Sarah V. Amezaga
Bankruptcy Case California Central Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 2:10-bk-17015
District Judge Ellen Carroll, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kathy A Dockery, Trustee
No Logo Sarah V. Amezaga, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew E Faler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee (LA)"
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
    Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan . (Dockery, Kathy) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
      Amended Chapter 13 Plan with proof of service Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga.). (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
        Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Disposable Income Contribution of Daniel Amezaga Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Income Contribution) (Faler, Matthew) CORRECTION: As per attorney's office incorrect event used, has been notified by phone, attorney to re file. Modified on 4/1/2010 (Moulton, Sheila). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
          Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Disposable Income Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) CORRECTION: As per attorney's office incorrect event used, has been notified by phone, attorney to re file. Modified on 4/1/2010 (Moulton, Sheila). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
            Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income (Form 22B) Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) CORRECTION: As per attorney's office incorrect event used, has been notified by phone, attorney to re file. Modified on 4/1/2010 (Moulton, Sheila). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
              Declaration RE: Payment of Domestic Support Obligations Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                Declaration RE Tax Returns (Preconfirmation) Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                  Notice of Hearing Filed by Trustee Kathy A Dockery. (Dockery, Kathy) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                    Proof of service Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan). (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                      BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 12. Service Date 03/05/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                        Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/29/2010 at 04:00 PM at RM 103, 725 S Figueroa St, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/06/2010 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 06/28/2010. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                          Statement of Social Security Number(s) Form B21 Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                            Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                              Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                  Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Sarah V. Amezaga. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                    Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $274 Filed by Sarah V. Amezaga (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Space Space

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?