USA v. Carmichael, et al
Criminal Case Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00259

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit by Leon Carmichael, Sr. (James, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
    Appeal Remark re 07-11400-JJ, 854 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment: USCA letter stating that The Supreme Court has denied certiorari. The court's mandate having previously issued, no further action will be taken by this court. (ydw, ) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: None Motion in Limine
      MOTION in Limine REGARDING ALLEGED STATEMENTS TO LAW ENFORCEMENT by Leon Carmichael Sr.. (Chartoff, Marion) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
        OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 151 by Leon Carmichael Sr. Objections to Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Wise, Ronald) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Leon Carmichael Sr. re 71 Motion to Suppress; Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2004. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 4/15/2004. (snc) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 29 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?