Donald Brown, et al v. Albertsons Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-05117
District Judge Florence-Marie Cooper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dike, Bronstein, Roberts & Cushman, LLP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Donald Brown"

Toggle Switch Represented by Arias Ozzello & Gignac LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A Ozzello +1 310 670 1600 +1 310 670 1231 mozzello@aogllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger and Marx

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Preston A Marx, III +1 805 566 9500 preston@bergermarx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chulak Shiffman Quisenberry and Drescher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra T Brathwaite +1 661 260 1149 +1 661 702 7985

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard V Mowrey Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Vincent Mowery +1 949 415 0172
No Logo Sau Yeung, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arias Ozzello & Gignac LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A Ozzello +1 310 670 1600 +1 310 670 1231 mozzello@aogllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger and Marx

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Preston A Marx, III +1 805 566 9500 preston@bergermarx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chulak Shiffman Quisenberry and Drescher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra T Brathwaite +1 661 260 1149 +1 661 702 7985

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard V Mowrey Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Vincent Mowery +1 949 415 0172
No Logo Thomas Lamore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arias Ozzello & Gignac LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A Ozzello +1 310 670 1600 +1 310 670 1231 mozzello@aogllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger and Marx

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Preston A Marx, III +1 805 566 9500 preston@bergermarx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chulak Shiffman Quisenberry and Drescher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra T Brathwaite +1 661 260 1149 +1 661 702 7985

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard V Mowrey Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Vincent Mowery +1 949 415 0172
v.
No Logo Aaron Brothers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Administaff, Defendant
No Logo Advance America, Defendant
No Logo Albertson's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alfred Dunhill Americas Limited, Defendant
American Eagle Outfitters American Eagle Outfitters, Defendant
No Logo Armani Exchange, Defendant
No Logo Autozone, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Barbeques Galore Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bath & Body Works, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bebe Stores, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Cost Plus Inc/ca/
No Logo Bernini, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bristol Farms, Defendant
No Logo Brookstone Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Buca Di Beppo Inc, Defendant
No Logo Burberry Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Burberry Limited"
No Logo Cache, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cafe Tu Tu Tango, Defendant
No Logo Carlton Cards Retail, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cathy Jean, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cost Plus World Market Inc, Defendant
Disney Worldwide Services, Inc. Disney Worldwide Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Domino's Pizza, -, Defendant
No Logo Eddie Bauer, Inc., Defendant
No Logo El Pollo Loco,inc., Defendant
No Logo El Portal Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Encore, Defendant
No Logo Escada (USA) Inc, Defendant
No Logo Express, Defendant
No Logo Frederick's Of Hollywood, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FRY'S ELECTRONICS, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gblsons Markets, Defendant
Guess Guess, Defendant
Officially listed as "Guess? Inc"
No Logo Gymboree Retail Stores Inc, Defendant
No Logo Hard Rock Cafe International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo In-n-out Burgers, Defendant
No Logo Island Rhythms (Beach Access), Defendant
No Logo Jack In The Box Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jacmar Companies,, Defendant
No Logo Jamba Juice Company, Defendant
No Logo Johnston & Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Knott's, Defendant
No Logo Kohls, Defendant
No Logo Krispy Kreme Doughnut Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Landrys Restaurants, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lane Bryant, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lenscrafters, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lerner New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Linens-N-Things, Defendant
No Logo Liz Claiborne, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucky Brand Dungarees Stores Inc, -, Defendant
No Logo Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Madden Retail Inc, Defendant
No Logo Manpower Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mattress Discounters Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Mervyn's California, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Fields' Original Cookies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ninety-nine Cents Only Stores, Defendant
No Logo Office Depot, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Origins Natural Resources Inc., Defendant
No Logo Payless Shoesource, Inc., Defendant
Pep Boys Pep Boys, Defendant
Officially listed as "Pep Boys Inc"
No Logo Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo P.f. Chang's China Bistro, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pizza Hut, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Polo Retail Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pottery Barn, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Prada Usa Corp., Defendant
No Logo Ramada Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Ramada Limited"
No Logo Red Robin Burger and Spirits Emporiums, Defendant
No Logo Ritz Camera Centers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Robeks Juice Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Robinsons-May Inc, Defendant
No Logo Ross Stores, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ruby's Diner, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Saks Fifth Avenue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchalter Nemer Fields & Younger, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Chinski +1 213 891 0700 +1 213 896 0400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan McDermott Mercer +1 213 891 0700

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Marie LaMar +1 213 891 0700 mlamar@loeb.com
No Logo Sam Goody, Defendant
No Logo Savon, Defendant
No Logo Shoe Pavilion Inc, Defendant
No Logo Spencer Gifts, Defendant
Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Structure, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Swatch Group (u.s.) Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Talbots, Inc.,, Defendant
Officer/Director, D M Management Co
No Logo Talent Tree, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Athlete's Foot Stores, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Body Shop International Plc, Defendant
No Logo The Coffee Bean International Inc, Defendant
No Logo The Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Limited"
No Logo The Limited Too, Defendant
No Logo Tony Roma's, Defendant
No Logo Toys "r" Us, Defendant
No Logo Travelodge Hotels, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Universal Studios, Inc. &, Defendant
Officially listed as "Universal Studios Inc"
No Logo Victoria's Secret Stores, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wendy's International, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Tim Hortons Inc.
No Logo Williams-sonoma, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wilsons Leather Holdings Inc, Defendant
No Logo Yankee Candle Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Yoshinoya Franchise of North America Inc, Defendant
No Logo Yves Saint Laurent America Inc, Defendant
No Logo Z'Tejas Partners Ltd, Defendant
No Logo Zale Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) before Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: ORDER remanding action to Los Angeles Superior Court (Case number BC 294155 , terminating case (MD JS-6). CR: Not Reported (cc: Order and Docket sheet to State Court) (jp) (Entered: 08/04/2003)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
    RESPONSE by defendant Saks Fifth Avenue to standing order [3-1] (bp) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
      STANDING ORDER requiring submission of information regarding removal by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper (bp) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiffs Donald Brown, Thomas Lamore, Sau Yeung (rrey) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendant Saks Fifth Avenue from Superior Court of the State of California, Los Angeles County, Central District (Case Number: BC294155) with conformed copy summons and complaint referred to Discovery Andrew J. Wistrich. (rrey) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 185 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?