Kathryn Rideaux v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-05736
District Judge A. Howard Matz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 7:30 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kathryn Rideaux, Plaintiff
v.
CB Richard Ellis Group CB Richard Ellis Group, Defendant
Officially listed as "CB Richard Ellis Group Insurance Plan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Barger & Wolen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert K Renner +1 949 757 2800 +1 949 752 6313 rrenner@bargerwolen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKennon Schindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott E Calvert +1 949 387 9595 +1 949 464 9714 sc@mslawllp.com
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barger & Wolen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert K Renner +1 949 757 2800 +1 949 752 6313 rrenner@bargerwolen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKennon Schindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott E Calvert +1 949 387 9595 +1 949 464 9714 sc@mslawllp.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz GRANTING Stipulation for Dismissal of the Entrie Action, as to each and every defendant with prejudice 10, that this action be dismissed with prejudice, in its entirety, pursuant to stipulation of the parties and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Each party shall bear her/its own attorneys fees and costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Defendants CB Richard Ellis Group Insurance Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Renner, Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz. After reviewing the Stipulation 8 , that Defendants CB Richard Ellis Group Insurance Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company shall have an additional three weeks to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, such that a pleading filed on or before 10/18/2010 shall be deemed timely. (jp) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 18, 2010 filed by Defendants CB Richard Ellis Group Insurance Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Renner, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kathryn Rideaux, upon Defendant CB Richard Ellis Group Insurance Plan served on 8/12/2010, answer due 10/4/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Derek S. Whitman - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
            FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CB Richard Ellis Group Insurance Plan answer now due 10/4/2010, filed by Defendant CB Richard Ellis Group Insurance Plan.(Renner, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
              FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer now due 9/27/2010, filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Renner, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kathryn Rideaux, upon Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 8/5/2010, answer due 8/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margaret Wilson, Person Authorized to Accept Serivce of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  INITIAL ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz (se) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kathryn Rideaux. (et) (mg). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      COMPLAINT against Defendants CB Richard Ellis Group Insurance Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Case assigned to Judge A. Howard Matz for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff Kathryn Rideaux.(et) (mg). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 71 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?