National Federation of Independent Business v. Sebelius
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 11-393

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo National Federation of Independent Business, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Carvin +1 202 879 7643 +1 202 626 1700 macarvin@jonesday.com
No Logo Florida, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Bancroft PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 pclement@bancroftpllc.com
No Logo Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo AARP, et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROCHELLE BOBROFF +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 rbobroff@nsclc.org
No Logo America's Health Insurance Plan, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia A Millett +1 202 887 4000 +1 202 887 4288 pmillett@akingump.com
No Logo American Academy of Actuaries (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kannon K. Shanmugam +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 kshanmugam@wc.com
No Logo American Benefits Council (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. Napoli +1 202 416 5862 jnapoli@proskauer.com
No Logo American Center for Law and Justice, et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Alan Sekulow +1 757 226 2749
No Logo American Civil Rights Union (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Rights Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Ferrara +1 703 582 8466
No Logo American Hospital Association, et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
No Logo American Medical Student Association, et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for American Progress

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ian Millhiser +1 202 481 8228 imillhiser@americanprogress.org
No Logo American Public Health Association, et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL HEALTH LAW PROGRAM - CARRBORO NC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha Jane Perkins +1 919 968 6308
No Logo Asian & Pacific Islander American Health Forum, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilbert Randolph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Packman - PHV +1 202 772 2320 +1 202 772 2322 packmanm@gotofirm.com
No Logo Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David P. Felsher +1 212 308 8505 dflaw@earthlink.net
No Logo California, et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Powell +1 415 703 5830 +1 415 703 1234 Daniel.Powell@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Lee Blalack, II +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 lblalack@omm.com
No Logo Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Christina +1 864 271 1300
No Logo Court-appointed amicus curiae, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Bartow Farr +1 202 775 0184
No Logo David Boyle, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Carleton Boyle +15143 734 904 6132 davidcarletonboyle@gmail.com
No Logo David R. Riemer and Community Advocates, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurley Burish & Stanton SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dean A Strang +1 608 257 0945 +1 608 257 5764 dstrang@hbslawfirm.com
No Logo Economists (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven A. Engel +1 202 261 3403 +1 202 261 3143 steven.engel@dechert.com
No Logo Family Research Council, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by George Mason University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nelson Lund +1 703 993 8045 nlund@gmu.edu
No Logo Freedom Watch, Inc., Other Party
Officially listed as "Freedom Watch"

Toggle Switch Represented by Freedom Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Klayman +1 310 595 0800
No Logo Joella Swan, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Jones, Snelling & Gilbert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Johnson +1 312 578 8100 tjohnson@jjsgd.com
No Logo Justice and Freedom Fund (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L. Hirsen +1 714 283 8880 hirsen@earthlink.net
No Logo LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P Hutchison +1 816 931 5559 +1 816 931 1115 rpetehutch@aol.com
No Logo Michigan Legal Services, Inc., et al. (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Michigan Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary A. Benjamin +1 313 590 6136 gbenjamin@michiganlegal.org
No Logo Missouri (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Missouri Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremiah J. Morgan +1 573 751 1800 +1 573 751 0774 jeremiah.morgan@ago.mo.gov
No Logo National Indian Health Board, et al. (Severability Issue), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey D. Strommer +1 503 242 1745 +1 503 242 1072 gstrommer@hobbsstraus.com
No Logo National Restaurant Association (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LEON R. SEQUEIRA +1 202 828 5341 lsequeira@seyfarth.com
No Logo Texas Public Policy Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Texas Public Policy Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mario Loyola +1 512 472 2700 mlloyola@texaspolicy.com
No Logo Texas Public Policy Foundation and Cato Institute (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Allen Epstein +1 773 450 4476 repstein@uchicago.edu
No Logo The Washington and Lee University School of Law Black Lung Clinic, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David I. Bruck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy C. MacDonnell +106 540 458 8562 macdonnellt@wlu.edu
United States Senate United States Senate, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dowd Bennett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Bennett +1 314 889 7302 +1 314 863 2111 jbennett@dowdbennett.com
No Logo Western Center for Journalism (Severability), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Justice Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary G. Kreep +1 760 788 6624 +1 760 788 6414 gkreep@sbcglobal.net
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 11-11021, 11-11067
Lower Court Decision Date 8/12/2011
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 94 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    LREF
    Blank 93 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
    Jul 30 2012
      LREF
      Blank 92 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
      Jun 28 2012
        LREF
        Blank 91 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
        Jun 11 2012
          LREF
          Blank 90 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
          May 22 2012
            LREF
            Blank 89 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
            May 7 2012
              LREF
              Blank 88 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
              Apr 25 2012
                LREF
                Blank 87 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                Apr 16 2012
                  LREF
                  Blank 86 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                  Mar 28 2012
                    LREF
                    Blank 85 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                    Mar 28 2012
                      LREF
                      Blank 84 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                      Mar 17 2012
                        LREF
                        Blank 83 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                        Mar 15 2012
                          LREF
                          Blank 82 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                          Mar 14 2012
                            LREF
                            Blank 81 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                            Mar 13 2012
                              LREF
                              Blank 80 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                              Mar 13 2012
                                LREF
                                Blank 79 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                Mar 13 2012
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 78 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                  Feb 27 2012
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 77 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                    Federation of Independent Business, et al. are allotted 30 minutes. On the Severability issue (Nos. 11-393 and 11-400), the petitioners are allotted 30 minutes, the Solicitor General is allotted 30 minutes, and the Court-appointed amicus curiae is allotted 30 minutes.On the Medicaid issue (No. 11-400), the petitioners are allotted 30 minutes, and the Solicitor General is allotted 30 minutes.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 76 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                      Upon consideration of the motions pertaining to the allocation of oral argument time, the following allocation of oral argument time is adopted. On the Anti-Injunction Act issue (No. 11-398), the Court-appointed amicus curiae is allotted 40 minutes, the Solicitor General is allotted 30 minutes, and the respondents are allotted 20 minutes.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 75 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Court-appointed amicus curiae (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 74 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of Joella Swan, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 73 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Asian & Pacific Islander American Health Forum, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 72 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of The Washington and Lee University School of Law Black Lung Clinic (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 71 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                Brief amici curiae of David R. Riemer and Community Advocates (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Missouri (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Motion for divided argument and enlargement of time for oral argument on the Anti-Injunction Act issue filed by Florida, et al. and National Federation of Independent Business, et al. VIDED.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Motion for divided argument and enlargement of time for oral argument on the Anti-Injunction Act issue filed by respondents Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., joined by both Court-appointed counsel. VIDED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Motion for reconsideration for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed by Freedom Watch. VIDED.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amicus curiae of American Benefits Council (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amici curiae of American Medical Student Association, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of National Indian Health Board, et al. (Severability Issue) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amici curiae of Michigan Legal Services, Inc., et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of American Academy of Actuaries (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amici curiae of American Public Health Association, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amici curiae of California, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief of respondents Department of Health and Human Services, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion of Freedom Watch for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Motion to add parties Dana Grimes and David Klemencic as additional petitioners in No. 11-393 and additional respondents in Nos. 11-398 and 11-400 filed by petitioners National Federation of Independent Business, et al. GRANTED. VIDED.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Record received from U.S.D.C. for Northern District of Florida. (1 box) The remainder of the record is electronic.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  CIRCULATED
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Record received from U.S.C.A. for 11th Circuit. (1 box)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2012.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Texas Public Policy Foundation and Cato Institute (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Economists (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of United States Senate (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Western Center for Journalism (Severability) filed. (Distributed)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Family Research Council, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of National Restaurant Association (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law and Justice, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans and The Blue Cross Blue Shield Association (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief of respondents Florida, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of American Hospital Association, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Brief of petitioners National Federation of Independent Business, et al. (Severability) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Joint appendix (Minimum Coverage Provision, Anti-Injunction Act, and Severability) filed. VIDED. (Statement of costs filed)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Motion of Freedom Watch for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Watch filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union (Severability) filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Motion to add parties Dana Grimes and David Klemencic as additional petitioners in No. 11-393 and additional respondents in Nos. 11-398 and 11-400 filed by petitioners National Federation of Independent Business, et al. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, March 28, 2012 (Severability). VIDED
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Motion for leave to intervene filed by Freedom Watch DENIED.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Dec 8 2011
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Dec 8 2011
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Dec 7 2011
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Dec 6 2011
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Dec 5 2011
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Dec 3 2011
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Nov 22 2011
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Nov 18 2011
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Nov 16 2011
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Nov 15 2011
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 11-400 is granted limited to the issue of severability presented by Question 3 of the petition. The cases are consolidated and a total of 90 minutes is allotted for oral argument
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Family Research Council, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2011.
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Brief of respondents Kathleen Sebelius, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Waiver of right of respondents Florida, et al. to respond filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for State Respondents, Florida, et al. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents, the Solicitor General. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs , in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix of National Federation of Independent Business, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 1,490 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?