Miranda McCuller v. Nautical Ventures, L.L.C.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 09-31084

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 7:32 AM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501576927 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [09-31084] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/19/2011 09:47 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501554341 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [09-31084] (JMA) [Entered: 07/28/2011 11:19 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501554326 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [09-31084 Affirmed in Part. Vacated and Remanded in Part] Judge: RHB, Judge: JLD, Judge: CH Mandate pull date is 08/18/2011 [09-31084] (JMA) [Entered: 07/28/2011 11:16 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501311971 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COURT ORDER FILED denying motion to allow demonstration at oral argument filed by Appellants Cross-Appellees Ms. Miranda McCuller and Mr. Benjamin McCuller [6685821-2] [09-31084] (SME) [Entered: 12/06/2010 08:24 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501310325 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Cross-Appellees Mr. Benjamin McCuller and Ms. Miranda McCuller to allow a demonstration during oral argument [6685821-2]. Date of service: 12/02/2010 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee(s): Hart, Townsley; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant(s): Herschaft, McCleskey, Morrison [09-31084] (Randall Earl Hart ) [Entered: 12/02/2010 03:55 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501257926 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 12/06/2010. [09-31084] (GAM) [Entered: 10/08/2010 09:20 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COSTS TAXED: each party to bear its own costs on appeal [09-31084] (JMA) [Entered: 07/28/2011 11:23 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Barksdale, Dennis, Haynes. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Randall Earl Hart arguing for Appellant Cross-Appellees Miranda McCuller and Benjamin McCuller; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Robert P McCleskey, Jr. arguing for Appellee Cross-Appellant L.L.C. Nautical Ventures [09-31084] (SME) [Entered: 12/08/2010 11:47 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on 12/08/2010 in New Orleans in the East Courtroom -- PM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [09-31084] (SME) [Entered: 10/22/2010 11:13 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Paper copies of cross appellant reply brief filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., in 09-31084 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [09-31084] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/26/2010 08:43 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 70 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?