Astrue v. Capato
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-1472

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Kouichi Taniguchi, Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Ayer +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 737 2832

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Fried +1 202 879 3434 msfried@jonesday.com
No Logo Kan Pacific Saipan, Ltd., Respondent

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Himmelfarb +1 202 263 3000 dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Chicago Area Translators and Interpreters Association, et al., Other Party

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deanne E Maynard +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 dmaynard@mofo.com
No Logo Interpreting and Translation Professors, Other Party

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Scott Barnard +1 214 969 4299 +1 214 969 4343 sbarnard@akingump.com
No Logo National Association of Judiciary Interpreters and Translators, Other Party

Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Thomas Stancil +1 202 775 4520 +1 202 775 4510 mstancil@robbinsrussell.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-15212
Lower Court Decision Date 3/8/2011
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ISSUED.
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
    Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Kennedy, Thomas, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Sotomayor, JJ., joined.
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
      Argued. For petitioner: Michael S. Fried, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Dan Himmelfarb, Washington, D. C.
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
        Reply of petitioner Kouichi Taniguchi filed. (Distributed)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
          Record from Northern Mariana Islands (NMI) is electronic.
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
            Brief amici curiae of Chicago Area Translators and Interpreters Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
              Brief of respondent Kan Pacific Saipan, Ltd. filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                CIRCULATED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                  Record for U.S.D.C. for Mariana Islands (MNII) is electronic.
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                    Record received from U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                      SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 21, 2012.
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of Interpreting and Translation Professors filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                          Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Judiciary Interpreters and Translators filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                            Brief of petitioner Kouichi Taniguchi filed.
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                              Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party received from counsel for the respondent.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                  Consent to the fiing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                    The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2012.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                      The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 28, 2011.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                        Petition GRANTED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                            Reply of petitioner Kouichi Taniguchi filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                              Brief of respondent Kan Pacific Saipan, Ltd. in opposition filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 5, 2011.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2011)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 208 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?