Backpage.com et al v. McKenna et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00954-RSM
District Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ricardo S. Martinez
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 9:49 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Backpage.com, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ambika Kumar Doran +1 206 757 8030 +1 206 757 7700 ambikadoran@dwt.com
Space James Condon Grant +1 206 622 3150 +1 206 757 7096 jimgrant@dwt.com
No Logo internet archive, Plaintiff

Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Zimmerman +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 mattz@eff.org

Represented by Focal PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Venkat Balasubramani +1 206 529 4827 +1 206 260 3966 venkat@balasubramani.com
v.
No Logo Adam N Kick, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Andrew K Miller, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Angus Lee, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Anthony F Golk, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin C Nichols, Defendant
No Logo Dan Satterberg, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Daniel H Bigelow, Defendant
No Logo David J Burke, Defendant
No Logo David S McEachran, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Deborah S Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Denis P Tracy, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Gary A Riesen, Defendant
No Logo Gregory L Zempel, Defendant
No Logo Gregory M Banks, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo H. Steward Menefee, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo James L Nagle, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo James P. Hagarty, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Jeffrey S Barkdull, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Jon Tunheim, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan L Meyer, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Karl F Sloan, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Lori L Hoctor, Defendant
No Logo Mark K Roe, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Mark Lindquist, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Matthew L Newberg, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Michael K Dorcy, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Michael Sandona, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Randall K Gaylord, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Randy J Flyckt, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Rea L Culwell, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Richard Weyrich, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Rob McKenna, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Washington Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lana Sue Weinmann +1 206 389 2022 Lana.Weinmann@atg.wa.gov
No Logo Russell D Hauge, Defendant

Represented by KITSAP COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacquelyn Moore Aufderheide +1 360 337 4992 +1 360 337 7083 jaufderh@co.kitsap.wa.us
Space Ione S George +1 360 337 4992 +1 360 337 7083 igeorge@co.kitsap.wa.us
Space Jeremy Aaron Morris +1 360 337 4992 jmorris@co.kitsap.wa.us
No Logo Scott W Rosekrans, Defendant
No Logo Shawn P Sant, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Steven J Tucker, Defendant
No Logo Steven M Clem, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Susan I Baur, Defendant

Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Kathleen Eiden +1 206 296 8969 amy.eiden@kingcounty.gov
Space David J Eldred +1 206 296 0430 +1 206 296 8819 david.eldred@kingcounty.gov
No Logo Thomas A Metzger, Defendant
No Logo Timothy D Rasmussen, Defendant
Attributes
Office Seattle
Filed 6/4/2012
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Clallam
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Timeline
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 87 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Judgment by CourtCourt Filing
JUDGMENT BY COURT Plaintiffs be awarded declaratory and permanent injunctive relief in accordance with the Courts Orders of December 10, 2012; and Plaintiffs recover $200,000 for costs and attorneys fees from the Office of the Attorney General, acting in its official capacity on behalf of the State of Washington. This action was decided by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez based on the parties Stipulations and Proposed Orders for Entry of Final Judgment, filed on December 5, 2012 and the prior proceedings in the action, including Plaintiffs Motions for Preliminary Injunction and the Courts Order Granting Plaintiffs Motions for Preliminary Injunction, dated July 27, 2012 (Dkt. #69). (RS)
LREF
Blank 86 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT RUSSELL D. HAUGE ACCEPTING ORDER FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ENJOINING ENFORCEMENT OF RCW 4.68A.104 (WASHINGTON SENATE BILL 6251) by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
LREF
Blank 85 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ENJOINING ENFORCEMENT OF RCW 4.68A.104 (WASHINGTON SENATE BILL 6251) by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
LREF
Blank 84 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Proposed Order (Unsigned)
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re Judgment on Behalf of All Parties. (Grant, James)
LREF
Blank 83 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Russell D. Hauge Accepting Entry of Final Judgment Enjoining Enforcement of RCW 4.68A.104 (Washington Senate Bill 6251) by parties. (Grant, James)
LREF
Blank 82 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Final Judgment Enjoining Enforcement of RCW 4.68A.104 (Washington Senate Bill 6251) by parties. (Grant, James)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Response to Motion
RESPONSE, by Defendant Russell D Hauge, to [74] Joint MOTION for Clarification or Reconsideration re [72] Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (George, Ione)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Notice of Unavailability
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Ione S George for Defendant Russell D Hauge from 12/17/12 to 1/3/13. (George, Ione)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
ORDER re [78] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Nathan Daniel Cardozo for Internet Archive, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/18/2012, Entered: 11/18/2012 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nathan Cardozo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Internet Archive (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3019022. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012 Order to Re-Note MotionCourt Filing
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OR RECONSIDERATION; RE-NOTING [74] Joint MOTION for Clarification or Reconsideration re [72] Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; Noting Date 12/7/2012, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Notice of Unavailability
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Ione S George for Defendant Russell D Hauge (George, Ione)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: 10/29/2012 Notice of Unavailability
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Ione S George for Defendant Russell D Hauge (George, Ione)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 74 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Joint MOTION for Clarification or Reconsideration re [72] Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiffs Backpage.com LLC, Internet Archive. Noting Date 10/2/2012, (Doran, Ambika)
LREF
Blank 73 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ENJOINING ENFORCEMENT OF WASHINGTON SENATE BILL 6251 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
LREF
Blank 72 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting dft Hauge's [24] Motion to Dismiss; granting dft Hauge's [37] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Notice of Unavailability
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Ione S George for Defendant Russell D Hauge from September 4, 2012 to September 5, 2012 and September 21, 2012. (George, Ione)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 70 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Answer to Intervenor Complaint
ANSWER to [36] Intervenor Complaint by Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, David J Burke, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel.(Eldred, David)
LREF
Blank 69 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; parties to submit joint proposed order within 10 days by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
LREF
Blank 68 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY, filed by Defendant Russell D Hauge, TO RESPONSE to [37] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Plaintiff Internet Archives (George, Ione)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Daniel H. Bigelow, Wahkiakum County Prosecuting Attorney on 6/18/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Response to Motion
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Internet Archive, to [37] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Plaintiff Internet Archives. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Motion HearingCourt Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez- Dep Clerk: Lowell Williams; Pla Counsel: James Grant, Ambika Doran, Matthew Zimmerman, Venkat Balasubramani; Def Counsel: David Eldred, Lana Weinmann, Amy Eiden; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 1:00 PM; Courtroom: 13206; Oral Arugment held on 7/20/2012 re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Backpage.com LLC. Court hears argument from counsel and takes matter under advisement. Court will issue a ruling as soon as possible. (LW)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Proposed Order (Unsigned)
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re [24] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6) . (George, Ione)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY, filed by Defendant Russell D Hauge, TO RESPONSE to [24] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6) (George, Ione)
LREF
Blank 61 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC, TO RESPONSE to [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doran, Ambika)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Internet Archive, TO RESPONSE to [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Balasubramani, Venkat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to [28] Amended Complaint by David J Burke.(Eldred, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David J Eldred on behalf of Defendant David J Burke. (Eldred, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Response to Motion
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC, to [24] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6). (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Grant, James)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sarah Yusi on behalf of Karl F. Sloan, Okanogan County Prosecuting Attorney on 7/2/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Mary J. Nevew on behalf of Anthony F. Golik, Clark County Prosecuting Attorney on 7/2/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cynthia Nelson on behalf of Michael Sandona, Ferry County Prosecuting Attorney on 7/2/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sharlene Murphy on behalf of Benjamin C. Nichols, Asotin County Prosecuting Attorney on 7/2/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Melissa Bohm on behalf of Michael K. Dorcy, Mason County Prosecuting Attorney on 7/2/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jeffrey S. Barkdull on 7/2/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on David J. Burke on 7/2/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST STEVENS COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY TIM RASMUSSEN by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TF)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Claims Against Stevens County Prosecuting Attorney Tim Rasmussen by parties. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Proposed Order (Unsigned)
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Denying Motions for Preliminary Injunction (Weinmann, Lana)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Todd Novisedlak filed by Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, David J Burke, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, Rob McKenna, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Weinmann, Lana)
LREF
Blank 45 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Ryan Long filed by Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, David J Burke, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, Rob McKenna, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Weinmann, Lana)
LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Paula Selis filed by Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, David J Burke, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, Rob McKenna, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Weinmann, Lana)
LREF
Blank 43 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Lana Weinmann filed by Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, David J Burke, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, Rob McKenna, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Weinmann, Lana)
LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Rebecca Hartsock filed by Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, David J Burke, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, Rob McKenna, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Escort Dater, # (2) Exhibit My Provider Guide, # (3) Exhibit ErosAds, # (4) Exhibit Backpage, # (5) Exhibit Internet Archive)(Weinmann, Lana)
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Response to Motion
RESPONSE, by Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, David J Burke, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, Rob McKenna, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel, to [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Weinmann, Lana)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' [39] MOTION FOR OVER-LENGTH BRIEF by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TF)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, Rob McKenna, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/10/2012, (Eldred, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to [28] Amended Complaint by Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel.(Eldred, David)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Plaintiff Internet Archives by Defendant Russell D Hauge. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(George, Ione)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 Intervenor Complaint
Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Internet Archive.(Balasubramani, Venkat)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Brewster Kahle filed by Plaintiff Internet Archive re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Balasubramani, Venkat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Brief
Joinder Motion and BRIEF re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Internet Archive. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
ORDER granting [22] Motion to Intervene by The Internet Archive by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Internet Archive, TO RESPONSE to [22] MOTION to Intervene (Balasubramani, Venkat)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David J Eldred on behalf of Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Daniel H Bigelow, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, Anthony F Golk, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Scott W Rosekrans, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker, Jon Tunheim, Richard Weyrich, Gregory L Zempel. (Eldred, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE INTERNET ARCHIVE; motion in support of prelim inj 7/2/12; dfts' opposition 7/12/12; reply 7/18/12 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER regarding briefing schedule by parties. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT to Declare Invalid and Enjoin Enforcement of SB 6251 against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by Backpage.com LLC.(Grant, James)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Acceptance of Service by Counsel
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel on behalf of Defendants Gregory M Banks, Susan I Baur, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, James P. Hagarty, Lori L Hoctor, Deborah S Kelly, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, H. Steward Menefee, Thomas A Metzger, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Gary A Riesen, Mark K Roe, Dan Satterberg, Denis P Tracy, Steven J Tucker on 6/4/2012. (Eldred, David)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: 6/25/2012 Response to Motion
RESPONSE, by Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, James P. Hagarty, Russell D Hauge, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, Rob McKenna, H. Steward Menefee, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Mark K Roe, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Richard Weyrich, to [22] MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Weinmann, Lana)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney Venkat Balasubramani. Filed by Plaintiff Internet Archive. (Balasubramani, Venkat) Modified Address on 6/21/2012 (DS).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant Russell D Hauge. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/20/2012, (George, Ione)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac V
ORDER re [21] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew J Zimmerman for Internet Archive, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Motion to Intervene
MOTION to Intervene by Plaintiff Internet Archive. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Proposed Complaint), # (2) Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/29/2012, (Balasubramani, Venkat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012, Terminated: 6/15/2012 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew Zimmerman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Internet Archive (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2848329. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Venkat Balasubramani on behalf of Plaintiff Internet Archive. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Vickie Maurer, Office Supervisor for the Skagit County Prosecuting Attorney's Office, on behalf of Richard Weyrich, Skagit County Prosecuting Attorney on 6/5/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Issac Jarrett on behalf of Jon Tunheim, Thurston County Prosecuting Attorney on 6/5/2012, filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULES re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2012 at 01:30 PM by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Briefing Deadlines by parties re [7] Order Setting Hearing on Motion,. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Add and Terminate Attorneys
Attorney Amy Kathleen Eiden for Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, James P. Hagarty, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, H. Steward Menefee, Jonathan L Meyer,Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Mark K Roe, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Richard Weyrich added per [12] Notice of Appearance. (KN)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Add and Terminate Attorneys
Attorney Jacquelyn Moore Aufderheide,Jeremy Aaron Morris for Russell D Hauge added per [13] Notice of Appearance. (KN)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lana Sue Weinmann on behalf of Defendant Rob McKenna. (Weinmann, Lana)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ione S George on behalf of Defendant Russell D Hauge. (George, Ione)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David J Eldred on behalf of Defendants Gregory M Banks, Jeffrey S Barkdull, Susan I Baur, Steven M Clem, Rea L Culwell, Michael K Dorcy, Randy J Flyckt, Randall K Gaylord, James P. Hagarty, Adam N Kick, Angus Lee, Mark Lindquist, David S McEachran, H. Steward Menefee, Jonathan L Meyer, Andrew K Miller, James L Nagle, Matthew L Newberg, Mark K Roe, Michael Sandona, Shawn P Sant, Dan Satterberg, Karl F Sloan, Denis P Tracy, Richard Weyrich. (Eldred, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Exhibit
EXHIBIT A-H to Declaration of Carl Ferrer re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, [9] Minute Order,, [3] Declaration by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Minute Order
The following MINUTE ORDER is made at the direction of the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez: The [3] DECLARATION of Carl Ferrer filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction was filed without referenced exhibits attached. Plaintiff is ordered to immediately file all exhibits referenced in the Carl Ferrer declaration. In addition, the parties are directed to consult Local Rule 10(e)(8) regarding the provision of paper copies of volumnious documents.(NM)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Praecipe for a Summons
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. Clerk iss'd(RS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Certificate-Other
CERTIFICATE of Sending Temporary Restraining Order to Defendants by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENJOINING ENFORCEMENT OF WA SENATE BILL 6251 re pltf's [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez; pltf shall certify by 6/6/12 at 9am that it has emailed a copy to all dfts by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Notice re Lack of Proper Signature
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The [2] Motion for TRO, [1] Complaint, filed on 6/4/2012 was improperly signed by Elizabeth L. McDougall. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and Local General Rule 2(h), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." (RE)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Civil Cover Sheet
CIVIL COVER SHEET re [1] Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com LLC.. (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: 6/4/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Ambika K. Doran filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-M, # (2) Exhibit N-U)(Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: 6/4/2012 Declaration
DECLARATION of Carl Ferrer filed by Plaintiff Backpage.com re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: 6/4/2012 Motion for TRO
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Backpage.com. Noting Date 6/4/2012, (Grant, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2012: # (1) PROPOSED TRO Enjoining Enforcement) (RE).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: 6/4/2012 Complaint
COMPLAINT TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF WASH STATE SB 6251 FOR VIOLATION OF THE COMMUNICATIONS DECENCY ACT, AND THE FIRST AND FIFTH AMENDMENTS AND COMMERCE CLAUSE OF THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-2835519), filed by Backpage.com.(Grant, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Add and Terminate Judges
Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (RE)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlin
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Plaintiff(s) Backpage.com, LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/11/2012. (RE)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 247 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?