Southern Union Co. v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 11-94

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Southern Union Company, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin C. Block +1 202 662 6000 bblock@cov.com
No Logo Criminal Procedure Scholars, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David C Thomas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold J. Krent +1 312 906 5010 hkrent@kentlaw.edu
Related Case 10A998
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-2403
Lower Court Decision Date 12/22/2010
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Jul 24 2012
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Jul 24 2012
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Jul 23 2012
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          Jun 21 2012
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            Mar 19 2012
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Mar 12 2012
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Feb 13 2012
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Jan 31 2012
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                    Record from U.S.D.C. for District of Rhode Island is electronic. Record received from U.S.D.C. for District of Rhode Island consist of exhibits and transcripts
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                      Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Procedure Scholars filed.
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                          Brief of petitioner Southern Union Company filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                            Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                              Record received from U.S.C.A. for 1st Circuit. (1box)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 19, 2012.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                  Petition GRANTED.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2011.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                      Reply of petitioner Southern Union Company filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                        Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                          Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 19, 2011.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                              Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 19, 2011.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2011)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Application (10A998) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until July 17, 2011.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Application (10A998) to extend further the time from June 17, 2011 to July 17, 2011, submitted to Justice Breyer.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Application (10A998) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until June 17, 2011.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Application (10A998) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 18, 2011 to June 17, 2011, submitted to Justice Breyer.
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?