.com
No Logo Representative Romano L. Mazzoli. et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6006
No Logo Service Employees International Union, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leon O. Dayan +1 202 842 2600 +1 202 842 1888 ldayan@bredhoff.com
No Logo State Senator Russell Pearce, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Orfanedes +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 porfanedes@judicialwatch.org
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. Kneedler +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
Related Case 08A1076
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 07-17272, 07-17274, 08-15357, 08-15359, 08-15360
Lower Court Decision Date 3/9/2009
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 49 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Jun 28 2011
      LREF
      Blank 48 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Jun 27 2011
        LREF
        Blank 47 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        May 26 2011
          LREF
          Blank 46 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Dec 8 2010
            LREF
            Blank 45 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Nov 22 2010
              LREF
              Blank 44 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Nov 15 2010
                LREF
                Blank 43 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Oct 28 2010
                  LREF
                  Blank 42 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Oct 28 2010
                    LREF
                    Blank 41 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                    Oct 28 2010
                      LREF
                      Blank 40 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                      Oct 28 2010
                        LREF
                        Blank 39 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                        Oct 28 2010
                          LREF
                          Blank 38 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                          Oct 28 2010
                            LREF
                            Blank 37 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                            Oct 27 2010
                              LREF
                              Blank 36 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                              Oct 27 2010
                                LREF
                                Blank 35 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                Brief of respondents Michael B. Whiting, et al.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                  CIRCULATED
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of Service Employees International Union filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                      Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center, et al. filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of Asian American Justice Center, et al. filed.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Representative Romano L. Mazzoli. et al. filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of Business Organizations filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Justice Kagan is recused in this case.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                    SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, December 8, 2010.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Brief of petitioners Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Joint appendix filed. (Statement of Costs received.).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                          The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 21, 2010.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                            The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 1, 2010.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Record received from U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Record received from U.S.D.C. for District of Arizona. (1 envelope)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Petition GRANTED.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Supplemental brief of respondents Janice K. Brewer, Arizona Governor, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 24, 2010.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Supplemental brief of petitioners Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2009.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Reply of petitioners Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief of respondents Janice K. Brewer, Arizona Governor, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Asian American Justice Center, et al. filed.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of National Employment Law Project, et al. filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Business Organizations filed.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 28, 2009, for all respondents.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2009)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Application (08A1076) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 24, 2009.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Application (08A1076) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 7, 2009 to August 6, 2009, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?