Sophia Stewart v. Andy Wachowski, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-02873
District Judge Margaret M. Morrow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 7:56 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sophia Stewart, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary S. Brown +1 818 293 0979 +1 919 293 0760 garysbrown@ca.rr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan W Lubell Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan W Lubell +1 212 659 7775

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Dean Browning Webb

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Browning Webb +1 503 629 2176 +1 503 629 9527 ricoman1968@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael T Stoller Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Stoller +1 818 226 4040 +1 818 226 4044 michael.stoller@stollerlawgroup.com
v.
No Logo 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyman & Isaacs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Wyman +1 323 648 4141 +1 323 648 4133 bwyman@wymanisaacs.com
No Logo 20th Century Fox Productions, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mer Rouge State Bank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janna Smith +1 310 358 3221
No Logo Andy Wachowski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mer Rouge State Bank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janna Smith +1 310 358 3221

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyman & Isaacs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Wyman +1 323 648 4141 +1 323 648 4133 bwyman@wymanisaacs.com
No Logo Gale Ann Hurd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mer Rouge State Bank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janna Smith +1 310 358 3221

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyman & Isaacs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Wyman +1 323 648 4141 +1 323 648 4133 bwyman@wymanisaacs.com
No Logo Hemdale Films, Defendant
No Logo James Cameron, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mer Rouge State Bank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janna Smith +1 310 358 3221

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyman & Isaacs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Wyman +1 323 648 4141 +1 323 648 4133 bwyman@wymanisaacs.com
No Logo Joe L. Silver, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyman & Isaacs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Wyman +1 323 648 4141 +1 323 648 4133 bwyman@wymanisaacs.com
No Logo Joel Silvers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mer Rouge State Bank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janna Smith +1 310 358 3221
No Logo Larry Wachowski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mer Rouge State Bank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janna Smith +1 310 358 3221

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyman & Isaacs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Wyman +1 323 648 4141 +1 323 648 4133 bwyman@wymanisaacs.com
No Logo Thea Bloom, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyman & Isaacs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Wyman +1 323 648 4141 +1 323 648 4133 bwyman@wymanisaacs.com
No Logo Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Warner Brothers"

Toggle Switch Represented by David H Boren Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Boren +1 310 492 4363 +1 310 492 4388 dboren@borenlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flagler Forever Committee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Alan Isaacs +1 213 633 6808 +1 213 633 6899 bruceisaacs@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyman & Isaacs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Wyman +1 323 648 4141 +1 323 648 4133 bwyman@wymanisaacs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mer Rouge State Bank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janna Smith +1 310 358 3221
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - RejectingCourt Filing
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, ORDERING untitled w/form 1099 attached submitted by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart received on 1/5/08 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: case closed. (bp) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
    MINUTES: Order Awarding Defendants Attorney Fees; Court awards defendants $305,235.62 in attorneys fees by Judge Margaret M. Morrow Court Reporter: N/A. (ir, ) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Costs MOTION for Costs 135 filed by defendants' Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc. (bp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
        MINUTES: Order Denying Defendants Motion for Attorneys Fees 135 and directs them to file a supplemental pleading that allocates the time charges their attorneys recorded between the copyright and RICO claims, offers evidence regarding the reasonableness of their attorney rates and addresses whether any of their reimbursable costs are attributable to the RICO claims on or before 4/14/06. Stewart may if she wishes file a supplemental pleading on or before 4/27/06 that addresses the supplemental pleading filed by defendants and the Fox biling statements by Judge Margaret M. Morrow Court Reporter: N/A. (ir, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
          MINUTES: Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration 136 by Judge Margaret M. Court Reporter: N/A. (ir, ) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
            MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow : The 9/26/05 10:00 hearing calendared for plaintiffs MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Relief from judgment entered against her under FRCP 60(b) MOTION for Relief from judgment entered against her under FRCP 60(b) 136 and defendants MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Costs MOTION for Costs 135 are vacated and taken off calendar; matters deemed submitted on vacatedhearing date and clerk will notify parties when court has reached a decision; Court Reporter: none. (lc, ) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Reply (Motion related)
              REPLY to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration and alternatively for Relief under FRCP 60(b) 136 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. (ir, ) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Motion Related Document
                OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Sophia Stewart 135 filed by Defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. (ir, ) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Declaration (Motion related)
                  MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES AND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Bruce Isaacs and David Boren in Reply to Stewart Opposition to Defendants Motion for Attorney Fees 135 filed by Defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. (ir, ) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                    OPPOSITION to MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Costs MOTION for Costs 135 filed by plaintiff, Sophia Stewart. (sv) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Bill of Costs (CV-59)
                      BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ $695.00 in favor of Defendants Andy Wachowski et al and against Sophia Stewart regarding Judgment 124 (ir, ) (Entered: 07/21/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Motion Related Document
                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE of Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration and alternatively for Relief under FRCP 60(b) 136 filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. (ir, ) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of change of date of defendants motion for attorney's fees and costs filed by defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. (ca, ) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                            MINUTES: Order Advancing Briefing Schedule; Plaintiff Stewart filed a motion for reconsideration 136 and Defendants motion for Attorney Fees and Costs 135 currently set for 9/26/05. Court hereby advances the briefing schedule on both motions. Any opposition by Plaintiff to defendants motion for attorneys fees must be filed no later than 7/22/05. As respects both motions, plaintiff and defendants must file any replies no later than 8/5/05. Parties must deliver a conformed couresty copy to chambers in the Roybal Building on the day of filing by Judge Margaret M. Morrow Court Reporter: N/A. (ir, ) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration under Local Rule 7-18 or for Relief under FRCP 60(b) 136 filed by Defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron.; Declaration of Bruce Isaacs in support thereof. (ir, ) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                Defendants' NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO THE CLERK TO TAX COSTS filed by Defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. (shb, ) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Notice of Document Discrepancies - GrantingCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow ORDERING Motion for Reconsideration submitted by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart received on 6/28/05 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk.(shb, ) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration and alternatively for Relief from judgment entered against her under FRCP 60(b) filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. Motion set for hearing on 7/18/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Margaret M. Morrow.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Michael T Stoller. (ir, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Margaret M. Morrow.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declarations of David Boren, Mark Meyerson, John Schulman and Bruce Isaacs in support thereof. (ir, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Notice of Document Discrepancies - GrantingCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow ORDERING Motion submitted by Defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron received on 6/28/05 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. Counsel shall re notice for 9/26/05 at 10:00. (ir, ) Modified on 6/30/2005 (ir, ). (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Statement (Motion related)
                                          STATEMENT of Genuine Issues regarding Matrix Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 95 filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. (ir, ) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities and Supplemental Declaration of David Boren in reply to Opposition to their MOTION for Summary Judgment 95 filed by defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Transcript (CV)
                                              TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 6/13/05. Court Reporter: David A. Salyer. (nm, ) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Receipt of Reporters Transcript (G-80)
                                                RECEIPT OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 6/13/05 Court Reporter: David A. Salyer (nm, ) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities and supplemental declaration of Gale Anne Hurd in reply to opposition to their MOTION for Summary Judgment 95 filed by defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Response - non motion
                                                    RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS to purported facts in dispute (NOS. 25-29) filed by Defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                      OBJECTINS TO, AND MOTION to Strike portions of, the declaration of Sophia Stewart filed in opposition to their motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Margaret M. Morrow. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                        OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION to Strike portions of, the declarations of Sophia Stewart and Michael Stoller filed in opposition to their motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2005 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Margaret M. Morrow. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENLARGE TIME to File opposition to their motion for summary judgment 115 filed by defendants Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Gale Ann Hurd, Thea Bloom, 20th Century Fox Film Corporation, Joel Silver, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, James Cameron. (ca, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                            JUDGMENT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow that plaintiff Sophia Stewart take nothing by way of her complaint against defendants Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, James Cameron, Gale Ann Hurd, Warner Bros Entertainment Inc, Andy Wachowski, Larry Wachowski, Joel Silver, and Thea Bloom. Action be and it hereby is dismissed and that defendants recover their costs of suit herein. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated).(ir, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow Defendants Motion to Dismiss RICO Claims (Claim Numbers 1-4) in Stewart Second Amended Complaint 76 is granted.(ir, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Grants both the Terminator Defendants 94 and the the Matrix Defendants 95 motions for summary judgment on all claims. (ir, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, the court denies defendants motion to dismiss Stewart action 93 and grants their motion to preclude Stewart from testifying in opposition to the pending motions for summary judgment 92 .(ir, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTES: (1) Terminator Defendants motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Defendants Motion to preclude Plaintiff Sophia Stewart Testimony; Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties and having heard the oral argument of counsel, the court GRANTS both the Terminator Defendants 94 and the Matrix Defendants 95 motions for summary judgment on all claims. Court denies defendants motion to dismiss Stewarts action 93 [ and grants their motion to preclude Stewart from testifying in opposition to the pending motions for summary judgment and at trial by Judge Margaret M. Morrow Court Reporter: DAVID SALYER. (ir, ) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended complaint with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b) 93 ; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Michael T Stoller; Declaration of Sophia Stewart filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. (shb, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                        Plaintiff's STATEMENT of Genuine Issues re Terminator Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 94 filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. (shb, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to The Terminator Defendants MOTION for Summary Judgment 94 ; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Sophia Stewart; Declaration of Michael T Stoller filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. (shb, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to the Matrix Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment 95 ; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Sophia Stewart; Declaration of Michael T Stoller filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. (shb, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Ex Parte Application for Enlargement of Time to File
                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENLARGE TIME to File Opposition to Defendants' Two Summary Judgment Motions pursuant to Fed R Civ P 56; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Michael T Stoller in support thereof filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. (shb, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Ex Parte Application for Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Receipt of Reporters Transcript (G-80)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Ex Parte Application to Continue
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Notice of Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Ex Parte Application for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Notice of Random Selection of ASO (ADR-13)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Stipulation Re: Attorney Settlement Officer (Random) - (ADR-2)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Notice of Document Discrepancies - Granting
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/4/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Order on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Order/Refer to ADR Program (LR-16 settlement conf)(ADR-12)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Application for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Receipt of Reporters Transcript (G-80)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 ADR Program Questionnaire (ADR-9)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 In Chambers Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Notice of Document Discrepancies - Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Notice of Document Discrepancies - Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Notice of Document Discrepancies - Granting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 In Chambers Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Supplement (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Substitution of Attorney (Form G-1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Order APPROVING Application (G-64) of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Order on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Order APPROVING Application (G-64) of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 In Chambers Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 224 Transfer Pursuant to GO 08-05 DECLINED- (related case)(CV 34)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Reassign Case - Self-Recusal - pursuant to GO 08-05 (CV-52)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 In Chambers Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Receipt of Reporters Transcript (G-80)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Show Cause Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Objections -- non-motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Notice To Counsel Re: Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Complaint - (Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2,023 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?