Nancy Osipo-Peera
Bankruptcy Case California Central Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 1:10-bk-15226
District Judge Kathleen Thompson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas, Trustee
No Logo Nancy Osipo-Peera, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aris Artounians +1 818 291 6300 +1 818 291 6301 artounians91203@yahoo.com
No Logo United States Trustee (SV), U.S. Trustee
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 12. Service Date 05/06/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
    Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at RM 105, 21051 Warner Center Lane, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/03/2010 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Proof of Claim due by 09/14/2010. (Artounians, Aris) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
      Declaration RE Tax Returns (Preconfirmation) , Declaration RE: Payment of Domestic Support Obligations , Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Nancy Osipo-Peera. (Artounians, Aris) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
        Debtor's notice of section 341(a) meeting and hearing on confirmation of chapter 13 plan with copy of chapter 13 plan Filed by Debtor Nancy Osipo-Peera. (Artounians, Aris) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
          Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Nancy Osipo-Peera. (Artounians, Aris) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
            Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Nancy Osipo-Peera. (Artounians, Aris) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
              Statement of Social Security Number(s) Form B21 Filed by Debtor Nancy Osipo-Peera. (Artounians, Aris) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Chapter 13 Petition Filed by Debtor Nancy Osipo-Peera. (Artounians, Aris) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                  Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $274 Filed by Nancy Osipo-Peera (Artounians, Aris) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 692 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?