Garrie William Wortham
Bankruptcy Case Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-80099
District Judge Jack Caddell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Garrie William Wortham, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lowell H. Becraft, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Zingarelli +1 256 350 1264 +1 256 350 2010 johnz@HiWaay.net
No Logo Philip A Geddes, Trustee
No Logo Rebecca F. Wortham, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lowell H. Becraft, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Zingarelli +1 256 350 1264 +1 256 350 2010 johnz@HiWaay.net
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)38) (RE: related document(s)38 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor Vanda, LLC). Notice Date 04/19/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/20/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
    BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)40) (RE: related document(s)40 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 04/19/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/20/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
      Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # 39) Signed on 4/17/2013. (dwh) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
        Trustee Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments Filed by Trustee Philip A Geddes. (Geddesoffice, adi) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
          Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: CANDICA L.L.C (Claim No. 10) To Vanda, LLC Filed by Creditor Vanda, LLC. (Ross, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
            BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)36) (RE: related document(s)36 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor National Capital Management, LLC). Notice Date 01/16/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/12/2013, Entered: None
              Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Santander Consumer USA Inc dba Drive Financial Sv (Claim No. 4) To National Capital Management, LLC. Filed by Creditor National Capital Management, LLC. (Wall, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)34) (RE: related document(s)34 Modification of Plan (All Chapters)). Notice Date 01/11/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/12/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                  Order Granting Modification of a Confirmed Plan (Related Doc # 33) Signed on 1/8/2013. (dwh) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                    Motion to Modify Plan Filed by Trustee Philip A Geddes. (Geddesoffice, adi) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                      BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)31) (RE: related document(s)31 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor Capital One, N.A.). Notice Date 08/08/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                        Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. (Claim No. 12) To Capital One, N.A. Filed by Creditor Capital One, N.A.. (Bass, Patti) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                          Amended Schedule B , Amended Schedule C Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham. (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/12/2011, Entered: None
                            BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)28) (RE: related document(s)28 Notice of Deficient Filing). Service Date 06/12/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/12/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                              Notice of Deficient Filing (RE: related document(s)27 Schedule B - Personal Property filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham, Schedule C). Incomplete Filings due by 6/24/2011. (dwh) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                Amended Schedule B , Amended Schedule C Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham. (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                  BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)25) (RE: related document(s)25 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor Ecmc). Service Date 04/28/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                    Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Wells Fargo Education Financial Services (Claim No. 5) To ECMC Filed by Creditor Ecmc. (Thor, Mai) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                      BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)23) (RE: related document(s)23 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Service Date 03/25/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/26/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                        Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 3/23/2011 (RE: related document(s)8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). (tcw) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                          BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)21) (RE: related document(s)21 Order on Motion to Determine Value). Service Date 03/09/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                            Order Granting Motion to Determine Value of Security (Related Doc # 16) Signed on 3/7/2011. (dwh) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/27/2011, Entered: None
                                              BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)19) (RE: related document(s)19 Notice of Hearing Continued/Rescheduled). Service Date 02/27/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 03/23/2011 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur. (blb) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Financial Management Course Certificate Filed Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham. (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)15) (RE: related document(s)15 Notice of Deficient Filing). Service Date 02/04/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/05/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Amended Motion to Determine Value of 2004 Honda Odyssey financed by Santander Consumer USA Inc Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Notice of Deficient Filing (RE: related document(s)14 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham). Incomplete Filings due by 2/16/2011. (dwh) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Motion to Determine Value of 2004 Honda Odyssey financed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                            BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)10) (RE: related document(s)10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Service Date 01/13/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                              BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)2) (RE: related document(s)2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham). Service Date 01/12/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s)8) (RE: related document(s)8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Service Date 01/12/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management . (Admin) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2011 at 11:00 AM at Room 200 Decatur. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/21/2011 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (TBB) Decatur. Proof of Claim due by 05/09/2011. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/11/2011 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/08/2011. (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham. (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham. (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Statement of Attorney for Debtor in a Chapter 13 Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham. (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham. (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the debtor(s) may pay the filing fee in installments pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1006 as proposed in the application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that until the filing fee is paid in full the debtor(s) shall not pay any additional money for attorney fees in connection with this case, and the debtor(s) shall not relinquish any additional property as payment for attorney fees in connection with this case.Receipt Number install, Fee Amount $274 (RE: related document(s) 4 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Garrie William Wortham, Joint Debtor Rebecca F. Wortham). Filing fee of $274 to be paid through plan by chapter 13 trustee. (dwh) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $274.00 Filed by Garrie William Wortham, Rebecca F. Wortham (Zingarelli, John) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 940 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?