Lee v. AT&T Operations, Inc., et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00289
Magistrate Judge Robert R Armstrong, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Magistrate Judge Robert R Armstrong
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Lionel Lee, Plaintiff

Represented by Galvin & Mlawski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Cleveland +1 205 322 1811 +1 205 322 1848 clevelandatty@hotmail.com
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Time Warner Telecom Inc.
NCR Corporation Officer/Director, NCR Corporation
Officer/Director, At Home Corp
Officer/Director, Interactive Network Inc /ca
Officer/Director, Net2phone, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mail.com, Inc.
AT&T Operations, Inc. AT&T Operations, Inc., Defendant

Represented by AT&T Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon H. Lee, Jr. +1 404 927 3509 +1 404 927 7167 ll4314@att.com

Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leon H. Lee, Jr. +1 404 927 3509 +1 404 927 7167 ll4314@att.com

Represented by Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris M Mitchell +1 205 254 1160 +1 205 254 1999 cmitchell@maynardcooper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris M Mitchell +1 205 254 1160 +1 205 254 1999 cmitchell@maynardcooper.com
No Logo BellSouth Corporation, Defendant

Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon H. Lee, Jr. +1 404 927 3509 +1 404 927 7167 ll4314@att.com
No Logo Bellsouth Telecommunications Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by AT&T Operations, Inc., BellSouth Corporation.(Lee, Leon) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lionel Lee. BellSouth Corporation waiver sent on 8/27/2010, answer due 10/26/2010. (Cleveland, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Operations, Inc., AT&T, Inc., BellSouth Corporation, filed by Lionel Lee.(Cleveland, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
AMENDMENT to COMPLAINT against BellSouth Corporation, filed by Lionel Lee.(Cleveland, Kenneth) Modified on 8/30/2010 (CTS, ). (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT to Correctly Name AT& T, Inc. against AT&T, filed by Lionel Lee.(Cleveland, Kenneth) Modified on 7/14/2010 (CTS, ). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to re 6 Show Cause Order filed by Lionel Lee. (Cleveland, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
Request for service by certified mail filed by Lionel Lee. (Cleveland, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leon H. Lee, Jr. by AT&T Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mitchell, Chris) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that more than 120 days have elapsed since the filing of this action, & no service of process having yet been effected on dft AT&T. Pla has 11 days to show cause why this dft should not be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 6/10/10. (CTS, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Operations, Inc.. (Mitchell, Chris) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by AT&T Operations, Inc..(Mitchell, Chris) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lionel Lee. AT&T Operations, Inc. waiver sent on 3/16/2010, answer due 5/17/2010. (Cleveland, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT filed by Lionel Lee.(Cleveland, Kenneth) Modified on 3/16/2010 (CTS, ). (Entered: 03/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., & AT&T (Filing fee $ 350.00, B4601009443), filed by Lionel Lee.(CTS, ) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 113 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?