Technical Witts Inc v. Skynet Electronic Co
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 3:04-cv-02025

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 3:21 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Technical Witts, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Technical Witts Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by International Flora Technologies, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Warren Gilmore, Jr. +1 480 545 7000 doug.gilmore@floratech.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Israel & Gerity PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Gerity +1 602 274 4400 +1 602 274 4401 mgerity@ig-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Noblitt & Gilmore LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Noblitt +1 480 994 9859 +1 480 994 9025 syan@ngtechlaw.com
No Logo Advanced Technical Sales Incorporated, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick S. Frei +1 202 662 3049 +1 202 662 2739 frederickfrei@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com
No Logo Silicon Valley World Trade Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick S. Frei +1 202 662 3049 +1 202 662 2739 frederickfrei@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com
No Logo Skynet Electronic Company, Ltd., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Skynet Electronic Company Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick S. Frei +1 202 662 3049 +1 202 662 2739 frederickfrei@andrewskurth.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aldo Noto +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 notoa@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Hnath +1 202 373 6000 +1 202 373 6001 gary.hnath@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/06/2008 Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 mlimon-wynn@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/06/2008 Rick Tache +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 rtache@swlaw.com
v.
No Logo Advanced Technical Sales Incorporated, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick S. Frei +1 202 662 3049 +1 202 662 2739 frederickfrei@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com
No Logo Jim Liang, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Hnath +1 202 373 6000 +1 202 373 6001 gary.hnath@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
No Logo Silicon Valley World Trade Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick S. Frei +1 202 662 3049 +1 202 662 2739 frederickfrei@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com
No Logo Skynet Electronic Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Skynet Electronic Company Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick S. Frei +1 202 662 3049 +1 202 662 2739 frederickfrei@andrewskurth.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aldo Noto +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 notoa@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Hnath +1 202 373 6000 +1 202 373 6001 gary.hnath@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/06/2008 Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 mlimon-wynn@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/06/2008 Rick Tache +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 rtache@swlaw.com
No Logo Skynet Electronic Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick S. Frei +1 202 662 3049 +1 202 662 2739 frederickfrei@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Hnath +1 202 373 6000 +1 202 373 6001 gary.hnath@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
No Logo Unknown Liang, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Hnath +1 202 373 6000 +1 202 373 6001 gary.hnath@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
No Logo Unknown Parties, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
No Logo Technical Witts, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Technical Witts Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by International Flora Technologies, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Warren Gilmore, Jr. +1 480 545 7000 doug.gilmore@floratech.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Israel & Gerity PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Gerity +1 602 274 4400 +1 602 274 4401 mgerity@ig-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Noblitt & Gilmore LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Noblitt +1 480 994 9859 +1 480 994 9025 syan@ngtechlaw.com
No Logo Ernest Wittenbreder, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Israel & Gerity PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Gerity +1 602 274 4400 +1 602 274 4401 mgerity@ig-law.com
No Logo Sidney Harris, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Harris +1 202 973 8800 sharris@wsgr.com
No Logo Skynet Electronic Company, Ltd., ThirdParty Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Skynet Electronic Company Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick S. Frei +1 202 662 3049 +1 202 662 2739 frederickfrei@andrewskurth.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aldo Noto +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 notoa@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Hnath +1 202 373 6000 +1 202 373 6001 gary.hnath@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul K. Charlton +1 602 530 8585 +1 602 530 8500 paul.charlton@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moffett, Lloyd R., Sr. (deceased) Through The Representative Of His Estate Lloyd R. Moffett, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fei Fei Chao +1 202 662 2700 +1 202 662 2739 fei-feichao@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sid Leach +1 602 382 6372 +1 602 382 6070 sleach@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/06/2008 Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 mlimon-wynn@swlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/06/2008 Rick Tache +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 rtache@swlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (284) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the Court grants the parties' 280 motion. The above captioned lawsuit is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/15/10. (LFIG) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
    WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re 280 Joint MOTION to Vacate the Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Orders and Dismiss the Case With Prejudice -and- Joint Status Report by Defendants Advanced Technical Sales Incorporated, Silicon Valley World Trade Corporation, Skynet Electronic Company Limited, Plaintiff Technical Witts Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Laurie Adams. Appearances: Michael Gerity for the plaintiff. Paul Charlton for the defendant. Status Hearing held on 11/30/2010. The Court has received and reviewed the Joint Motion to Vacate the Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Orders and Dismiss the Case With Prejudice (Doc. 280). Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED directing counsel to file a joint memorandum in support of their request, which shall include authorities by 12/13/10. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.](KSP) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
        Minute Order: The Court ORDERS setting this matter for Status Hearing on November 30, 2010 at 4:00 p.m., at which time the Court will discuss the parties joint Motion to Vacate the Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Orders and Dismiss the Case With Prejudice. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.](KSP) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Vacate the Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Orders and Dismiss the Case With Prejudice -and- Joint Status Report by Technical Witts Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
            TEXT ONLY Order: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the parties to submit a joint status report to the Court, describing the current status of the litigation. The parties should submit the report by November 12, 2010. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
              MANDATE of Federal Circuit; remanding the case for further proceedings consistent with the settlement agreement reached by the parties, re: 2010-1333 268 , 269 Notices of Appeal (REW) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd for proceedings held on 02/23/2010 before Judge Hon. Mary H. Murguia. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE OF RECORD TRANSMITTED TO THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT re 268 Notice of Appeal, 269 Notice of Appeal - Amended (SAT) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT filed for Motions Hearing for dates of 02/23/2010 before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Merilyn A Sanchez. Re 268 Notice of Appeal, 269 Notice of Appeal - Amended Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (BAS) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                      US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit Case Number 2010-1333 for 268 Notice of Appeal and 269 Notice of Appeal - Amended. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit). (LSP) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                        Notice re of Change of Counsel by Skynet Electronic Corporation (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                          Notice of Appeal Notification Form; Notice of Appeal and copy of docket sheet transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit and all parties re 268 Notice of Appeal, 269 Notice of Appeal - Amended. (LAD) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM for Appeal by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder for proceedings held on 02/23/2010 before Judge Murguia. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Letter of Mr. Wittenbreder served on Mr. Michael E Gerity on 3/29/2010. (LAD) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re Order 161 , Order 264 and Judgment 265 to Federal Circuit by Technical Witts Inc. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0970-3777979. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 4/20/2010 to reflect document linkage (LAD). (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL re Order 161 , Order 264 and Judgment 265 to Federal Circuit, by Technical Witts Inc. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-3777979. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 4/20/2010 to reflect document linkage (LAD). (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER directing the Clerk to send via certified mail Mr. Wittenbreder's letter to Mr. Michael E. Gerity. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/26/10. (LSP) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                      Notice re No Objection by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Frei, Frederick) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                        CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Court's Order of March 3, 2010, granting Defendant Skynet Electronic Company, LTD's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringement of the '329 Patent, denying as futile Plaintiff Technical Witts, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Complaint, granting Counter-defendant Technical Witts, Inc. and Third Party Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Skynet's State Law Claims, granting Defendant Skynet Electronic Company, LTD's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Technical Witts' State Law Claims, judgment is entered accordingly. This action is hereby dismissed.(REW) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
                                          STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its 262 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (REW) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
                                            MOTION and Memorandum for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fraud, Fraudlent Inducement and Misrepresentation Claims by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (REW) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Michael Gerity and Daniel Noblitt for the plaintiff. Frederick Frei, Paul Charlton, and Lindsey Weber for the defendants. Motion Hearing held on 2/23/10. Counsel argue their positions to the Court. IT IS ORDERED taking these matters under advisement [docs. 168, 170, 171]. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.](KSP) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                OBJECTION re 258 Reply in Support of Motion and Clarification of Facts filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Frei, Frederick) Modified on 2/24/2010, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP). (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER entered by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 2/18/10. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Third-Party Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder's request to reschedule oral argument on February 23, 2010 254 . Unfortunately, due to the Court's upcoming trial schedule it is unable to accommodate Mr. Wittenbreder's request. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Motion to Expedite 256 . [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.] (KSP) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY in Support re 254 MOTION to Continue Oral Argument filed by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 2/18/2010 (TLJ). DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCIV 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED. (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document re 256 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Continue Oral Argument Proposed Order by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Expedite Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Continue Oral Argument by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 2/18/2010 (TLJ). DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCIV 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED. (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                          OBJECTION re 254 MOTION to Continue Oral Argument filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Continue Oral Argument by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 2/18/2010 (TLJ). DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCIV 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED. (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Order: The Court ORDERS setting oral argument as to the cross Motions for Summary Judgment [docs. 170, 171] on Tuesday, February 23, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Mary H Murguia. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.](KSP) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY in Support re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,402,329 Skynet Electronic Co. Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infrindgement and Patent Invalidity of US Patent No. 5,402,329 filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chao, Fei-Fei) Modified on 10/7/2009, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP). (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  DECLARATION of Declaration re 250 Reply to Response to Motion by Counter Claimant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 184 MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment Motion as to Plaintiff's Three Fraud Claims filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 12 through 16 to Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 16)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibits 6 through 11 of Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibits 2 through 5 of Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-K Part 3 to Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-K Part 2 of Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-K Part 1 of Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-J Part 3 of Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-J Part 2 of Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-J Part 1 to Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-I Part 3 to Reponse to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-I Part 2 of Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-I Part 1 of Reponse Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-H Part 2 to Reponse Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-H Part 1 to Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-G Part 2 to Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-G Part 1 to Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-F Part 2 to Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-F Part 1 to Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-E Part 2 to Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit 1-E Part 1 to Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement, Exhibit D to Response to Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement of Facts, Exhibit 1-C Part 2 to Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2009 TO INCLUDE DOCUMENT LINKAGE (KMG). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement of Facts, Exhibit 1-C Part 1 to Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2009 TO INCLUDE DOCUMENT LINKAGE (KMG). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document RE 223 Statement of Facts, Exhibit 1-B Part 2 to Response Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2009 TO INCLUDE DOCUMENT LINKAGE (KMG). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document re 223 Statement of Facts, Exhibit 1-B Part 1 by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2009 TO INCLUDE DOCUMENT LINKAGE (KMG). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document 223 Statement of Facts Exhibit 1-A Part 1 by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2009 TO INCLUDE DOCUMENT LINKAGE (KMG). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STATEMENT of Plaintiff's Response Statement of Facts and Supplement Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Response 222 to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gerity, Michael) Modified on 9/15/2009 TO ADD DOCUMENT LINKAGE (KMG). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (Amended) to Motion re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,402,329 filed by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of Plaintiffs' Statement of Disputed Material Facts for Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Fraud Claims by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 184 MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment Motion as to Plaintiff's Three Fraud Claims filed by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER entered by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 8/25/09. The Court notes that Plaintiff Technical Witts, Inc.'s response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt.##187) does not conform with Local Rule 7.2(e). Plaintiff's responsive brief is 33-pages in length; the Local Rules of this District provide a 17-page limit, unless otherwise permitted by the Court. Plaintiff has not sought, and the Court has not granted, leave to exceed the presumptive 17-page limit. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED striking Plaintiff's response brief and its statement of facts from the Court's docket, (Dkt.##187, 188, 214). Plaintiff shall have 20 calendar days from the date of this Order to file its amended response and statement of facts. Plaintiff's response brief shall be limited to 17-pages in length. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, (Dkt.#169). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Three Fraud Claims, (Dkt.#184). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendants' Motion for Expedited Review of the Pending Motion to Stay, (Dkt.#216), and Defendants' Motion to Stay, (Dkt.#215).[This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.](KSP) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of Supplement Statement of Facts In Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 217 Reply in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support re 170 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Fraud Claims filed by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [Defendants Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd., et al's] Motion to Stay by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay re Reply To Plaintiffs Response To Skynets Motion For Summary Judgment Until The Court Decides Whether Plaintiffs Response Should Be Stricken For (1) Violation Of Local Rule 7.2(E) By Exceeding The Seventeen (17) Page Limit For Response And (2) Openly Ignoring The Markman Order Due To No Ruling On Its Motion For Reconsideration (Expedited Consideration Requested) by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ****STRICKEN PER 219 ORDER DATED 08/25/09******ERRATA attaching corrected Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Statement of Facts)(Gerity, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2009 (ESL, ). (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document Exhibits 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16, # 6 Exhibit 17)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document Exhibits 5, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 to Plaintiffs Statement of Fact re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document Exhibit 2, 3 and 4 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-K Part 3 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-K Part 2 to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-K Part 1 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-J Part 3 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-J Part 2 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-J Part 1 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-I Part 2 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-I Part 1 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-H Part 2 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-H Part 1 to Plaintiffs Statement of Fact re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-G Part 2 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-G Part 1 to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts Re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-F Part 2 to Plaintiffs Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-F Part 1 to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-E Part 2 to Plaintiffs' Statement of Fact re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-E Part 1 to Plaintiffs' Statement of Fact re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix D to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts re Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED PER ATTORNEY REQUEST TO CORRECT APPENDIX TO D INSTEAD B on 8/11/2009 (REK). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-B Part 2 to Plaintiffs Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED PER ATTORNEY REQUEST TO 1-B INSTEAD OF 1-C ON 8/11/2009 (REK). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document Appendix 1-B Part 1 by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document 188 Appendix 1-C Part 2 by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2009 (KMG, ). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document 188 Appendix C Part 1 by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2009 (KMG, ). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document 188 Appendix A to SOF by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2009 TO INCLUDE DOCUMENT LINKAGE(KMG). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ***STRICKEN PER 219 ORDER DATED 08/25/09****STATEMENT of Statement of Facts re 187 Response to Motion, for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gerity, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2009 (ESL, ). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ****STRICKEN PER 219 ORDER DATED 08/25/09*****RESPONSE to Motion re 170 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Fraud Claims, 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,402,329 filed by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2009 (ESL, ). (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LODGED Proposed Skynet Electronic Co, Ltd.s Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs Fraud, Fraudulent Inducement And Negligent Misrepresentation Claims re: 184 MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment Motion as to Plaintiff's Three Fraud Claims. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LODGED Proposed Skynet Electronic Co, Ltd.s Motion And Memorandum For Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs Fraud, Fraudulent Inducement And Misrepresentation Claims re: 184 MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment Motion as to Plaintiff's Three Fraud Claims. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment Motion as to Plaintiff's Three Fraud Claims by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Fei-Fei Chao In Support of Skynet Electronic Co.'s Opposition to Planitff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re 180 Response in Opposition to Motion by Counter Claimant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, ThirdParty Plaintiff Skynet Electronic Co Ltd filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jim Liang In Opposition to Partial Summary Judgement re 170 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Fraud Claims by Counter Claimant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, ThirdParty Plaintiff Skynet Electronic Co Ltd filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of Disputed Material Facts for Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Fraud re 180 Response in Opposition to Motion by Counter Claimant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, ThirdParty Plaintiff Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 170 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Fraud Claims filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Chao, Fei-Fei) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 168 MOTION for Amend Complaint filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 178 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Statement of Facts re 171 filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, D-F)(MAP) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 175 Motion to Seal. ORDERED directing the Clerk to accept for filing under seal (1) the Defendant/Counterclaimants Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and (2) the confidential supporting documentation submitted therewith. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/6/09.(MAP) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED LODGED Proposed Defendant Skynet Electronic Co. Ltd.'s Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,409,329 and Exhibits A, B, D, E and F Thereto re: 175 MOTION to Seal re Motion for Leave to File Confidential Documents Under Seal.. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, D, E and F)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal re Motion for Leave to File Confidential Documents Under Seal. by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Dr. Fe-Fei Chao in Support of Defendant Skynet Electronic Co., Ltd.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,402,329 re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,402,329 by Defendants Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation, ThirdParty Plaintiff Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Counter Claimant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice re Filing Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,409,329 by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,402,329 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-3, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Continued, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5-6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8-9, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 11, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 11, Part 3)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT of of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re 170 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Fraud Claims by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,402,329 by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Fraud Claims by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re Reconsideration of Claim Construction by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Amend Complaint by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of ERRATA by Technical Witts Inc re 166 Report Re: Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Expert Jim Walker's Response to Defendant's Expert Report (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 5/8/2009 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED; THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Notice) TO (Errata) (REW, ). (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Jim Walker's Response to Defendant's Expert's Report by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Rebuttal to Expert Report by Defendant Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice re Notice of Filing Jim Walker's Initial Expert Report on Behalf of Plaintiff by Ernest Wittenbreder, Technical Witts Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Jim Walker's Initial Report on behalf of Plaintiff)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Initial Report of Expert by ThirdParty Plaintiff Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Notice of Filing Expert Report by ThirdParty Plaintiff Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER adopting the Special Master's Report and Recommendation in its entirety as the Order of this Court 139 . FURTHER ORDERED overruling Plaintiff's Objections 145 to the Claim Construction Report of the Special Master. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 2/1/09. (KMG) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER entered by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 11/20/08. The Court has considered Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Objection to Claim Construction Report of the Special Master, IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion 157 . (KSP)[This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.] (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 158 Lodged Proposed Document filed by Ernest Wittenbreder, Technical Witts Inc. Description of deficiency: Cover sheet is missing. No follow up is required, see attached pdf for full details. (ESL) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LODGED Proposed Sur-Reply in Support of Objection to Claim Construction Report of the Special Master. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Objection to Claim Construction Report of the Special Master by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice re Service of Discovery Responses by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 153 ORDERED that Stipulation is GRANTED, and that Plaintiff has until July 18, 2008 in which to file its Reply. Signed by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 07/21/08. (MHM) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of 145 OBJECTION TO 139 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER filed by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Gerity, Michael) Modified on 7/21/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED; THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Reply, re: Motion) TO (Reply, re: Objection); LINKAGE CORRECTED. (REW, ). (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 152 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to file Reply in Support of Objection to Special Master's Report and Recommendation by Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 145 Objection to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Reply in Support of Objection to the Report and Recommendation by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order: The Court ORDERS directing Plaintiff to file any reply to the Defendant's response to Plaintiff's objections to the Report and Recommendation by July 15, 2008. There will be no extensions granted absent extraordinary good cause. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.](KSP) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 145 Objection to Special Master Report by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Objections to the Special Master's Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED that Skynet's motion is granted and Skynet has until June 23, 2008 to file its response. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 05/19/08.(MHM) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice re Proposed Order by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd re 147 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Objections (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Objections by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Order: The Court ORDERS directing Defendants to file a response to the Plaintiff's objections to the Special Master's Report and Recommendation by close of business on May 23, 2008, which shall not exceed 30 pages. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.] (KSP) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION re 139 Other Notice to Claim Construction Report of the Special Master filed by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice re Notice of No Objections to Report and Recommendation by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Plaintiff's 142 Motion to Modify the Case Management Scheduling Order as detailed in this order. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 4/25/08.(REW, ) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Modify Case Management Scheduling Order by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2008 DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). (REW, ). (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Sidney Harris and Judge Mary H. Murguia on 12/19/07. Court Reporter: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Michael Gerity and Daniel Noblitt. Defendant is present wit counsel, Fei-Fei Chao, Frederick Frei, and Paul Charlton. This is the time set for Markman Hearing. Plaintiff presents its tutorial. 10:53 a.m. Court stands at recess. 11:08 a.m. Court reconvenes, same counsel and parties present. Plaintiff's tutorial continues. 12:05 p.m. Court stands at recess. 1:19 p.m. Court reconvenes, same counsel and parties present. Plaintiff's tutorial continues. Defendant presents its tutorial. Discussion held regarding the location of the Final Markman Hearing. The Special Master will notify the parties as to the location where the Final Markman Hearing will be held. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.] DUE TO A CLERICAL ERROR, THIS MINUTE ENTRY WAS NOT ENTERED UNTIL APRIL 18, 2008. (KSP) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Order: The Court is in receipt of the Special Master's Report and Recommendation regarding claim construction. The Court ORDERS directing the parties to file any/all objections to the Report and Recommendation by close of business on May 5, 2008. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.](KSP) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Claim Construction REPORT of Special Master by Sidney Harris (Harris, Sidney) Modified on 3/20/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED. (REW, ). (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (VAR) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Markman Hearing held on 1/30/08 before Special Master Sidney Harris. Court Reporter: Vicki Reger. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2008. (VAR) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply re 134 Brief (Non Appeal) on Whereby Clause by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 42, # 2 Exhibit 43)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Sidney Harris for Markman Hearing proceedings held on 1/30/08 before Sydney Harris Special Master. (BAS, ) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF Memorandum re Whereby Clause by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Appendix 1, # 6 Appendix 2)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Markman Hearing held on 1/30/08 before Judge Special Master Sidney Harris. Court Reporter: Vicki Reger. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List, re: Motion Hearing by Technical Witts Inc. (REW, ) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List, re: Motion Hearing by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation, Silicon Valley World Trade Corporation, Advanced Technical Sales, Inc. (REW, ) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd for proceedings held on 01/30/2008 before Judge Murguia. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Special Master Sidney Harris. Markman Hearing held on 1/30/2008. Special Master will allow a memorandum regarding the Whereby Clause. Defendant's memorandum shall be filed by Wednesday, 2/6/08 and Plaintiff's response shall be filed by Tuesday, 2/12/08. Memorandum is limited to six (6) pages. Parties are to file a Proposed Joint Scheduling Order for the Court. (Court Reporter/ECR Vicki Reger.)(VAR) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd for proceedings held on 01/30/2008 before Judge Murguia. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF re 124 Brief (Non Appeal), Rebuttal Markman Brief by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF Reply Brief by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE BRIEF to Defendants' 115 Claim Construction Brief re 116 Brief, 123 Rebuttal Brief, Supplemental Brief, by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19, # 2 Exhibit 20, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 22, # 5 Exhibit 23, # 6 Exhibit 24, # 7 Exhibit 25, # 8 Exhibit 26, # 9 Exhibit 27, # 10 Exhibit 28, # 11 Exhibit 29, # 12 Exhibit 30, # 13 Exhibit 31, # 14 Exhibit 32, # 15 Exhibit 33, # 16 Exhibit 34, # 17 Exhibit 35, # 18 Exhibit 36, # 19 Exhibit 37, # 20 Exhibit 38, # 21 Exhibit 39, # 22 Exhibit 40, # 23 Exhibit 41)(Gerity, Michael) Modified on 1/22/2008 DOCUMENT LINKED INCORRECTLY; LINKAGE ADDED AND TEXT CLARIFIED. (REW, ). (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF Rebuttal Brief by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 part 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to Plaintiff's 116 Initial Markman Brief by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gerity, Michael) Modified on 12/19/2007 to correct text (REW, ). (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice re of Consent to Relationship by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder re 114 Order, (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice re Consent by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document re 115 MOTION for construction claim Brief by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re 115 MOTION for construction claim Brief by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document re 115 MOTION for construction claim Brief by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF Markman Brief by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder, Counter Defendant Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Claim Chart, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 986 Patent, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 329 Patent, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Walker Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Walker CV, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Webster Def, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Comp Dict Def, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Dict of Computing Def, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Fundamentals Def, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Active and Non Linear, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Erikson, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Brown, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Kassakian, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Amendment A, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Response, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Response, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Amendment B, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Dict of Computing Def)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF for construction claim by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Charlton, Paul) Modified on 12/4/2007 INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FORM (Motion) TO (Brief). (REW, ). (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 53(a)(2), Fed.R.Civ.P., the Court hereby puts the parties in the instant lawsuit on notice of this relationship; In acknowledgment of this notice pursuant to Rule 53(a)(2), the parties shall file a notice of consent to this relationship or any objections thereto by 12/4/07 (See order for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/30/2007. (LAD) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA re 112 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Advanced Technical Sales, Inc. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Technical Witts Inc(an Arizona Corporation) by Advanced Technical Sales, Inc.(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Silicon Valley World Trade Corporation.(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Technical Witts Inc. Silicon Valley World Trade Corporation served on 10/30/2007. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Technical Witts Inc. Advanced Technical Sales, Inc served on 10/30/2007. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice re Modification of Special Master's Order by Sidney Harris re 102 Other Notice (Harris, Sidney) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 105 Witness List filed by Ernest Wittenbreder, Technical Witts Inc. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. The correct event is Other Notice and it is found in the Notices menu. (LSP) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 104 Witness List filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. The correct event is Other Notice and it is found in the Notices menu. (LSP) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re Designation of Experts by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gerity, Michael) Modified on 10/16/2007, INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "Witness List" TO "Notice", (LSP). (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re Designation of Experts by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Charlton, Paul) Modified on 10/16/2007, INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "Witness List" TO "Notice", (LSP). (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER entered by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 10/3/07. The Court ORDERS denying as moot the Motion for Protective Order 98 . [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice re Special Master Order by Sidney Harris (Harris, Sidney) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER appointing Judge Sidney Harris as Special Master for patent-related issues in this action. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/6/07. (REW, ) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of Counsel re 98 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc, ThirdParty Defendant Ernest Wittenbreder, Counter Defendants Technical Witts Inc, Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order by Technical Witts Inc, Ernest Wittenbreder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/20/07. (REW, ) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM re: Joint Submission of List of Qualified Candidates for Appointment as Special Master by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 1A# 3 Exhibit 2 and 3)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Silicon Valley World Trade Corporation, Advanced Technical Sales, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Silicon Valley)(HIH). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print. (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice re Summons by Technical Witts Inc re 87 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons (2))(Israel, Kyle) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply to Affirmative Defenses, ANSWER to Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint by Ernest Wittenbreder.(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the Scheduling Conference briefing held on June 21, 2007, and the Court being fully advised, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED incorporating all dates agreed upon by the parties or determined by the Court at the Scheduling Conference, as contained within this order. Discovery due by 4/25/2008. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/10/07. (SAT) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Submit a List of Potential Special Masters. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to meet and confer and jointly submit a list of three qualified candidates for appointment as a special master. At least one potential special master should be from Arizona. Such list is due ten days from the file date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/10/07.(SAT) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time Submit Their Lists of Potential Special Masters by Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Israel, Kyle) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice re DEFENDANTS SKYNET ELECTRONIC CO., LTD., ET AL.'S SUBMISSION OF A SUGGESTED LIST OF QUALIFIED CANDIDATES FOR APPOINTMENT AS SPECIAL MASTER by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Davis CV# 2 Exhibit B - Selinger CV)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Silicon Valley World Trade Corporation, Advanced Technical Sales, Inc, Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation ; Party John Does; LMN Entities; Jane Doe Liang; Jim Liang; XYZ Corporations; ABC Partnerships and Jane Does terminated; Jury Demand, filed by Technical Witts Inc.(KMG) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER allowing Pla leave to file its Second Amended Complaint in the form previously submitted to this Court. FURTHER ORDERED, that Pla's Second Amended Complaint shall be filed and shall be duly served in accordance with the appropriate provisions of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/2/07.(KMG, ) . (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LODGED Proposed Second Amended Complaint re: 83 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Amended Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LODGED Proposed proposed Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint re: 83 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Amended Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct re Amended Complaint by Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LODGED Proposed Case Management Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LODGED Proposed Proposed Case Management Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Order: The Court ORDERS directing plaintiff's counsel to submit a proposed scheduling order incorporating the dates agreed upon at the Scheduling Conference on June 21, 2007 by Thursday, June 28, 2007. Counsel shall email the proposed order to Murguia_chambers@azd.uscourts.gov. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.] (KSP) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. Ernest Wittenbreder waiver sent on 5/29/2007. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Michael Gerity and Daniel Noblitt for the plaintiff. Fei-Fei Chao and Paul Charlton (telephonically) for the defendants. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference re: Markman briefing held on 6/21/07. The Court and counsel discuss the proposed deadlines. Markman briefing is due as follows: Initial Markman Brief due 12/3/07; responsive Markman brief due 12/17/07; rebuttal Markman brief due 1/11/08. The Court will set a Markman Hearing once the issue is fully briefed. IT IS ORDERED that dispositive motions be filed two weeks after entry of the Markman Order. Discovery shall be completed by 4/25/08. The Court DIRECTS counsel to meet and confer and jointly submit a suggested list of three qualified candidates for appointment as special master, along with each candidates curriculum vitae on or before July 5, 2007. The Court is not inclined to bifurcate the case, but will consider it. [This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.] (KSP) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice re of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Technical Witts Inc (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice re Initial Disclosures by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Paul Charlton for Mailing by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 72 Lodged Proposed Document (Case Management Plan) filed by Technical Witts Inc. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. (REW, ) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 70 Amended Answer to Complaint (Counterclaim), filed by Technical Witts Inc. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. (REW, ) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Joint Case Management Plan filed by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2007 INCORRECT DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED TO REMOVE "LODGED" AND "Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted" FROM TEXT. (REW, ). (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice re Filing Sworn Declaration by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Defendants' Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims 66 Answer to Counterclaim, 48 Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by Technical Witts Inc(an Arizona Corporation). (Gerity, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2007 INCORRECT DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED TO REFLECT CORRECT DOCUMENT TYPES OF LINKED DOCUMENTS. (REW, ). (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 68 Motion for Order Authorizing Alternative Service Pursuant to Rule 4.1(m), Ariz.R.Civ.P. and Rule 4(e)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P.; ORDERED that service of process in this action may be made upon Ernest H. Wittenbreder by service of process on Michael E. Gerity; FURTHER ORDERED that Skynet shall forthwith cause to be mailed to Ernest H. Wittenbreder, at the last known residence or business address of Mr. Wittenbreder, a copy of the Summons directed to Ernest H. Wittenbreder, a copy of Defendant Skynets Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and Third Party Complaint on behalf of Ernest H. Wittenbreder and Errata for Defendants Answer and Counterclaim and the Counterclaim/Third Party Complaint and a copy of this Order, and shall file with this Court satisfactory evidence of such mailing. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/5/2007.(LAD) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Altnernative Service by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index# 2 Exhibit 1-3# 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 6/21/2007 at 04:00 PM before Judge Mary H Murguia. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 5/24/07. (KSP) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Skynet d/b/a Amtek's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint filed by Technical Witts, COUNTERCLAIM against Technical Witts Inc by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd.(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that Plaintiff Technical Witts, Inc., has sufficiently shown cause why Defendant Amtek should not be dismissed. Defendant Amtek's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply 57 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Against Amtek 56 is denied. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees incurred in opposing Amtek's recent filings is denied. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 4/27/07.(REW, ) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LODGED Proposed Surreply to Plaintiff's Reply re: 57 MOTION for for leave to file. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Surreply)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 57 MOTION for leave to file filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. Description of deficiency: Original proposed pleading not electronically lodged. (REW, ) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply/ ANSWER to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Technical Witts Inc.(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 56 Application for Entry of Default by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION for for leave to file filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice re Order re Motion by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd re 57 MOTION for for leave to file Surreply (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION for for leave to file Surreply filed by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for for leave to file by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Charlton, Paul) Modified on 4/30/2007 LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT NOT ENTERED (REW, ). (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc against Defendant Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit on Default)(Gerity, Michael) Modified on 4/19/2007 (DMT, ). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED FROM APPLICATION TO MOTION. (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA re 48 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, by Defendant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply re 49 Other Notice, 52 Response,, in Support of Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Reply# 2 Exhibit B to Reply)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 50 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul Kipp Charlton substituted as counsel for Jane Doe Liang, John Does, Skynet Electronic Corporation, Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Jane Does, ABC Partnerships, LMN Entities in place of attorney Sid Leach. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 4/4/07.(KSP) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE OF SKYNET ELECTRONIC CORPORATION d/b/a AMTEK ELECTRONIC COMPANY TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE IN SATISFACTION OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT SKYNET ELECTRONIC CORPORATION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SERVICE by Defendants Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Skynet Electronic Corporation, ThirdParty Plaintiff Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Counter Claimant Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kao F. Hsu# 2 Exhibit A to Declaration# 3 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Frei, Frederick) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Ernest Wittenbreder, Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Wittenbreder)(entered by PEM) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney: for substitution of Gallagher & Kennedy in place of Snell & Wilmer by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Charlton, Paul) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice re Filing Affidavit of Service by Technical Witts Inc in Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint; COUNTERCLAIM against Technical Witts Inc; THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ernest Wittenbreder, by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Leach, Sid) Modified on 3/30/2007 TO CORRECT PARTY TYPES (REW, ). (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Anne Limon-Wynn on behalf of Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Limon-Wynn, Monica) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss in accordance with this order; granting Plaintiff's 29 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall show cause why the Court should not dismiss the case as to Defendant Skynet California for lack of service of process. Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2007. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/12/07.(REW, ) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 36 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Fei-Fei Chao and the law firm of Andrews Kurth LLP, is substituted in place of Gary M. Hnath of the law firm of Bingham McCutchen LLP as counsel for dfts . Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/1/06. (TLJ) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Fei-Fei Chao on behalf of Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (BAS, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Aldo Noto on behalf of Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (BAS, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Frederick S Frei on behalf of Skynet Electronic Co Ltd. (BAS, ) (ESL). (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Rick Tache on behalf of Skynet Electronic Co Ltd (Tache, Joseph) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA re 36 MOTION to Substitute Attorney: for substitution of Fei-Fei Chao in place of Gary M. Hnath by Defendants Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Jim Liang, Jane Doe Liang, Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Leach, Sid) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Substitute Attorney: for substitution of Fei-Fei Chao in place of Gary M. Hnath by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Jim Liang, Jane Doe Liang, Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leach, Sid) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jim Liang and Judia Liang and to dismiss Count IV, Count V and Count VI or alternatively for more definite statement filed by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Jim Liang, Jane Doe Liang, Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Leach, Sid) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jim Liang and Judia Liang and to dismiss Count IV, Count V and Count VI or alternatively for more definite statement Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jim Liang and Judia Liang and to dismiss Count IV, Count V and Count VI or alternatively for more definite statement filed by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Fei-Fei Chao terminated. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 05/19/06. (KCS) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have to and including Monday, May 22, 2006, in which to respond to Defendant Liangs' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 05/19/06. (MHM) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Jim Liang, Jane Doe Liang, John Does, Skynet Electronic Corporation, Jane Does, XYZ Corporations, ABC Partnerships, LMN Entities. (Leach, Sid) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Jim Liang by Technical Witts Inc. (KCS) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Technical Witts Inc. Jim Liang served on 3/13/2006, answer due 4/3/2006; Jane Doe Liang served on 3/13/2006, answer due 4/3/2006. (KCS) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CORRECTION BY THE CLERK re 25 Declaration filed by Technical Witts Inc. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. Document is a return of service executed on Skynet Electronic Co. Follow up by Clerks Office: The deficiency has been addressed by the Clerk. Court use only: KCS. (KCS) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of service Executed upon Skynet Electronic Co. by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc. (KCS) Modified on 5/2/2006 (KCS). MODIFIED TO CORRECT DOCUMENT TYPE TO "RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED". (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Fei-Fei Chao on behalf of defendants Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Jim Liang, Jane Doe Liang, and Skynet Electronic Corporation. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Gary M Hnath on behalf of defendants Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Jim Liang, Jane Doe Liang, and Skynet Electronic Corporation. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Party Jim Liang and Judia Liang and to dismiss Count IV, Count V and Count VI or alternatively for more definite statement by Skynet Electronic Co Ltd, Jim Liang, Jane Doe Liang, Skynet Electronic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Judia Liang# 2 Affidavit of Jim Liang# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Leach, Sid) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CORRECTION BY THE CLERK re 18 MOTION for Request for International Judicial Assistance filed by Technical Witts Inc,. Description of deficiency: Document incorrectly filed as a motion. Follow up by Clerks Office: The deficiency has been addressed by the Clerk. Court use only: DNH. (KCS, ) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for International Judicial Assistance by Technical Witts Inc. (DNH, ) Modified on 12/12/2005 (KCS). CORRECTED TO ORDER SIGNED BY THE JUDGE. (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Order: The Court ORDERS granting plaintiff's request for issuance of letter rogatory re: Skynet Electronic Co., LTC. Original letter rogatory will be sent to Plaintiff's counsel for issuance, a copy of which will be docketed. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process on Dfts Jim and Jane Doe Liang. The deadline to server these two Dfts shall be 5/1/06 . Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/1/05. (LSP) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants; Jury Demand, filed by Technical Witts Inc.(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST re: for Judicial Signature by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants via Letters Rogatory by Technical Witts Inc. (Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Request for International Judicial Assistance re 9 (as to Mrs Jil Liang) by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Gerity, Michael) filed by Technical Witts Inc, . Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 10/28/05. (MAP, ) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Request for International Judicial Assistance re 9 (as to Jim Liang). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 10/31/05. (MAP, ) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Order: The Court ORDERS granting plaintiff's request for issuance of letters rogatory. Original letters rogatory will be sent to Plaintiff's counsel for issuance. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSB) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST re: Request for Judicial Signature by Plaintiff Technical Witts Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Gerity, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing affidavits re: the service of defendants by Technical Witts Inc (RDS) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to extend time for service of process on dfts Jim and Jane Doe Liang by pla Technical Witts Inc [6-1]; the deadline to serve dfts shall be 12/6/05 (cc: all counsel) (LAD) (ADI-ICMS, ). (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to extend time for service of process on dfts Jim and Jane Doe Liang by pla Technical Witts Inc [6-1] (REW) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge David G. Campbell granting motion to extend time for 150 days for service of process by pla Technical Witts Inc [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (KCS) (ADI-ICMS, ). (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to extend time for 150 days for service of process by pla Technical Witts Inc [4-1] (KCS) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by pla (SAT) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for Jury Trial by pla (SAT) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 264 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 171 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 168 Motion to Amend, granting 170 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, granting 262 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/2/10. (cc: all counsel)(REW) MODIFIED TO UNSEAL DOCUMENT PURSUANT TO THIS ORDER 3/15/2010 (MAP).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed regarding (patent/trademark). Copy of complaint and docket sent to Washington, DC. (MRB) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?