United States v. Scott (INMATE 3)
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00243

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 5:13 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255
Nature of Suit Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT overruling petitioner's 57 and 77 objections; sustaining respondent's 52 objection; adopting 51 and 75 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, as modified by the respondent's objection; denying 1 28 U.S.C.A. 2255 petition for writ of habeas corpus; taxing costs against petitioner, for which execution may issue; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/19/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/19/2007. (cc, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER ADOPTING 70 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; notifying the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals that, due to an oversight by the magistrate judge and the court, the ineffective-assistance-of-appellate-counsel claims were not addressed by the court; r equesting that the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals vacate 60 opinion and 61 judgment of this court so that the magistrate judge and the court can address the ineffective-assistance-of-appellate-counsel claims. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/26/2007. (cc, ) Copy furnished to 11th Circuit as directed.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that this court file a notice with the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals, notifying the Court that, due to an oversight, the ineffective assistance of appellate counsel claims at issue were not addressed by this court and requesting that the case be remanded to this court for further proceedings with respect to those claims; Objections to R&R due by 4/16/2007. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/3/07. (djy, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          VACATED pursuant to 74 Order. JUDGMENT sustaining respondent's 52 Objection; Overruling petitioner's 57 Objection; adopting 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as modified by respondent's objection; denying 1 Motion to Vacate/Set A side/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Fred C. Scott; taxing costs against petitioner, for which execution may issue; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/27/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, ) Modified on 5/18/2007 (cc, ).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            OPINION. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/27/2006. (cc, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              OPINION AND ORDER it is Ordered, pursuant to FRCP 60 (b), as follows: 1) Petitioner's 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Fred C. Scott, is treated as a motion for extension of time to file objections to recommendation; 2) Petiti oner's motion for extension of time to file objections to recommendation 55 is granted; 3) The opinion and final judgment entered on 6/27/06 (doc. nos. 53 , 54 ), are vacated; 4)Petitioner's Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2006 to the recommendation entered on 6/8/06 ( (doc. no. 51 ); 5) This case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/5/06. (vma, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                VACATED PER ORDER OF 9/5/06 - doc. 56***JUDGMENT sustaining respondent's 52 objection; ADOPTING 51 Report and Recommendations, as modified by said objection; denying 1 28 U.S.C. 2255 petition for writ of habeas corpus; taxing costs against the petitioner, for which execution may issue; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/27/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, ) Modified on 9/5/2006 (vma, ).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  VACATED PER ORDER OF 9/5/06 - doc. 56 ***OPINION . Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/27/2006. (cc, ) Modified on 9/5/2006 (vma, ).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Fred C. Scott, it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that the 28 USC 2255 motion be denied as the claims presented therein entitle the dft to no relief; Objections to R&R due by 6/21/2006. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/8/06. (vma, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 75 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2007. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/29/2007. (cc, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 20 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?