Rhonda Ezell v. City of Chicago
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 10-3525

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 10:00 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00701580560 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 07/06/2011 Final Order with Mandate and Bill of Costs sent to the District Court Clerk. [6325854-2] [6325854] [10-3525] (JC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
    Mandate issued with bill of costs in the amount of $1087.90.. Record to be returned later 2 vol. of exhibits. [35] [6325846] [10-3525] (JC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
      Filed Bill of Costs by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in the amount of $1,241.43. [34] [6323654] [10-3525]--[Edited 07/20/2011 by FI]to reflect correct amount of $1,087.90. (Sigale, David)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        Filed opinion of the court by Judge Sykes. REVERSED and REMANDED. Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge, Concurring; and Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge. *This opinion was originally released in typescript. [33] [6321654] [10-3525] (FP)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
          ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [32] [6320302] [10-3525] (CD)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            Filed opinion of the court by Judge Sykes. The district court's order denying the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is REVERSED and the case is REMANDED with instructions to enter a preliminary injunction consistent with this opinion. Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge, concurring in the judgment; and Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge. This opinion is released in typescript; a printed version will follow. [31] [6320300] [10-3525] (CD)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
              Filed Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). [30] [6306168] [10-3525] (Sigale, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                Filed Appellee City of Chicago Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). [29] [6305750] [10-3525] (Loose, Suzanne)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                  Added Attorney(s) Suzanne M. Loose for party(s) Appellee City of Chicago, in case 10-3525 per appearance form. Appearance form filed by Attorney Suzanne M. Loose for Appellee City of Chicago, in case 10-3525. [28] [6305728] [10-3525]--[Edited 05/04/2011 by AD to reflect the addition of attorney Loose.] (Loose, Suzanne)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                    15 copies Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [6293615] [25] Electronically Transmitted. DIST. [25] [6293615] [10-3525] (LB)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                      15 copies Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae Patrick J. Charles, Paul Finkelman, Stanley Katz, David Thomas Konig and Robert J. Spitzer per order. Disk Filed. [24] [6290758] [10-3525] (RS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                        Instanter order issued GRANTING Unopposed Motion of Historians and Legal Scholars Paul Finkelman, Stanley N. Katz, David Thomas Konig, Patrick J. Charles, and Robert J. Spitzer as Amici Curiae in Support of Appellee to File Amicus Brief. The clerk of this court shall file INSTANTER the amicus brief received on February 25, 2011. [21] SCR [23] [6290696] [10-3525] (AD)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                          Argument set for Monday, April 4, 2011, at 9:30 a.m in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 20 minutes. [22] [6290421] [10-3525] (RS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                            Filed motion by Non-Party Paul Finkelman, Stanley N. Katz, David Thomas Konig, Patrick J. Charles and Robert J. Spitzer to file amicus brief. 15 copies amicus brief tendered. [21] [6290159] [10-3525] (KH)
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                              NOTICE: Attorney Benna Solomon for Appellee City of Chicago will not be available for oral argument April 11-12; May 12-13, 2011. [20] [6288541] [10-3525] (AB)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                15 copies Appellee's brief filed by Appellee City of Chicago. [6288289] [19] Disk Filed. [19] [6288289] [10-3525]--[Edited 02/22/2011 by RT] (RT)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE: Attorney Mr. David G. Sigale for Appellants Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated, Rhonda Ezell, Joseph I. Brown, William Hespen and Action Target, Incorporated will not be available for oral argument March 30-31; April 5-14, 2011. [18] [6288162] [10-3525] (AB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE: Attorney Benna Solomon for Appellee City of Chicago will not be available for oral argument April 7-8, 12, 14-15 & 26, 2011. [17] [6287616] [10-3525] (AB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                      Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [15] Appellee's brief due on or before 02/18/2011 for City of Chicago. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/11/2011 for Appellant Action Target, Incorporated, Appellant Joseph I. Brown, Appellant Rhonda Ezell, Appellant William Hespen and Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. CMD [16] [6283998] [10-3525] (AD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                        Motion filed by Appellee City of Chicago to extend time to file appellee's brief. [6283783] [10-3525] (KL)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                          Supplemental paper record on appeal filed. Contents of record : 2 vol. of exhibits.[14] [6277376] [10-3525] (DW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                            Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [12] Appellee's brief due on or before 02/07/2011 for City of Chicago. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/22/2011 for Appellant Action Target, Incorporated, Appellant Joseph I. Brown, Appellant Rhonda Ezell, Appellant William Hespen and Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. CMD [13] [6276275] [10-3525] (SM)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                              Motion filed by Appellee City of Chicago to extend time to file appellee's brief. [6276251] [10-3525] (CD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                15 copies Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Brett Benson by consent. Disk Filed. [11] [6272894] [10-3525] (SP)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Filed 10 copies Appendix by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [10] [6271637] [10-3525] (SP)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                    15 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/07/2011 for City of Chicago [6271634] [9] Electronically Transmitted. [9] [6271634] [10-3525]--[Edited 01/19/2011 by SP] (SP)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [8] [6269910] [10-3525] (SM)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 6 vol. of pleadings. [6] [6269332] [10-3525] (SK)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [5] [6266049] [10-3525] (SM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Attorney Alan Gura for Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated, William Hespen, Rhonda Ezell, Joseph I. Brown and Action Target, Incorporated in 10-3525 terminated and added Attorney(s) David G. Sigale for party(s) Appellant Joseph I. Brown Appellant Action Target, Incorporated Appellant Rhonda Ezell Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Appellant William Hespen, in case 10-3525 per disclosure statement. Disclosure statement filed by Attorney(s) David G. Sigale for party(s) Appellant Joseph I. Brown Appellant Action Target, Incorporated Appellant Rhonda Ezell Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated Appellant William Hespen Appellant Illinois State Rifle Association, in case 10-3525. [4] [6266037] [10-3525] (SM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Docketing statement filed by Appellants Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. [3] [6264486] [10-3525] (SM)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Appearance form filed by Attorneys Mara S. Georges, Myriam Zreczny Kasper and Suzanne M. Loose for Appellee City of Chicago. [2] [6263130] [10-3525] (FP)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Action Target, Incorporated, Appellant Joseph I. Brown, Appellant Rhonda Ezell, Appellant William Hespen and Appellant Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated by 11/04/2010. Transcript information sheet due by 11/12/2010. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/07/2010 for Action Target, Incorporated, Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated. Record on Appeal from Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division due by 11/19/2010. [1] [6262399] [10-3525] (CD)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 310 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?