Mims v. Arrow Financial Services, LLC
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-1195

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marcus D. Mims, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Beck PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deepak Gupta +1 202 470 3826 +1 202 328 7030 deepak@guptabeck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Lawrence Nelson +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 snelson@citizen.org
No Logo Arrow Financial Services LLC, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Barron & Newburger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Sinsley bsinsley@bns-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Garre +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 gregory.garre@lw.com
No Logo Aca International, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter E. Pederson, Jr. +1 312 704 3000 +1 312 704 3001 ppederson@hinshawlaw.com
No Logo Dba International, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmonds & Narita LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Topor +1 415 283 1000 +1 415 352 2625 jtopor@snllp.com
No Logo National Consumer Law Center, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard John Rubin +1 505 983 4418 +1 505 983 2050 dickrubin@cs.com
No Logo National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Schiavo Blatt +1 202 942 5842 lisa.blatt@aporter.com
Related Case 10A816
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 10-12077
Lower Court Decision Date 11/30/2010
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.D.C. for Southern District of Florida.
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. for 11th Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
        Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
          Argued. For petitioner: Scott L. Nelson, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Gregory G. Garre, Washington, D. C.
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
            Reply of petitioner Marcus D. Mims filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
              Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                Brief amicus curiae of ACA International filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                  Brief amicus curiae of DBA International filed. (Distributed)
                    LREF
                    Blank 23 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                    Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of the respondent received from counsel for the petitioner.
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                      Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of the respondent received from counsel for the petitioner.
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                        Brief of respondent Arrow Financial Services, LLC filed. (Distributed).
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                          Record received from U.S.D.C. for Southern District of Florida. (1 envelope)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                            Record received from U.S.C.A. for 11th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                              CIRCULATED
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                Brief of petitioner Marcus D. Mims filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                  Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                    SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday November 28, 2011.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                      Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for the respondent.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                        The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 27, 2011.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                          The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 13, 2011.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                            Petition GRANTED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                              Reply of petitioner Marcus D. Mims filed. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2011.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Brief of respondent Arrow Financial Services, LLC in opposition filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Law Center, et al. filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 27, 2011.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 2, 2011)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Application (10A816) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 30, 2011.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Application (10A816) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 28, 2011 to March 30, 2011, submitted to Justice Thomas.
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Space Space

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?