Southern CA AZ CO, et al v. Robert E Sonnenblick, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00387
District Judge William J. Rea, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

CB Richard Ellis Group CB Richard Ellis Group, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "CB Richard Ellis Investors L L C"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allan S Ono +1 310 277 7200 allan.ono@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J Kramer +1 310 277 7200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L Watts +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219 lwatts@seyfarth.com
No Logo LA Metromall LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allan S Ono +1 310 277 7200 allan.ono@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L Watts +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219 lwatts@seyfarth.com
No Logo Southern California, Arizona, Colorado & Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal & Glass Workers Pension Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of State Hospitals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allan S Ono +1 310 277 7200 allan.ono@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L Watts +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219 lwatts@seyfarth.com
v.
No Logo Robert E Sonnenblick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blaine E Greenberg Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blaine E Greenberg +1 818 986 8433

Toggle Switch Represented by Lang Hanigan & Carvalho, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy R Hanigan +1 818 883 5644 +1 818 704 9372 trhanigan@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Carvalho, Jr. +1 818 883 5644 +1 818 704 9372 acarvalho@lhcllp.com
No Logo Sonnenblick-Leasing Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blaine E Greenberg Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blaine E Greenberg +1 818 986 8433

Toggle Switch Represented by Lang Hanigan & Carvalho, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy R Hanigan +1 818 883 5644 +1 818 704 9372 trhanigan@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Carvalho, Jr. +1 818 883 5644 +1 818 704 9372 acarvalho@lhcllp.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER dismissing action pursuant to full settlement with prejudice by Judge William J. Rea terminating case (MD JS-6) (lc) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
    RECORD on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals vols: 1 transcripts: 1 (weap) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER that the Crt filed & spread the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals mandate; discovery cutoff 3/31/03; pretrial conference 4/14/03 10:00; trial 5/13/03 by Judge William J. Rea (lc) (Entered: 11/22/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: None
        MINUTES: Hearing held on MANDATE from Circuit Court of Appeals reversing & remanding decision of this crt be filed and spread on the minutes of this court; Discovery cutoff 3/31/03; PTC 4/14/03 10:00; trial 5/13/02 9:30; plf shall prepare proposed order (lc) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: None
          CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: reversing and remanding the Decision of the District Court [Appeal [21-1] MDJS-5 (lc) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
            MINUTES: NOTICE TO SCHEDULE the filing & Spreading of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Mandate (Reversed & Remanded); Court hereby set the matter for the filing & spreading of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals mandate for Monday 11/18/02 @ 11/18/02 by Judge William J. Rea CR: Not Reported (cc Appeals Section) (ir) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
              CLERK'S record on appeal transmitted to Circuit [21-1] vols: 1, transcripts: 1. 01-55918 (dlu) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE of Record Transmitted to USCA (01-55918) (cc: all parties) (weap) (Entered: 11/02/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: None
                  TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and ordering form for dates: 4/23/01 re transcript [20-1] CR: Leni LeBlanc. (ghap) (Entered: 10/19/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                    STIPULATION and ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin extending time to and including 10/29;01 for defendant to file a moiton for summary judgment . No further extensions of time will be granted absent compelling circumstances (shb) (Entered: 10/01/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION and ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carolyn Turchin granting plaintiffs an extension of time to and including 8/27/01 to file motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff should not anticipate a further extension of time absent compelling circumstances. Defendant's motion is due 30 daya after plaintiff's motion (shb) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None
                        NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number appeal [21-1] 01-55918. (ghap) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Timothy R Hanigan by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick in fur suppt of motion for attorney fees [23-1] (rrey) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: None
                            OPPOSITION by plaintiff CB Richard Ellis to dfts motion for attorney fees [23-1] (pj) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick for attorney fees ; memo of PA; decl of Timothy R Hanigan; motion hearing set for 10:00 6/11/01 (lc) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None
                                REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re appeal [21-1] (pjap) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff CB Richard Ellis Investors, LLC, as Investment Manager of Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, & Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal & Glass Workers Pension Trust to 9th C/A from Dist. Court Ord fld 4/30/01 & ent 5/2/01 [19-2] (cc: Brian J. Kramer; Blaine Greenberg; Timothy R. Hanigan, Lang, Hanigan & Carvalho, LLP; Hon. Ronald E. Cappai, Los Angeles Superior Court) Fee: Billed. (pjap) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None
                                    RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 4/23/01 (Re: ) CR: Leni LeBlanc (pjap) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge William J. Rea granting dft motion to dismiss state law unfair business practice clm w/o prej because it lacks independent basis of subject matter jurisdiction terminating case (MD JS-6) (ENT 5/2/01) send/ntcs (lc) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTES: Hrg on dfts motion to dismiss 1st A/C for failure to state a clm upon which relief can be GR (FRCP 12(b)(6) [14-1] is hld & matter stands submitted by Judge William J. Rea CR: Lenne LeBlanc (lc) (Entered: 04/26/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: None
                                          REPLY MEMO IN FUR SUPPT by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick motion to dismiss 1st A/C for failure to state a clm upon which relief can be GR (FRCP 12(b)(6) [14-1] (pj) (Entered: 04/17/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: None
                                            OPPOSITION by plaintiff to motion to dismiss 1st A/C [14-1] (lc) (Entered: 04/09/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: None
                                              REQUEST by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick for judicial notice in suppt of motion to dismiss 1st A/C for failure to state a clm upon which relief can be GR (FRCP 12(b)(6) [14-1] (jp) (Entered: 03/22/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick to dismiss 1st A/C for failure to state a clm upon which relief can be GR (FRCP 12(b)(6) ; motion hearing set for 10:00 4/23/01 (jp) (Entered: 03/22/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                  RETURN OF SUMMONS and proof of service executed upon defendant Robert E Sonnenblick on attys Timothy R Hanigan & Blaine Greenberg Esq by mail (lc) (Entered: 03/16/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff CB Richard Ellis etc terminating plaintiff LA Metromall LLC, plaintiff Southern CA AZ CO; jury demand. Summons not issd (lc) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of ruling granting defts mot to dism w/10 days lv to file amd cmplt by plaintiff (lc) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MINUTES: Hrg hld; ORD granting deft motion to dismiss for failure to st clm upon which relief can be granted [5-1]; plf granted 10 days lv to amd cmp; plf shall prep ord by Judge William J. Rea CR: Lisa Michaels (lc) Modified on 04/12/2001 (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY Memo by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick in Fur suppt of motion to dismiss fr fail to st clm upon wh relief can be granted [5-1] (ir) (Entered: 02/27/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                            OPPOSITION by plaintiff to motion to dismiss for failure to st clm upon which relief can be granted [5-1] (lc) Modified on 04/12/2001 (Entered: 02/21/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Robert E Sonnenblick on 1/17/01 by cert mail by delivering S/C to Blaine Greenberg, defendant attorney; Orig return receipt requested attch; Original Summons rtn (jp) (Entered: 02/16/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                REQUEST by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick for judicial notice re motion to dismiss for failure to st clm upon which relief can be granted [5-1] (lc) Modified on 04/12/2001 (Entered: 02/08/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick to dismiss for fail to st clm upon wh relief can be granted ; memo of PA; motion hearing set for 9:00 3/5/01 (lc) Modified on 04/12/2001 (Entered: 02/08/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Robert E Sonnenblick (lc) (Entered: 02/08/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 (Related Case) filed. [ Related Case no.: CV 99-8045 WJR (CTx)] Case transferred from Judge Ronald S. Lew to Judge William J. Rea for all further proceedings. , Case referred from Discovery Brian Q. Robbins to Discovery Carolyn Turchin . The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge [ CV 01-387 WJR (CTx)] (cc: all counsel) (rn) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Southern CA AZ CO, plaintiff CB Richard Ellis, plaintiff LA Metromall LLC (pc) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                          COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) Issued referred to Discovery Brian Q. Robbins; Jury Demand (pc) (Entered: 01/17/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?