CSX Transp., Inc. v. McBride
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-235

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Csx Transportation, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A. Rothfeld +1 202 263 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Himmelfarb +1 202 263 3000 dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Robert McBride, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence M. Mann +1 202 298 9191 +1 202 469 8986 lm.mann@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Generally Admitted

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Marcus +1 618 622 3600 +1 618 622 3700 bmarcus@kujawskiassociates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Frederick +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dfrederick@khhte.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SHER CORWIN LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Gross +1 314 721 5200 mgross@shercorwin.com
No Logo Academy of Rail Labor Attorneys, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yaeger, Jungbauer & Barczak, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William G. Jungbauer +1 651 288 9500 +1 651 288 0227 wgjgrp@yjblaw.com
No Logo American Association for Justice, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lustigman Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Robert White +1 202 944 2839 +1 202 965 0902 jeffrey.white@cclfirm.com
No Logo American Train Dispatchers Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Interim General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold A. Ross +1 216 241 2630 haross1@ble-t.org
No Logo Cheryl Campagno, Daniel D. Hill, and Frances K. Jennings, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University Of Texas Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Sturley +1 512 232 1350
No Logo The Association of American Railroads, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Saphire +1 202 639 2505
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 08-3557
Lower Court Decision Date 3/16/2010
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Southern District of Illinois.
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
      Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, except as to Part III-A. Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined that opinion in full, and Thomas, J., joined as to all but Part III-A. Roberts, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia, Kennedy, and Alito, JJ., joined.
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
        Argued. For petitioner: Charles A. Rothfeld, Washington, D. C. For respondent: David C. Frederick, Washington, D. C.
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
          Reply of petitioner CSX Transportation, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
            Brief amici curiae of Cheryl Campagno, Daniel D. Hill, and Frances K. Jennings filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
              Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                Brief amicus curiae of Academy of Rail Labor Attorneys filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                  Brief amici curiae of American Train Dispatchers Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                    Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                      Brief of respondent Robert McBride filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                        The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 22, 2011.
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                          Partial record receivef from U.S.D.C. for Southern District of Illinois. The remainder of this record is electronic.
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                            Record from U.S.C.A. for 7th Circuit is electronic.
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                              CIRCULATED.
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                Brief amicus curiae of The Association of American Railroads filed. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                  Brief of petitioner CSX Transportation, Inc. filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                    Joint appendix filed. Statement of costs filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                      SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 28, 2011.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                        Petition GRANTED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                          Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by the Association of American Railroads GRANTED.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                            Reply of petitioner CSX Transportation, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 23, 2010.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                Brief of respondent Robert McBride in opposition filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by the Association of American Railroads.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 18, 2010.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 17, 2010)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 220 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?