In Re: Total Body Formula Products Liability Litigation MDL 1985
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-01946-RDP
District Judge R David Proctor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 12:25 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Plaintiff's Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Grisham +1 205 940 9708 +1 205 879 1247 grishgirl@yahoo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jimmy H. Watson, Sr. +1 615 244 1018 +1 615 256 2871 jhwatsonsrlaw@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Kirk Wood, Jr. +1 205 612 0243 +1 866 747 3905 ekirkwood1@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Bahe Cook Cantley & Jones, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence L. Jones, II +1 502 587 2002 +1 502 587 2006 larry@bccjlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jasper D. Ward +1 502 587 2002 +1 502 587 2006 jasper@bccjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyrell F Jordan +1 205 251 8100 +1 205 488 5767 tjordan@balch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DAVIS KESSLER & DAVIS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Floyd D Davis +1 931 967 7000
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norris A Kessler, III +1 931 967 7000 +1 931 968 0680 nickkessler@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by de Beaubien, Knight, Simmons, Mantzaris & Neal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2010 Anthony Cammarata +1 850 201 3655 +1 850 205 3717 ac11@dbksmn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A Tanner +1 850 201 3655 +1 850 205 3717 ss13@dbksmn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FRANKLIN GRAY & WHITE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark K Gray +1 502 585 2060 +1 502 581 1933 mgray@franklingrayandwhite.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Doris A. Kim +1 502 637 6000 +1 502 637 1413 dkim@grayandwhitelaw.com
Space B Travis Newman +1 502 637 6000 +1 502 638 6089 tnewman@franklingrayandwhite.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L White +1 502 637 6000 +1 502 637 1413

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray & White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark K. Gray +1 502 805 1800 +1 502 618 4059 mgray@grayandwhitelaw.com
Space Matthew L. White +1 502 805 1800 mwhite@grayandwhitelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Louis Bross +1 205 326 3336 +1 205 326 3332 wlbross@hgdlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Heninger +1 205 326 3336 +1 205 326 3332 steve@hgdlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JIM THOMAS LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C Thomas +1 931 967 0616 +1 931 967 3046 jim@jimthomaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JOHN C DAVIS PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Clark Davis +1 850 222 4770 +1 850 222 3119 john@johndavislaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Ward PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Lee Jones, II +1 502 882 6000 +1 502 587 2002 larry@jonesward.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KIRSCHNER & VENKER PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Venker +1 770 436 5353 +1 770 436 5398 tjvenker@kirschnervenker.net

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL B BREHNE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee M. Jacobson +1 407 645 2195

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew C. Gaughan +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663

Toggle Switch Represented by MARSH RICKARD & BRYAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Rickard +1 205 879 1981 +1 205 879 1986 jrickard@mrblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Goetz +1 813 221 6581 +1 813 223 5402 mgoetz@forthepeople.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keenan R. S. Nix - PHV +1 404 965 8811 +1 404 965 8812 knix@forthepeople.com
Space Scott WM Weinstein +1 239 433 6880 +1 239 433 6836 sweinstein@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF STEVEN L BEARD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Loy Beard +1 770 422 2642 +1 678 384 5786 steve@stevebeardpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Cory Bradley +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2811 pdh-efiling@pittmandutton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBERTSON BODOH & NASRA, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Douglas Bodoh +1 770 424 1234 +1 770 424 2345 Bodoh@RBNlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lamb Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Archie Cleveland Lamb, Jr. +1 205 324 4644 +1 205 324 4649 alamb@archielamb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PITTMAN FIRM PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Wesley Pittman +1 904 784 9000 +1 850 763 6787 wes@pittmanfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Binkley +1 931 372 8771 +1 931 372 8992 jejones@frontiernet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by The Steiner Bldg, Third Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED F Inge Johnstone +1 205 383 1809 +1 888 759 3882 ijohnstone@ingejohnstone.com
v.
No Logo Archie Cleveland Lamb, Defendant
No Logo Defendant's Counsel, Cross Claimant

Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Represented by Blackburn Domene & Burchett PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Blasingame, Burch, Garrard & Ashley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leanna Bankester Pittard +1 706 354 4000 +1 706 549 3545 lbp@bbgbalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Pappas Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Leon Hammond +1 813 281 1900 +1 813 281 0900

Represented by CAMPBELL LAW PC

Represented by Carr, Allison, Pugh, Howard, Oliver & Sisson, PC

Represented by CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

Represented by Comcast Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Conroy, Simberg, Ganon, Krevens, Abel, Lurvey, Morrow & Schefer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John L. Morrow +1 407 649 9797 +1 407 649 1968 jmorrow@conroysimberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Drew Eckl & Farnham, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew David Horowitz +1 404 885 1400 ahorowitz@deflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gloor Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Patterson Gloor +1 312 752 3700 pgloor@gloorlaw.com

Represented by Hand Arendall, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alexander T. Galloway , III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Donald Ingram +1 770 429 1499 ringram@mijs.com

Represented by Law Offices of Shaun Michael Daugherty

Represented by Lewis King Krieg & Waldrop PC

Toggle Switch Represented by MOORE HILL & WESTMORELAND PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS LARRY HILL +1 850 434 3541 +1 850 435 7899 lhill@mhw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell Goldstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hall F. Mckinley, III +1 404 885 1400 trandemarks@pogolaw.com

Represented by Stoll Keenon Ogden, PLLC

No Logo Defendant's Counsel, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blasingame, Burch, Garrard & Ashley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leanna Bankester Pittard +1 706 354 4000 +1 706 549 3545 lbp@bbgbalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr, Allison, Pugh, Howard, Oliver & Sisson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean C Pierce +1 205 822 2006 +1 205 822 2057 spierce@carrallison.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Taylor C Powell +1 205 822 2006 +1 205 822 2057 tpowell@carrallison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cassiday Schade LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Patterson Gloor +1 312 641 3100 +4441 444 444 1669

Toggle Switch Represented by CHRISTIAN & SMALL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Duncan Young Manley +1 205 795 6588 +1 205 328 7234 dym@csattorneys.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Donaldson Stuart +1 205 795 6588 +1 205 328 7234 sdstuart@csattorneys.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Paul Zimmerman +1 205 795 6588 +1 205 328 7234 jpz@csattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MOORE HILL & WESTMORELAND PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS LARRY HILL +1 850 434 3541 +1 850 435 7899 lhill@mhw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen C. Hall +1 503 294 9625 +1 503 220 2480 schall@stoel.com
No Logo Elliott S Cappuccio, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pulman, Cappuccio, Pullen & Benson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elliott S Cappuccio +1 210 222 9494 +1 210 892 1610 ecappuccio@pulmanlaw.com
No Logo Randall Alan Pulman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pulman, Cappuccio, Pullen & Benson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall A Pulman +1 210 222 9494 +1 210 892 1605 rpulman@pulmanlaw.com
No Logo MDL Panel, Miscellaneous
No Logo Misc, Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura C. Smith +1 415 362 2580 +1 415 434 0882 smith@lbbslaw.com
No Logo Special Master, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leigh Anne Hodge +1 205 521 8092 +1 205 488 6092 lhodge@babc.com
No Logo Algeo & Clarke, Special Master
Officially listed as "Special Master"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gentle, Turner & Sexton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edgar C Gentle, III +1 205 716 3000 +1 205 716 2364 escrowagen@aol.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Office Southern
Filed 10/21/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Jefferson
Terminated 10/3/2012
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (287) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER REGARDING THE FINAL FIDUCIARY ACCOUNTING WITH RESPECT TO THE TOTAL BODY QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND AND THE WINDING UP OF THE TOTAL BODY QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/6/2013. (AVC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 275 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 OrderCourt Filing
    TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on an informal request from the Settlement Administrator for leave to file the Final Fiduciary Accounting for the Total Body Qualified Settlement Fund under seal. The request is GRANTED. The Settlement Administrator is granted leave to file the Final Fiduciary Accounting and related documents UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/29/2013. (AVC)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 Order on Motion for Certificate of AppealabilityCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [273] Motion of Counsel Financial Services, LLC for Rule 54(b)Certification. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/18/12. (ASL)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012, Terminated: 10/18/2012 Motion for Certificate of Appealability
        MOTION for Certificate of Appealability for Rule 54(b) Certification by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
          ORDER-The Settlement Administrator is DIRECTED to pay the $9,095.10 being heldfrom the Wood Law Firm's Common Benefit Award into the Clerk of the Court of the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama. Further, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE case (2:08-CV-1946-RDP. Any further and necessary actions will be conducted in postjudgment proceedings. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/3/2012. (AVC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Response - Other
            RESPONSE to re (268 in 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 268 in 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 126 in 2:11-cv-01051-RDP, 126 in 2:11-cv-01051-RDP) filed by Archie Cleveland Lamb, The Lamb Firm. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Anderson, David)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Brief
              APPENDIX in Support of Brief on Total Body Attorneys' Fees Due to Archie Lamb and the Lamb Law Firm (128 in 2:11-cv-01051-RDP).Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Pulman, Randall) Modified on 9/14/2012 (AVC).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Brief
                Brief re(268 in 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 268 in 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 126 in 2:11-cv-01051-RDP, 126 in 2:11-cv-01051-RDP) Terminate Motions, Order,,,,,,,, Attorney;s Fees Due to Archie Lamb and The Lamb Firm. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Pulman, Randall)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: 8/30/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Renewed Motion to Authorize Distribution of Settlement Proceeds, Fees and Expenses (Case No. 2:08-CV-1946-RDP Doc. # 260/Case No. 2:11-CV-1051-RDP Doc. # 65, respectively). It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Settlement Administrator SHALL distribute to Wood and the Wood Law Firm those attorneys' fees, expenses and costs which may be payable in connection with the cases listed in Exhibit A to the Motion for Declaratory Judgment; Distribution of Settlement Proceeds, Fees and Expenses; and Resolution of Issues Raised by Special Master, Ed Gentle (Case No. 2:08-CV-1946-RDP, Doc. # 194 at p. 10). By 9/14/2012, Pltf and other interested parties may submit evidence and/or briefs regarding whether the $9,095.10 being held by the Settlement Administrator represents a reasonable value for the services rendered by Lamb and the Lamb Firm on the Retainer Agreement at issue before the Lamb Firm ceased doing business and before Lamb's bankruptcy petition was filed. (See Doc. # 111). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/30/2012. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(AVC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                    ORDER-This matter is before the court on Wood's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (2:08-cv-1946-RDP Doc# 259;2:11-cv-1051-RDP Doc#64). The motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/29/2012. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(AVC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE by Edgar C Gentle, III of November 28, 2011 Receipt of Funding Deposit by the Wright Defendants Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Gentle, Edgar)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER-Before the court is the Claims Administrator's request for authority to distribute settlement proceeds to three (3) Medicare eligible Settling Plaintiffs who did not become eligible for Medicare benefits until after 8/2/2010 Settlement Date. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Claims Administrator is hereby AUTHORIZED, EMPOWERED, and DIRECTEDto issue net personal injury payments, net of any other applicable liens, to the Post-Settlement Medicare Beneficiary Claimants, Mr. Herbert Barden, Ms. Clairnell Ellis, and Mr. Wayne Ramsey, provided that each Post-Settlement Medicare Beneficiary Claimant and his or her attorney complete the Medicare Release, attached to this Order as Exhibit A. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/29/2011. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(AVC)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER APPROVING PAYMENTS FROM THE TOTAL BODY QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND COMMON BENENFIT FUND. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/23/2011. (AVC)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Set Hearings
                            TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on an objection to the Escrow Agent's proposal to pay settlement proceeds to three Medicare Claimants who did not become eligible for Medicare until after the Settlement Date. This issue is SET for a telephone hearing at 11:30 a.m. CDT on Tuesday, October 25, 2011. Interested parties are DIRECTED to call (877) 322-9654 at the appropriate time and use access code 475073 in order to participate in the telephone hearing. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/11/11. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(SFR, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011 Response to Motion
                              Position of Lamb, the Lamb Firm and the Vortex Companies with Respect to the Wood Fee Application filed by ACL Vortex Films LLC, ACL Vortex Holdings LLC, ACL Vortex Properties LLC. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Anderson, David) Modified on 9/29/2011 (AVC).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/12/2011. (AVC)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/18/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER re the Settlement Administrator's Request for Instructions from the Court Concerning Motion for Leave to Depose Special Master [236]. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/17/2011. (AVC)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011, Terminated: 8/30/2012 Motion for Release of Funds
                                    Renewed MOTION to Authorize Distribution of Settlement Proceeds, Fees and Expenses by E Kirksey Wood, Jr, Wood Law Firm LLC. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Whatley, Joe) Modified on 8/5/2011 (AVC).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011, Terminated: 3/29/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                      Wood's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by E Kirksey Wood, Jr, Wood Law Firm LLC. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Whatley, Joe) Modified on 8/5/2011 (AVC).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by E Kirksey Wood, Jr, Wood Law Firm LLC. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Whatley, Joe) Modified on 8/5/2011 (AVC).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Return of Service .....
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE by Counsel Financial Services LLC re (47 in 2:11-cv-01051-RDP) Amended Complaint, on Constantine Kanakis Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Tapscott, Robert)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Return of Service .....
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE by Counsel Financial Services LLC re (47 in 2:11-cv-01051-RDP) Amended Complaint, on JoAnn Kanakis Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Tapscott, Robert)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Joinder
                                              JOINDER in re (38 in 2:11-cv-01051-RDP) Chartis' Joinder in Settlement Administrator's Request for Instructions, Objection to Violation of Mediation Privilege and Motion to Sustain Objections, filed by Misc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Peremptory Exceptions, # (2) Exhibit Email chain re counsel depositions, # (3) Exhibit Ed Gentle depo email, # (4) Exhibit Jon Miller depo, # (5) Exhibit Lafayette motion to compel, # (6) Affidavit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Smith, R)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER-This matter is before the court on the informal request from Bob Smith, Esp. for an extension of the 7/27/2011 deadline to submit his ex parte affidavit or declaration. The request is DENIED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/19/2011. (AVC)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Settlement Administrator's Request for Instructions from the Court Concerning Motion for Leave to Depose Special Master [236]. It is ORDERED that by 7/27/2011, all parties, representatives, and counsel SHALL filed an exparte affidavit with the Clerk of Court under seal. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/11/2011. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(AVC)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/30/2011, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-7063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court forms/transcripts/Transcript Redaction Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 8/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2011. (AVC)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 237 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: 6/28/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Settlement Administrator's Request for Instructions from the Court Concerning Motion for Leave to Depose Special Master (Doc. # 236), filed June 27, 2011. This matter is SET for a telephone conference with interested parties at 9:30 a.m. CDT on Thursday, June 30, 2011. The telephone conference will be conducted by a call-in number. Counsel in this case with a relationship with interested parties (e.g., the parties to the litigation in Louisiana, including Wright Enrichment, Inc., Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, and Lafayette Insurance Company) are DIRECTED to notify those interested parties and counsel of this telephone conference. Interested parties are DIRECTED to call (877) 322-9654 at the appropriate time and use access code 475074 in order to participate in the conference call. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 06/28/11. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(SFR, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Response - Other
                                                        Settlement Administrator's Request for Instructions from the Court Concerning Motion for Leave to Depose Special Master filed by Edgar C Gentle, III. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Hodge, Leigh) Modified on 6/28/2011 (AVC).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011, Terminated: 6/14/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by E Kirksey Wood, Jr, Wood Law Firm LLC. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Whatley, Joe)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER in case 2:08-cv-01946-RDP; terminating (27) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (28) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:11-cv-01051-RDP ; parties are directed to discuss whether portions of the first amended complaint should be repled and/or whether dfts should be dismissed; pla shall replead the complaint by 7/8/2011; if motions cannot be resolved by agreement; dfts shall notify the court by 6/30/2011. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/2011. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(KAM, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER-It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Settlement Administrator is hereby authorized to issue personal injury payments to the Third Month Claimants, provided that the Certificate of No Lien Form is signed. All obligations and liability on the part of any pltfs' Counsel to indemnify the dfts and the Settlement Administrator to the extent of the 25% Advance Payment to Medicare Claimants are unenforceable, to the extent that they are in violation of Alabama State Bar Ethics Opinion RO 2011-01. The Indemnity Agreement to be used is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/3/2011. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(AVC)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 232 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                TEXT ORDER - The court has been informed of the need for a hearing on the issue of payments to Thirty Month Non-Medicare Claimants. Therefore, this matter is SET for a telephone hearing at 2:00 p.m. CDT on Tuesday, May 10, 2011. Settlement Administrator Ed Gentle has provided call-in information for the hearing. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 05/04/11. (SFR, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M Miles on behalf of E Kirksey Wood, Jr, Wood Law Firm LLC Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Miles, Howard)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER re: (194 in 2:08-cv-01946-RDP) MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Plaintiff's Counsel.In light of the fact that the issues raised by Wood's pending motion will be resolved in thesuit filed by CFS, which has been consolidated with the underlying MDL, the Clerk of the Court isDIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE the motion (Doc. # 194).. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/5/2011. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(KAM, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: 3/31/2011 Court Filing
                                                                      TEXT ORDER - The parties are hereby AUTHORIZED to file their pre-hearing briefs under seal. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 03/31/11. Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(SFR, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: 3/31/2011
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joe R Whatley, Jr on behalf of E Kirksey Wood, Jr Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01946-RDP, 2:11-cv-01051-RDP(Whatley, Joe)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER-This matter is before the court on the complaint filed in (2:10-cv-00051-RDP, Doc# 1). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to consolidate said case with MDL 1985. The parties should use the style reflected in this Order on all future pleadings. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/29/2011. (AVC)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Court Filing
                                                                            TEXT ORDER - The hearing scheduled at 10:00 a.m. CDT on Thursday, April 7, 2011, will be conducted by a call-in number. Interested parties are DIRECTED to call 877 322 9654 at the appropriate time and use access code 475073 in order to participate in the conference call. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 03/25/11. (SFR, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Court Filing
                                                                              TEXT ORDER-The parties have requested a hearing regarding the application of the settlement agreement to potential settlements with non-settling plaintiffs. Therefore, this matter is SET for a hearing at 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, April 7, 2011 in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse. Interested parties SHALL submit any pre-hearing briefs on the issue on or before Thursday March 31, 2011. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/25/2011. (AVC)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                PHV Fee paid: $50, Receipt# 1126-1364796 (ALND# B4601021391 (Cappuccio, Elliott) Modified on 3/25/2011 (AVC).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  PHV Fee Paid
                                                                                  PHV Fee paid: $50, Receipt# 1126-1364781 (ALND# B4601021390). (Pulman, Randall) Modified on 3/25/2011 (AVC).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: 3/23/2011, Terminated: 3/23/2011
                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Wood, E) Modified on 3/23/2011 (KAM) correcting docket - not a motion.
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011
                                                                                      NOTICE by Randall Alan Pulman Advisory to the Court (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                        RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 16 (End) filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 15 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 14 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                              RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 13 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 12 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 11 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 10 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 9 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 8 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 7 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 6 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 5 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 4 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 3 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [206], [194], [205] filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services Exhibits Part 2 filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [194] MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed on behalf of Counsel Financial Services filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Beginning of Exhibits)(Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [194] MOTION for Declaratory Judgment file on Behalf of Counsel Financial Service filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                          Counsel Financial Services, LLC's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Randall Alan Pulman. (Pulman, Randall) Modified on 3/21/2011 (AVC).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of Motion for Declaratory Judgment; Distribution of Settlement Proceeds, Fees and Expenses; and Resolution of Issues Raised by Special Master, Ed Gentle filed by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit Exhibit 26)(Wood, E) Modified on 3/21/2011 (AVC).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [200] & [201]. The Motions are CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. Attorneys Pulman and Cappuccio have until 3/25/2011 to pay the filing fee of $50, failure to do so will result in this court vacating this order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/21/2011. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011, Terminated: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Counsel Financial Services, LLC by Elliott S Cappuccio. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cappuccio, Elliott)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011, Terminated: 3/21/2011
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Counsel Financial Services, LLC by Randall Alan Pulman. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pulman, Randall)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER STATEMENT FOR SERVICES RENDERED AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR JANUARY 2011. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/24/2011. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER- re MOTION for Declaratory Judgment; Distribution of Settlement Porceeds, Fees and Expenses; and Resolution of Issues Raised by Special Master, Ed Gentle [194]. The motion is SET for a hearing at 9:00a.m. on 3/24/2011, in courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. By 4:30p.m. on 3/21/2011, interested parties SHALL a)file any pre-hearing briefs and evidentiary submissions and b) e-mail proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law to chambers. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/24/2011. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER - The conference call scheduled with interested parties at 9:00 a.m. CDT on Thursday, February 24, 2011, will be conducted by a call-in number. Interested parties are DIRECTED to call 877 322 9654 at the appropriate time and use access code 475073 in order to participate in the conference call. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 02/23/11. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the settlement administrator is authorized to issue an advance payment to Medicare eligible plaintiffs equal to 25% of their personal injury settlement amounts pending resolution of Medicare's interestes, providing that the settling pla and settling pla's atty sign the 25% Advance Payment Indemnity Agreement; Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/22/2011. (BST, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion for Declaratory Judgment; Distribution of Settlement Proceeds, Fees and Expenses; and Resolution of Issues Raised by Special Master, Ed Gentle (Doc. # 194) filed February 22, 2011. The court will conduct a conference call with interested parties at 9:00 a.m. CDT on Thursday, February 24, 2011, to discuss the parameters for a hearing on the Motion. The court will initiate the call. Interested parties are DIRECTED to e-mail chambers at proctor_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov with the telephone number at which they can be reached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 02/22/11. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011, Terminated: 4/5/2011
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, E)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED: the attached Cerfiticate of No Lien form is hereby APPROVED, and from this point forward Settling Pltf's and Settling Pltf's counsel are hereby REQUIRED to sign the attached revised Certificate of No Lien form prior to payment of the Settling Pltf's personal injury payments. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/15/2011. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER STATEMENT FOR SERVICES RENDERED AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR DECEMBER 2010. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/26/2011. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Plaintiff's Counsel (Venker, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: 12/28/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER STATEMENT FOR SERVICES RENDERED AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR NOVEMBER 2010. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/28/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER-Before this court is the Settlement Administrator's request for authority to pay a Settling pltf's legal fees and expenses to the pltf's lawyer before the pltf liens are all resolved. Upon considering the Settlement Administrator's proposal, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED: (1) Upon receiving a request from pltf's lawyer to pay his legal fees and expenses before the pltf's liens are resolved, the settlement administrator is hereby authorized to do so, provided a signed Settlement Statement is received; and (2) In cases where the pltf's lawyer is paid his legal fees and expenses before the pltf is paid, the pltf will not be paid until all liens are resolved and the pltf and his attorney sign the due diligence Certificate and provide it to the Settlement Administrator. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/15/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(AVC)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER-The court has been informed that a dispute has arisen regarding the distribution of settlement proceeds to attorneys. This matter is SET for a telephone hearing at 2:30 pm CDT on Thursday, December 9, 2010. Settlement Administrator Ed Gentle will provide call-in information for the hearing. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/2/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER STATEMENT FOR SERVICES RENDERED AND EXPENSES INCURRED FROM MAY 2010 TO OCTOBER 2010 AND REMAINING BALANCE OF MEDIATORS BILL. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/29/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER - The hearing previously set at 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, November 17, 2010, is hereby RESET for 3:00 p.m. on Wednesday, November 17, 2010 in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse. Settlement Administrator Ed Gentle is directed to provide notice to the appropriate representative of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/09/10. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER -The court has been informed that a dispute has arisen regarding information requested by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama relating to liens on settlement proceeds payable to certain settling Plaintiffs. This matter is SET for a hearing at 10:00 am on 11/17/2010 in courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black Courthouse. Settlement Administrator Ed Gentle is DIRECTED to provide notice of the hearing to the appropriate representative of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/8/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER-This matter is before the court on Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s Amended Motion for Protective Order [177]. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Don Ivansek and the Gloor Law Group, are ORDERED to negotiate in good faith with the attorney issuing the subpoena in order to develop a manner in which they may respond to the subpoena while simultaneously maintaining the confidentiality of the documents at issue. If Mr. Ivansek and his firm are unable to obtain issuing counsel's cooperation, or unable to develop a method of maintaing the confidentiality of the documents at issue, they are ORDERED to bring this matter to the issuing court's attention for resolution. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/5/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT COMMON BENEFIT FUND SPECIAL MASTERS ADMINISTRATION REPORT-Based upon a review of the Report, and all other matters and things the Court has taken into consideration, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED: The Special Master's 9/29/2010 Report is hereby approved; In carrying out the terms of the Report, the Special Master, and his agents and employees are hereby granted judicial immunity. They shall act in substantial compliance with the Report. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/4/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Attachement to Order Approving Settlement)(AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re [177] Amended MOTION for Protective Order of Wright Enrichment, Inc. filed by Defendant's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER-This matter is before the court on the MOTION on Behalf of Alfred James Salmon to Distribute Settlement Proceeds to Wells Fargo as Trustee Alfred James Salmon Trust [180]. The Motion is GRANTED. It is hereby further ORDERED as follows: When the settlement proceeds are distributed, Edgar C. Gentle, Settlement Special Master, SHALL distribute one-third of the settlement proceeds, after any Medicaid payments, to Kirschner & Venker, P.C., plus expenses of $725.97. The balance of the settlement proceeds SHALL be made payable to Wells Fargo Bank as Trustee of Alfred James Salmon Trust. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/1/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010, Terminated: 11/1/2010
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION on Behalf of Alfred James Salmon to Distribute Settlement Proceeds to Wells Fargo Bank as Trustee of Alfred James Salmon Turst by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Venker, Thomas) Modified on 10/27/2010 (AVC).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [177] Amended MOTION for Protective Order of Wright Enrichment, Inc. Texamerican's Response to Wright Enrichment's Motion for Protective Order filed by Defendant's Counsel. (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER-This matter is before the court on Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s MOTION for Protective Order [176] and Amended MOTION for Protective Order [177]. Document [176] is to be terminated as duplicative. As to [177], the court does not believe that it has jurisdiction to quash or place conditions on the subpoena at issue pursuant to FRCP 45. However, the court has the authority to consider the motion for protective order. Any party having an interest in the matter is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE on or before 10/29/2010 why the Motion [177] should not be granted. Any reply by Wright SHALL be filed by 11/2/2010. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/22/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010, Terminated: 11/5/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                Amended MOTION for Protective Order of Wright Enrichment, Inc. by Defendant's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010, Terminated: 10/22/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order of Wright Enrichment, Inc. by Defendant's Counsel. (Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Special Master Final Notice to Lienholders (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gentle, Edgar)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO 222 SETTLING PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/30/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING ESTABLISHMENT OF QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/27/10. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010, Terminated: 8/27/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Establish Qualified Settlement Fund by Plaintiff's Counsel. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-re Settlement Conference, the parties SHALL appear at 9:00 a.m. on Monday, August 2, 2010 in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/30/10. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER CANCELING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE- After consulting with the Honorable Alvin Wong, the Settlement Conference previously set to begin in Decatur, Georgia at 9:00 a.m. on August 2, 2010 is CANCELED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/30/10. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant's Counsel(Pierce, Sean) Modified on 7/28/2010 (AVC).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by MDLPANEL of Service (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for August 2 and 3, 2010 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 2D of the DeKalb County Courthouse, 556 North McDonough, Decatur, Georgia 30030. All attorneys, parties, and representatives ORDERED to attend, should be prepared to attend the conference from its inception until concluded on both days. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/22/10. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s Responses to Second Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Doc. # 163), filed July 9, 2010. Defendant Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. # 165), filed July 15, 2010, indicates that Wright provided the information sought in the Motion to Compel to Texamerican's counsel on July 15, 2010. Therefore, Defendant Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s Motion (Doc. # 163) is MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 07/20/10. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Defendant's Counsel. (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Defendant Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s Responses to Second Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Doc. # 163), filed July 9, 2010. The motion indicates that discovery, including discovery propounded by Defendant Wright Enrichment, Inc., is proceeding by agreement of the parties in a consolidated fashion with certain state court cases. In light of that, on or before Thursday, July 15, 2010, Defendant Wright Enrichment, Inc. is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.s Motion should not be granted. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 07/12/10. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010, Terminated: 7/20/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendant Wright Enrichment, Inc. to respond to Second Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Defendant's Counsel. (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE: CLAIM FORM CONFIDENTIALITY- Based upon the Stipulation [161] and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED; The Claim Forms, the information within the Claim Forms, supporting medical records, and other documentation submitted therewith to the Settlement Special Master in order to determine whether there can be a Settlement shall be treated as confidential and will not be disclosed except to the Settlement Special Master and other persons with a "need to know" in processing the Claim Forms. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/9/2010. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION OF THE PLAINTIFFS REPRESENTATIVE COUNSEL; TOTAL BODY ESSENTIAL NUTRITION, INC.; WRIGHT PHARMA, INC.; WRIGHT ENRICHMENT, INC.; AND TEXAMERICAN FOOD BLENDING, INC. RE: CLAIM FORM CONFIDENTIALITY by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order Re: CLAIM FORM CONFIDENTIALITY)(Gentle, Edgar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Linda Gomez by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Deposition Notice, # (2) Deposition Subpoena)(Wood, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Defendant's Counsel Notice of Service (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Linda Gomez by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Wood, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER- re [156] MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Proceedings. The Motion is GRANTED. This case is STAYED until further order of this court. On or before July 19, 2010, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants are ORDERED to submit a joint written status report to chambers e-mail regarding the status of settlement negotiations. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/18/10. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010, Terminated: 6/18/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Proceedings by Defendant's Counsel. (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-The start time for the court-assisted settlement conference on June 10 and 11, 2010 has been changed to 10:00 am on June 10. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/10.(AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER-Before the Court is a Request to Withdraw as Counsel [153], filed June 8, 2010 by attorney T. Shane Mayes of the law firm of Moore Ingram Johnson & Stelle, LLP. The Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Mayes and the law firm of Moore Ingram Johnson & Steele, LLP are terminated. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/10. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010, Terminated: 6/8/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel)(Mayes, Travis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiffs by MDLPANEL.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Defendant's Counsel PROOF OF SERVICE (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Defendant's Counsel Proof of Service (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DESIGNATING SPECIAL MASTER- The court herby appoints Edgar C. Gentle, III to serve as Special Master to advise the Court generally and specifically concering the possible settlement, in whole or in part, of the cases in this multi-district litigation. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/25/10. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Linda Gomez by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Deposition Notice)(Wood, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REVISED ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/18/10. (AVC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-This case is SET for a court-assisted settlement conference on June 10 and 11, 2010. All MDL Plaintiffs will be represented at the settlement conference by the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. All other interested Plaintiffs' counsel should coordinate through the Plaintiff's Executive Committee, but should be prepared to be available by phone if the need arises. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/17/10. (AVC) Modified on 5/17/2010 (AVC, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 5/6/2010. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (KLL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER - This matter is set for a status conference to discuss the status of this litigation at 2:00 p.m. on Thursday, May 6, 2010, in courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Liaison Counsel are directed to e-mail chambers at Proctor_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov with a proposed agenda by 4:00 PM on Tuesday. May 4, 2010. Counsel wishing to participate by telephone are also directed to email chambers by 4:00 PM on Tuesday. May 4, 2010, with the telephone number at which they can be reached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 04/26/10. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST for Production of Documents by MDLPANEL. (Attachments: # (1) Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s Third Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.)(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [139] filed by Defendant's Counsel. (Ireland, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Salmon Wright, IV by MDLPANEL.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joel McSpadden by MDLPANEL.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wright Enrichment Corporate Representatives by MDLPANEL.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM against Texamerican Food Blending Inc filed by Wright Enrichment Inc.(Goldsmith, M) Modified on 3/30/2010 (ASL ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Amended Cross-Claim ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant's Counsel.(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant's Counsel.(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Arden Green by Defendant's Counsel.(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010, Terminated: 2/5/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw Anthony Cammarata as Counsel by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Tanner, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER - Before the Court is a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. # 135) filed February 5, 2010, by attorney Anthony Cammarata. The Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Anthony Cammarata is terminated. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 02/05/10. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Plaintiff Arden Green by Defendant's Counsel.(Ireland, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Service by MDLPANEL.(Goldsmith, M) Modified on 2/3/2010 (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Crossclaim by MDLPANEL.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER - This matter is set for a telephone conference at 11:30 AM on Wednesday, February 3, 2010 to discuss the status of this litigation. Counsel are directed to e-mail chambers at Proctor_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov by 4:00 PM on February 2, 2010 to inform the court who will be participating on behalf of the parties and at what number they should be contacted. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 01/29/10. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Cross-Claim ANSWER to Crossclaim by Defendant's Counsel.(Ireland, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Cross CROSSCLAIM Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Cross-Claim against Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Nutrition, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc. Wright Holdings, Inc. and Global Nutrition, LLC, filed by Defendant's Counsel.(Ireland, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Texamerican Food Blending, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant's Counsel.(Ireland, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Crossclaim by Defendant's Counsel.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Answer to First Amendment to Complaint by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant's Counsel.(Ireland, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s First Amended Cross-Claim ANSWER to Crossclaim by Defendant's Counsel.(Ireland, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010, Terminated: 1/4/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Total Body's Notice of Withdrawal by Elizabeth Walker by Defendant's Counsel. (Cate, Rodney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [125] Motion to Withdraw Elizabeth Walker as Attorney. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 01/04/10. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant's Counsel.(Rollins, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (CTO-7) dated 12/7/2009, stay lifted 12/22/2009; transferring one additional case to our court for inclusion in MDL 1985; email notification sent to transferror Clerk's requesting electronic transfer of record to our Court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/22/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Defendant's Counsel Of Withdrawal (Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant's Counsel.(Rollins, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009, Terminated: 12/11/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Plaintiff's Counsel. (Jordan, Tyrell) Modified on 12/11/2009 (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER - Before the Court is a Motion to Withdraw As Counsel (Doc. # 120), filed December 11, 2009 by attorney Tyrell F. Jordan. The Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Tyrell F. Jordan is terminated. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/11/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: 12/10/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amendment to Complaint against all defendants, filed by Plaintiff's Counsel.(Rickard, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Wright Enrichment, Inc. by MDLPANEL.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim of Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by In Re Total Body Formula Products Liability Litigation.(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Status Conference held on 10/8/2009, before Judge R David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 11/3/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit court reporter certification page) (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 10/8/2009. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (KLL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand (Relates to Rodney Wayne Ramsey and Patricia K. Ramsey) filed by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc.. (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Cross-Claim (Relates to Rodney and Patricia Ramsey) filed by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc.. (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff Paula Couch's Complaint filed by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc.. (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Wright Defendants & Total Body Nutrition by Mark Peragallo, Angela Peragallo.(Bodoh, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - The status conference previously set for October 15, 2009 is hereby RE-SET on Thursday, October 8, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Liaison counsel have already provided the court with a tentative agenda of items to discuss at the status conference regarding mediation. Prior to the status conference, counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants SHALL confer in an effort to reach agreement on as many aspects of mediation as possible. On or before Tuesday, October 6, 2009, the parties SHALL jointly notify the court in writing at proctor_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov regarding those aspects of mediation on which they have reached agreement, and regarding those aspects about which there remains dispute. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 09/24/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM Texamerican's Answer to The Wright Deft.s' Counterclaim by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc.. (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF of Service of INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Texamerican Food Blending, Inc. by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Cate, Rodney) Modified on 9/2/2009 (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Wright Enrichment, Inc. by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Cate, Rodney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST for Production of Documents by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Cate, Rodney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiffs by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Cate, Rodney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/1/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Status Conference held on 7/6/2009, before Judge R David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 9/21/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2009. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit court reporter certification page) (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS and third party complaint Returned Executed as to Texamerican Food Marketing, Inc. served on 8/27/2009, answer due 9/16/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Counterclaim Summons Issued as to Texamerican Food Marketing, Inc., mailed certified mail. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Wright Enrichment, Inc., Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc., Wright Nutrition, Inc., Global Nutrition, LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Texamerican Food Marketing, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc. by Wright Nutrition, Inc, Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First CROSSCLAIM Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Cross-Claim against Global Nutrition, L.L.C., filed by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First CROSSCLAIM Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s against Wright Nutrition, Inc, Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, filed by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009, Terminated: 8/4/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental MOTION to Remand filed by Winfred E. Mills, Charlotte Teet Mills. (Hellums, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Crossclaim of Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by Wright Enrichment, Inc.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Cross-Claim by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - This matter is set for a telephone conference on Tuesday, July 28, 2009 at 12:00 noon (CST) to address (1) deposition protocols and (2) the effect of the Alabama Supreme Court's decision in Sparks v. Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc., 2009 WL 2105533 (Ala., July 17, 2009) on those motions to remand arguing fraudulent joinder of retailers. Counsel wishing to participate in the call shall e-mail chambers by 4:30 p.m. on July 27, 2009 with the telephone number at which they should be contacted for the telephone conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 07/21/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Entry of Case Management Order (Goldsmith, M) Modified text on 7/21/2009 (ASL ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Cross-Claim ANSWER to Complaint by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009, Terminated: 8/4/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Remand to State Court by Winfred E. Mills, Charlotte Teet Mills. (Hellums, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - This matter is SET for a status conference on Thursday, October 15, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Before the conference, liaison counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants SHALL confer and develop a written joint status report which they SHALL SUBMIT via e-mail to the undersigneds chambers at proctor_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov on or before September 24, 2009. The joint status report may also propose a tentative agenda for the conference.Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 07/09/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 7/9/2009. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey.) (KLL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/6/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint (Robert L Ware, et al), CROSSCLAIM against TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (CTO-6) dated 6/16/2009, stay lifted 7/2/2009; transferring one additional case to our court for inclusion in MDL 1985; email notification sent to transferror Clerk's requesting electronic transfer of record to our Court. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. Consent to Removal (Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim of Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by Wright Enrichment, Inc.(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER in Consent to Removal filed by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Mary Ann Bates (3:09-cv-01168), CROSSCLAIM against TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Mary Ann Bates by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009, Terminated: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw [84] MOTION for Protective Order by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Cate, Rodney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER this matter is before the court on (1) the Motion for Entry of Protective Order, filed on June 19, 2009 by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Doc. # [84]), and (2) the Motion for Withdrawal of Motion for Entry of Protective Order filed on June 22, 2009, also by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Doc. # 86). For good cause shown, the Motion for Withdrawal (Doc. # [86]) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE the Motion for Entry of Protective Order (Doc. # [84]). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/22/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009, Terminated: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Mary Ann Bates by Wright Enrichment, Inc.(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - This matter is SET for a status conference on Thursday, July 9, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Before the conference, liaison counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants SHALL confer and seek consensus to the extent possible regarding a tentative agenda for the conference, including a listing of pending motions on which the parties may wish to be heard at the conference. On or before July 2, 2009, counsel shall SUBMIT the proposed agenda via e-mail to the undersigneds chambers at the following address: proctor_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 06/09/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009, Terminated: 6/4/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION AND LIFE GROCERY STORE, INC. by General Nutrition Corporation. (Allen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009, Terminated: 7/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Wright Enrichment's Consent by John Snider. (Rickard, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009, Terminated: 7/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Total Body's Joinder and Consent by John Snider. (Rickard, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. (Cate, Rodney) Modified on 5/28/2009 (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Cross-Claim ANSWER to Complaint by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER in re [74] Consent to Removal filed by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER in and Consent to Removal filed by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.. (Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE-No discovery will be filed in the case, unless Judge Proctor directs the parties to do so. Every attorney, who is not registered with our court to receive electronic notification, shall register at www.alnd.uscourts.gov. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Wright Nutrition, Inc, Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc Notice of Service of Discovery Documents (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009, Terminated: 7/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remand by John Snider. (Rickard, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Crossclaim (Amended) of Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by Wright Enrichment, Inc.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/11/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting [68] Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims by All Plaintiffs against Defendant, Horizon Health Care Systems, Inc. d/b/a the Medicine Shoppe, it is ORDERED that the action against dft Horizon Health Care Systems, Inc. d/b/a Medicine Shoppe is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/11/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009, Terminated: 5/11/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hipaa Order (Unopposed) by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order HIPAA Order (proposed))(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  HIPAA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting unopposed motion for HIPAA Order [70]. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 05/11/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Life Grocery Store, Inc. (Rule 26 Disclosures) (Horowitz, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009, Terminated: 5/11/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims by All Plaintiffs against Defendant, Horizon Health Care Systems, Inc. d/b/a the Medicine Shoppe by Horizon Health Care Systems, Inc. (Cozart, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM Complaint against TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Texamerican Food Blending, Inc's Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Cross Complaint ANSWER to Crossclaim by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Texamerican Food Blending, Inc.'s Answer to Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Cross-Claim in Stephens ANSWER to Crossclaim by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Crossclaim by Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, Global Nutrition, L.L.C..(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Crossclaim (Amended) by Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, Global Nutrition, L.L.C..(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (CTO-5) dated 4/03/2009, stay lifted 4/21/2009; transferring one additional case to our court for inclusion in MDL 1985; email notification sent to transferror Clerk's requesting electronic transfer of record to our Court.(KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Life Grocery Store, Inc. of its Offer of Settlement Pursuant to O.C.G.A. ยง 9-11-68 as to Peragallo v. Life Grocery Store, Inc. (Horowitz, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Service of Discovery Documents by John W Wilkerson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Interrogatories to TexAmerican, # (2) Exhibit Interrogatories to Wright, et al., # (3) Exhibit Request for Production to TexAmerican, # (4) Exhibit Request for Production to Total Body, # (5) Exhibit Request for Production to Wright, et al.)(Wood, E) Modified on 4/17/2009 (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by Wright Enrichment, Inc.(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - Before the court is a Motion For Leave To File Second Amendment to Complaint (Doc. # 56) filed April 6, 2009 by Plaintiffs Cindi and Marion Howard. The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to filed the proposed Second Amendment to Complaint with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 04/08/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009, Terminated: 4/8/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Second Amendment to Complaint by Marion Howard. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Second Amendment to Complaint)(Rickard, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (CTO-4) dated 3/18/2009, stay lifted 4/3/2009; transferring two additional cases to our court for inclusion in MDL 1985; email notification sent to transferror Clerk's requesting electronic transfer of record to our Court. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: Liaison Counsel and Committees. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/2/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009, Terminated: 4/1/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Stopher, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - Before the court is a Motion to Withdraw (Doc. # 53) filed April 1, 2009 by attorney Robert E. Stopher. The Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Robert E. Stopher is terminated. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 04/01/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Bowman by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Gloor, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Wright Nutrition, Inc, Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, Global Nutrition, L.L.C. INITIALS DISCLOSURES OF THE WRIGHT DEFENDANTS (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by General Nutrition Corporation Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Allen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by John W Wilkerson Plaintiffs' Consolidated Rule 26 Disclosures (Wood, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Crossclaim, ANSWER to Crossclaim, ANSWER to Crossclaim of Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Wright Enrichment, Inc to Take Video Deposition of Larry Bowman (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/26/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Wright Enrichment, Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim of Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by Wright Enrichment, Inc.(Zimmerman, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/26/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C Rickard on behalf of Neal Taylor (Rickard, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Neal Taylor, CROSSCLAIM against TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Remand filed by Wright Nutrition, Inc, Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, Global Nutrition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(M Alex Goldsmith) Modified on 3/23/2009 (KSS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended CROSSCLAIM against Wright Nutrition, Inc, TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, filed by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (CTO-3) dated 2/20/2009, stay lifted 3/10/2009; transferring one additional case to our court for inclusion in MDL 1985; email notification sent to transferror Clerk's requesting electronic transfer of record to our Court. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [37] Motion to Dismiss and in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement as set out. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/6/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DIRECTING REGISTRATION WITH THE COURT'S CM/ECF SYSTEM. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/5/09. (ASL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009, Terminated: 3/6/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Joinder In Wright Enrichment's Motion to Dismiss and In the Alternative Motion for Definite Statement with Respect to the Cross-Claim of Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc.. (Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009, Terminated: 3/6/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss and in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement, with respect to the Cross-Claim of Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GOVERNING INSPECTION OF THE WRIGHT ENRICHMENT, INC. FACILITY based upon certain agreements of the parties, the court ORDERS the following as set out. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/4/2009. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Non-Disclosure Agreement)(KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GOVERNING INSPECTION OF THE TEXAMERICAN FOOD BLENDING, INC.'S FACILITY based upon certain agreements of the parties, the court ORDERS the following as set out. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/4/2009. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Non-Disclosure Agreement)(KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal by Robert E. Stopher (Stopher, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Shane Mayes on behalf of Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, Global Nutrition, L.L.C. (Mayes, Travis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009, Terminated: 2/24/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice by General Nutrition Corporation. (Allen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C Allen on behalf of General Nutrition Corporation (Allen, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Matthew C. Allen (Doc. # 32) will be treated as a notice of appearance pursuant to the court's November 27, 2008 Order. The Motion is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 02/24/09. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009, Terminated: 8/4/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mark Peragallo, Angela Peragallo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C)(Bodoh, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/19/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSFER ORDER it is ORDERED that the action listed and pending outside the Northern District of Alabama are transferred to the Northern District of Alabama for inclusion in MDL 1985. Signed by John G. Heyburn, II.(KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: 2/16/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on February 9, 2009 Status Conference in the Consolidated Georgia State Court Cases by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009, Terminated: 2/19/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSSCLAIM Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc.'s Cros-Claim against Wright Enrichment, Inc. and Texamerican Food Blending, Inc. against Wright Nutrition, Inc, TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc., Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, filed by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Cate, Rodney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc..(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT re: Plaintiff Fact Sheets by Wright Enrichment, Inc. (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Status Conference held on 1/23/2009, before Judge R David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anita McCorvey, Telephone number 205-278-2063. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (See Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 2/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2009. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit court reporter signature page) (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 an initial case managemnent conference was held, at which the following mattes were discussed and/or determined as set out. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/30/2009. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Tanner on behalf of Jimmy B Hill, Mary E Hill (Tanner, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 1/23/2009. (Court Reporter Anita McCorvey) (KWC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Steven Goetz on behalf of James Kelly, Frank Eriquez (Goetz, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Scott WM Weinstein on behalf of James Kelly (Weinstein, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING INITIAL CONFERENCE this case is set for initial conference on 1/23/2009 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/22/2008. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint (Mary Kullman v. Total Body, et al - USDC Kentucky 3:08cv564H) by Wright Enrichment, Inc.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint (Mark Harris v. Total Body, et al - USDC Kentucky 3:08cv563-H) by Wright Enrichment, Inc.(Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint and Plaintiff Mark Harris' Jury Demand by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint and Plaintiff Mary G. Kullman's Jury Demand by Total Body Essential Nutrition, Inc..(Pittard, Leanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Damany F Ransom on behalf of TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer G Cooper on behalf of TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - The Motion for Limited Entry of Appearance filed on behalf of Lawrence L. Jones, II and Jasper D. Ward (Doc. # 8) will be treated as a notice of appearance pursuant to the court's November 27, 2008 Order. The Motion is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/02/08. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008, Terminated: 12/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear by Patricia Breehl. (Ward, Jasper)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - The Motion to Admit Counsel D. Patterson Gloor, Stephen P. Ellenbecker, and Donald F. Ivansek Pro Hac Vice (Doc. # 5) is GRANTED. Attorneys admitted to practice and in good standing in any United States District Court are PERMITTED to appear pro hac vice in this litigation, without need for any other motion, order or payment of fee. Association of local counsel is not required. All counsel participating in this litigation, to the extent not already registered, are DIRECTED to contact the Clerk of the Court to register with this court for CM/ECF Electronic Noticing (E-Noticing) and CM/ECF Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/27/08. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James C Huckaby, Jr on behalf of Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, Global Nutrition, L.L.C. (Huckaby, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 11/24/2008. (KLL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - As discussed during the telephone conference with counsel on November 21, 2008, the parties are DIRECTED to file with the clerk of the court, under seal, any fee agreements that could control and/or affect any potential recovery of attorneys fees from defendants. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/24/08. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (CTO-2) dated 11/04/2008, stay lifted 11/20/2008 transferring two additional cases to our court for inclusion in MDL 1985; email notification sent to transferror Clerk's requesting electronic transfer of record to our Court. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008, Terminated: 11/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice by TexAmerican Food Blending, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Pierce, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - INVOLVING ALL CASES IN THE TOTAL BODY FORMULA PRODUCTS MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION: The court will conduct a telephone conference with all lead counsel on Monday, November 24, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. All counsel who will be participating in the call are DIRECTED to provide their contact information (names/phone numbers) no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, November 21, 2008 by sending an email to proctor_chambers@alnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/19/08. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (CTO-1) dated 10/29/2008, stay lifted 11/14/2008 transferring four additional cases to our court for inclusion in MDL 1985; email notification sent to transferror Clerk's requesting electronic transfer of record to our Court. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by M Alex Goldsmith on behalf of Wright Enrichment, Inc, Wright Pharma, Inc., Wright Holdings, Inc, Global Nutrition, L.L.C. (Goldsmith, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008, Terminated: 10/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw and Change of Address by Bryan Hicks, David L. Dickens, Virginia R. Dickens, Edward Patalas, B. Chase Hicks, Jennifer Wood, Flora Doss, James L Kassner, Jr, John W Wilkerson. (Jordan, Tyrell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - Before the court is a Motion to Withdraw and Change of Address (Doc. # 2) filed October 22, 2008 by attorney Tyrell F. Jordan. The Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Tyrell F. Jordan is terminated. The Clerk is DIRECTED to take notice of Mr. Jordan's new contact information. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/22/08. (SFR, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSFER ORDER it is ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of Alabama are transferred to the Northern District of Alabama for inclusion in MDL 1985. Signed by John G. Heyburn, II on 10/21/2008. (KSS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 623 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?