PageMasters, Inc. v. Autodesk, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-00553
District Judge Robert C. Broomfield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 11:41 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Pagemasters, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "PageMasters Incorporated"
v.
Autodesk Autodesk, Defendant
Officially listed as "Autodesk Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph G. Adams +1 602 382 6207 +1 602 382 6070 jgadams@swlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Philip Hoxie +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 jhoxie@swlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court having granted Autodesk, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss PageMaster's Complaint, judgment is entered in favor of Defendant. The Complaint is dismissed with prejudice and this action is hereby dismissed. (LAD) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting Dft Autodesk Inc's 10 Motion to Dismiss PageMaster's Complaint and the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter JUDGMENT in favor of dft Autodesk, Inc. and to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/30/2009. (LAD) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER that Case CV-08-553-PHX-NVW is reassigned to Senior District Judge Robert C. Broomfield. The case number is changed to CV-08-553-PHX-RCB, which the parties shall show on the caption of future filings. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 08/18/08. (ESL) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
        REPLY in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Autodesk, Inc.. (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER pursuant to 18 Stipulation: ORDERED extending the time period for defendant Autodesk, Inc. to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss up to and including July 15, 2008. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/3/08. (SJF) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
            STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Autodesk, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
              RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by PageMasters, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Appendix 2, # 4 Appendix 3, # 5 Appendix 4)(McKee, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 14 Stipulation to extend time for PageMasters to respond to Autodesk's Motion to Dismiss by Friday, June 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/10/08. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                  Notice re Proposed Order by PageMasters, Inc. re 14 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (McKee, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by PageMasters, Inc.. (McKee, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Autodesk, Inc.. (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION of of Dominique-Chantale Alepin in Support of Defendant Autodesk, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss PageMasters' Complaint re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Autodesk, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B_1, # 3 Exhibit B_2, # 4 Exhibit B_3, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                          REQUEST re: Autodesk Inc's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss PageMasters' Complaint by Defendant Autodesk, Inc.. (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss Case by Autodesk, Inc.. (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                              ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Dominique Chantale Alepin on behalf of Autodesk, Inc. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Rodney G Strickland Jr on behalf of Autodesk, Inc. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER re 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. ORDERED extending the time period for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint up to and including May 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/7/08. (SJF) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G Adams on behalf of Autodesk, Inc. (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re 1 Complaint (First Request) by Autodesk, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                                          Summons Issued as to Autodesk, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Availability Form)(CMH, ). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print. (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                            Notice re Summons by PageMasters, Inc. (McKee, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000001810917, filed by PageMasters, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(McKee, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 253 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?