Siemens v. Seagate Technology
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:06-cv-00788
District Judge James V. Selna, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 1:32 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Siemens AG Siemens AG, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Siemens"
Officer/Director, Bentley Systems, Inc.
Siemens Industry, Inc. Officer/Director, Siemens Industry, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A O'Malley +1 312 321 0022

Toggle Switch Represented by Fernald Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon C Fernald +1 323 410 0320 +1 323 410 0330 brandon@fernaldlawgroup.com

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Partain Lett +1 214 855 8000 +1 214 855 8200 katherine.lett@nortonrosefulbright.com
v.
No Logo Seagate Technology, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Seagate Technology"
Officer/Director, Gadzoox Networks, Inc.

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha K Gooding +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 mgooding@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Laurenson +1 949 759 5269 +1 949 721 6910 laurensonr@howrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 rooklidgew@howrey.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (798) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Seagate Technology Against Siemens filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER AMENDING PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge James V. Selna pursuant to Stipulation to Amend 800 . See document for details. (nbo) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
      STIPULATION to AMEND Stipulation and Order 26 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 799 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
        SEALED DOCUMENT RE: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 1 to Exclude 354 Advice of Counsel Defense to Willful Infringment Claim. (lwag) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 797 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
          SEALED DOCUMENT - DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Randy Lee on 6/12/08. (Attachments: # 1 PAGES 51 - 109)(NUNC PRO TUNC 12/17/08) (rla) Modified on 8/21/2009 (rla). (Entered: 08/21/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 796 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
            SEALED DOCUMENT - DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Herbert Schewe, PHD on 5/24/07. (NUNC PRO TUNC 12/17/08) (Attachments: # 1 Pages 100-149, # 2 Pages 150-199, # 3 pages 200-268)(rla) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4-27-09, 4-28-08, 8-20-07, 9-22-08, 12-18-08, 12-19-08 (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-19-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-18-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9-22-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8-20-07. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4-28-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4-27-09. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/23/08 8:40a.m. (bem) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/23/08 8:40a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Gary D. George, phone number (760) 699-5039. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2009. (bem) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11-18-08, 11-19-08, 11-20-08, 11-21-08, 12-05-08, 12-09-08, 12-11-08 and 12-12-08 (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-20-08 11:42 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through d.parker@ix.netcom.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-12-2008 11:07 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through d.parker@ix.netcom.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-11-08 11:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through d.parker@ix.netcom.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-09-08 11:16 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through d.parker@ix.netcom.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-05-2008 11:45 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through d.parker@ix.netcom.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-21-08 7:47 a.m.. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through d.parker@ix.netcom.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-19-09 12:20 p.m.: Deborah Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through d.parker@ix.netcom.com PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-18-08 11:25 a.m.. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through d.parker@ix.netcom.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (Parker, Deborah) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings Dec. 2, 3, 4, 2008 (Dellaneve, Maria) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Dec. 4, 2008 @ 11:20. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARIA BEESLEY, phone number 714-564-9259. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2009. (Dellaneve, Maria) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Dec. 3, 2008 @ 11:11. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARIA BEESLEY, phone number 714-564-9259. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2009. (Dellaneve, Maria) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Dec. 2, 2008 @ 11:15. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARIA BEESLEY, phone number 714-564-9259. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2009. (Dellaneve, Maria) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                          AMENDED JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff/Defendant Siemens, Seagate Technology. (db) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER Granting Siemens AG's Application 484 for Order Sealing Confidential Portions of Siemens AG's Oppositions to Seagate Technology's Motions in Limine by Judge James V. Selna. See order for further details. (lwag) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11-19-08 Vol. I, 11-20-08 Vol. I, 11-21-08 Vol. II, 12-2-08 Vol. I, 12-3-08 Vol. I, 12-4-08 Vol. I, 12-5-08 Vol. I, 12-9-08 Vol. I, 12-10-08 Vol. I, 12-11-08 Vol. I, 12-12-08 Vol. I, 12-17-08 (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-17-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-12-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-11-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number )714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-10-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-9-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-5-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-4-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-3-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12-2-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-21-08 Vol. II. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-20-09 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-19-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 6/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10-27-08, 11-12-08, 11-13-08, 11-14-08, 11-18-08 Vol. I (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/14/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 6/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-18-08 Vol. I. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/14/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 6/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10-27-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/14/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 6/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-13-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/14/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 6/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-14-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number (714) 543-0870. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/14/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 6/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11-12-08. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number Court Reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2009. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 06/14/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM Re: 749 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Regarding Cost Award by Judge James V. Selna. It Is Ordered that the court awards costs to Seagate Technology in the amount of $161,500 pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and will issue an Amended Final Judgment reflecting the costs award. (see order for more information) re Stipulation for Costs 748 . (twdb) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appeal--Federal Circuit Appeal Information Sheet (A-31) filed by plaintiff Siemens. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by plaintiff Siemens. Filing fee $455, receipt number 09730000000005366373. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Costs against Siemens filed by plaintiff Siemens. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge James Selna re Final Order Denying Renewed Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law or New Trial (Fld 2-18-09). Siemens has filed renewed motions for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to FRCP 50(b), or alternatively, for a new trial pursuant to FRCP Rule 59(a), on Seagates anticipation and obviousness defenses. The Court denies Siemens' motions in their entirety. See order for details. (lwag) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Motion Hearing (Non-Evidentiary) re Renewed Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law or New Trial (Fld 2-18-09) held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court's tentative ruling is issued. Counsel make their arguments. The Court takes plaintiff's motions under submission.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Siemens, re APPLICATION for Leave of Warren Huang to Appear for Pro Hac Vice 674 served on 12/9/2008. (lwag) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) 735 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Obviousness Defense 733 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Obviousness Defense 733 SEAGATE'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO SIEMENS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR NEW TRIAL ON SEAGATE'S OBVIOUSNESS DEFENSE filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) 735 SEAGATE'S OPPOSITION TO SIEMENS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND A NEW TRIAL ON SEAGATE'S DEFENSE OF ANTICIPATION filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Defendant Seagate Technology SEAGATE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS BILL OF COSTS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration AARON D. VAN OORT, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS TO SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY's BILL OF COSTS filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER RE STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEUDLE FOR POST TRIAL MOTIONS by Judge James V. Selna. The briefing schedule for the two post trial motions contemplated by Siemens shall be as follows: Seagate's Opposition briefing will be due 03/18/09; Siemens' Reply briefing will be due 04/08/09; and The post trial motions will be heard on or after 04/20/09. (See Order for further details) (db) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) 735 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) 735 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Anticipation Defense under 35 U.S.C. sec 102(g) filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 4/20/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Obviousness Defense 733 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, MOTION for New Trial re Seagate Technology's Obviousness Defense filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 4/20/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law/New Trial, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies filed by plaintiff Siemens. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S APPLICATION TO THE CLERK TO TAX COSTS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 (part I of III), # 6 Exhibit 5 (part II of III), # 7 Exhibit 5 (part III of III), # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lwag) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT by Judge James V. Selna. It is Ordered and Adjudged that the Plaintiff Siemens AG take nothing, that the action be dismissed on the merits, that judgment be entered for Defendant Seagate Technology on all claims, and that Defendant Seagate Technology recover its costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (db) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Jury Notes # 3 filed. (lwag) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Jury Notes # 2 filed. (lwag) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Jury Notes # 1 filed. (lwag) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed SEAGATE'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT re Jury Verdict 705 (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            COURT'S FINDING OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW RE INEQUITABLE CONDUCT DEFENSE by Judge James V. Selna: (See document for details.) Based on the foregoing, the evidence before the Court, and the applicable law, Seagate failed to show that the '838 Patent is unenforceable due to inequitable conduct, and thus the defense fails. (rla) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 723 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Gary Martin on 7/22/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 722 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Kevin P. Roche on 7/18/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 721 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Andrew Peter Tennent on 7/18/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 720 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing David Rockers on 7/15/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 719 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Joe Heinen on 7/11/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 718 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing William F. White, Jr. on 6/19/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 717 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Don Kennedy on 6/10/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 716 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Mick McCarthy on 5/13/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 715 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing David E. Heim on 5/5/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 714 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Stuart S. Parkin on 5/1/08, Volume: 1. (Attachments: # 1 1)(ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 713 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Peter Bauerschmidt on 3/11/08, Volume: 2. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 712 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Guenther Rupp on 3/10/08, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 711 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Serafina R. Zinckgraf on 11/28/07, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 710 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Peter Bauerschmidt on 10/25/07, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 709 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Richard Ludwig Mayer on 9/27/07, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 708 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing G. Patrick Bonnie on 8/30/07, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 707 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing David A. Vandenhoek on 9/21/07, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 706 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT Deposing Gernot Schroer on 5/29/07, Volume: 1. (ade) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 705 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL VERDICT (Public Redacted Version) in favor of plaintiff Siemens and defendant Seagate Technology. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 18th Day held and completed before Judge James V. Selna Verdict reached. The Court and counsel confer regarding the absence of Juror #2 who is ill. The Court excuses juror #2 and directs the remaining jurors to continue deliberations. Jury FINDS: in favor of plaintiff(s) and defendant(s). Jury polled.Court Reporter: Gary George. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 17th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Jury resumes deliberations. The Court and counsel confer via telephone regarding Jury Note #2. Jury Trial set for 12/23/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 16th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Jury resumes deliberations. The Court and counsel confer via telephone regarding Jury Note #1. Jury Trial set for 12/19/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 15th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Closing arguments. Court instructs jury. Bailiff(s) sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. The Court and counsel confer re jury instructions. Counsel state on the record any objections to the jury instructions. The Court and counsel confer re exhibits. Jury Trial set for 12/18/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 14th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. The Court and counsel confer re evidentiary issues and exhibits. The Court and counsel confer re jury instructions off the record. Counsel argue their for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The Court grants the Motion in Part. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens / Deborah Parker. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 13th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. The Court and counsel confer re evidentiary issues and exhibits. The Court and counsel confer re jury instructions off the record. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens / Deborah Parker. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 12th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. The Court and counsel confer re evidentiary issues and exhibits. The Court and counsel confer re jury instructions off the record. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens / Deborah Parker. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 11th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 12/10/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court's Exhibit 3 (stipulation of the parties) read to the Jury. The Court and counsel confer re jury instructions, evidentiary issues and exhibits. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens / Deborah Parker. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 10th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. The Court and counsel confer regarding evidentiary issues. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens / Deborah Parker. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 9th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. The Court and counsel confer regarding evidentiary issues. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens / Maria Delleneve. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 8th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 12/4/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. The Court and counsel confer regarding evidentiary issues. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens / Maria Delleneve. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 7th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. The Court and counsel confer regarding evidentiary issues. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens / Maria Delleneve. (rla) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SIEMENS AG'S WITNESS LIST PURSUANT TO L.R. 16-5 at trial filed by Plaintiff Siemens.(lwag) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S TRIAL Witness List at trial filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.(lwag) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 690 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge James V. Selna. (lwag) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S POCKET BRIEF ON CONTINUING JURY DELIBERATIONS (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COURTS EXHIBIT 4. (lwag) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURTS EXHIBIT 3.(lwag, ) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff Siemens.. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE REMOVAL OF AUDIOVISUAL EQUIPMENT AND TRIAL SUPPLIES AND MATERIALS by Judge James V. Selna. See order for details. (smi) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pocket BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Siemens. re 287(a) Notice of Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. SEAGATE'S POCKET BRIEF ON REMAINING ISSUES IN THE FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pocket BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Siemens. re Jury Instruction No. 25 (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COURTS EXHIBIT 1 (lwag, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum re Prior Invention, # 2 Memorandum re Obviousness, # 3 Memorandum re Willful Infringement, # 4 Memorandum re Damages)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. SEAGATE'S POCKET BRIEF REGARDING IBM'S RIGHT TO SELL THE ACCUSED SEAGATE HDDs UNDER THE IBM-SIEMENS CROSS LICENSE (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. SEAGATE'S POCKET BRIEF ON THE FINAL JURY INSTRUCTION ADDRESSING WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. SEAGATE'S POCKET BRIEF ON THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OF "INCLUDING" A LAYER SYSTEM (Attachments: # 1 Declaration AARON VAN OORT, # 2 Exhibit A)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Leave of Warren Huang to Appear for Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Fee Paid. Lodged lodged order. (db) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2008: # 1 Proposed Order) (nbo). (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION FOR A CURATIVE INSTRUCTION EXPLAINING THAT THE IBM INVENTION CAN BE PRIOR ART WITHOUT CONTAINING EVERY ELEMENT OF THE '838 PATENT 667 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 672 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald In Support of Pocket Brief Objections to The Demonstratives to be used with Witness Nils Pirschel. (ade) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 671 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: POCKET BRIEF re: Objections to the demonstratives to be used with Witness Nils Pirschel (ade) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 670 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Aaron Van Oort (ade) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 669 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re: POCKET BRIEF on Andrew Tennent Deposition Objections. (ade) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 668 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT RE: POCKET BRIEF RE: The Deposition Desgiantions and Objections for IBM Witness Andrew Tennent. (ade) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION FOR A CURATIVE INSTRUCTION EXPLAINING THAT THE IBM INVENTION CAN BE PRIOR ART WITHOUT CONTAINING EVERY ELEMENT OF THE '838 PATENT Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF RE THE DEPOSITON DESIGNATIONS AND OBJECTIONS OF DR. GUENTHER RUPP filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (db) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF IN SUPPPORT OF ITS OBJECTIONS TO CERTAIN DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF CHRIS KOLEFAS AND RESPONSE TO SEAGATE'S OBJECTIONS filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (db) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. SEAGATE'S POCKET BRIEF ON CHRIS KOLEFAS DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS AND EXHIBITS 411, 412, AND 413 (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. SEAGATE'S POCKET BRIEF ON GUENTHER RUPP DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to Seagate's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Measuring Contacts 357 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (db) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Aaron Van Oort in Support of Seagate's Motion to Exclude Siemens' Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (db) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE SIEMENS' DAMAGES EXPERT WALTER BRATIC filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (db) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Seagate Technology re. documents served on via email on 12/1/08. (smi) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to File Under Seal Documents Related to Dfendant Seagate Technology's Pocket Brief on Dr. Stuart Parkin Deposition Objections filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (smi) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 657 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT: COMPLETED JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES (ade) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 656 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT RE: Pocket BRIEF on Dr. Stuart Parkin's Deposition Objections. (ade) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **DOCUMENT SEALED** ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING THE FILING OF ITS POCKET BRIEF ON DR. STUART PARKIN DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS UNDER SEAL by Judge James V. Selna (ade) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the basis of: SEAGATE'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW RE MEASURING CONTACTS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration AARON VAN OORT, # 2 Exhibit A)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Aaron Van Oort ISO Seagate's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Re Measuring Contacts. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of SEAGATE'S POCKET BRIEF ON DR. STUART PARKIN DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pocket BRIEF filed by plaintiff Siemens. re Siemens' Objections to Seagate's Designations of the Deposition Testimony of Dr. Stuart Parkin (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 6 Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits admitted. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Deborah Parker\Sharon Seffens. (db) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURTS EXHIBIT 2 (rla) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 648 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Timothy E. Grimsrud in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Inventive Entities (Attachments: # 1 1, # 2 2)(ade) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 647 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: POCKET BRIEF RE THE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND OBJECTIONS. (ade) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 646 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT RE: POCKET BRIEF RE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND OBJECTIONS. (ade) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 645 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT RE: POCKET BRIEF ON DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS. (ade) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 644 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT RE: POCKET BRIEF on deposition objections. (ade) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 643 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR A CURATIVE INSTRUCTION (rla) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 642 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of MARTHA K GOODING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to PRECLUDE DR. GLASHOW FROM OFFERING TWO OPINIONS (rla) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 641 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - MOTION to PRECLUDE DR. GLASHOW FROM OFFERING TWO OPINIONS (rla) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 640 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - POCKET BRIEF re THE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS and OBJECTIONS for MSSRS. BONNIE, HEINEN, KENNEDY, LEE, LEWIS, MARTIN, MCCARTHY, ROCKERS, SCHELTER, SCHEWE, DAVID VANDENHOEK, and WHITE (rla) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 639 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - re APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO POCKET BRIEF RE THE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND OBJECTIONS FOR MSSRS. BONNIE, HEINEN, KENNEDY, LEE LEWIS, MARTIN, MCCARTHY, ROCKERS, SCHELTER, SCHEWE, VANDENHOEK, AND WHITE(rla) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 5th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 11/21/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens/Deborah Parker. (rla) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 11/20/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens/ Deborah Parker. (rla) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 11/19/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens/Deborah Parker. (rla) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE of MANUALLY FILED DOCUMENTS; filed by defendant Seagate Technology, re APPLICATION to Seal 632 ; [Proposed] Order Granting Seagate's Application for Order; Seagate's Opposition; Proof of Service; served on 11/18/08. (rla) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING Seagate's APPLICATION for Order Allowing the Filing of Documents Under Seal Relating to its Motion to Preclude Dr. Glashow from Offering Two Opinions 619 . (nbo) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING Seagate's Application for Order Allowing the Filing of Documents Under Seal Relating to its Pocket Brief re the Deposition Designations and Objections for Messrs. Bonnie, Heinen, Kennedy, Lee, Lewis, Martin, McCarthy, Rockers, Schelter, Schewe, Vandenhoek, and White. (nbo) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to File Under Seal Documents Related to Defendant Seagate's Opposition to Siemens' Motion for a Curative Instruction filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (nbo) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING Seagate's Application for Order Allowing the Filing of its Opposition to Siemens' Motion for a Curative Instruction. (nbo) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 630 Filed: 11/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - SEAGATE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO ADMIT EXHIBITS 756 AND 757 INTO EVIDENCE AND TO BAR THE PARTIES FROM ARGUING ABOUT THE CONTENTS OF REDACTED DOCUMENTS. (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 629 Filed: 11/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY E GRIMSRUD IN SUPPORT OF SEAGATE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO ADMIT EXHIBITS 756 AND 757 INTO EVIDENCE AND TO BAR THE PARTIES FROM ARGUING ABOUT THE CONTENTS OF REDACTED DOCUMENTS. (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 628 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY E. GRIMSRUD IN SUPPORT OF SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING CONCERNING APPLICABILITY OF RULE 408 TO PRE-SUIT COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN THE PARTIES (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 627 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING CONCERNING APPLICABILITY OF RULE 408 TO PRE-SUIT COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN THE PARTIES. (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 626 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION OF BRANDON C. FERNALD RE SIEMENS AG'S OPPOSITION TO SEAGATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT EXHIBITS 756 AND 757 AND SIEMENS AG'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE INVENTIVE ENTITIES OTHER THAN PARKIN AND HEIM FOR SEAGATE'S 102(g) DEFENSE. (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 625 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - SIEMENS AG'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE INVENTIVE ENTITIES OTHER THAN PARKIN AND HEIM FOR SEAGATE'S 102(g) DEFENSE (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 624 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - SIEMENS AG'S OPPOSITION TO SEAGATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT EXHIBITS 756 AND 757 INTO EVIDENCE AND TO BAR THE PARTIES FROM ARGUING ABOUT THE CONTENTS OF REDACTED DOCUMENTS (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 623 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION OF BRANDON C. FERNALD IN SUPPORT OF SIEMENS AG'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING CONCERNING APPLICABILITY OF FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 408 TO PRE-SUIT COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN THE PARTIES. (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 622 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - SIEMENS AG SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING CONCERNING APPLICABILITY OF FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 408 TO PRE-SUIT COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN THE PARTIES. (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 621 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - SEAGATE'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO SIEMENS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE INVENTIVE ENTITIES OTHER THAN PARKIN AND HEIM FOR SEAGATE'S 102(g) DEFENSE (smi) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Seagate Technology, served on 11/17/08. (ade) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Seal Documents Related to Defendant Seagate's Motion to Preclude Dr. Glashow from Offering Two Opinions. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE of Manually Filed Documents. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology, served on 11/17/08. (ade) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Seal Documents Related to Defendant Seagate's Pocket Brief re the deposition Designations and Objections for Messrs. Bonnie, Heinen, Kennedy, Lee, Lewis, Martin, McCarthy, Rockers, Schleter, Schewe, Vandenhoek and White. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal; Seagate's Opposition to Siemens' Motion for a Curative Instruction; Proof of Service. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge James V. Selna. Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Jury Trial set for 11/18/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (ade) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge James V. Selna Jury empanelled and sworn. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2008 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (ade) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. GLASHOW FROM OFFERING TWO OPINIONS [REDACTED] MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. GLASHOW FROM OFFERING TWO OPINIONS [REDACTED] 610 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Brandon C Fernald in opposition to MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION RE THREE EVIDENTIARY ISSUES RAISED BY SIEMENS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS 609 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION RE THREE EVIDENTIARY ISSUES RAISED BY SIEMENS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS 609 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. GLASHOW FROM OFFERING TWO OPINIONS [REDACTED] filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2008 at 07:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION RE THREE EVIDENTIARY ISSUES RAISED BY SIEMENS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2008 at 07:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Defendant. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Defendant. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING APPLICATION to Seal Documents Relating to its Memorandum in Opposition to Siemen's Motion to Exclude Inventive Entities other than Parkins and Heim for Seagate's Defense. 605 (ade) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Seal documents related to Seagate's Memorandum in Opposition to Siemen's Motion to Exclude Inventive Entitites other than Parkin and Heim for Seagate's Defense. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court's tentative ruling is issued. Counsel make their arguements. The Court rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as attached. (See document for Details) 572 , 563 , 564 Court Reporter: sharon seffens. (kt) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff Siemens.. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 11/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE OF MANUALLY FILED DOCUMENTS filed by Defendant served on 11/07/08. (db) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 11/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING APPLICATION to Seal 600 Documents Relating to Seagate's Motion to Admit Exhibits 756 and 757 into Evidence. (ade) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 11/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Seal Documents Related to Seagate's Motion to Admit Exhibits 756 and 757 into Evidence. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE DELIVERY OF EXHIBIT BINDERS, TRANSCRIPTS ANDOTHER TRIAL MATERIALS/SUPPLIES TO COURT by Judge James V. Selna. (ade) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S BRIEF ON ORDER OF CLOSING ARGUMENT (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Seagate Technology, 1) Application to File Under Seal; 2) Proposed Order Granting Application; 3) Defendant Seagate's Response to Siemen's Supplemental Briefing; 4) Declaration of Timothy E. Grimsurd; 5) Proof of Service served on 11/4/08. (ade) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Siemens, 1) Siemen's Opposition to Seagate's Motion to Admit Exhibits 756 and 757; 2) Memorandum of Points and Authorities; 3) Declaration of Brandon Fernald; 4) Application to Seal; 5) Proof of Service served on 11/4/08. (ade) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed SIEMENS AG'S AND SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS re Order, 554 (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Seagate Technology, of MANUALLY FILED DOCUMENTS served on 11/10/08. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for to Exclude Inventive Entities Other than Parkin and Heim for Seagate's 102(g) Defense MOTION for Order for to Exclude Inventive Entities Other than Parkin and Heim for Seagate's 102(g) Defense 572 SEAGATE'S MEMORANDUM OFPOINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO SIEMENS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE INVENTIVE ENTITIES OTHER THAN PARKIN AND HEIM FOR SEAGATE'S 102(g) DEFENSE filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration TIMOTHY E. GRIMSRUD, # 2 Exhibit 1-6)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal; Seagate's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Siemens' Motion to Exclude Inventive Entities Other Than Parkin and Heim for Seagate's 102(g) Defense; Exhibits 3-6 to the Declaration for Timothy Grimsrud; Proof of Service. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING APPLICATION to Seal Documents Relating to Seagate's Response to Siemen's Supplemental Briefing 590 (ade) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Seal Documents Related to Defendant Seagate's Response to Siemen's Supplemental Briefing. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING APPLICATION to Seal 588 Confidential Documents. (ade) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Seal Confidential Filings. Filed by plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY IN SUPORT MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT EXHIBITS 756 AND 757 INTO EVIDENCE AND TO BAR THE PARTIES FROM ARGUING ABOUT THE CONTENTS OF REDACTED DOCUMENTS 563 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration TIMOTHY E. GRIMSRUD, # 2 Exhibit 1-5)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Defendant. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRIAL BRIEF filed by plaintiff Siemens.. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Stipulation re: Exhibits Pretrial Trial 582 (ade) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits STIPULATION RE TRIAL EQUIPMENT AND TECHNOLOGY filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, The Court having considered the parties' Stipulation Correcting Briefing Schedule 575 , and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS ORDERED that Siemens will file and serve its Section 282 Motion on November 4, 2008, and Seagate will file and serve its opposition on November 10, 2008. (rla) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Application for Siemens AG for Order Directing that the Court's Order dated 10/27/08 on Public Docket be replaced with a redacted version by Judge James V. Selna (ade) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Siemens,1) Siemen's Supplemental Briefing; 2) Declaration of Brandon C. Fernald; 3) Proof of Service served on 10/30/08. (ade) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING APPLICATION to Seal Portions of Siemen's Supplemental Briefing re Applicability of Federal Rule of Evidence 408 576 (ade) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Seal Confidential Portions of Siemen's Supplemental Briefing re Applicability of Federal Rule of Evidence 408 filed by plaintiff Siemens. Lodged order. (ade) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Relief from STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CORRECTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Siemens, served on Siemens AG's Opposition to Seagate's Motion to Admit Exhibits 756 and 757 Into Evidence and to Bar the Parties from Arguing About the Contents of Redacted Documents; Siemens AG's Memorandum of Points & Authorities to Exclude Inventive Entities Other Than Parkin and Heim For Seagate's 102(g) Defense; Declaration of Brandon C. Fernald re: 1. Siemens Opposition to Admit Exhibits 756 and 757 and 2. Siemens' Motion to Exclude Inventive Entities Other Than Parkin and Heim for Seagate's 102(g) Defense; Siemens AG's Application to Seal; Proposed Order; Proof of Service. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of Siemens AG's Memorandum of Points & Authorities re Motion to Exclude Inventive Entities Other Than Parkin and Heim for Seagate's 102(g) Defense; Siemens AG's Opposition to Seagate's Motion to Admit Exhibits 756 and 757 into Evidence; Declaration of Brandon C Fernald, Application to Seal and Proposed Order. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Exclude Inventive Entities Other than Parkin and Heim for Seagate's 102(g) Defense filed by plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION TO INSTRUCT THE JURY ON THE STIPULATED LEVEL OF ORDINARY SKILL IN THE ART 564 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Stipulation 567 : (See document for further details.) IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Defendant Seagate Technology DEFENDANT SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING CONCERNING APPLICABILITY OF RULE 408 TO PRE-SUIT COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN THE PARTIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration TIMOTHY E. GRIMSRUD, # 2 Exhibit 1-3)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal; Seagate's Response to Siemens' Supplemental Briefing Re Applicability of Rule 408 to Pre-Suit Communications Between the Parties; Declaration of Timothy E. Grimsrud ISO Seagate's Response to Siemens' Supplemental Briefing Re Applicability of Rule 408 to Pre-Suit Communications Between the Parties; Proof Of Service. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Relief from STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for THAT THE COURT'S ORDER DATED OCTOBER 27, 2008 BE REMOVED FROM THE PUBLIC DOCKET AND REPLACED WITH A REDACTED VERSION; DECLARATION OF BRANDON C. FERNALD filed by Plaintiff Siemens.(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of Supplemental Briefing Concerning Applicability of Federal Rules of Evidence 408 to Pre-Suit Communications Between the Parties; Declaration of Brandon C. Fernald; Application to Seal and Proposed Order; Proof of Service. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION TO INSTRUCT THE JURY ON THE STIPULATED LEVEL OF ORDINARY SKILL IN THE ART filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2008 at 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief SEAGATE'S MOTION TO ADMIT EXHIBITS 756 AND 757 INTO EVIDENCE AND TO BAR THE PARTIES FROM ARGUING ABOUT THE CONTENTS OF REDACTED DOCUMENTS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2008 at 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court grants the parties an extension of time to submit the pretrial conference order till 9:00 am on 10/23/08. The court directs counsel to file their proposed juror questionnaire by 10/22/08 and jury voir dire questions shall be submitted not later than 11/5/08. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (ade) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: On Proposed Neutral Statement of the Case The Court has reviewed the parties' Proposed Neutral Statements of the Case. The Court finds that Seagate's proposal is balanced and keeps to the level of detail appropriate for such a statement. The Court will use Seagate's proposal, and the statement will be read to the jurors on November 5, 2008 prior to filling out the juror the questionnaires. (rla) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting APPLICATION for attorney Dustin Mauck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID) 546 by Dustin Mauck to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Siemens.Brandon Fernald is designated as local counsel. (db) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting APPLICATION for attorney Katherine P. Lett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID) 547 by Katherine P Lett to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Siemens. Brandon Fernald is designated as local counsel. (db) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting APPLICATION for attorney Ryan Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID) 550 by Ryan Griffin to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Siemens. Brandon Fernald is designated as local counsel. (db) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference and Motions in Limine held before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document fot details) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (kt) (smi). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2008: # 1 SEALED VERSION) (smi). Modified on 11/7/2008 (smi). (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Joint Stipulation re: Demonstrative Materials 545 (ade) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Joint Stipulation re: Evidence or Argument re: Nationality/Place of Incorporation 544 (ade) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Final Pretrial Conference ORDER GRANTED by Judge James V. Selna. The foregoing admissions having been made by the parties, and the parties have specified the foregoing issues remaining to be litigated, this Final Pretrial Conference Order shall supersede the pleadings and govern the course of the trial of this cause, unless modified to prevent manifest injustice. (ade) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (SIEMENS' AND SEAGATE'S RESPECTIVE PROPOSED NEUTRAL STATEMENTS OF THE CASE set) filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (JOINT STATEMENT RE DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM set) filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for attorney Ryan Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Lodged Order. (db) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Siemens, re APPLICATION for attorney Dustin Mauck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) 546 , APPLICATION for attorney Ryan Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) 548 , APPLICATION for attorney Katherine P. Lett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) 547 served on 10/24/08. (ade) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney Ryan Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by plaintiff Siemens. Lodged ORDER. (ade) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Katherine P. Lett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by plaintiff Siemens. Lodged order. (ade) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Dustin Mauck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by plaintiff Siemens. Lodged order. (ade) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEMONSTRATIVE MATERIALS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RE NATIONALITY/PLACE OF INCORPORATION filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Seagate Technology Application to File Under Seal Defendant Seagate Technologys Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law; Proposed Order Granting Seagates Application for Order Allowing the Filing Under Seal of Seagate Technologys Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law; and Defendant Seagate Technologys Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law personally served on 10/21/08. (smi) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Siemens re service of Notice of Manual Filing; Plaintiff Siemens AGs Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law; Joint Exhibit List Pursuant to LR 16-6.1; Siemens AGs Application for Order Sealing Confidential Portions of Pre-Trial Pleadings; Proposed Order Granting Siemens AGs Application for Order Sealing Confidential Portions of Siemems AGs Pretrial Pleadings and Proof of Service via email and fedex on 10/21/08. (smi) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING APPLICATION to Seal Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law 539 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING APPLICATION to Seal Portions of Siemen's Pretrial Pleadings 538 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Seal Seagate's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Lodged order. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Seal Portions of Pre-Trial Pleadings. Filed by plaintiff Siemens. Lodged order. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 537 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY In Support of Motions in Limine Nos. 9 and 10. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 536 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT re: JOINT Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 1, # 2 2)(ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 535 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 534 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT RE: MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 533 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT RE: SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald In Support of Motions in Limine (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 532 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT RE: SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Christopher Burrell In Support of Reply Memoranda Re Motions in Limine Nos. 1-5, 7-9, 12, 13, 15 and 16. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 531 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY In Support of Motion in Limine No. 2. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 530 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY In Support of Motion in Limine No. 5 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 529 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENTS RE: REPLY In Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 528 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY In Support of Motion In Limine No. 6 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 527 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY in Support of Motion in Limine No. 7. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 526 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT Re: REPLY In Support of Motion in Limine NO. 14 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 525 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 16 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 524 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 15. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 523 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 13 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 522 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 12 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 521 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 9 (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 520 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT RE: REPLY Memorandum in Support of Seagate's Motion in Limine No. 8. (ade) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 519 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT re: REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine NO. 7 to Exclude Testimony from Manbeck on Abandonment. (ade) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Siemens documents served on 10/20/08. (See document for further details) (db) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Application for Order Sealing Confidential Portions of Siemens AG'S Replies in Support of its Motions in Limine by Judge James V. Selna 515 . (See Order for details) (db) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Order Sealing Confidential Portions of Siemens AG'S Replies in Support of its Motions in Limine filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (db) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE OF MANUALLY FILED DOCUMENTS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology served on 10/20/08. (See document for details) (db) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting Seagate's Application for Order Allowing the Filing Under Seal of Dcouments Relating to Seagate's Reply Memoranda in Support of its Motions in Limine Nos. 7-9, 12-13, 15 and 16 512 . (See document for details) (db) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to File Undner Seal Documents Related to Defendant Seagate Technology's Reply Memoranda in Support of Seagate's Motions in Limine Nos. 7-9, 12-13, 51 and 16 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (db) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List filed by Plaintiff Siemens.. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of Siemens Contentions of Fact and Law; Joint Exhibit List; Application to Seal; Proposed Order. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal; Defendant Seagate Technology's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law; Proof of Service. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 506 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Written Statement of Peter Grunberg filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in support of Siemens Motion in Limine No. 15 re General Matters for Exclusion filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Siemens Motion in Limine No. 8 (Willfulness Defenses) filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER J. BURRELL In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DR. SHELDON GLASHOW COMPARING THE IBM INVENTION AND '838 PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DR. SHELDON GLASHOW COMPARING THE IBM INVENTION AND '838 PATENT 381 , MOTION IN LIMINE (16) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (16) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT 388 , MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT 370 , MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL 387 , MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE BAYREUTHER REPORT AND BAYREUTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT ABOUT THEM AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE BAYREUTHER REPORT AND BAYREUTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT ABOUT THEM AT TRIAL 360 , MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 384 , MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Limit SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO LIMIT SIEMENS' ARGUMENT AT TRIAL RE INFRINGEMENT AND THE SCOPE OF THE COURTS 09/23/08 ORDER MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Limit SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO LIMIT SIEMENS' ARGUMENT AT TRIAL RE INFRINGEMENT AND THE SCOPE OF THE COURTS 09/23/08 ORDER 358 , MOTION IN LIMINE (13) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 287(a) MOTION IN LIMINE (13) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 287(a) 385 , MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PETER GRNBERG AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING IT AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PETER GRNBERG AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING IT AT TRIAL 359 , MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS 357 , MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION 361 , MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT 373 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (16) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (16) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT 388 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL 387 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (13) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 287(a) MOTION IN LIMINE (13) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 287(a) 385 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 384 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DR. SHELDON GLASHOW COMPARING THE IBM INVENTION AND '838 PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DR. SHELDON GLASHOW COMPARING THE IBM INVENTION AND '838 PATENT 381 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT 373 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT 370 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION 361 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE BAYREUTHER REPORT AND BAYREUTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT ABOUT THEM AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE BAYREUTHER REPORT AND BAYREUTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT ABOUT THEM AT TRIAL 360 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PETER GRNBERG AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING IT AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PETER GRNBERG AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING IT AT TRIAL 359 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Limit SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO LIMIT SIEMENS' ARGUMENT AT TRIAL RE INFRINGEMENT AND THE SCOPE OF THE COURTS 09/23/08 ORDER MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Limit SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO LIMIT SIEMENS' ARGUMENT AT TRIAL RE INFRINGEMENT AND THE SCOPE OF THE COURTS 09/23/08 ORDER 358 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY In Support MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS 357 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal; Reply Memoranda in Support of Seagate's Motions in Limine Nos. 7-9, 12-13, 15, and 16; Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Second Supplemental Declaration of Christopher J. Burrell ISO Seagate's Reply Memoranda re Motions in Limine Nos. 7-9, 12-13, 15 and 16; Proof of Service. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of Replies re Motions in Limine Nos 2, 3, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 14; Second Supplemental Declaration of Brandon C Fernald. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting APPLICATION for attorney AARON D. VAN OORT to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID.) 455 by Aaron D Van Oort to appear on behalf of Defendant Seagate Technology. Martha K Gooding is designated as local counsel. Fee PAID. (db) Modified on 10/20/2008 (db). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting Jeya Paul to appear on behalf of Defendant Seagate Technology. Martha K. Godding is designated as local counsel. Fee paid. (ade) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting APPLICATION FEE PAID.) 458 by Mary Cullen Yeager to appear on behalf of Defendant Seagate Technology. Martha K Gooding is designated as local counsel. Fee PAID. (db) Modified on 10/20/2008 (db). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Granting APPLICATION for attorney KEVIN P. WAGNER to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID.) 457 by Kevin P. Wagner to appear on behalf of Defendant Seagate Technology. Martha K Gooding is designated as local counsel. Fee PAID. (db) Modified on 10/20/2008 (db). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION For Order Sealing Confidential Portions of Certain of Siemens AG'S Oppositions to Seagate Technology's Motions in Limine l filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (db) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Siemens, served on 10/14/08. (See document for details) (db) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Application to File Under Seal Documents Related to Defendant Seagate Technology's Responses to Siemens' Motions in Limine Nos. 1-3, 5-7, 9-10 and 14-15 by Judge James V. Selna 481 . (See Order for details) (db) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to File Under Seal Documents Related to Defendant Seagate Technology's Respones to Siemens' Motion in Limine Nos. 1-3, 5-7, 9-10 and 14-15 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (db) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE OF MANUALLY FILED DOCUMENTS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology, served on 10/14/08. (See document for details) (db) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 479 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT re: OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL 387 . Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 478 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT re: OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#16) to Preclude Siemens from Offering Evidence or Argument Regarding Confidential Siemens AG License Agreement MOTION IN LIMINE (#16) to Preclude Siemens from Offering Evidence or Argument Regarding Confidential Siemens AG License Agreement 410 . Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 477 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re: OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS 357 . Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 476 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT re: OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT 370 . Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 475 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT RE: OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION 361 . Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 474 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT re: OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Preclude Testimony of Dr. Sheldon Glashow Comparing the IBM Invention and '838 Patent MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Preclude Testimony of Dr. Sheldon Glashow Comparing the IBM Invention and '838 Patent 404 . Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 473 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT RE: OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT 373 . Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 472 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT RE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 384 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 471 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: Seagate's Response to Siemen's Motion in Limine No. 15 (Including Motions in Limine I through XIV) re: General Matters for Exclusion. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 470 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT re: Seagate's Response to Siemen's Motion in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Evidence re: Siemen's Alleged Patent Transfers. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 469 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re: Seagate's Response to Siemen's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Exclude the Confidential Siemen's License Agreement dated 11/6/06. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 468 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT re: Seagate's Response to Siemen's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude the Confidential Siemens AG License Agreement Dated 8/28/08. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 467 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT re: Supplemental DECLARATION of Christopher J. Burrell in support of Seagate's Response to Siemen's Motions in Limine Nos 1-15. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 466 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT RE SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 464 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT re: Response to Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Seagate's Witnesses and Evidence Concerning the Layer Structures of the Read Head Purportedly used in Certain IBM Hard Drives. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 463 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: Response to Motion in Limine No. 6 re: Seagate's Expert Witness Caroline Ross. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 462 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT re: Response to Motion In Limine No. 5 re: Defendant's Proffered Expert Testimony Concerning Damages. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 460 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re: RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE #2 REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF ANDREW TENNENT. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 459 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT RE: RESPONSE to MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1 to Exclude Advice of Counsel Defense to Willful Infringment of Claim 354 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney MARY CULLEN YEAGER to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney KEVIN P. WAGNER to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney JEYA PAUL to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney AARON D. VAN OORT to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Gooding Standing, # 2 Court Admissions, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Motion in Limine to Exclude, 383 , Motion in Limine to Exclude, 389 , Motion in Limine to Preclude, 386 , Motion in Limine to Exclude, 366 , Motion in Limine to Preclude, 382 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald In Opposition To MOTION IN LIMINE (1-17) to Exclude MOTION IN LIMINE (1-17) to Exclude MOTION IN LIMINE (1-17) to Exclude 356 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 (INCLUDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE I THROUGH XIV) RE GENERAL MATTERS FOR EXCLUSION filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RE SIEMENS ALLEGED PATENT TRANSFERS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE THE CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 6, 2006 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (16) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (16) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT 388 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE THE CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT DATED AUGUST 28, 2008 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL 387 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 RE DEFENDANT'S DEFENSES TO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Constructive Notice Under 35 USC Section 287 (a) MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Constructive Notice Under 35 USC Section 287 (a) 408 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S WITNESSES AND EVIDENCE CONCERNING THE LAYER STRUCTURES OF THE READ HEADS PURPORTEDLY USED IN CERTAIN IBM HARD DRIVES filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 384 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 RE SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S EXPERT WITNESS CAROLINE ROSS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DR. SHELDON GLASHOW COMPARING THE IBM INVENTION AND '838 PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DR. SHELDON GLASHOW COMPARING THE IBM INVENTION AND '838 PATENT 381 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 REGARDING DEFENDANT'S PROFFERED EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING DAMAGES filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT 373 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT 370 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE SEAGATE WITNESSES AND EVIDENCE CONCERNING PRIVILEGE LOGS PRODUCED BY IBM IN THIS LITIGATION filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION 361 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 REGARDING THE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF ANDREW TENNENT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE BAYREUTHER REPORT AND BAYREUTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT ABOUT THEM AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE BAYREUTHER REPORT AND BAYREUTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT ABOUT THEM AT TRIAL 360 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PETER GRNBERG AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING IT AT TRIAL MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PETER GRNBERG AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING IT AT TRIAL 359 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ADVICE OF COUNSEL DEFENSE TO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT CLAIM filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Limit SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO LIMIT SIEMENS' ARGUMENT AT TRIAL RE INFRINGEMENT AND THE SCOPE OF THE COURTS 09/23/08 ORDER MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Limit SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO LIMIT SIEMENS' ARGUMENT AT TRIAL RE INFRINGEMENT AND THE SCOPE OF THE COURTS 09/23/08 ORDER 358 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS 357 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND MOTION IN LIMINE (1-17) to Exclude MOTION IN LIMINE (1-17) to Exclude MOTION IN LIMINE (1-17) to Exclude 356 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-5, 7-9, 12, 13, 15 and 16 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. BURRELL IN SUPPORT OF SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S RESPONSES TO SIEMENS AG'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-15, # 2 Exhibit 1-11, # 3 Exhibit 12-15, # 4 Exhibit 16-20, # 5 Exhibit 21-31, # 6 Exhibit 32-42)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Memorandum in Support of Motion 365 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 375 , Motion in Limine to Exclude 354 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 376 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 377 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment to MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of [UNREDACTED] Declaration of Brandon C. Fernald and Oppositions to Seagate's MIL Nos. 1, 5, 7, 8, 9, 12, 15 and 16. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal; Seagate's Responses to Siemens' Motions in Limine Nos. 1-3, 5-7, 9-10 and 14-15; Supplemental Declaration of Christopher J. Burrell ISO Seagate's Responses to Siemens' Motions in Limines and Exhibits 3-10, 14-15, 21, 23-40, and 42; Proof of Service. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Seagate Technology, served on 10/7/08. (ade) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Siemens, 1) Unredacted Declaration of Brandon C. Fernald; 2) Unredacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities MIL 1; 3) Unredacted Memorandum of Points and Authortities MIL 2; 4) Unredacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities MIL 3; see document for further details. Served on 10/7/08. (ade) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 422 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 14 to Exclude 354 evidence re Siemens Alleged Patent Transfers. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 421 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT RE: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 11 to Exclude 354 License Agreement between Forschungszentrum Julich GmbH and Seagate. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 420 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 10 to Exclude 354 the Confidential Siemens License Agreement dated 11/6/06 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 419 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 9 to Exclude 354 the Confidential Siemens License Agreement dated 8/28/08. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 418 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT RE: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 8 to Exclude 354 re: Defendant's Defenses to Willful Infringement. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 417 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 7 to Exclude 354 Seagate's Witnesses and Evidence Concerning the Layer Structures of the Read Heads Purportedly used in Certain IBM Hard Drives. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 416 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 6 to Exclude 354 re: Seagate's Expert Witness Caronline Ross. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 415 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 5 to Exclude 354 REgarding Defendant's Proferred Expert Testimony Concerning Damages. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 414 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 3 to Exclude 354 Seagate Witnesses and Evidence concerning privilege logs produced by IBM in this Litigation. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 413 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE No. 2 Exclude 354 The Deposition Testimony of Andrew Tennent. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 412 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 4 to Exclude 354 Witnesses and Evidence Concerning IBM's Post-Priority Date Activities. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) Modified on 1/7/2010 (lwag). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 411 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#17) to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding IBM's Standard Confidentiality Policy. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 410 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#16) to Preclude Siemens from Offering Evidence or Argument Regarding Confidential Siemens AG License Agreement. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 409 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#15) to Preclude Siemen's Expert Harry Manbeck from Offering an Opinion or Testimony or WIllfulness at Trial. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 408 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENTS re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Preclude Evidence or Argument Concerning Constructive Notice Under 35 USC Section 287 (a). Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 407 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Preclude Evidence or Argument Relating to IBM's Purported Abandonment, Suppression, or Concealment prior to November 1991. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 406 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude Testimony from Dr. Sheldon Glashow on Copying. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 405 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Preclude Siemens Expert Witness Harry Manbeck from Offering an Opinion or Testimony at Trial Regarding Dr. Hugo Van Berg's Intent to Deceive the PTO. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Preclude Testimony of Dr. Sheldon Glashow Comparing the IBM Invention and '838 Patent. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 403 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Preclude Dr. Sheldon Glashow from Testifying on Abandonment, Suppression, and Concealment. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 402 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Testimony from Mr. Harry Manbeck on Abandonment, Suppression, and Concealment. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) Modified on 10/10/2008 (ade). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 401 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Testimony or Argument Regarding the Use of Importance of the '838 Patent. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(ade) Modified on 10/10/2008 (ade). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING APPLICATION to Seal 396 Documents relating to Motions in Limine Nos. 1 through 17 (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting APPLICATION to Seal 398 Confidential Portions of Siemen's Motions in Limine (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Seal Confidential Portions of Siemen's Motions in Limine. Filed by plaintiff Siemens. Application set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge James V. Selna: Order re: Motions in Limine and Local Rule 7-3. The court has reviewed the Notices of Motion which the parties filed on 10/7/08 concerning their respective Motions in Limine. There appears to be failure to comply with Local Rule 7-3. Neither party's Notice complies. If the parties desire the court to hear the motions, they shall promptly comply with Local Rule 7-3 and file a complying statement. The court invites the parties to take a closer look at the motions to see whether the case in fact necessitates presenting 32 different motions. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Seal documents related to Defendant Seagate's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-17. Filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Application set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 395 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT re: DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald in support of Motion in Limine. Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 394 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT re: DECLARATION of Christopher Burrell with Exhibits 54-60 in support of Motions in Limine 1-17. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 393 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT re: DECLARATION of Christopher J. Burrell and Exhibits 25-53 in support of motions in limine 1-17. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 392 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT re: DECLARATION of Christopher J. Burrell with **Exhibits 1-25 **. Filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) Modified on 10/10/2008 (ade). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Telephone Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer regarding jury selection and trial procedures. Counsel stipulate to the pre-screening of jurors for time availability only. The Court directs counsel to file their proposed juror questionnaire by 10/22/08 and jury voir dire questions shall be submitted not later than 11/5/08. Court Reporter: Marian Baird. (twdb) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint 351 DEFENDANT SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO SIEMENS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (17) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT REGARDING IBM'S STANDARD CONFIDENTIALITY POLICY filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (16) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL SIEMENS AG LICENSE AGREEMENT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (15) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS' EXPERT HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY ON WILLFULNESS AT TRIAL filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (14) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS FROM PRESENTING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT THE DATE OF INVENTION OF THE '838 PATENT IS PRIOR TO DECEMBER 21, 1992 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (13) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 287(a) filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (12) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATING TO IBM'S PURPORTED ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, OR CONCEALMENT PRIOR TO NOVEMBER 1991 filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (11) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM DR. SHELDON GLASHOW ON COPYING filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (10) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO PRECLUDE SIEMENS EXPERT WITNESS HARRY MANBECK FROM OFFERING AN OPINION OR TESTIMONY AT TRIAL REGARDING DR. HUGO VAN BERG'S INTENT TO DECEIVE THE PTO filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY DR. SHELDON GLASHOW COMPARING THE IBM INVENTION AND '838 PATENT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald In Support Of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 15 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 14 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 13 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 12 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 11 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 10 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE DR. SHELDON GLASHOW FROM TESTIFYING ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 9 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 8 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM MR. HARRY MANBECK ON ABANDONMENT, SUPPRESSION, AND CONCEALMENT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 7 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 6 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 5 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT REGARDING THE USE OR IMPORTANCE OF THE '838 PATENT'S TECHNOLOGY IN THE HARD DISK DRIVE INDUSTRY filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 4 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 3 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 2 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude 354 re Motion in Limine No. 1 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE GERMAN FEDERAL COURT DECISION IN THE ALPS LITIGATION filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE BAYREUTHER REPORT AND BAYREUTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT ABOUT THEM AT TRIAL filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PETER GRNBERG AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING IT AT TRIAL filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Limit SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO LIMIT SIEMENS' ARGUMENT AT TRIAL RE INFRINGEMENT AND THE SCOPE OF THE COURTS 09/23/08 ORDER filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Determine SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION FOR MEASURING CONTACTS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (1-17) to Exclude filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. BURRELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-17, # 2 Exhibit 1-4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6 part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 6 part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8-15, # 8 Exhibit 16, # 9 Exhibit 17-33, # 10 Exhibit 34 part 1 of 5, # 11 Exhibit 34 part 2 of 5, # 12 Exhibit 34 part 3 of 5, # 13 Exhibit 34 part 4 of 5, # 14 Exhibit 34 part 5 of 5, # 15 Exhibit 35-38, # 16 Exhibit 39-49, # 17 Exhibit 50-54, # 18 Exhibit 55-60)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of Application and Proposed Order re Filing Motions in Limine Under Seal. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-15 to Exclude filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Application and Proposed Order to File Under Seal; Seagate's Motions in Limine Nos. 3, 6-13, 15-17; Declaration of Christopher J. Burrell ISO Seagate's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-17 and Exhibits 1, 3, 9, 13-15, 17, 20-21, 23-28, 30, 36, 39-49, 51-52, 55-60; Proof of Service. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of Confidential Motion in Limine Pleadings. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Seagate Technology amending Complaint 1 and First Amended Complaint 119 filed by Plaintiff Siemens.(nbo) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 231 . GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity, or for Partial Summary Judgment on Willfulness and Constructive Notice and for Further Claim Construction 237 . DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike IBM Privilege Logs and Andrew Tennant Testimony re Same 306 , Declaration of Kenneth D. Allen 241 304 , Declaration of Richard J. Kvitek 260 305 , and Declaration of Augusto Morrone Declaration 257 303 . GRANTING MOTION for Leave to to File Second Amended Complaint 307 . (nbo) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint are taken under submission. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (nbo) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE OF MANUALLY FILED DOCUMENTS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology served on 09/08/08. (See document for details) (db) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING SEAGATE'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF DOCUMENTS RELATING TO SEAGATE'S SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge James V. Selna 345 . (See Order for details) (db) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to file Under Seal Documents Related to Seagate's Second Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (db) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Siemens, served on 09/08/08 (1) Siemens AG'S Application for Order Sealing Confidential Portions of Siemens AG'S Reply in Support of its Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; (proposed) order (2) [Unredacted] Siemens AG'S Reply Memorandum of Points And Authorities in Support of its Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) [Unredacted] Siemens AG's Opposition to Seagate Technology's Counter Statement of Unconroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law; and (4) [Unredacted] Supplemental Reply Declaration of Brandon C. Fernald in Support of Siemens AG's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment (5) Proof of Service. (db) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF SIEMENS AG'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 342 . (db) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING CONFIDENTIAL PROTIONS OF SIEMENS AG'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by plaintiff Siemens. (db) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 341 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (smi) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 340 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S OPPOSITION TO SIEMENS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (smi) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 339 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S OBJECTIONS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE (smi) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 338 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - SIEMENS AG'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (smi) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 337 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY DECLARATION OF BRANDON C FERNALD IN SUPPORT SIEMENS AG'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (smi) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 336 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - SIEMENS AG'S OPPOSITION TO SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S COUNTER STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (smi) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 11-6 Memorandum/brief exceeds 25 pages. RE: Reply (Motion related) 332 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (nca) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of in Opposition to Seagate's Counter Statement of Undisputed Facts Second MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity, or for Partial Summary Judgment on Willfulness and Constructive Notice and for Further Claim Construction 237 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 231 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JJJ, # 2 Exhibit KKK, # 3 Exhibit LLL)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 231 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to to File Second Amended Complaint 307 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S OPPOSITION TO SIEMENS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike IBM Privilege Logs and Andrew Tennant Testimony re Same 306 , MOTION to Strike Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 241 of Kenneth D. Allen [REDACTED] MOTION to Strike Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 241 of Kenneth D. Allen [REDACTED] 304 , MOTION to Strike Declaration (non-motion) 260 of Richard J. Kvitek [REDACTED] 305 , MOTION to Strike Declaration of Augusto Morrone Declaration (non-motion) 257 303 SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO SIEMENS AG'S OBJECTIONS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE (1) CERTAIN IBM DOCUMENTS, PRIVILEGE LOG AND TESTIMONY; (2) THE DECLARATION OF DR. KENNETH D. ALLEN; (3) THE DECLARATION OF AUGUSTO MORRONE & EXHIBITS; AND (4) THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD KVITEK & EXHIBITS filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY IN SUPPORT Second MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity, or for Partial Summary Judgment on Willfulness and Constructive Notice and for Further Claim Construction 237 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Siemens of Unredacted Siemens AG's Reply In Support of Its Partial Motion for Summary Judgment and related pleadings. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Seagate Technology of Application and Proposed Order to file Under Seal; Seagate's Memorandum in Response to Siemens' Objections and Motions to Strike; Seagate's Reply Memorandum ISO Seagate's Second Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum ISO Seagate's Opposition to Siemens' Motion for Leave to file Proposed Second Amended Complaint; POS. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 326 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT Re: RESPONSES to Plaintiff's Siemens Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of its partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Seagate Technology (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 325 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT re: Opposition Statement Disputed Facts In Opposition to Seagate Technology's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 324 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re: DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald in Opposition to Seagate's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 323 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant Seagate Technology's Opposition to Siemen's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 322 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT re: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Timothy E. Grimsrud filed by Defendant Seagate Technology. (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 321 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT RE: Objections TO MOTION to Strike Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 241 of Kenneth D. Allen [REDACTED] MOTION to Strike Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 241 of Kenneth D. Allen [REDACTED] 304 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 320 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT RE: Objection re: MOTION to Strike Declaration (non-motion) 260 of Richard J. Kvitek [REDACTED] 305 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 319 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT Re: OBJECTIONS to MOTION to Strike Declaration of Augusto Morrone Declaration (non-motion) 257 303 . Filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 318 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT RE: Opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 237 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 317 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT re: STATEMENT Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Opposition to Siemen's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Seagate Technology (ade) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna GRANTING Seagate's APPLICATION for Order Allowing the Filing Under Seal of Documents Related to Seagate's Opposition to Siemens' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment 312 . (nbo) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING SIEMENS AG'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF SIEMENS AG'S OPPOSITION TO SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge James V. Selna 311 . (smi) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Seagate Technology, re 1) APPLICATION to Seal 312 ; 2) [Proposed] Order Granting Seagate's Application; 3) Memorandum in Support of Defendant Seagate Technology's Opposition to Siemens' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; (See document for further details.); served on 8/25/08. (rla) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Siemens, re 1) APPLICATION to Seal 311 ; 2) [Unredacted] Siemens Ag's Memorandum of Points and Autorities in Opposition to Seagate Technology's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; 3)[Unredacted] Siemens Ag's Opposition Statement of Disputed Fact; (See document for further details.); served on 8/25/08. (rla) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to File Under Seal Docments Related to Defendant Seagate Technology's Opposition to Siemens' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by defendant Seagate Technology. Lodged order. (rla) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION FOR ORDER Sealling Confidential Portions of Siemens AG's Opposition to Seagate Technology's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by plaintiff Siemens. (rla) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald In Support Of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 231 [CORRECTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Siemens. correcting Declaration (Motion related) 279 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 236 (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Leave to to File Second Amended Complaint 307 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike IBM Privilege Logs and Andrew Tennant Testimony re Same filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declaration (non-motion) 260 of Richard J. Kvitek [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 241 of Kenneth D. Allen [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declaration of Augusto Morrone Declaration (non-motion) 257 filed by Plaintiff Siemens. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of OF DISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO Second MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity, or for Partial Summary Judgment on Willfulness and Constructive Notice and for Further Claim Construction 237 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Brandon C. Fernald In Opposition To Second MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity, or for Partial Summary Judgment on Willfulness and Constructive Notice and for Further Claim Construction 237 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Siemens. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit WW, # 2 Exhibit XX, # 3 Exhibit YY, # 4 Exhibit ZZ, # 5 Exhibit AAA, # 6 Exhibit BBB, # 7 Exhibit CCC, # 8 Exhibit DDD, # 9 Exhibit EEE, # 10 Exhibit FFF, # 11 Exhibit GGG, # 12 Exhibit HHH, # 13 Exhibit III)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 392 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?