Lek Investment, LLC
Bankruptcy Case California Central Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 8:09-bk-15974
District Judge Erithe A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo James J Joseph, Trustee
No Logo Weneta M. Kosmala, Trustee
No Logo Lek Investment, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew E Faler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com
No Logo Lugonia Nevada LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lugonia Nevada LLC
No Logo United States Trustee (SA), U.S. Trustee
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/27/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s) 19 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 6. Service Date 02/27/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/27/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
    Notice of Hearing Notice of Motion For Relief From the Automatic Stay Under 11 U.S.C. § 362 Filed by Creditor Jerry Luu, et al. (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: Vacant Land, Redlands, San Bernardino County . Fee Amount $150, Filed by Creditor Jerry Luu, et al.). (Schwaber, Steven) CORRECTION: 10:30am is incorrect. This motion will be set on 3/30/10 at 9:30am. Attorney to file and serve amended notice reflecting the corrected hearing time. Modified on 3/1/2010 (Reid, Rick). (Entered: 02/26/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
      Order Denying Motion for Order Shortening Time and Deferring Dismissal of Case (Related Doc # 18 ) Signed on 2/25/2010. The underlying Motion may be brought on regular notice. HOWEVER, THIS CASE SHALL NOT BE DISMISSED PRIOR TO THE HEARING ON MOVANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY (Daniels, Sally) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
        Application shortening time AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING OF MOTION OF JERRY LUU, ET AL., FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY WITH EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF SOUGHT; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF Filed by Creditor Jerry Luu, et al. (Schwaber, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
          Application shortening time Motion for Order Shortening Time for Hearing of Motion of Jerry Luu, et Al., for Relief from the Automatic Stay with Extraordinary Relief Sought; Declarations in Support Thereof Filed by Creditor Jerry Luu, et al. (Schwaber, Steven) CORRECTION: Filer shows attorney for debtors, however, debtor did not file the motion for relief. Also page 2 is not properly signed by attorney, and proof of service page does is not dated or signed. Advised attorney to file amended Motion for Order Shortening Time using same event: Application Shortening Time, but adding Amended to title. Modified on 2/17/2010 (Daniels, Sally). (Entered: 02/12/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
            Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: Vacant Land, Redlands, San Bernardino County . Fee Amount $150, Filed by Creditor Jerry Luu, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of Real Property Appraisal# 2 Exhibit Part 2 of Real Property Appraisal) (Schwaber, Steven) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
              Trustee's Request to Dismiss Debtor(s) for Failure to Appear at 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7) - Dismiss Debtor Filed by Trustee Weneta M Kosmala. (Kosmala, Weneta) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                Order Denying Motion for Order Shortening Time and Deferring Dismissal of Case (Related Doc # 11 ) Signed on 2/25/2010. The underlying Motion may be brought on regular notice. HOWEVER, THIS CASE SHALL NOT BE DISMISSED PRIOR TO THE HEARING ON MOVANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY (I, deputy clerk who is making this entry, certify that service on all parties under Section II was completed, Daniels, Sally) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                  ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to appear at 341(a) meeting - Debtor Dismissed. All pending motions and adversary proceedings are moot and dismissed. (BNC) Signed on 2/24/2010. (Corona, Heidi) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                    Trustee's Request to Dismiss Debtor(s) for Failure to Appear at 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7) - Dismiss Debtor Filed by Trustee James J Joseph. (Joseph, James) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                      Application shortening time AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING OF MOTION OF JERRY LUU, ET AL., FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY WITH EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF SOUGHT; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF Filed by Creditor Jerry Luu, et al. (Schwaber, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                        Trustee's Request to Dismiss Debtor(s) for Failure to Appear at 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7) - Dismiss Debtor Filed by Trustee James J Joseph. (Joseph, James) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                          Application shortening time Motion for Order Shortening Time for Hearing of Motion of Jerry Luu, et Al., for Relief from the Automatic Stay with Extraordinary Relief Sought; Declarations in Support Thereof Filed by Creditor Jerry Luu, et al. (Schwaber, Steven) CORRECTION: Filer shows attorney for debtor, however, debtor did not file the motion. Also, page 3 is not properly signed by attorney, and proof of service page is not dated or signed. Advised attorney to file amended Moiton for Order Shortening time using same event: Application Shortening Time, but adding Amemded to title. Modified on 2/17/2010 (Daniels, Sally). (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                            Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: Vacant Land, Redlands, San Bernardino County . Fee Amount $150, Filed by Creditor Jerry Luu, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of Real Property Appraisal# 2 Exhibit Part 2 of Real Property Appraisal) (Schwaber, Steven) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                              Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Trustee James J Joseph. 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/08/10 at 03:00 PM (check with U.S. Trustee for location). (Joseph, James) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?