William L Seay v. Richard Mitchell, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-06800
District Judge William J. Rea, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo William L Seay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dennis H Johnston Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/08/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis Harry Johnston +1 310 470 0915

Toggle Switch Represented by Emilio N Francisco Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emilio Nacin Francisco +1 949 474 2222

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark A Shoemaker Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/08/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Alan Shoemaker +1 562 498 9595 +1 562 494 8410 hoorapep@prismnetworks.com
v.
CB Richard Ellis Group CB Richard Ellis Group, Defendant
Officially listed as "CB Richard Ellis Investors"

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity EO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Eric Asch +1 310 966 5700 +1 310 966 5758 aasch@roll.com
No Logo Joe Enrique, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
No Logo LA Metromall LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
No Logo Lou Bennett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
No Logo Nema Jaycoe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
No Logo Rene Beiro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
No Logo Richard Mitchell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
No Logo Ron Wheatley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
No Logo Southern California Arizona Colorado and Southern Nevada Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
No Logo Thomas Metz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy M Walker +1 310 277 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchel Dean Whitehead +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss and Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Weiss +1 310 788 0710 +1 310 788 0735 tweiss@weisslawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wohlner Kaplon Phillips Young and Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Barsh +1 818 501 8030 wbarsh@wkpyc.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER dism actn purs FRCP 41(a)(1) purs to sttlmnt agreement; ea pty to bear own costs & atty fees by Judge William J. Rea terminating case (MD JS-6) (send) (lc) (Entered: 09/27/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
    ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney attorney Dennis H Johnston & Dennis H Johnston Law Offices for William L Seay by William L Seay and substituting attorney Emilio Nacin Francisco by Judge William J. Rea (lc) (Entered: 01/12/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: None
      ANSWER filed by defts Southern CA AZ CO, Richard - Mitchell, Thomas Metz, Nema Jayroe esa Nema Jaycoe, Rene Beiro, Joe Enriquez esa Joe Enrique, Lou Bennett, Ron Wheatley, LA Metromall LLC to amended complaint [21-1] (lc) (Entered: 12/26/2000)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER ans to 2nd A/C; no 2nd A/C on file & no ord allow 2nd A/C to be fld by Judge William J. Rea (lc) (Entered: 12/19/2000)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Judge William J. Rea GRANTING Dft CBRE's motion to dismiss 6th, 7th, 8th, 9th clms of A/C w/prej [25-1]; Seay has failed for a 2nd time to state any clm agnst CBRE (ENT 12/14/00) (SEND/NTC) (ir) (Entered: 12/14/2000)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
            MINUTES: Hrg on defts mot to dism hld; GRANT in part DENY in part Glaziers, Trustees & LA Metromall mot to dism; crt grns mot to dism 2nd, 34d, 10th cause of actn w/prej; 2nd & 34d cause of actn are time barred; 10th causes of actn duplcative of a clm prev dism, thus Crt will not fv Seay another chance to amd that clm; Crt denies mot to dism 4th, 5th cause of actn denied & Trustees mot to dism cmplt entirely as to them; crt Grants CB Richard Ellis Investors mot to dism [23-1]; ans to remaining clms shl be fld w/i 15 days; crt adopts tentative ruling (attached); deft to prep ord by Judge William J. Rea CR: Deborah Parker (lc) (Entered: 11/29/2000)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER denying stip cont defts mot to dism hrg by Judge William J. Rea (lc) (Entered: 11/20/2000)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: None
                REPLY BRIEF by defendants - Southern CA AZ CO, Richard - Mitchell, Thomas Metz, Nema Jaycoe, Rene Beiro, Joe Enrique, Lou Bennett, Ron Wheatley, LA Metromall LLC in suppt of motion to dismiss for failure to St a clm [23-1] (mch) (Entered: 11/08/2000)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: None
                  REPLY memo of P&A in suppt by defendant - CB Richard Ellis to motion to dismiss A/C [25-1] (lc) (Entered: 11/08/2000)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None
                    REQUEST by plaintiff William L Seay for judicial notice re in suppt of opps to motions to dismiss [25-1][23-1] (lc) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None
                      MEMO OF P&A IN OPPOSITION by plaintiff William L Seay to Glaziers defts motion to dismiss for failure to St a clm [23-1] (lc) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None
                        MEMO OF P&A OPPOSITION by plaintiff William L Seay to motion to dismiss 6th, 7th, 8th, 9th clms of A/C w/prej [25-1] (lc) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by defendant - CB Richard Ellis of motion to dismiss 6th, 7th, 8th, 9th clms of A/C w/prej [25-1] (lc) (Entered: 10/25/2000)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/13/2000
                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant - CB Richard Ellis to dismiss 6th, 7th, 8th, 9th clms of A/C w/prej ; motion hearing set for 10:00 11/13/00 (lc) (Entered: 10/25/2000)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: None
                              PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE by defendant - CB Richard Ellis on 10/23/00 memo in suppt of mot to dism A/C by lv at a conspicous place during office hrs (lc) (Entered: 10/25/2000)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendants Southern CA AZ CO, LA Metromall LLC to dismiss for failure to St a clm ; motion hearing set for 10:00 11/13/00; Memo of P/A; decl of Cindy M Walker in suppt (ir) (Entered: 10/11/2000)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER that crt's 8/28/00 tentative ruling grant in part & deny in part the mot to dism by So Calif, AZ, Co & So Nev Glaziers etc,, R Mitchell, T Metz, N Jayroe, R Beiro, J Enriquez, L Bennet, R Wheatly & LA MetroMall & grant CB Richard Ellis Investors mot to dism w/o prej by Judge William J. Rea (ENT 10/4/00) send/ntcs (lc) (Entered: 10/04/2000)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: None
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff William L Seay; jury demand. Summons issd (lc) Modified on 09/18/2000 (Entered: 09/18/2000)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      MINUTES: Hearing on defts motion to dism hld; defts mot to dism is ORD granted in part & denied in part; crt adops its tentatve ruling (attached); plf granted 20 days to amd cmplt; plf to prep ord [9-1] [7-1] by Judge William J. Rea CR: Deborah Parker (lc) (Entered: 08/30/2000)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: None
                                        REPLY brief by defendant - Southern CA AZ CO, defendant Ron Wheatley, defendant Richard - Mitchell, defendant Lou Bennett, defendant Nema Jaycoe, defendant Thomas Metz in suppt of motion to dismiss for failure to state a clm [7-1] (twdb) (Entered: 07/26/2000)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: None
                                          REPLY memo in supptby defendant - CB Richard Ellis to motion to dismiss the fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth eleventh clms [9-1] (lc) (Entered: 07/25/2000)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MINUTES: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE Crt's own mot hearing on motion to dismiss the fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth & eleventh clms [9-1], motion to dismiss for failure to state a clm [7-1] sched for 7/31/00 cont to 10:00 8/28/00; Orig briefing sched shall remain by Judge William J. Rea CR: Not Present (ir) (Entered: 07/24/2000)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/17/2000, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of William L. Seay by plaintiff William L Seay in suppt of opp to dfts Glaziers & Trustees mot to dism for failure to state a clm (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Mark Allen Shoemaker by plaintiff William L Seay in suppt of opp to dft CB Richard Ellis motion to dismiss the fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth & eleventh clms [9-1] (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM of P/A IN SUPPORT by plaintiff William L Seay of plfs opp to dft CB Rihard Ellis motion to dismiss the fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth & eleventh clms [9-1] (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM of PA IN SUPPORT by plaintiff William L Seay of plfs opp to dfts Glaziers & Trustees mot to dism for failure to state a clm. (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Mark Allen Shoemaker by plaintiff William L Seay in suppt of opp to dft CB Richard Ellis motion to dismiss the fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth & eleventh clms [9-1] (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION of William Seay by plaintiff William L Seay in suppt of opp to CB Richard Ellis motion to dismiss the fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth & eleventh clms [9-1] (twdb) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 (Related Case) filed. [ Related Case no.: CV 99-8045 WJR (CTx)] Case transferred from Judge Wm. M. Byrne to Judge William J. Rea for all further proceedings. , Case referred from Discovery Andrew J. Wistrich to Discovery Carolyn Turchin . The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge [ CV 00-6800 WJR (CTx)] (cc: all counsel) (kc) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant - CB Richard Ellis to dismiss the fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth & eleventh clms ; motion hearing set for 10:00 7/31/00 (twdb) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by plaintiff William L Seay of related case(s) CV 99-8045 WJR (CTx) (kc) (Entered: 07/06/2000)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Richard - Mitchell, defendant Thomas Metz, defendant Nema Jaycoe, defendant Rene Beiro, defendant Joe Enrique, defendant Lou Bennett, defendant Ron Wheatley, defendant LA Metromall LLC, defendant - Southern CA AZ CO to dismiss for failure to state a clm ; motion hearing set for 10:00 7/31/00 (twdb) (Entered: 07/05/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE by defendants to ptys of assignment to US Mag Judge (twdb) (Entered: 07/03/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant - CB Richard Ellis (mch) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                      Certification OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Richard - Mitchell, defendant Thomas Metz, defendant Nema Jaycoe, defendant Rene Beiro, defendant Joe Enrique, defendant Lou Bennett, defendant Ron Wheatley, defendant LA Metromall LLC, defendant - Southern CA AZ CO (twdb) (Entered: 06/30/2000)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE to Superior Crt of The State of Calif for Cnty of Los Angeles, Central Dist of removal of civil actn to USDC for the Central Dist of Calif by defendants (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2000)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                          JOINDER by defendant - CB Richard Ellis joining removal complaint [1-1] (twdb) (Entered: 06/28/2000)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendant Richard - Mitchell, defendant Thomas Metz, defendant Nema Jaycoe, defendant Rene Beiro, defendant Joe Enrique, defendant Lou Bennett, defendant Ron Wheatley, defendant LA Metromall LLC, defendant - Southern CA AZ CO from LA Cty Sup Crt( Case Number: BC 230580) with copy summons and complaint referred to Discovery Andrew J. Wistrich . (pc) (Entered: 06/28/2000)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 293 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?