Michael Chaleff v. Bernard L Madoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-08260

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 2:09 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Michael Chaleff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve W. Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hbsslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee M Gordon +1 213 330 7150 +1 213 330 7152 lee@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com
v.
No Logo Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bernard L Madoff Investment Securities"
Madoff, Bernard L. Madoff, Bernard L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bernard L. Madoff"
No Logo Stanley Chais, Defendant
No Logo The Brighton Company, Defendant
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Michael Chaleff. Dismissal is Without. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court fully adheres to Rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure which requires that the Rules be construed to secure the just, speedy and inexpensive determinationof every action. Counsel should also be guided by the following special requirements: [SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.] (ake) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Steve W Berman for Plaintiff Michael Chaleff. (ghap) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Chaleff. (ghap) (ds). (Entered: 12/18/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008
          COMPLAINT against Defendants Bernard L. Madoff, Bernard L Madoff Investment Securities, Stanley Chais, The Brighton Company. (Filing fee $ 350: FEE PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Michael Chaleff.(ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2008: # 1 Summons) (ds). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2008: # 2 Notice of Assignment, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 43 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?