FCC v. Fox Television Stations, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-1293

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Federal Communications Commission, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo ABC Television Affiliates Association, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey & Leonard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wade H. Hargrove +1 919 839 0300 whargrove@brookspierce.com
No Logo ABC, Inc., KTRK Television, Inc., and WLS Television, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Corn-Revere +1 202 973 4200 +1 202 973 4499 bobcornrevere@dwt.com
No Logo CBS Television Network Affiliates Association and NBC Television Affiliates, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Long - PHV +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 778 5612 rlong@cov.com
No Logo Center for Creative Voices in Media, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Jay Schwartzman +1 202 232 4300
Fox Television Stations, Inc. Fox Television Stations, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carter G Phillips +1 202 736 8270 +7368 736 736 8711 cphillips@sidley.com
No Logo NBC Universal Media LLC, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miguel A. Estrada +1 202 955 8500 +1 202 467 0539
No Logo American Academy of Pediatrics, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela J. Campbell +1 202 662 9535 ipr-efiling@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo American College of Pediatricians and the Christian Medical and Legal Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alliance Defending Freedom - Scottsdale, AZ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan H. Beauman +1 859 340 1127 bbeauman@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
No Logo Decency Enforcement Center for Television, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. North +1 906 643 6348
No Logo Focus on the Family and Family Research Council, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hampton Road Strategies Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Robert Flores +1 703 609 8731 rfloresesq@cox.net
No Logo Former FCC Officials, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TIMOTHY K. LEWIS +1 202 419 4216 tlewis@schnader.com
No Logo National Association of Broadcasters, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elaine J. Goldenberg +1 202 639 6000 egoldenberg@jenner.com
No Logo National Religious Broadcasters, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National Religious Broadcasters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig L. Parshall +1 703 330 7000 cparshall@nrb.org
No Logo Pennsylvania Center for the First Amendment, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Pennsylvania State University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D. Richards +1 814 863 1900 rdr2@psu.edu
No Logo Public Broadcasting Service, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Michael Christian +1 202 626 3612 ryan.christian@whitecase.com
No Logo The Cato Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Elwood +1 202 639 6518 +1 202 879 8917 jelwood@velaw.com
No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lucy A. Dalglish +1 703 807 2100
No Logo American Center for Law & Justice, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R. Shapiro +1 212 549 2500 +1 212 549 2651
No Logo Judith A. Reisman, Ph.D. and Liberty Counsel, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by LIBERTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. Crampton +1 434 592 7000 +1 434 592 7700 court@lc.org
No Logo Morality In Media, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Morality In Media, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick A. Trueman +1 212 870 3222 p.trueman@verizon.net
No Logo Parents Television Council, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Long & Leahy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert R Sparks, Jr +1 703 848 4700 rrsparks@sparkscraig.com
No Logo The Student Press Law Center, and College Broadcasters, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Stuart Smith +1 202 383 0100
No Logo The Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression and the Media Institute, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Thos. Jefferson Cntr for Free

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joshua Wheeler +1 434 295 4784
No Logo Yale Law School Information Society Project Scholars, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Priscilla J. Smith +1 718 399 9241 priscilla.smith@yale.edu
Related Case 10A794
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-1760-ag, 06-2750-ag, 06-5358-ag
Lower Court Decision Date 7/13/2010
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 67 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
Record returned to Federal Communication Commission.
    LREF
    Blank 66 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
    Record returned to U.S.C.A. for the 2nd Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 65 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 64 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
        Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Thomas, Breyer, Alito, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Sotomayor, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the cases.
          LREF
          Blank 63 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
          Argued. For petitioners: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents Fox Television Stations, Inc., et al.: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D. C. For respondents ABC, Inc., et al.: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D. C.
            LREF
            Blank 62 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
            Record received from U.S.C.A. for 2nd Circuit. (1 Box)
              LREF
              Blank 61 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
              Adminstrative record received from FCC. (1 Box)
                LREF
                Blank 60 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                Reply of petitioners Federal Communications Commission, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                  LREF
                  Blank 59 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                  Motion for divided argument filed by respondent GRANTED. Justice Sotomayor took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                    LREF
                    Blank 58 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                    CIRCULATED.
                      LREF
                      Blank 57 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                      SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 10 , 2012.
                        LREF
                        Blank 56 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                        Brief amici curiae of The Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression and the Media Institute filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 55 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                            LREF
                            Blank 54 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of Public Broadcasting Service filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 53 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                LREF
                                Blank 52 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                Brief amici curiae of National Association of Broadcasters, et al. filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 51 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 50 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                    Brief amici curiae of The Student Press Law Center and College Broadcasters, Inc. filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 49 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Pediatrics, et al. filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 48 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Former FCC Officials filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 47 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                          Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the CBS Television Network Affiliates Assn. and NBC Television Affiliates.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 46 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                            Letter from counsel for respondents ABC, Inc., KTRK Television, Inc., and WLS Television, Inc. proposing to lodge copies of charts (cited to in their brief on the merits) drawn from data in proprietary Nielsen databases.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 45 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of Pennsylvania Center for the First Amendment, et al. filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 44 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                Brief of respondents ABC, Inc., KTRK Television, Inc., and WLS Television, Inc. filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Brief of respondents Center for Creative Voices in Media, et al. filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Brief of respondents ABC Television Affiliates Association, et al. filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Brief of respondents Fox Television Stations, Inc., et al. filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Brief of respondents CBS Television Network Affiliates Association and NBC Television Affiliates filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Joint motion of respondents for divided argument filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Parents Television Council filed.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of Yale Law School Information Society Project Scholars, et al. filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amici curiae of Focus on the Family and Family Research Council filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Judith A. Reisman, Ph.D. and Liberty Counsel filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amici curiae of American College of Pediatricians and the Christian Medical and Legal Association filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice in support of neither party filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Decency Enforcement Center for Television filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Morality in Media, Inc. filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of National Religious Broadcasters filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief of petitioners Federal Communications Commission, et al. filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including November 3, 2011.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 7, 2011.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from the Solicitor General.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents ABC Television Affiliates Association, et al.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Center for Creative Voices in Media, and the Future of Music Coalition.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent Fox Television Stations, Inc.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent CBS Broadcasting, Inc.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents NBC Universal Inc., and NBC Telemondo License Company.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents ABC, Inc., KTRK Television, Inc. and WLS Television.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: “Whether the Federal Communications Commission’s current indecency-enforcement regime violates the First or Fifth Amendment to the United States Constitution.”. Justice Sotomayor took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Reply of petitioners Federal Communications Commission, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2011.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Consent to the fiing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent CBS Broadcasting, Inc.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief of respondents ABC, Inc., KTRK Television, Inc., and WLS Television, Inc. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief of respondents Fox Television Stations, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief of respondent Intervenors Center for Creative Voices in Media, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief of respondents ABC Television Affiliates Association, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for NBC.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Parents Television Council filed.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent Fox Television Stations, Inc.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2011)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Application (10A949) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 4, 2011.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Application (10A949) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2011 to May 4, 2011, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Application (10A794) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until April 21, 2011.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Application (10A794) to extend further the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 22, 2011 to April 21, 2011, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Application (10A794) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until March 22, 2011.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Application (10A794) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 20, 2011 to March 22, 2011, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 319 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?