Securian Financial Group, Inc. et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-02957
District Judge Michael J. Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 12:42 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel J Clark +1 612 373 8387 +1 612 373 0929 sclark@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn N Hibbard +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 khibbard@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjgilbertson@rkmc.com
No Logo Securian Financial Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel J Clark +1 612 373 8387 +1 612 373 0929 sclark@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn N Hibbard +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 khibbard@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjgilbertson@rkmc.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (134) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER: (Discovery due by 3/21/2014, Motions (non-disp) due 3/28/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 3/3/14. (akl) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company re 129 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 127 Scheduling Order (Hibbard, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
      MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 129 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company. (Hibbard, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM in Support re 129 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 127 Scheduling Order - Joint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hibbard, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 129 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 127 Scheduling Order : at date and time to be determined. (Hibbard, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 127 Scheduling Order by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company. (Hibbard, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING: Discovery due by 3/21/2014. Motions (non-disp) due 3/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 1/2/14. See order for further details and deadlines.(KNK) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 125 Stipulation, (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                      Answer to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 123 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT [THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT] against All Defendants. Filed by Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Minnesota Life Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages (ECF No. 95) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs must file the amended pleading within seven days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 12/2/13. (jam) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT [SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Filed by Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Minnesota Life Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation is APPROVED, and Plaintiffs may file and serve a Second Amended Complaint, adding claims under the Employees Retirement Income Security Act signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 11/21/13. (KNK) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company re 117 Stipulation, [Joint STIPULATION TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION re 84 Amended Complaint [Joint STIPULATION TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 11/21/2013 (jz). (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/29/2013. The Court held a hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages (ECF No. 95). The motion was taken under advisement, and a written order will issue. (Court Reporter N/A) (MMP) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion (ECF No. 110) is GRANTED and the Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. 55), as amended (ECF Nos. 78, 93), is further amended as follows: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/29/2013. (MMP) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 110 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 93 Scheduling Order, (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                            MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 110 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 110 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 93 Scheduling Order, filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 110 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 93 Scheduling Order, : at date and time to be determined. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 93 Scheduling Order, by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 108 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 107 Response in Opposition to Motion, Certificate of Service of Conventionally Filed/Sealed Documents (Millea, Daniel) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Dan Millea in OPPOSITION TO 95 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 84 Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-E, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibits F-S)(Millea, Daniel) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE 10/23/13. Modified on 10/28/2013 (GMW). (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 84 Amended Complaint Placeholder for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Memorandum Supporting Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Millea, Daniel) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE 10/23/13. Modified on 10/28/2013 (GMW). (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 104 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Manuel F Cachan for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/21/13. (MAP) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 103 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bart H Williams for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/21/13. (MAP) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Manuel F. Cachan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3737061 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Millea, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bart H. Williams. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3737047 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Millea, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company re 99 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,,, 97 Memorandum in Support of Motion (for conventionally filed/sealed documents) (Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company re 95 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 84 Amended Complaint (Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 95 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company. (Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Eric C. Ernstene in SUPPORT OF 95 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 84 Amended Complaint filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits 1 - 6 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25), # 2 Exhibit(s) 7, # 3 Placeholder for Exhibits 8-15 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25), # 4 Exhibit(s) 16, # 5 Exhibit(s) 17, # 6 Placeholder for Exhibit 18 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25), # 7 Exhibit(s) 19, # 8 Placeholder for Exhibits 20-23 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25), # 9 Exhibit(s) 24, # 10 Placeholder for Exhibits 25-33 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25), # 11 Exhibit(s) 34, # 12 Exhibit(s) 35, # 13 Placeholder for Exhibits 36-52 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25), # 14 Exhibit(s) 53, # 15 Exhibit(s) 54, # 16 Placeholder for Exhibits 55-57 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25), # 17 Exhibit(s) 58, # 18 Placeholder for Exhibits 59-62 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25), # 19 Exhibit(s) 63, # 20 Exhibit(s) 64, # 21 Placeholder for Exhibits 65-106 filed under seal pursuant to Protective Order (#25))(Gilbertson, Robert) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE 10/15/13. Modified on 10/16/2013 (GMW). (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company re 97 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company. (Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 95 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 84 Amended Complaint filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company. (Gilbertson, Robert) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE 10/15/13. Modified on 10/16/2013 (GMW). (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 95 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 84 Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 84 Amended Complaint by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company. (Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Status Conference held on 7/9/2013. (JME) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER that the Amended Pretrial Schedule (ECF No. 78) be AMENDED as follows: Discovery due by 12/6/2013. Motions (non-disp) due 12/20/2013. Motions (disp) due by 3/7/2014. Ready for trial due by 8/4/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 7/10/13. (JME) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      LETTER from Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham regarding to counsel re: Status Conference. (MMP) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., The City of Farmington Hills Employees Retirement System, Catholic United Financial Joint letter requesting a status conference. (Anderson, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Informal Dispute Resolution Conference held on 4/19/2013. The Court determined that Wells Fargo must produce copies of all expert reports and any exhibits related to those reports, as well as all exhibits filed under seal in Blue Cross Blue Shield and CFHERS by April 26, 2013. That requirement does not include any expert deposition transcripts. Wells Fargo need not produce any expert deposition transcripts from previous cases until after the conclusion of expert depositions in subsequent cases. (GMW) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE: Informal Dispute Resolution Conference set for 4/19/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 04/16/2013. (MMP) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER As discussed at the IDR, the parties are ordered to meet and confer on the subject of whether to pursue private mediation or a settlement conference with the Court. No later than March 8, 2013, the parties should file one private letter, sent directly to the Courts email, advising of their decision. Should the parties be unable to agree, the letter should indicate that disagreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/28/13. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG, 0:12-cv-01729-DWF-JJG(GMO) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Settlement Conference held on 2/26/2013. A written order is forthcoming regarding potential settlement of these cases. (akl) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE: (Status Conference set for 2/26/2013 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/20/13. (akl) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Lindsey) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT of Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, and Minnesota Life Insurance Company against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Securian Financial Group, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER Adopting re 81 Stipulation filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Securian Financial Group, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/22/12. (RLR) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc. re 81 Stipulation to Amend Complaint (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, [STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT] by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: IDR Conference held on 10/2/2012. (RLR) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION Conference set for 10/2/2012 11:00 AM via Telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. SEE NOTICE FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 9/19/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG, 0:12-cv-01729-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/6/2013. Motions (non-disp) due 9/20/2013. Motions (disp) due by 1/10/2014. Ready for trial due by 6/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 9/12/12. (RLR) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2012. (RLR) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 72 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 55 Scheduling Order, (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 72 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 72 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 55 Scheduling Order, filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 72 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 55 Scheduling Order, : at date and time to be determined. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 55 Scheduling Order, by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Informal Dispute Resolution Conference set for 9/12/2012 11:00 AM, by telephone conference, before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 8/31/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG, 0:12-cv-01729-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: IDR Conference held on 8/24/2012. (RLR) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER/NOTICE of Setting Hearing: IDR Conference set for 8/23/2012 10:30 AM, via telephone conference, before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (RLR) Modified text on 8/27/2012 (JME). (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Telephone Conference held on 8/2/2012. See minutes for further details. (RLR) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on April 25, 2012 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (61 pages). Transcriber: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 8/24/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2012. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (cb) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (cb) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Agreed Upon Deposition Rules by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNab, William) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER Cancelling IDR Conference for 7/19/12 at 11:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 7/18/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: IDR Conference held on 6/29/2012. (RLR) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: IDR Conference held on 6/22/2012. Parties shall continue to meet and confer on subpoenas and Rule 30(b)(6) depositions.Next conference with Magistrate Judge Graham is June 29, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. by Conference Bridge. (RLR) Modified text on 6/28/2012 (jz). (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING POSITION LETTERS for 6/29/12 - Conference set for 6/29/2012 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/22/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Reece, James) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR INFORMAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION Conference set for 6/22/2012 02:00 PM, by telephone, before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/18/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2012. (akl) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: IDR Conference held on 5/31/2012. (RLR) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Procedures for this Informal Dispute Resolution process. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 5/23/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2012. Discovery due by 7/31/2013. Motions (non-disp) due 8/14/2013. Motions (disp) due by 11/29/2013. Ready for trial due by 4/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 5/18/12. (RLR) Modified on 9/10/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: IDR Conference held on 5/16/2012. (RLR) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Rescheduling Hearing (NOTICE OF LOCATION CHANGE): IDR Conference set for 5/16/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (RLR) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Millea, Daniel) Modified on 5/14/2012 (jz). (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Rule 16 Discovery Conference held on 5/4/2012. Pretrial Order will be issued. (RLR) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION Conference set for 5/16/2012 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 5/2/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(Johnson, Mark) Modified on 5/2/2012 (jz). (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/30/12. (kt) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Rescheduling Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2012 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(RLR) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE Conference set for 5/11/2012 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/25/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Status Conference held on 4/25/2012. Written orders shall issue resolving the issues discussed on the record. (RLR) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE to Attorneys: The motion hearing previously scheduled for Friday, April 27, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Donovan W. Frank has been canceled. (The motion was withdrawn by counsel; see letter at 42 .) (BJS) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2012 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(RLR) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . (Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE OF Status Conference set for 4/25/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/23/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . (Millea, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Securian Financial Group, Inc. . (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc. re: supplemental authority. (Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference set for 4/25/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/6/12. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-04372-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02529-DWF-JJG, 0:11-cv-02957-DWF-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      *AMENDED TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: NOTICE to Attorneys: The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss 11 scheduled for Friday, April 20, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 4/27/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (BJS) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: 31 NOTICE to Attorneys: The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss 11 scheduled for Friday, March 23, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. has been rescheduled to 4/20/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (BJS) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Michael J. Davis, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 11-cv-2957 DWF/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/21/2012 and Chief Judge Michael J. Davis signed on 2/22/2012. (LJG) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks F Poley on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Poley, Brooks) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by William A McNab on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNab, William) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Attorneys: The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss 11 scheduled for Friday, March 9, 2012, in Courtroom 15E of the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis at 9:30 a.m. has been rescheduled. The hearing has been rescheduled for Friday, March 23, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. in the Devitt Courtroom located in the St. Paul Federal Courthouse. (KMW) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 29 Reply . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) E-G)(Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY re 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Michael E. Jacobs (Jacobs, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Attorneys: The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss 11 scheduled for Friday, March 9, 2012 in Courtroom 15E of the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse before Chief JudgeMichael J. Davis shall begin at 9:30 a.m. (KMW) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gilbertson, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/17/12. (akl) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Samuel J. Clark (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Protective Order by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Regarding Sealed Pleadings in Other Actions by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Millea on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Millea, Daniel) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 18 Stipulation filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Securian Financial Group, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/12/11. (KMW) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc. . (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Johnson, Mark) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Richard M. Hagstrom in SUPPORT OF 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-B, # 2 Exhibit(s) C-D)(Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 LR 7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hagstrom, Richard) Modified text on 12/1/2011 (akl). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/1/11. (akl) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 11 Motion to Dismiss/General by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Date and time to be determined. (Hofmann, Lawrence) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION WITHDRAWN Per Letter 42 dated 04/23/2012. MOTION to Dismiss/General by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hofmann, Lawrence) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). Modified text on 4/23/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., hereby certifies that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a direct and indirect subsidiary of Wells Fargo & Company, a publicly held entity.(Hofmann, Lawrence) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Jacobs on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Jacobs, Michael) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Cashman on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Cashman, Michael) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rory D Zamansky on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by James S Reece on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Reece, James) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey A Davis on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Davis, Lindsey) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M Hagstrom on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence T Hofmann on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hofmann, Lawrence) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (jz). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiffs Minnesota Life Insurance Company, is wholly woned by Plaintiff Securian Financial Group, Inc. Plaintiff Securian Financial Group, Inc. is wholly owned by Securian Holding Company which is wholly owned by Minnesota Mutual Companies, Inc. (RLR) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4059234.) assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung, filed by Securian Financial Group, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLR) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 456 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?