Chrysler P Osmena
Bankruptcy Case California Central Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 8:09-bk-17088
District Judge Erithe A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aileen P Osmena, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew E Faler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com
No Logo Amrane Cohen, Trustee
No Logo Chrysler P Osmena, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew E Faler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com
No Logo United States Trustee (SA), U.S. Trustee
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s) 33 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 11. Service Date 01/29/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
    Order Granting Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY - 6064 Shining Light Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada 89139-6425 (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 31 ) Signed on 1/27/2010 (Deramus, Glenda) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
      Notice of intent to pay claims . (Cohen, Amrane) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
        Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 6064 Shining Light Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada 89139-6425 With Proof of Service. Fee Amount $150, Filed by Creditor HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for Nomura Asset Acceptance Corporation Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2005-AR5 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1 - 4) (Delmotte, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
          Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 10/9/2009. Debtor's attorney is awarded $.00 in fees (RE: related document(s) 11 No action taken on Chapter 13 Plan filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena). (I, deputy clerk who is making this entry, certify that service on all parties under Section II was completed, Daniels, Sally) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
            Trustee's report of confirmation Filed by Trustee Amrane Cohen . (Deramus, Glenda) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
              Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Ramesh Singh on behalf of Courtesy NEF. (Singh, Ramesh) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Clare Gadd on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Gadd, Clare) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                  Proof of service of proof of claim # 7 Filed by Creditor HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Jimenez, Eddie) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                    Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Darlene C Vigil on behalf of Courtesy NEF. (Vigil, Darlene) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                      Declaration setting forth postpetition, preconfirmation deed of trust payments Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                        Declaration setting forth postpetition, preconfirmation payments on: 1. Leases of Personal Property; 2. Purchase money security liens in personal property Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                          Declaration RE Tax Returns (Preconfirmation) , Declaration RE: Payment of Domestic Support Obligations Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                            Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Jose A Garcia on behalf of Courtesy NEF. (Garcia, Jose) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                              Trustee's Notice to the debtor(s) that the case may be dismiss or converted at the confirmation hearing (batch) . (Cohen, Amrane) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                BNC Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of reassignment of case (BNC)) No. of Notices: 19. Service Date 07/29/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                  Notice to creditors Rescheduling the hearing for Confirmation of Plan to 9/16/09 at 1:30 p.m. at Courtroom 5A, 411 West Fourth St, Santa Ana CA 92701 (BNC-PDF). The automatic stay and other matters referred to in the original notice have not been altered, and continue in full force and effect. (Mccall, Audrey) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Notice of reassignment of case from Judge Robert N. Kwan to Judge Erithe A. Smith (BNC) (Mccall, Audrey) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Order Reassigning Bankrutpcy Case pursuant to General Order 99-02 to Judge with prior related case/proceeding; from Judge Robert N. Kwan to Judge Erithe A. Smith (within division transfer) Signed on 7/27/2009. (Mccall, Audrey) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                        BNC Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s) 9 ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (Ch 7/13) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Service Date 07/23/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                          BNC Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s) 8 Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Service Date 07/23/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                            BNC Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 14. Service Date 07/23/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None
                                              Proof of service Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena (RE: related document(s) 11 Chapter 13 Plan). (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena (RE: related document(s) 1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $274 Filed by Chrysler P Osmena, Aileen P Osmena.). (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Balance Sheet Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena. (Attachments: # 1 Credit Counseling) (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena) (Nguyen, Judy) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena) (Nguyen, Judy) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/18/2009 at 04:00 PM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/09/2009 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 11/16/2009. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Statement of Social Security Number(s) Form B21 Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Debtor's Certification of Employment Income Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Debtor's Certification of Employment Income Filed by Debtor Chrysler P Osmena. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Joint Debtor Aileen P Osmena, Debtor Chrysler P Osmena. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $274 Filed by Chrysler P Osmena, Aileen P Osmena (Faler, Matthew). CORRECTION: deficient for missing Certificate of Credit Counseling, Chapter 13 Plan due by 7/30/09. Incomplete Filings due by 7/30/09. Modified on 7/16/2009 (Nguyen, Judy). (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Space Space

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?