Angeles Chemical Company Inc et al v. Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:07-cv-01471
District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2021 at 7:40 PM DT (8.6 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Caufield & James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery Caufield +1 619 325 0441 +1 619 325 0231 jeff@caufieldjames.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Santino Michael Tropea +1 619 325 0441 santino@caufieldjames.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/11/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy L Feng +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 955 6575 wfeng@cov.com
No Logo Greve Financial Services Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Caufield & James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery Caufield +1 619 325 0441 +1 619 325 0231 jeff@caufieldjames.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Santino Michael Tropea +1 619 325 0441 santino@caufieldjames.com
No Logo John Locke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Caufield & James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery Caufield +1 619 325 0441 +1 619 325 0231 jeff@caufieldjames.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Santino Michael Tropea +1 619 325 0441 santino@caufieldjames.com
v.
No Logo Air Products & Chemicals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Kavita Mukund Patel +1 213 268 6400

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise G Fellers +1 213 680 6427 +1 213 680 6499 denise.fellers@bingham.com
Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diana F Biason +1 213 532 2000 +1 213 532 2020 dbiason@millerbarondess.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Belynda B Reck +1 213 532 2000 +1 213 532 2020 breck@hunton.com
No Logo Allied-Signal, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Advansix Inc.
Officer/Director, Garrett Motion Inc.
Officer/Director, HH Spinco Inc.
Officer/Director, Honeywell, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy L Feng +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 955 6575 wfeng@cov.com
No Logo Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Lehecka +1 213 628 7131 slehecka@hanmor.com
No Logo Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 1430 Wynkoop St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evelyn F. Heidelberg +1 619 238 1900 +1 619 235 0398 evelyn.heidelberg@procopio.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Jude Lormon +1 619 515 3217 +1 619 744 5417 jjl@procopio.com
No Logo Appropriate Technologies II Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J Sanders +1 415 856 7225 matthewsanders@paulhastings.com
No Logo Arlon Adhesives & Film, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J O'Neil +1 213 620 1780 +1 213 620 1398 soneil@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo Avery Dennison Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
BASF Corporation BASF Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hamitoniplaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex R Baghdassarian +1 213 896 2400

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Starr Azlin +1 213 896 2400 +1 213 896 2450 kristina.azlin@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Casey Flaherty +1 213 896 2400 +1 213 896 2450 casey.flaherty@hklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bonni Fine Kaufman +1 202 955 3000 bonni.kaufman@hklaw.com
No Logo Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest John Hahn +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 ernie.hahn@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene A. Lucero +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 gene.lucero@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia G. Stringel +1 202 637 1304 +1 202 637 2201
No Logo Boeing North American, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy L Feng +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 955 6575 wfeng@cov.com
No Logo Borden Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Spurlock Industries Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Grever +1 816 559 2375 +1 816 521 5547 tgrever@shb.com
No Logo Bourns Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bourns Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg M Gibbons +1 951 781 5408 gregg.gibbons@bourns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
BP America, Inc. BP America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewitt Hackman Shapiro Marshall and Harlan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen T Holzer +1 818 990 2120 +1 818 981 4764 sholzer@lewitthackman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Calsonic Climate Control Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Crosby & Overton Inc, -, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Naatsis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J Oliva +1 213 622 5555 toliva@allenmatkins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa M Prayongratana +1 213 622 5555 mprayongratana@allenmatkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Allen +1 213 622 5555 +1 213 620 8816 jallen@allenmatkins.com
No Logo Datatronics Romoland Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Choate and Choate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Porter Lewis, Jr. +1 213 623 2297 +1 626 403 6442 rpljr@rplewislaw.net
No Logo Del Mar Avionics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lauchlan Kortum +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 jkortum@archernorris.com
No Logo Donna Berg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cronin Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis J Byrne +1 714 505 9365 +1 714 505 3792 dbyrne@crolaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/12/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian C Chapman +1 714 505 9365 +1 714 505 3792 cchapman@crolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C Cronin +1 714 505 9365 tcronin@crolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan R Johnston +1 714 505 9365 ajohnston@crolaw.com
The Dow Chemical Company The Dow Chemical Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dow Chemical Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan S Landis +1 213 688 1000 +1 213 243 6330 rlandis@mckennalong.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Volz +1 415 267 4108 cvolz@mckennalong.com
Eaton Corporation Eaton Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loura L Alaverdi +1 310 820 8800 +1 310 820 8859 lalaverdi@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frank Cermak +1 310 442 8800 +1 310 820 8859 jcermak@bakerlaw.com
No Logo FHL Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith & Rendon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane R Smith +1 949 474 2231 drsmith@smithtrager.com
No Logo Firmenich Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Firmenich Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Maria Praitis +1 213 896 6637 +1 213 896 6600 jpraitis@sidley.com
TERMINATED: 01/25/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Kim Son +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 cson@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Kelley Washington +1 213 896 6073 bwashi01@sidley.com
No Logo Gambro, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael E Delehunt +1 415 434 4484 mdelehunt@foley.com
TERMINATED: 02/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher John Heck +1 213 972 4500

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy & King, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Marie Scheibert +1 617 423 0400 +1 617 423 0498 ms@hanify.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha +1 213 620 7700 +1 213 452 2329 faenlle-rocha@whitecase.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A Horsch +1 212 819 8866 +1 212 354 8113 rhorsch@whitecase.com
TERMINATED: 07/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William L Troutman, V +1 213 620 7877 wtroutman@whitecase.com
No Logo Gatx Terminals Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Carroll +1 213 892 4972 +1 213 892 7731 lcarroll@luce.com
No Logo George Industries, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Represented by Mennemeier,Glassman & Stroud LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Gsf Energy, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Kavita Mukund Patel +1 213 268 6400

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise G Fellers +1 213 680 6427 +1 213 680 6499 denise.fellers@bingham.com
No Logo Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy L Feng +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 955 6575 wfeng@cov.com
No Logo Harsco Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Havery Sorkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Cooper Teraoka +1 213 680 6400 +1 213 680 6499 jill.teraoka@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by John D Edgcomb Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Edgcomb +1 415 399 1555 jedgcomb@edgcomb-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtney M LeBoeuf +1 415 399 1993 cleboeuf@edgcomb-law.com
No Logo Hexcel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber S Finch +1 213 892 2585 fincha@howrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanne Lichtman +1 213 892 1800 +1 213 892 2300 lichtmanj@howrey.com
No Logo Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Grever +1 816 559 2375 +1 816 521 5547 tgrever@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul B La Scala +1 949 475 1500 +1 949 475 0016 plascala@shb.com
No Logo Hilton Hotels Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP - Mountain View, CA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daphne M Anneet +1 213 236 0600 danneet@bwslaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen J Shadur +1 213 236 0600 eshadur@bwslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Hitachi Home Electronics (America), Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 1430 Wynkoop St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evelyn F. Heidelberg +1 619 238 1900 +1 619 235 0398 evelyn.heidelberg@procopio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Union Bank Bldg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Jude Lormon +1 619 515 3217 +1 619 744 5417 jjl@procopio.com
Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy L Feng +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 955 6575 wfeng@cov.com
No Logo Hubbel Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Hughes Space And Communications Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy L Feng +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 955 6575 wfeng@cov.com
No Logo Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Waters McCluskey & Boehle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg Walter Brugger +1 310 396 3411 gbrugger@wmboehle.com
International Paper Company International Paper Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loura L Alaverdi +1 310 820 8800 +1 310 820 8859 lalaverdi@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frank Cermak +1 310 442 8800 +1 310 820 8859 jcermak@bakerlaw.com
No Logo International Rectifier Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Martin Cohen +1 310 282 2000 +1 310 282 2200 acohen@loeb.com
No Logo Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Johns Manville International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewitt Hackman Shapiro Marshall and Harlan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen T Holzer +1 818 990 2120 +1 818 981 4764 sholzer@lewitthackman.com
No Logo Kolmar Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruby Ramos Fernandez +1 213 443 5100

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JUDGE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lee Halm +1 213 443 5100 +1 213 443 5101

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Condie Corless +1 213 443 5100 +1 213 443 5101 thomas.corless@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Loma Linda University, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lafollette Johnson Dehaas Fesler Silberberg & Ames

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Carl Cannon +1 714 558 7008 ccannon@ljdfa.com
No Logo Lonza Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Luxfer Gas Cylinders, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loura L Alaverdi +1 310 820 8800 +1 310 820 8859 lalaverdi@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frank Cermak +1 310 442 8800 +1 310 820 8859 jcermak@bakerlaw.com
Macy's Macy's, Defendant
Officially listed as "Macy's West"

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Mitchell Wieman +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 catherine.wieman@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arti L Bhimani +1 213 612 2500 +1 213 612 2501 abhimani@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 06/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kavita Paul Lesser +1 213 612 7347 klesser@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne L. Miller +1 213 612 2500 +6122 612 612 2501 dmiller@morganlewis.com
Mattel, Inc. Mattel, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Hsiao +1 213 892 5731 +1 213 892 5454 phsiao@mofo.com
Maxwell Technologies, Inc. Maxwell Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Malte L Farnaes +1 619 235 4040 malte@farnaeslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shustak and Partners

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M Parker +1 619 696 9500 jparker@shufirm.com
No Logo McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy L Feng +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 955 6575 wfeng@cov.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Cooper Teraoka +1 213 680 6400 +1 213 680 6499 jill.teraoka@bingham.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy M Wilms +1 213 680 6400 +1 213 680 6499 nancy.wilms@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Edgcomb Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Edgcomb +1 415 399 1555 jedgcomb@edgcomb-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A.G. Einhorn +1 415 399 1993 +1 415 399 1885 meinhorn@edgcomb-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtney M LeBoeuf +1 415 399 1993 cleboeuf@edgcomb-law.com
No Logo Medeva Pharmaceuticals Ca, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Mico, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Larkin, Hoffman, Daly & Lindgren, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Raymond Jeffrey Mergens +1 952 896 3297 mmergens@larkinhoffman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory E Korstad +1 952 896 3292 gkorstad@larkinhoffman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher B Leonard +1 310 312 2000 +1 310 312 3100 cbl@msk.com
Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
NCR Corporation NCR Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lauchlan Kortum +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 jkortum@archernorris.com
No Logo NMB Technologies Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Martin Cohen +1 310 282 2000 +1 310 282 2200 acohen@loeb.com
No Logo Ohline Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter Rothans & Dumont

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D Redford +1 213 228 0400 +1 213 228 0401 jredford@crdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J Rothans +1 213 228 0400 +1 213 228 0401 srothans@crdlaw.com
No Logo Omega Chemical PRP Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Lehecka +1 213 628 7131 slehecka@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Lehecka +1 213 628 7131 slehecka@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia M O'Toole +1 213 630 4220 otoolelaw@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Matsumura +1 213 743 6722 william.matsumura@att.com
PG&E Corporation PG&E Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Pacific Gas & Electric Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A Lehecka +1 213 628 7131 slehecka@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Pacific Precision Metals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Pearl Rosenthal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cronin Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis J Byrne +1 714 505 9365 +1 714 505 3792 dbyrne@crolaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/12/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian C Chapman +1 714 505 9365 +1 714 505 3792 cchapman@crolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C Cronin +1 714 505 9365 tcronin@crolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan R Johnston +1 714 505 9365 ajohnston@crolaw.com
No Logo PolyOne Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lauchlan Kortum +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 jkortum@archernorris.com
No Logo Quality Carriers, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hamitoniplaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex R Baghdassarian +1 213 896 2400

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest John Hahn +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 ernie.hahn@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene A. Lucero +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 gene.lucero@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia G. Stringel +1 202 637 1304 +1 202 637 2201
No Logo RATHEON COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy L Feng +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 955 6575 wfeng@cov.com
No Logo Rathon Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Reed & Graham, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lauchlan Kortum +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 jkortum@archernorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED HUEY P. COTTON +1 213 892 7900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jonathan Partos +1 213 892 7900 +1 866 537 7530 mpartos@cozen.com
No Logo Remet Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Best Best & Krieger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel S Roberts +1 949 263 6568 +1 949 260 0972 daniel.roberts@bbklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hancock & Estabrook, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric C Nordby +1 315 471 3151

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Richhold Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Robert Berg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cronin Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis J Byrne +1 714 505 9365 +1 714 505 3792 dbyrne@crolaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/12/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian C Chapman +1 714 505 9365 +1 714 505 3792 cchapman@crolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy C Cronin +1 714 505 9365 tcronin@crolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan R Johnston +1 714 505 9365 ajohnston@crolaw.com
No Logo Rogers Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Safety-kleen Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest John Hahn +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 ernie.hahn@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene A. Lucero +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 gene.lucero@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia G. Stringel +1 202 637 1304 +1 202 637 2201
No Logo Scripto-tokai Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Hsiao +1 213 892 5731 +1 213 892 5454 phsiao@mofo.com
No Logo Seymour Moslin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Cooper Teraoka +1 213 680 6400 +1 213 680 6499 jill.teraoka@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by John D Edgcomb Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Edgcomb +1 415 399 1555 jedgcomb@edgcomb-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtney M LeBoeuf +1 415 399 1993 cleboeuf@edgcomb-law.com
Royal Dutch Shell PLC Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Shell Oil Company"
Officer/Director, Codexis, Inc.
Officer/Director, Equilon Enterprises LLC
Officer/Director, Cosan Ltd.

Toggle Switch Represented by Caldwell Leslie & Proctor PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R Leslie +1 213 629 9040 leslie@caldwell-leslie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Margaret Mackenzie +1 213 629 9040 mackenzie@caldwell-leslie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra L Tholen +1 213 629 9040 +1 213 629 9022 tholen@caldwell-leslie.com
Siemens Medical Systems, Inc. Siemens Medical Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jocelyn R Cuttino +1 310 315 8223 jcuttino@mcguirewoods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Sierracin Corporation,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lauchlan Kortum +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 jkortum@archernorris.com
No Logo Sigma Casting Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frank Cermak +1 310 442 8800 +1 310 820 8859 jcermak@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Signet Armorlite, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 1430 Wynkoop St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evelyn F. Heidelberg +1 619 238 1900 +1 619 235 0398 evelyn.heidelberg@procopio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Union Bank Bldg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Jude Lormon +1 619 515 3217 +1 619 744 5417 jjl@procopio.com
No Logo Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lauchlan Kortum +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 jkortum@archernorris.com
No Logo Southern California Edison Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Southern California Edison Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern California Edison Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia A Cirucci +1 626 302 6704 patricia.cirucci@sce.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa A Delorme +1 626 302 6889 lisa.delorme@sce.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas P Ditonto +1 626 302 6969 douglas.ditonto@sce.com
No Logo Southern Pacific Transportation Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Southern Pacific Transportation Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Teledyne Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Kavita Mukund Patel +1 213 268 6400

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise G Fellers +1 213 680 6427 +1 213 680 6499 denise.fellers@bingham.com
No Logo Teledyne Technologies Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Teledyne Technologies Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Kavita Mukund Patel +1 213 268 6400

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise G Fellers +1 213 680 6427 +1 213 680 6499 denise.fellers@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Caldwell Leslie & Proctor PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra L Tholen +1 213 629 9040 +1 213 629 9022 tholen@caldwell-leslie.com
No Logo Tension Envelope Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
Texaco, Inc. Texaco, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Chevron Corp
Chevron USA, Inc. Officer/Director, Chevron USA, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dynegy Acquisition, Inc.
Officer/Director, Chevron Investments Inc.
Officer/Director, Ngc Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Erik Elliott +1 213 488 7511 mark.elliott@pillsburylaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J McNevin +1 213 488 7507 chrismcnevin@pillsburylaw.com
Texas Instruments, Inc. Texas Instruments, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation"
Officer/Director, Micron Technology, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Carroll +1 213 892 4972 +1 213 892 7731 lcarroll@luce.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cronin Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis J Byrne +1 714 505 9365 +1 714 505 3792 dbyrne@crolaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/12/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian C Chapman +1 714 505 9365 +1 714 505 3792 cchapman@crolaw.com
No Logo The Estate of Paul Maslin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Cooper Teraoka +1 213 680 6400 +1 213 680 6499 jill.teraoka@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by John D Edgcomb Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Edgcomb +1 415 399 1555 jedgcomb@edgcomb-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtney M LeBoeuf +1 415 399 1993 cleboeuf@edgcomb-law.com
No Logo The May Department Stores Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Mitchell Wieman +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 catherine.wieman@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kavita Paul Lesser +1 213 612 7347 klesser@morganlewis.com
No Logo The Sherwin-Willimas Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2008 JOSEPH C. OWENS +1 213 250 1800 owens@lbbslaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/28/2008 William C Steffin +1 213 250 7978 +1 213 250 7900 steffin@lbbslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aluyah Imoisili +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 aimoisili@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vannesa C Martinez +1 213 892 4443
No Logo Titan Corporation,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Allen +1 213 622 5555 +1 213 620 8816 jallen@allenmatkins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa M Prayongratana +1 213 622 5555 mprayongratana@allenmatkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Union Oil Company of California, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Erik Elliott +1 213 488 7511 mark.elliott@pillsburylaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/29/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J McNevin +1 213 488 7507 chrismcnevin@pillsburylaw.com
United Parcel Service United Parcel Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "United Parcel Service Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beverlee E Silva +1 404 881 7000 beverlee.silva@alston.com
No Logo Universal City Studios, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilchrist & Rutter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Yopp +1 310 393 4000 +1 310 394 4700 kyopp@gilchristrutter.com
No Logo Vopak Distribution Americas Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Schubert Barer (Anch)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie Reade Schenck +1 206 464 3939 lschenck@gsblaw.com
No Logo Walt Disney Pictures and Television, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilchrist & Rutter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald C Nanney +1 310 393 4000 dnanney@gilchristrutter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Yopp +1 310 393 4000 +1 310 394 4700 kyopp@gilchristrutter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Walt Disney Company, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2008 Marea M Suozzi +1 818 560 6454 Marea.M.Suozzi@Disney.com
No Logo Warner Lambert Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Weber Aircraft LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Higgs Fletcher & Mack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/06/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R Gibson +1 619 236 1551 +1 619 696 1410 gibsonm@higgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexis Sean Gutierrez +1 619 236 1551 +1 619 696 1410 agutierrez@higgslaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/06/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rahil Khosroabadi +1 619 236 1551

Toggle Switch Represented by Wulfsberg Reese Colvig & Firstman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Alan Colvig +1 510 835 9100
TERMINATED: 03/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W Reese +1 510 835 9100 creese@wulfslaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emmeline Thompson +1 510 835 9100 ethompson@wulfslaw.com
No Logo Yellow Freight Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lauchlan Kortum +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 jkortum@archernorris.com
No Logo York International Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanna & Morton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry G Gutterridge +1 213 628 7131 lgutterridge@hanmor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millhouse Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith F Millhouse +1 805 230 2280 kmillhouse@mlglaw.net
No Logo Yort Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen M Agnew +1 213 623 9300 +1 213 623 9924 kagnew@sonnenschein.com
Space Christopher E Prince +1 213 892 5049 +1 213 623 9924 cprince@sonnenschein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M Roberts +1 213 623 9300 groberts@sonnenschein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenwald, Pauly, Foster & Miller, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald E Chomiak +1 310 451 8001 +1 310 395 5961 dchomiak@gpfm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (1114) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1227 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1225 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1224 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1223 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1222 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1221 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Mail Returned
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1220 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1219 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1218 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1217 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1214 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Mail Returned
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1212 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Joinder
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1211 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Joinder
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1210 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1209 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1204 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1203 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Change of Address
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Joinder
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1198 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Joinder
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1197 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1196 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1195 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1192 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1191 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1190 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1187 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1186 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1185 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1184 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1180 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1179 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1178 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1177 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1176 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1169 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1159 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1157 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1155 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1137 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1136 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1135 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1134 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1062 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1050 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Amended Document (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1045 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1044 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE NOEs issued by Angeles Chemical Company filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. and John Locke (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Stone, Bret) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Barbara S. Benson on behalf of Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co. Filed by Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co (Benson, Barbara) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Scott D Mroz counsel for Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co. Filed by Defendant Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Mroz, Scott) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Sierracin Corporation, Yellow Freight Systems Inc joining in Status Report 911 . (McGaw, Peter) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER filed by Defendants International Rectifier Corporation, NMB Technologies Corp joining in Status Report 911 . (Cohen, Albert) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report 911 . (Evans, Gregory) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of address by Gregory Lawrence Evans attorney for Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. Changing attorneys address to 633 West Fifth Street, Floor Sixty Seven, Los Angeles, California 90071. Filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Evans, Gregory) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report 911 . (Redford, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders joining in Status Report 911 . (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation joining in Status Report 911 . (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report 911 . (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, re Status Report 911 served on 05/16/13. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Electronic Filing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 909 , Notice (Other) 907 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112), 908 e-mailed to ernie.hahn@lw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'#5.1.0 Address rejected.. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.Counsel are hereby notified that a status report must be filed by each party to this action no later than MAY 16, 2013. (ys) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 907 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Address. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS filed by Defendants Mattel Inc, Scripto-Tokai Corporation. (Hsiao, Peter) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER filed by Defendants NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Sierracin Corporation, Yellow Freight Systems Inc joining in Status Report 897 . (McGaw, Peter) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation joining in Status Report 897 . (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders joining in Status Report 897 . (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation joining in Status Report 897 . (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report 897 . (Redford, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report 897 . (Evans, Gregory) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER filed by Defendant International Rectifier Corporation joining in Status Report 897 . (Cohen, Albert) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF SERVICE filed by defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, Status Report served on 01/29/2013. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Omega Chemical PRP Group. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Joan Marie Wildman (Declaration of Service by Mail) re Notice of Appearance 895 filed by Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc. (Barreno, Colin) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Colin J Barreno on behalf of Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc (Barreno, Colin) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney John D Edgcomb counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Firm Name to Edgcomb Law Group, LLP. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Edgcomb, John) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael A.G. Einhorn counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Firm Name to Edgcomb Law Group, LLP. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary E Wilke counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Firm Name to Edgcomb Law Group, LLP. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Wilke, Mary) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael Raymond Jeffrey Mergens counsel for Defendant Mico Inc. Michael Raymond Jeffrey Mergens will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Michael Raymond Jeffrey Mergens is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Mico Inc. (Mergens, Michael) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that a status report must be filed by each party to this action no later than JANUARY 31, 2013. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ys) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of address by Laura Jean Carroll attorney for Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. Changing attorneys address to 1100 Glendon Avenue, Suite 1400, Los Angles, CA 90024-3503. Filed by Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. (Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Peter Hsiao counsel for Defendant Mattel Inc. Andrea L. Tozer will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Peter Hsiao (Hsiao, Peter) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF SERVICE filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 885 , Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 884 , Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 886 served on 10/04/2012. (Wilke, Mary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary E Wilke counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing firm name to Edgcomb Law Group, P.C.. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Wilke, Mary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael A.G. Einhorn counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Address to One Post Street, Suite 2100, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary E Wilke counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Changing Address to One Post Street, Suite 2100, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Wilke, Mary) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of address by Sandra L Tholen attorney for Defendant Shell Oil Company. Changing attorneys address to 725 South Figueroa Street, 31st Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017-5524. Filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Tholen, Sandra) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Bonni Fine Kaufman counsel for Defendant BASF Corporation. Filed by attorney BASF (Kaufman, Bonni) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mary El Wilke counsel for Defendant McKesson Corporation. Courtney M. LeBoeuf will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Courtney M. LeBoeuf is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Wilke, Mary) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc, re Notice (Other) 879 served on 5-4-12. (Partos, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE NOTICE OF JOINDER OF REED & GRAHAM INC. AND CERTAIN OTHER DEFENDANTS STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. (Partos, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER filed by Defendants International Rectifier Corporation, NMB Technologies Corp joining in Status Report,, 862 . (Cohen, Albert) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Nicole A Skolout counsel for Defendant Hexcel Corporation. Adding Nicole A. Skolout as attorney as counsel of record for Hexcel Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation (Skolout, Nicole) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joanne Lichtman counsel for Defendant Hexcel Corporation. Changing firm name and address to Baker & Hostetler LLP, 555 South Flower St., Suite 4200, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing e-mail and fax number to jlichtman@bakerlaw.com; fax 310.442.8887. Filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation (Lichtman, Joanne) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report,, 862 . (Evans, Gregory) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke, re Status Report 871 served on 04/30/12. (Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joinder in PRP Group Status Report filed by Defendants Del Mar Avionics Inc, NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc. (McGaw, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Stone, Bret) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report,, 862 . (Redford, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT w/Proof of Service filed by Defendants BP America Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Gurnick, David) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion) 865 Status Report Exhibit A Addtl Parties served on April 27, 2012. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to Status Report,, 862 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Status Report,, 862 4-26-12 served on April 26, 2012. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT 4-26-12 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting 859 Request to Substitute Attorney Bret Stone as attorney of record in place and stead of Attorneys Santino Michael Tropea, Jeffery Laun Caufield and Kenneth E James of Caufield and James, LLP for Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Co., Inc. & John Locke. (lom) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Bret Stone, Paladin Law Group LLP in place of attorney Jeffery Caufield, Caufield & James, LLP 859 served on 04/03/12. (Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST to Substitute attorney Bret Stone, Paladin Law Group LLP in place of attorney Jeffery Caufield, Caufield & James, LLP filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, John Locke. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting 856 Request to Substitute Attorney Melvin Teitelbaum, Esq. as attorney of record in place and stead of Attorneys Santino Michael Tropea, Jeffery Laun Caufield and Kenneth E James of Caufield and James LLP for Plaintiff Greave Financial Services Inc. (lom) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Greve Financial Services Inc, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Melvin Teitelbaum in place of attorney Jeffery Caufield Caufield & James, LLP 856 served on 03/26/12. (Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST to Substitute attorney Melvin Teitelbaum in place of attorney Jeffery Caufield Caufield & James, LLP filed by Plaintiff Greve Financial Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting 854 Request to Substitute Attorney Edward P. Sangster as attorney of record in place and stead of Attorney Belynda B Reck for Defendant Alcoa Inc. (lom) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST to Substitute attorney Edward P. Sangster in place of attorney Belynda Reck filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Reck, Belynda) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffrey D Wexler counsel for Defendants Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. Changing address & firm name to McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP, 300 S. Grand Ave., 14th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing e-mail to jwexler@mckennalong.com. Filed by defendant Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.) and Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation (Wexler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Laura Jean Carroll counsel for Defendants Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation. Changing firm name to Law Office of Laura J. Carroll. Changing e-mail to lauracarroll@ljcfirm.com. Filed by defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation), and Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation (Carroll, Laura) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jocelyn R Cuttino counsel for Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc. Jocelyn R Cuttino will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Jocelyn R Cuttino is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc. (Cuttino, Jocelyn) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeffrey D Wexler counsel for Defendant Gatx Terminals Corporation.Jeffrey David Wexler is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued as GATX Terminals Corporation) (Wexler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jill Cooper Teraoka counsel for Defendants McKesson Corporation, Seymour Moslin, Havery Sorkin, The Estate of Paul Maslin. Jill C. Teraoka will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Jill C. Teraoka is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants McKesson Corporation, Harvey Sorkin, Seymour Moslin, and the Estate of Paul Maslin (Teraoka, Jill) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: Attorney Patricia G. Stringel will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Patricia G. Stringel is no longer attorney of record in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Baxter Healthcare Corporation. (lom) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Disassociation of Counsel filed by defendent Appropriate Technologies II Inc. for Matthew J. Sanders (Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Paul Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Appropriate Technologies II Inc (Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Ernest John Hahn counsel for Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc.Patricia G. Stringel is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Latham & Watkins LLP (Hahn, Ernest) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents, RE: Notice (Other) 843 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Attorney Information (G-06). See our court's website for form. To efile this document, see category: Other Filings: Notices; for event: Change of Attorney Information (G-06). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co. (Dudley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Amber S Finch counsel for Defendant Hexcel Corporation. Changing firm name and address to Reed Smith LLP, 355 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2900, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing email and fax number to Email: afinch@reedsmith.com; facsimile: (213) 457-8080. Amber S. Finch will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Amber S. Finch is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Hexcel Corporation (Finch, Amber) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT and Joinder in Status Report of Omega Defendants [Doc. No. 826] filed in response to Court Order dated March 15, 2011 [Doc. No. 821] filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. (Dooley, Nathan) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company joining in Status Report,,, 826 . (Evans, Gregory) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion), Supplement (non-motion) 835 re Status Report served on March 31, 2011. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to Status Report,,, 826 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. (Yopp, Kevin) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Greve Financial Services Inc, John Locke. (Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Greve Financial Services Inc, John Locke. (Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER filed by Defendant Ohline Corp joining in Status Report,,, 826 . (Redford, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER filed by Defendant Datatronics Romoland Inc joining in Status Report,,, 826 . (Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER (McGaw, Peter) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER filed by Defendant International Rectifier Corporation joining in Status Report,,, 826 . (Cohen, Albert) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Status Report,,, 826 3-29-11 served on March 30, 2011. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT 3-29-11 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Siemens Medical Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Evelyn F Heidelberg counsel for Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation. Filed by Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation; Hitchi Home Electronics (America), Inc.; Signet Armorlite, Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 822 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Attorney Information (G-06). To efile this document, see category: Other Filings: Notices; for event: Change of Attorney Information (G-06). If you are unsure of the events, use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF menu bar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendant Applied Micro Circuits Corporation ; Hitchi Home Electronics (America), Inc.; Signet Armorlite, Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that a status report must be filed by each party to this action no later than March 31, 2011. (lom) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Amy P Lally counsel for Defendant Firmenich Incorporated.Brian Kelley Washington is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Firmenich Incorporated (Lally, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Amy P Lally counsel for Defendant Firmenich Incorporated. Adding Amy P. Lally as attorney as counsel of record for Firmenich Incorporated for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Firmenich Incorporated (Lally, Amy) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Gregory Evans, Integer Law Corporation, for Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company in place of Attorneys Aluyah Imoisili, Gregory Evans and Vannesa C. Martinez, Milbank Tweed Hadley & McCloy LLP 817 . (gk) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST to Substitute attorney Integer Law Corporation in place of attorney Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. Request set for hearing on 9/7/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Evans, Gregory) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. (Heck, Christopher) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting Requests to Substitute Attorney 563 564 565 . PLEASE NOTE: These Orders were docketed on 2/28/08 616 617 618 . This is a duplicate entry to administratively terminate pending Requests to Substitute Attorney. (kpa) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Denise G Fellers counsel for Defendants Air Products and Chemicals Inc, GSF Energy LLC, Teledyne Industries Inc, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. Adding Denise G. Fellers as attorney as counsel of record for Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., GSF Energy LLC, TDY Industries, Inc., Teledyne Technologies Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., GSF Energy LLC, TDY Industries, Inc., Teledyne Technologies, Inc. (Fellers, Denise) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Denise G Fellers counsel for Defendants Air Products and Chemicals Inc, GSF Energy LLC, Teledyne Industries Inc, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. Kavita Patel will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Kavita Patel is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., GSF Energy LLC, TDY Industries, Inc. and Teledyne Technologies Inc. (Fellers, Denise) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Donna Berg, Robert Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 810 served on 04/07/2010. (Byrne, Dennis) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Dennis J Byrne counsel for Defendants Donna Berg, Robert Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal. Adding Dennis J. Byrne as attorney as counsel of record for Robert Berg, Donna Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, and The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Robert Berg, Donna Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, and The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal (Byrne, Dennis) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Stipulation Re: Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against defendants Sorkin Parties, Joseph Sorkin and his Estate, With Prejudice 807 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter to enforce the terms of the written settlement agreement between the Parties and, also, Janyce Locke, with an effective date of January 5, 2010. (lom) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Greve Financial Services Inc, John Locke, re Stipulation for Order, 807 served on 04/01/10. (James, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Order RE: PLAINTIFFS' VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST MCKESSON, SORKIN PARTIES, JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE WITH PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiffs Angeles Chemical Company Inc, Greve Financial Services Inc, John Locke. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(James, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting 778 Defendants McKesson Corporation, Seymour Moslin, Harvey Sorkin, and the Estate of Paul Maslin's Motion for Approval of Good Faith of Settlement, Bar of Contribution and/or Indemnity Claims against settling Defendants, and applying the Uniform Comparative Fault Act, and Lifting of Stay Solely to Allow Permit the Filing of Claims of Dismissal for Settlement. The court further lifts the stay in this Action for the limited purpose of permitting Plaintiffs to file a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims against the Settling Defendants and Joseph Sorkin and his Estate within 10 days of the entry of this Order. (lom) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Chris C Chapman counsel for Defendants Robert Berg, Pearl Rosenthal, The Estate of Arnold Rosenthal. Chris C. Chapman will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Chris C. Chapman is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Robert Berg, Donna Berg, (Chapman, Chris) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, re Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 802 , Request for Judicial Notice,,, Request for Relief,, 803 served on March 11, 2010. (Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SETTLING DEFENDANTS' REPLY RE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE UNIFORM COMPARATIVE FAULT ACT, AND LIFTING STAY SOLELY TO PERMIT CLAIMS DISMISSAL filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant Ohline Corp. (Redford, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Reck, Belynda) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant Crosby & Overton Inc. (Prayongratana, Marissa) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendants Del Mar Avionics Inc, NCR Corporation, PolyOne Corporation, Reed & Graham Inc, Sierracin Corporation, Skypark Manufacturing LLC, Yellow Freight Systems Inc. (McGaw, Peter) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Boeing North American Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Harsco Corporation, Hexcel Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hubbel Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Ratheon Company, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Titan Corporation, Universal City Studios Inc, Van Waters & Rogers Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Non-Opposition to Motion,,,,,, 788 Written Statement Under L.R. 7-9b in Response... served on 3-09-10. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristen M Agnew counsel for Defendant Yort Inc. Kristen Michelle Agnew will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Kristen Michelle Agnew is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Yort Inc. (Agnew, Kristen) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure and Certification of Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation Pursuant to Rule 7.1 and LR 7.1-1 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation, (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure and Certificate of Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders Pursuant to Rule 7.1 and LR 7.1-1 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders, (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant Sigma Casting Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant International Paper Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Inglin, Sonja) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 WRITTEN STATEMENT UNDER L.R. 7-9(B) IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendants Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, Avery Dennison Corporation, BP America Inc, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Boeing North American Inc, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Harsco Corporation, Hexcel Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hubbel Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Johns Manville International Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc, Ratheon Company, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Safety-Kleen Systems Inc, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Titan Corporation, Universal City Studios Inc, Van Waters & Rogers Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 WRITTEN STATEMENT UNDER L.R. 7-9(b) IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant NMB Technologies Corp. (Cohen, Albert) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 WRITTEN STATEMENT UNDER L.R. 7-9(b) IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant International Rectifier Corporation. (Cohen, Albert) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time 783 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. IT IS ORDERED that all interested parties are hereby given an additional one week to file responsive pleadings re 778 . FURTHER ORDERED, that the moving DEFENDANTS reply pleadings are and shall be due on March 15, 2010. (lom) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, 783 served on 03-02-2010. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendants Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Harsco Corporation, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Lonza Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Quality Carriers Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extending Time for Response to GF Motion)(Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, re Motion Related Document,, 781 , Memorandum in Support of Motion,, 779 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 780 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 served on 2/19/2010. (Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF re MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of John D. Edgcomb In Support Of MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE 778 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement LEXIS case, # 2 Supplement LEXIS case, # 3 Supplement LEXIS case, # 4 Supplement LEXIS case, # 5 Supplement LEXIS case, # 6 Supplement LEXIS case)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of SETTLING DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT, BARRING CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS AND JOSEPH SORKIN AND HIS ESTATE, APPLYING THE UNIFORM COMPARATIVE FAULT ACT, AND LIFTING THE STAY SOLELY TO PERMIT FILING CLAIMS DISMISSAL filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: The Court has considered the ex parte application by Defendant McKesson Corporation to shorten time to consider a motion to lift the stay for the limited purpose of allowing a motion to determine good faith settlement and related issues and its motion to lift the stay for the limited purpose of allowing a motion to determine good faith settlement and related issues. It is Ordered that the ex parte application and the motions be, and hereby are Granted 769 , 770 , 772 . (lom) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application to Lift Stay on Case 768 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation, re MOTION to Lift Stay re LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 772 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, 773 , MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 770 , Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, 771 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 774 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 served on 2/2/2010. (Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of JOHN D. EDGCOMB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Lift Stay re LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 772 , MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 770 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 773 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Lift Stay re LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 772 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 770 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES 769 filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing MCKESSONS MOTION FOR ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation.(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Lift Stay re: LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT AND RELATED ISSUES filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation.(Einhorn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha counsel for Defendant Gambro Inc.Kelly M. Morrison is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gambro, Inc. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alexis Gutierrez in place of attorney Charles W. Reese 763 . Substituting attorney Alexis Sean Gutierrez for Weber Aircraft LP in place and stead of attorney Mark Alexander Stump; Emmeline Thompson; Timothy A Colvig and Charles W Reese of Wulfsberg Reese Colvig & Firstman. (lom) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristen M Agnew counsel for Defendant Yort Inc. Adding Kristen M. Agnew as attorney as counsel of record for Yort, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Yort, Inc. (Agnew, Kristen) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Weber Aircraft LP, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alexis Gutierrez in place of attorney Charles W. Reese 763 served on 2/23/09. (Reese, Charles) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alexis Gutierrez in place of attorney Charles W. Reese filed by defendent Weber Aircraft LP. (Attachments: # 1 Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Reese, Charles) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joseph M Parker counsel for Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc. Filed by Defendant Maxwell Technologies Inc. (Parker, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristina Starr Azlin counsel for Defendant BASF Corporation.Alex R. Bagdassarian is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant BASF Corporation (Azlin, Kristina) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 760 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, denying Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company, Inc's Motion to Lift Stay of case and leave to file first amended complaint 668 , 693 . (lom) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Michael J. Partos in place of attorney Huey P. Cotton 758 . Substituting attorney Michael J Partos for Reed & Graham Inc in place and stead of Huey P. cotton. (lom) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST to Substitute attorney Michael J. Partos in place of attorney Huey P. Cotton filed by Defendant Reed & Graham Inc. Request set for hearing on 9/29/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Partos, Michael) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Proof of Service (subsequent document) RE: Motion Related Document 749 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder (Motion related) RE: Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 735 . For correct event, see Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr Granting Amended APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID 752 on 8/18/08 by Richard A. Horsch to appear on behalf of Defendant Gambro Inc. Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha is designated as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Christopher J McNevin counsel for Defendants Texaco Inc, Union Oil Company of California. Christopher J. McNevin will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Christopher J. McNevin is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Texaco Inc. and Union Oil Company of California (McNevin, Christopher) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Gambro Inc, re Amended APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. 752 served on 08/26/2008. (Morrison, Kelly) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by defendant Gambro Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Kelly) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Gambro Inc, re APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. 750 served on 08/14/08. (Morrison, Kelly) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Richard A. Horsch for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by defendant Gambro Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Kelly) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE re MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION filed by Defendants BP America Inc, Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Holzer, Stephen) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: The caption of your docket entry and the document filed should be worded the same, RE: MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition 723 ; MOTION for Joinder 724 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Joinder (Motion Related) RE: Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 721 . Please do not use response. For correct event, see Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related). Your document should read the same as your docket entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc, re Reply (Motion related) 744 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 745 served on August 11, 2008. (Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of SANTINO M. TROPEA in SUPPORT of MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8-9, # 2 Exhibit 10-14)(Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 744 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in SUPPORT of MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 filed by Plaintiffs John Locke, Greve Financial Services Inc, Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Caufield, Jeffery) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER in MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 Notice of Joinder of Defendants Applied Micro Circuits Corporation's and Hitachi Home Electronics (America)'s in Omega Group Parties' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, Plaintiff Angeles Chemical Company Inc. (Heidelberg, Evelyn) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Joinder RE: Request for Joinder, 719 , 718 . Your filed document caption read as "Notice of Joinder" and the docket entry is a "Request." The Document caption and the the docket entry should almost read the same. The event selected should also be the same or related. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Joinder RE: Joinder (non-motion), 715 . There is a specific event for this document. This is a Motion related document, please use the "Notice of Joinder (Motion Related)" event found under Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related). Please do not use the Joinder (non-Motion) found in Other filings. Also, your docket entry should be similar or the same as the document caption. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Joinder RE: 704 , 699 , 695 , 690 , 691 , 698 . Please do not use the joinder found under Other Filings: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion). There is a specific event for this document. This is a Motion related document, please use the "Notice of Joinder (Motion Related)" event found under Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation, Gatx Terminals Corporation, Johns Manville International Inc, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, 677 Proof of Service of Notice of Joinder of Defendants Johns Manville (erroneously sued herein as Johns Manville International, Inc.), Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC (erroneously sued herein as GATX Terminals Corporation), and Texas Instruments Tucson Corporation in Omege Group Parties' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay [Docket 677] served on 8/8/08. (Wexler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER filed by Defendant Crosby & Overton Inc joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 . (Prayongratana, Marissa) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Joinder. RE: Joinder (non-motion) 684 , 687 , 685 , 686], 682 , 680 , 689 , 688 , 681 . There is a specific event for this document. This is a Motion related document, please use the "Notice of Joinder (Motion Related)" event found under Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Joinder (Motion Related). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Change of Attorney Information (G-06) RE: Notice (Other) 673 . Please do not use Notice (Other). There is a specific event for this document. For correct event, see Other Filings: Notices for Change of Attorney Information (G-06). Also, document text image is unreadable. This document has to be refiled. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO LIFT STAY OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 filed by Defendant FHL Group. (Smith, Diane) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Applied Micro Circuits Corporation, Hitachi Home Electronics (America) Inc, re Joinder (non-motion), Joinder (non-motion) 689 served on 08/05/2008. (Heidelberg, Evelyn) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Siemens Medical Systems Inc, re Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, 726 served on 08/05/08. (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Siemens Medical Systems Inc, re Notice of Appearance 725 served on 08/05/08. (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Pacific Gas & Electric Co, re Notice of Appearance 692 served on 08/05/08. (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Richhold Inc, re Declaration (Motion related) 696 served on 08/08/05. (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Richhold Inc, re Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, 694 served on 08/08/05. (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP, re Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, 720 served on 8/5/2008. (Reese, Charles) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 filed by Defendant Arlon Adhesives & Film. Request set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (O'Neil, Stephen) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 filed by Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc. Request set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Keith F Millhouse on behalf of Defendant Siemens Medical Systems Inc (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders' Notice of Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Luxfer Gas Cylinders. (Alaverdi, Loura) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 Defendant International Paper Company's Notice of Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group, LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant International Paper Company. (Alaverdi, Loura) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 Defendant Eaton Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Defendants Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC and Omega Chemical PRP Group's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Alaverdi, Loura) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR JOINDER OPPOSITION re: Request for Joinder,, Request for Relief,,, 720 filed by Defendant Arlon Adhesives & Film. (O'Neil, Stephen) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 filed by Defendant Weber Aircraft LP. (Reese, Charles) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 Joinder in OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP's Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Alcoa Inc. (Biason, Diana) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 filed by Defendants Universal City Studios Inc, Walt Disney Pictures and Television. (Yopp, Kevin) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Van Waters & Rogers Inc, re Response in Opposition to Motion, 710 , Declaration (Motion related) 714 served on 08-04-2008. (Schenck, Leslie) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 and Decl. of Nicholas Kanter filed by Defendant Kimberly Clark Worldwide Inc. (Holzer, Stephen) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER filed by Defendant Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 . (Brugger, Gregg) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Leslie Schenck In Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 filed by Defendant Van Waters & Rogers Inc. (Schenck, Leslie) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER in MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< 683 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Southern California Edison Co. (Delorme, Lisa) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 and Decl. of Nicholas Kanter filed by Defendant BP America Inc. (Holzer, Stephen) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Omega Group Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Teledyne Industries Inc, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, Air Products and Chemicals Inc, GSF Energy LLC. Request set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Patel, Kavita) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 filed by Defendant Van Waters & Rogers Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Schenck, Leslie) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 704 PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY'S JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY served on August 4, 2008. (Tholen, Sandra) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 Joinder in Opposition of Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC [Docket Nos. 675-676] filed by Defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (O'Toole, Patricia) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Alpha Therapeutic Corporation, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 705 served on 8-04-08. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER in MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< 683 filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Willimas Company. (Evans, Gregory) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 filed by Defendant Alpha Therapeutic Corporation. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION Opposition re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY'S JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Tholen, Sandra) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related) 701 filed by defendant Firmenich Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Washington, Brian) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Lonza Inc, Rathon Corp, Remet Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Southern Pacific Transportation Co, Harsco Corporation, Tension Envelope Corp, Titan Corporation, Pacific Precision Metals Inc, Omega Chemical PRP Group LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, York International Corporation, Omega Chemical PRP Group, Avery Dennison Corporation, Bourns Inc, Calsonic Climate Control Inc, George Industries, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hubbel Inc, Huntington Park Rubber Stamp Company, Jan-Kens Enameling Company, Kolmar Laboratories Inc, Medeva Pharmaceuticals CA Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, Quality Carriers Inc, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 served on 8-04-08. (Gutterridge, Larry) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER in MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay/File First Amended Complaint filed by Omega Goup Defendants< 683 Notice of Joinder in Defendant Omega Chemical's Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Loma Linda University. (Lender, John) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 699 served on 08/04/2008. (Silva, Beverlee) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                opposition Joinder in Opposition by Omega Group Defendants re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc. (Silva, Beverlee) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER filed by Defendants NMB Technologies Corp, International Rectifier Corporation joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 . (Cohen, Albert) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Appropriate Technologies II Inc, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 687 served on AUGUST 4, 2008. (Sanders, Matthew) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Keith F Millhouse In Support of Joinder in Opposition to MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 filed by Defendants Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Richhold Inc. (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER filed by Defendants Ratheon Company, AlliedSignal Inc, Boeing North American Inc, Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation, Honeywell International Inc, Hughes Space and Communications Company, McDonnell Douglas Corporation joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 . (Feng, Wendy) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 676 filed by Defendants Pacific Gas & Electric Co, Richhold Inc. Request set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 675 filed by Defendant Gambro Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2008 at 08:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Keith F Millhouse on behalf of Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Co (Millhouse, Keith) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANT THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANYS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO LIFT STAY re MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 filed by Defendant Dow Chemical Company. (Landis, Ryan) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANTS UNION OIL OF CALIFORNIA AND TEXACO INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN OMEGA CHEMICAL PRP GROUP LLC, ET AL.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY IN OPPOSITION TO re: MOTION to Lift Stay re OF CASE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 668 FILED BY PLAINTIFFS ON 07/25/2008 - OPPOSITION 675 AND DECLARATION OF LARRY G. GUTTERRI