Express, LLC v. Forever 21, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-04514
District Judge Otis D Wright, II, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Express, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchalter Nemer Fields & Younger, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell L Allyn +1 213 891 0700 +1 213 896 0400 rallyn@buchalter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey H Kapor +1 213 891 0700 +1 213 896 0400 jkapor@buchalter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Colucci & Umans, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Pampalone, III +1 212 935 5700 +1 212 935 5728 mpampalone@colucci-umans.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janice K Yoon +1 212 935 5700 +1 212 935 5728 jyoon@colucci-umans.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diana M Torres +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 diana.torres@kirkland.com
v.
No Logo Do Won Chang, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F Gookin +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 rgookin@raklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Meyer +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 nmeyer@raklaw.com
No Logo Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F Gookin +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 rgookin@raklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Meyer +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 nmeyer@raklaw.com
No Logo Forever, Defendant
Officially listed as "Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,"

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F Gookin +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 rgookin@raklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Meyer +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 nmeyer@raklaw.com
No Logo Forever 21, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F Gookin +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 rgookin@raklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Meyer +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 nmeyer@raklaw.com
No Logo Jin Sook Chang, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F Gookin +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 rgookin@raklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Meyer +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 nmeyer@raklaw.com
No Logo Steps Apparel Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee Lau & Ko Attorneys at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angie S Lee +1 818 993 2125 +1 818 647 0421 alee@llkattorneys.com
No Logo White Owl Clothing, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hamitoniplaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa Wagner Middlebrook +1 213 896 2400 +1 213 896 2450

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Starr Azlin +1 213 896 2400 +1 213 896 2450 kristina.azlin@hklaw.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (202) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: denying Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc Motion To Correct Order on White Owl's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Full Costs 197 . (lc) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: re: MOTION to Correct Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 196 MOTION to Correct Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 197 . The hearing on the above-referenced motion, scheduled for January 24, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby VACATED. The matter stands submitted. An order will issue. (rne) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE Appellant's Amended Statement of Issues To Be Raised On Appeal filed by Plaintiff/Appellant Express, LLC. (Torres, Diana) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
        FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by plaintiff-appellant Express, LLC. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 175 Filed On: 09/30/10; Entered On: 09/30/10; (Torres, Diana) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Diana M Torres on behalf of Plaintiff Express, LLC (Torres, Diana) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 197 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Correct Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,, 196 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Theresa Middlebrook, # 3 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
              LREF
              Blank 196 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright, II: the Court GRANTS Defendants Motions for Attorneys Fees in whole or in part 172 , 74 , 182 . Accordingly, Forever 21 is entitled to: (1) $510,608.00 in attorneys fees; and (2)$19,376.71 in costs. Steps Apparel, Inc. is entitled to: (1) $48,763.50 in attorneys fees; and (2) $1,199.00 in costs. Finally, White Owl is entitled to: (1) $121,157.82 in attorneys fees; and (2) $3,674.38 in expenses incurred in defending this action. (lc) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: re: MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS 172 , MOTION for Attorney Fees 182 , MOTION for Attorney Fees 174 . The hearing on the above-referenced motions, scheduled for November 8, 2010 at 1:30 p.m., is hereby VACATED. The matters stand submitted. An order will issue. (rne) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Theresa Middlebrook in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees 182 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 14432.76 in favor of Forever 21, Inc. et al. and against Express, LLC. RE: APPLICATION to Tax Costs against Express, LLC Re: Judgment, 170 , 177 , 183 , 174 , 182 , 181 (mb) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 192 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                      REPLY IN SUPPORT MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS 172 filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration NATHAN D. MEYER, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                        LREF
                        Blank 191 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                        REPLY in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees 182 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Theresa Middlebrook)(Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                          LREF
                          Blank 190 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                          REPLY MOTION for Attorney Fees 174 Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert A. Levinson in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 2 Declaration of Angie S. Lee in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees)(Lee, Angie) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                            LREF
                            Blank 189 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Attorney Fees 182 by White Owl Clothing, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frank J. Colucci in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Exhibits 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7-10 to Colucci Declaration)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                              LREF
                              Blank 188 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Attorney Fees 174 by Steps Apparel Group, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frank J. Colucci in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Exhibits 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7-10 to Colucci Declaration)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                LREF
                                Blank 187 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS 172 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Frank J. Colucci in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Exhibits 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7-10 to Colucci Declaration)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 186 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 175 filed by Express, LLC ; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56554. (dmap) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 185 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE Appellant's Statement of Issues To Be Raised On Appeal filed by Plaintiff/Appellant Express, LLC. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: N/A; Court Reporter: N/A; Court of Appeals Case Number: 10-56554; Re: 175 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                        Amended APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against PLAINTIFF Express, LLC filed by Defendants Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Jin Sook Chang. Application set for hearing on 10/21/2010 at 01:00 PM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: # 1 AMENDED PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 182 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/8/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Theresa Middlebrook, Exhibits A-P, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Isaac Saul, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                            APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Express, LLC filed by Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 10/21/2010 at 01:30 PM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit A)(Lee, Angie) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. OF CORRECTED HEARING DATE RE: APPLICATION TO THE CLERK TO TAX COSTS (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-56554, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 175 as to Plaintiff Express, LLC. (lr) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to Tax Costs against Express, LLC Re: Judgment, 170 APPLICATION to Tax Costs against Express, LLC Re: Judgment, 170 177 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Hearing information incorrectly set before the Judge and has Judges courtroom. The correct event is: Application: Clerk to Tax Costs, at the scheduling screen select Clerk of the Court.Bill of Costs hearings are held onThursdays. Counsel is to re-notice the corrected hearing information. Room number no longer required - location is telephonic hearing. Counsel is to re-notice with the correct hearing location. Note: Clerk has ONLY termed the erroneous hearing set before the Judge. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    APPLICATION to Tax Costs against Express, LLC Re: Judgment, 170 filed by Defendants Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Jin Sook Chang. Application set for hearing on 11/8/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                      REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 175 . (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by PLAINTIFF Express, LLC. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, 168 , Judgment, 170 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-7598134 paid.) (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/8/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Angie S. Lee in Support of Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 2 Appendix Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Angie S. Lee in Support of Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Robert A. Levinson in Support of Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 5 Appendix Index of Exhibits, # 6 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Robert A. Levinson in Support of Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 7 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Robert A. Levinson in Support of Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 8 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Robert A. Levinson in Support of Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 9 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Robert A. Levinson in Support of Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 10 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Robert A. Levinson in Support of Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 11 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses)(Lee, Angie) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Continuing Erroneously Noticed Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs 172 (Filed 9/29/10) by Judge Otis D Wright II. The above-referenced motion was erroneously noticed for hearing on November 4, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. The Court hears civil motions on Mondays at 1:30 p.m. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby CONTINUED to Monday, November 8, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. (sch) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration LARRY C. RUSS, # 2 Appendix OF EXHIBITS, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Z, # 26 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 judgment) (lc) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Plaintiff Express, LLC take nothing, action be adjudged on the merits, that final judgment is entered in favor of all defendants Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc., Steps Apparel Group, Inc., White Owl Clothing, Inc., Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, 168 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Granting Defendants' [90, 93, 97] by Judge Otis D Wright II. For the foregoing reasons, White Owls motion for summary judgment 90 is GRANTED, Forever 21 and Steps motion for summary judgment 93 is GRANTED, and Expresss motion for summary judgment 97 is DENIED. Defendants shall lodge a proposed judgment forthwith. (See Order for Details). (sch) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims 97 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Express LLC's First Amended Complaint 90 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ENTIRE CASE 93 . The hearing on the above-referenced motions, scheduled for August 16, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby VACATED. The matters stand submitted. An order will issue. (rne) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER EXTENDING Time to Complete Mediation 164 by Judge Otis D Wright II. Good cause appearing, the Court orders as follows: The parties shall have until September 3, 2010 to complete mediation in the above captioned case. (sch) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Objection In Support Of re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Express LLC's First Amended Complaint 90 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File complete mediation filed by Defendant Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Objections - non-motion, 161 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  DECLARATION of Frank J. Colucci in support of plaintiff's reply memoranda re: defendants' oppositions to plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims 97 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (bp) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Michael Tower filed in support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY in support of White Owl Clothing, Inc. MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Express LLC's First Amended Complaint 90 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Theresa Middlebrook, # 2 Exhibit Objections to Evidence Submitted by Express in its Opposition to White Owl's Motion Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Responses to Express's Additional Unconverted Facts in Opposition to White Owl's Motion Summary Judgment)(Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims 97 Re: Defendant White Owl Clothing's Opposition to Express, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Tower in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Plaintiff Express, LLC's Responses to White Owl Clothing, Inc.'s Additional Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 3 Plaintiff Express, LLC's Additional Evidentiary Objections to Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims 97 Re: Forever 21 Defendants and Steps' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Tower in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Plaintiff Express LLC's Responses to Forever 21 Defendants and Steps' Additional Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 3 Plaintiff Express, LLC's Additional Evidentiary Objections to Forever 21 and Steps' Responses to Plaintiff's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Frank Colucci In Support of Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ENTIRE CASE 93 filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Declaration)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC of Declaration of Frank J. Colucci in Support of Plaintiff's Reply Memoranda re: Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 154 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Nathan D. Meyer in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Express' MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 part 2-1, # 2 part 2-2, # 3 part 3-1, # 4 part 3-2, # 5 part 4-1, # 6 part 4-2, # 7 part 5, # 8 part 6)(mg) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 153 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT-SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Ann Cadier Kim in Support of Defendants' Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment (mg) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 152 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT-DECLARATION of Michael J Pampalone, III in Opposition to Defendants' MOTIONS for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3)(mg) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT-PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT of DISPUTED FACTS and Conclusions of Law in Opposition to Forever 21 and Steps' Motion for Summary Judgment (mg) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 147 Application to File the Following Documents Under Seal: (1) Plaintiff's Statement of Disputed Facts and Conclusions of Law in Opposition to Forever 21 Defendants and Steps' Motion for Summary Judgment (2) Declaration of Michael J. Pampalone III by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 146 Application to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Ann Cadier-Kim by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 145 Application to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Nathan D. Meyer by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPLICATION to file under seal statement of undisputed facts and conclusions of law in opposition, declaration of Michael J Pampalone III in opposition to defendants Motion for summary judgment filed by plaintiff Express, LLC. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to file under seal: Supplemental declaration of ann Cadier-Kim in support of opposition to Express motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc., Forever 21, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Order for to file under seal: supplemental declaration of Nathan D Meyer, Steps Opposition to Motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc. Forever 21, Inc. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Express LLC's First Amended Complaint 90 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of FRANK J. COLUCCI IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 EXPRESS'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO WHITE OWL CLOTHING, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 3 EXPRESS'S SEPARATE STATEMENT RE: OPPOSITION TO WHITE OWL CLOTHING, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ENTIRE CASE 93 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF FRANK J. COLUCCI IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 EXPRESSS SEPARATE STATEMENT RE: OPPOSITION TO FOREVER 21 DEFENDANTS AND STEPS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims 97 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Theresa Middlebrook, # 2 Exhibit Statement of Genuine Issues)(Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related) 125 of Frank Colucci filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims 97 filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Genuine Issues)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC of (1) Plaintiff's Statement of Disputed Facts/Conclusions of Law in Opposition to Forever 21 defendants and Steps' Motion for Summary Judgment; Pampalone Declaration in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 136 (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc. of Notice of Lodging of Non-Paper Physical Exhibit in Support of Forever 21 Defendants' Opposition to Express, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc. of Supplemental Declarations of Nathan D. Meyer and Ann Cadier-Kim in support of Forever 21 Defendants' Opposition to Express, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment; Applications to File Under Seal; and [Proposed] Orders Granting Application to File Under Seal. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: re: Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings 118 . The Court has reviewed the settlement briefs filed by the parties. After consultation with the District Judge, the Court concludes that the parties have more than ample resources to retain a private mediator, and that utilization of the Magistrate Judge for purposes of a settlement conference would be an injudicious use of judicial resources. Consequently, the settlement conference scheduled for July 28, 2010 is VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to complete private mediation within 30 calendar days of the date of this Minute Order. (rh) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 131 Application to File Under Seal Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 132 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to file under seal uncontroverted facts and conclusions of law in support of defendants motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Express, LLC's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 129 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Nathan D. Meyer in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Ann Cadier Kim in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Forever 21 Defendants' and Steps' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 119 Application to File Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Frank J. Colucci in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 112 Express's Application to File Declaration of Frank J. Colucci in Support Under Seal by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 111 Application to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 110 Application to File Under Seal Portions of the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 109 Application to File Under Seal Declaration of Ann Cadier Kim in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 108 Application to File Under Seal Declaration of Nathan D. Meyer in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to file uncontroverted facts and conclusions of law in support of motion for summary judgment under seal filed by plaintiff Express, LLC. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Confidential Settlement Statement due by 7/21/2010, Settlement Conference set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton.) (rh) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Tara L. Cooper in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Express LLC's First Amended Complaint 90 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Having notified by both parties that they had erroneously efiled the abovedocuments which contain confidential information, the Court orders the clerk of the court to restrict the above documents from the public view. This order is made at the request of both parties.Restricting Public View on the following documents: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Forever 21 Defendants and Steps Motion for Summary Judgment 96 ;Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [ 96-1];Plaintiff Express, LLCs Memorandum of Points andAuthorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment[96-1]; and Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment [97-2]. (lc) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC of Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order Granting Application. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusion of Law and re Memorandum in Support of Motion 104 , Errata, 113 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. correcting Memorandum in Support of Motion, 96 Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusion of Law (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to file declaration of Frank J Colucci in support of plaintiffs motion for summary judgment under seal filed by plaintiff: Express, LLC. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to file its memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment under seal filed by plaintiff Express, LLC. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to file under seal portions of memorandum in support of defendants motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc., Forever 21, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to file under seal declaration of Ann Cadier Kim in support of defendants motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to file under seal declaration of Nathan D Meyer in support of defendants motion for summary judgment filed by defendant Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc., Forever 21, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 102 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Errata. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims 97 [REDACTED] filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law [REDACTED], # 2 Proposed Order)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. correcting MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims 97 (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ENTIRE CASE 93 REDACTED filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Do Wong Chang defendants MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ENTIRE CASE 93 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and missing and should have been submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc. of STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC of Applicaton to File Under Seal (re Colucci Declaration) and Proposed Order to File Under Seal. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 88 (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability as to all Defendants for all Claims filed by plaintiff Express, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum, # 2SEALED DOCUMENT- Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 3 Proposed Order)(Colucci, Frank) Modified on 7/15/2010 (lc). Modified on 7/15/2010 (lc). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT-MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ENTIRE CASE 93 filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED DOCUMENT-Exhibit UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSION OF LAW [REDACTED])(Meyer, Nathan) Modified on 7/15/2010 (lc). Modified on 7/15/2010 (lc). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of KEY CHU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ENTIRE CASE 93 filed by Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through C)(Lee, Angie) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC of Declaration of Frank J. Colucci in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to ENTIRE CASE filed by DEFENDANTS Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc. of Portions of Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Declarations of Nathan D. Meyer & Ann Cadier-Kim ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, Applications to File Under Seal and [Proposed]Orders Granting Applications to File Under Seal. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed attaching (1) Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law; and (2) [Proposed] Summary Judgment and/or Order of Summary Adjudication re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Express LLC's First Amended Complaint 90 (Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Express LLC's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, # 2 Declaration Theresa Middlebrook, # 3 Declaration Isaac Saul, # 4 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Otis D Wright, II, ORDERING ex parte for order modifying 10/9/09 scheduling order, extending discovery cutoff, memorandum, declaration submitted by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc. received on 6/30/10 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: G.O. 08-02 case designated for e-filing. (lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2010: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3) (lc). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc. of Non-Paper Physical Garment. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: denying 84 White Owl Ex Parte Application to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date. (lc) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in support First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 9/7/2010 84 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Azlin, Kristina) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 9/7/2010 84 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF FRANK J. COLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO WHITE OWL CLOTHING, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 9/7/2010 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Middlebrook, # 2 Supplement Declaration of Middlebrook, # 3 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc. of Ex Parte Application for Modification of Scheduling Order Extending Discovery Cut-Off. (Cooper, Tara) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/13/10 10:10am (Lopez, Margarita) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/13/10 10:10am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Huntington Court Reporters And Transcription Inc, phone number (626) 792-7250. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2010. (Lopez, Margarita) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH RESPECT TO DISCOVERY REGARDING PRIOR LITIGATION Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: Defendants Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. 63 Motion for Protective Order. Court Recorder: CS04/13/2010. (rp) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FURTHER DISCOVERY AND SANCTIONS. Denying 73 Motion for Sanctions; Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: The Court declines to order imposition of any sanctions at this time, without prejudice. If, however, Defendants fail to comply with this Order, Plaintiff may re-make its Motion for Sanctions. Court Recorder: CS04/13/2010. (rp) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 76 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. However, clerk NOTES: Document was e-filed again with the correct attachment, as docket entry # 77. Therefore NO response to this notice is required. (lc) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristina Starr Azlin counsel for Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. Adding Theresa W. Middlebrook (SBN 89709) as attorney as counsel of record for WHITE OWL CLOTHING, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant WHITE OWL CLOTHING, INC. (Azlin, Kristina) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kristina Starr Azlin counsel for Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc.. Adding Theresa W. Middlebrook (SBN 89709) as attorney as counsel of record for WHITE OWL CLOTHING, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant WHITE OWL CLOTHING, INC. (Azlin, Kristina) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: TENTATIVE DECISION: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FURTHER DISCOVERY AND SANCTIONSre: MOTION for Sanctions 73 , Supplement(Motion related) 69 . (See Order for Complete Details) (rp) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: denying 63 Motion for Protective Order. Based on the foregoing, Defendants Motion for Protective Order will be DENIED. This Tentative Decision is provided for the assistance of counsel in preparation for the hearing in this matter. It may not be cited in this or any other case for any purpose. No supplemental documents may be filed with the Court unless they are timely and in compliance with Local Rule 37-2.3. Courtesy copies of all supplemental documents will be delivered to chambers. If both counsel wish to submit on this Tentative Decision, they should notify the Court Clerk. The matter will be taken off-calendar, and a final decision will be issued consistent with this Tentative Decision. (Please See Order for Details) (rp) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 73 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Notice of Motion and Joint Stipulation Re: Defendants' Failure to Reovide Discovery, and Request for Award of Sanctions; Declaration of Frank J. Colucci in Support; Declarations of Larry C. Russ, Kal Raustiala and Chris Sprigman in Opposition Thereof. (mat) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Angie S Lee counsel for Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.. Changing address and firm name to Levinson Arshonsky & Kurtz, LLP, 15303 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1650, Sherman Oaks, CA 91403. Changing e-mail and fax number to alee@laklawyers.com; (818) 382-3433. Filed by Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc. dba Steps of CA (Lee, Angie) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 67 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: NOTICE: Change of Attorney Infomation (G-0 6). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Discovery regarding prior Litigation 63 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION to Seal 65 JOINT STIPULATION RE DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO PROVIDE DISCOVERY, AND REQUEST FOR AWARD OF SANCTIONS filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Norman Bell)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Discovery regarding prior Litigation 63 filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information filed by Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc.. (Lee, Angie) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING EXPRESSSAPPLICATION TO FILEPLAINTIFFS JOINTSTIPULATION RE: DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO PROVIDE DISCOVERY, AND REQUEST FOR AWARD OF SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF FRANK J. COLUCCI IN SUPPORT AND DECLARATIONS OF LARRY C. RUSS, KAL RAUSTIALA AND CHRIS SPRIGMAN IN OPPOSITION THEREOF UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting 65 Application to Seal APPLICATION to Seal 65 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the Plaintiffs Joint Stipulation Re: Defendants Failure to Produce Discovery, and Request for Award of Sanctions; Declaration of Frank J. Colucci in Support and Declarations of Larry C. Russ, Kal Raustiala and Chris Sprigman be filed under seal. The text and exhibits appended to the Joint Stipulation include information designated by the parties as Confidential and Confidential Attorneys Eyes Only under the terms of the Stipulated Protective Order entered in this case on January 15, 2010. (rp) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPRESS'S APPLICATION TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S JOINT STIPULATION RE: DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO PROVIDE DISCOVERY, AND REQUEST FOR AWARD OF SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF FRANK J. COLUCCI IN SUPPORT AND DECLARATIONS OF LARRY C. RUSS, KAL RAUSTIALA AND CHRIS SPRIGMAN IN OPPOSITION THEREOF UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. Lodged Proposed Order. (rp) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Protective Order for Discovery regarding prior Litigation 63 filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-K re JtStipulation, # 2 Exhibit L-P and RFJN re JtStipulation)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Discovery regarding prior Litigation filed by Defendants Do Won Chang, Jin Sook Chang, Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Forever 21, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/13/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff of Proposed Order re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 61 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC of Notice of Motion and Joint Stipulation re: Defendants' Failure to Provide Discovery, and Request for Award of Sanctions, Declarations of Frank J. Colucci, Larry C. Russ, Kal Raustiala and Chris Sprigman; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: The trial date, related pretrial hearing dates and deadlines in this case are hereby modified as follows: Last Date to Conduct Settlement Conference: 8/9/10;Last Date for Hearing Motions: 8/16/10 1:30 PM; Lodge and File Pretrial Documents: 9/7/10; Final Pretrial Conference: 9/13/10 3:30 PM; Deadline to File Motions In Limine, proposed voir dire questions and agreed to statement of case: 9/13/10; Hearing on Motions In Limine: 9/27/10 4:00 PM; Deadline to File Final Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation: 9/30/10; Jury Trial: 10/5/10 9:00 AM. (lc) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc., identifying White Owl Clothing, Inc.. (Azlin, Kristina) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 35 filed by Defendant White Owl Clothing, Inc..(Azlin, Kristina) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright II: Granting 56 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J. Pampalone, III on behalf of Plaintiff Express, LLC, designating Russell L. Allyn as local counsel. (sch) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney Michael J. Pampalone, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF JIN SOOK CHANG, DO WON CHANG, DERRICK KLUNCHOO AND DONNA HAMPTON by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting 44 Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition. (rp) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: DENYING 46 Ex Parte Application to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition (rp) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of JIN SOOK CHANG, DO WON CHANG, DERRICK KLUNCHOO and DONNA HAMPTON 44 filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of Derrick Klunchoo, Donna Hampton, Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, and Certain 30(B)(6) Categories 46 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of JIN SOOK CHANG, DO WON CHANG, DERRICK KLUNCHOO and DONNA HAMPTON 44 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Compel the Depositions of Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Derrick Klunchoo and Donna Hampton)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of Derrick Klunchoo, Donna Hampton, Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, and Certain 30(B)(6) Categories 46 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Ann Cadier Kim in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of Derrick Klunchoo, Donna Hampton, Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, and Certain 30(B)(6) Categories 46 filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Nathan D. Meyer in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of Derrick Klunchoo, Donna Hampton, Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, and Certain 30(B)(6) Categories 46 filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of Derrick Klunchoo, Donna Hampton, Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, and Certain 30(B)(6) Categories 46 filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of Derrick Klunchoo, Donna Hampton, Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, and Certain 30(B)(6) Categories filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc.. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Frank J. Colucci In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of JIN SOOK CHANG, DO WON CHANG, DERRICK KLUNCHOO and DONNA HAMPTON 44 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of JIN SOOK CHANG, DO WON CHANG, DERRICK KLUNCHOO and DONNA HAMPTON filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. ***NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT*** (ag) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc., (Lee, Angie) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 35 filed by Defendant Steps Apparel Group, Inc..(Lee, Angie) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Express, LLC, upon Steps Apparel Group, Inc. served on 12/21/2009, answer due 1/11/2010. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon Key Chu, Vice President. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: wrrong event: service of summons and complaint returned executed 30 days (for Freedom of Information cases only). Correct Event: ervice of Summons and Complaint returned executed, 21 days. RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) 37 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 35 filed by DEFENDANTS Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,.(Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC, upon White Owl Clothing, Inc. served on 12/17/2009, answer due 1/16/2010. The Summons and Complaint were served by substituted service, by Federal statute, upon Isaac Saul Flores, Agent for Service of Process. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC, identifying White Owl Clothing, Inc.; Steps Apparel Group, Inc. dba Steps of CA. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants White Owl Clothing, Inc., Steps Apparel Group, Inc., Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Does 1-10, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc., amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 Jury Demand,filed by plaintiff: Express, LLC (lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2009: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 exhibit C, # 4 exhibit D, # 5 exhibit E, # 6 exhibit F, # 7 exhibit G, # 8 exhibt H, # 9 exhibit I, # 10 exhibit J, # 11 exhibit K, # 12 exhbit L, # 13 exhibit M, # 14 exhibit N, # 15 exhibit O, # 16 exhibit P) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2009: # 17 issued summons) (lc). (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II, re Stipulation 33 : Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint upon issuance of this order and in compliance with General Order 08-02 and L.R. 3-2. (lc) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Amend Complaint)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: re: Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 29 . The Court received the above document filed on November 3, 2009. The Court's decision on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order is unchanged by the Supplemental Brief. (rh) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: DENYING 26 Motion for Protective Order with Respect to the Depositions of Do Won Chang and Jin Sook Chang. The hearing calendared for November 17,2 009 is HEREBY VACATED. (See minute order for details) (rh) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for WITH RESPECT TO THE DEPOSITIONS OF DO WON CHANG AND JIN SOOK CHANG 26 IN OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for WITH RESPECT TO THE DEPOSITIONS OF DO WON CHANG AND JIN SOOK CHANG 26 filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Nathan Meyer counsel for Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,. Filed by Defendant Forever 21, Inc., et al. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Protective Order for WITH RESPECT TO THE DEPOSITIONS OF DO WON CHANG AND JIN SOOK CHANG 26 filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Gookin, Robert) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for WITH RESPECT TO THE DEPOSITIONS OF DO WON CHANG AND JIN SOOK CHANG filed by Defendant Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gookin, Robert) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Protective Order)(Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright II: Jury trial: 9/21/10 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 9/16/10; hearing on motions in limine: 9/13/10 4:00 PM; Pretrial Conference: 8/30/10 3:30 PM; motions in limine, proposed voir dire questions and proposed voir dire questions and agreed to statement of case: 8/30/10; lodged Pretrial conference order and pretrial exhibit stipulation, file contentions of fact and law, exhibit and witness lists, status report regarding settlement, agreed upon set of instructions and verdict forms, joint statement regarding disputed instructions verdicts etc: 8/23/10; last date to conduct settlement conference: 7/26/10; last day for hearing motions: 8/2/10 1:30 PM; discovery cutoff: 7/5/10 last date to amend pleadings or add parties: 12/28/09. (lc) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II Granting the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp1)to Appear Before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton for settlement proceedings. (lc) Modified on 10/9/2009 (lc). (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Vacating Scheduling Conference by Judge Otis D Wright II. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. The Court has reviewed the report and deems a scheduling conference unnecessary. Accordingly, the scheduling conference presently scheduled for October 5, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby VACATED, and no appearances are necessary. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. (sch) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC.. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Wrong event: misc(report); Corrrect Specific Event: Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan RE: Report 19 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 26(F) JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Colucci, Frank) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 10/5/2009 at 01:30 PM; compliance with FRCP 26(f) and filing of report and other instructions. Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,, (Gookin, Robert) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc.,.(Gookin, Robert) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank J. Colucci on behalf of plaintiff Express, LLC, designating Jeffrey H Kapor as local counsel. (lc) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Janice K. Yoo on behalf of plaintiff Express, LLC, designating Jeffrey H. Kapor as local counsel. (lc) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David M. Dahan, on behalf of plaintiff Express, LLC, designating Jeffrey H. Kapor as local counsel. (lc) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney David M. Dahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Janice K. Yoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Frank J. Colucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STANDING ORDER regarding newly assigned cases by Judge Otis D Wright II (lc) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Wrong event: Notice (Other); Correct Specific Event: Notice: voluntary dismissal of parties. RE: Notice (Other) 7 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Dismissal of DOES 11 through 50, inclusive filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (Allyn, Russell) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Frank J Colucci for Plaintiff Express, LLC. (et) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney David M Dahan for Plaintiff Express, LLC. (et) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Janice K Yoon for Plaintiff Express, LLC. (et) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Express, LLC. (et) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. (et) (ds). (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Complaint - (Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Defendants Jin Sook Chang, Do Won Chang, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Forever 21, Inc., Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Forever 21 Retail, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Express, LLC. [Given Does Form.] (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2009: # 1 Exhibits A - I, # 2 Exhibits J - P, # 3 Summons, # 4 Notice of Assignment & Civil Cover Sheet) (ds). (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 333 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?