Fred Kayne, et al v. MTC Electronic Tech, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:95-cv-00422
District Judge Stephen V. Wilson, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Stephen V. Wilson
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Fred Kayne, Plaintiff

Represented by John A Case Jr Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Allen Case, Jr. +1 310 203 3911 +1 310 203 3915 jcase@caseweblaw.com

Represented by Nagler and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence H Nagler +1 310 473 1200 +1 310 473 7144 lnagler@nagler.com
No Logo Lincoln Trust Company, Plaintiff

Represented by John A Case Jr Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Allen Case, Jr. +1 310 203 3911 +1 310 203 3915 jcase@caseweblaw.com

Represented by Nagler and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence H Nagler +1 310 473 1200 +1 310 473 7144 lnagler@nagler.com
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Merrill Lynch International Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch International
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, Infospace.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Fund Asset Management Lp
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Princeton Administrators Lp
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Officer/Director, Bank of America, NA
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Koll Real Estate Group Inc
Officer/Director, Uslife Income Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munivest Fund II Inc

Represented by John A Case Jr Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Allen Case, Jr. +1 310 203 3911 +1 310 203 3915 jcase@caseweblaw.com

Represented by Nagler and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence H Nagler +1 310 473 1200 +1 310 473 7144 lnagler@nagler.com
No Logo Milton Okun, Plaintiff

Represented by John A Case Jr Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Allen Case, Jr. +1 310 203 3911 +1 310 203 3915 jcase@caseweblaw.com

Represented by Nagler and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence H Nagler +1 310 473 1200 +1 310 473 7144 lnagler@nagler.com
No Logo Oppenheimer & Co., Plaintiff

Represented by Nagler and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence H Nagler +1 310 473 1200 +1 310 473 7144 lnagler@nagler.com
No Logo Rosemary Okun, Plaintiff

Represented by John A Case Jr Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Allen Case, Jr. +1 310 203 3911 +1 310 203 3915 jcase@caseweblaw.com

Represented by Nagler and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence H Nagler +1 310 473 1200 +1 310 473 7144 lnagler@nagler.com
No Logo Stephen Kayne, Plaintiff

Represented by Nagler and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence H Nagler +1 310 473 1200 +1 310 473 7144 lnagler@nagler.com
v.
No Logo Edilberto V Pozon, Defendant

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philippe Adler +1 212 833 1100 padler@fklaw.com

Represented by hdlawllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James K.T. Hunter +1 818 703 9494 +1 818 703 9495
No Logo Peter Jenson, Defendant

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Represented by hdlawllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James K.T. Hunter +1 818 703 9494 +1 818 703 9495
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (162) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiffs. (ir, ) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson :, RE: MOTION for Order for for entry of bar order and injunction; 159 is GRANTED.Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (yc, ) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
BAR ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson,NOW THEREFORE, it is hereby ordered that: Each of the plaintiffs and each of the Non-Settling defendants is hereby permanently barred, enjoined and restrained from commencing, prosecuting, or asserting any claim for indemnity or contribution against Geller.(see document). The settling defendants are hereby permanently barred, enjoined and restrained from commencing, prosecuting, or asserting any claim for indemnity or contribution against Geller. (see document). The court shall have and retain jurisdiction over the parties for all matters related to the administration, interpretation, effectuation, or enforcement of the settlement and this order. (yc, ) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
DECLARATION of David F. Berry re MOTION for Order for for entry of bar order and injunction; 159 filed by PLAINTIFF Fred Kayne. (yc, ) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION for entry of bar order and injunction; filed by plaintiffs Fred Kayne. Motion set for hearing on 4/2/2007 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Lodged ORDER. (yc, ) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ENTRY of Partial Final Judgment filed by defendants Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson, Goodwin Wang. (jp) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Fred Kayne, Oppenheimer & Co, Stephen Kayne, Milton Okun, Rosemary Okun, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, Lincoln Trust Company. Related Case(s): 2:06 MC 125 and CV 95-0488 SVW (rn, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceeding(s) filed by Plaintiffs Fred Kayne, Oppenheimer & Co, Stephen Kayne, Milton Okun, Rosemary Okun, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, Lincoln Trust Company. Related Case(s): Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC 363764 and MDL 1059 for the Eastern District of New York (rn, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
PATIAL FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson The court ORDERS that plaintiffs take nothing by their suit against the settling individual defendants. The court DENIES all relief not granted in this judgment, and directs the clerk to enter this a FINAL JUDGMENT as to the setting individual defendants. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated).(yc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Charles Avrith filed by Plaintiff Fred Kayne. re counsel's conference concerning questions raised by the court at the 12/11/2006 hearing on setting defendants motion for entry of a settlement bar order (yc, ) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson,NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby ordered that: A. For purposes of this order, settleing defendants refers to Messrs. Jensen, Pozon, and Wang, and their heirs, executors, administrators, successors, assigns, partners, limited partners, agents employees and attorneys and each of them. (see document for details). This order shall become effective upon the distribution of funds to plaintiffs and their counsel pursuant to paragraph 2.2.3 of the settlement agreement. (yc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2007 (lm, ). (Entered: 12/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson :, RE: MOTION for Order 146 . They are ordered to meet and confer and report back to the court by the end of the week. The motion is submitted.Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (yc, ) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of Bruce S. Kaplan in support of MOTION of defendants Peter Jensen,m Edilberto V. Pozon and goodwin Wang for entry of a settlement bar order.(yc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT by affiant: David F. Berry in support of motion for entry of settlement bar order sought by Peter Jensen, Edilberto Pozon, and Goodwin Wang. filed by Plaintiff Fred Kayne (yc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
DECLARATION of John N. Orsini filed by Defendant Peter Jenson. in support of the stipulation to vacate the 11/20/2006 status conference. (yc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICAITON FOR FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. filed by defendants Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. Lodged PROPOSEDORDER AND AFFIDAVT. (yc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of entry of order re stipulation filed by defendants Peter Jenson. (yc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT- NOTICE OF MOTION (yc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 145 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson : The parties entered into a stipulation and good cause having been shown it is hereby ordered that the settling defendants settlement bar order motion, memorandum of law and declaration with exhitibs which have been presented to the court for review, shall be filed under seal as shall all submissions in opposition to the further support of the settlement defendants motion.. (yc, ) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson : re The status Conference, Hearings 140 is vacated. (yc, ) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 9/18/06. Court Reporter: Stephen V. Wilson. (et) (Entered: 10/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 9/18/06 Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle (et) (Entered: 10/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson :, RE: MOTION for Order for exclude plaintiffs damages expert's report and preclude his testimony and for partial summary judgment and memorandum of points and authorities in support. 130 is moot and off calendar.Court Reporter: Not Available. (yc, ) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson :, Resetting Hearing as to Status Conference,, Reset Hearings, 133 Status Conference set for 11/20/2006 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.Court Reporter: Pam Seijas. (yc, ) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Allan Ray Friedman re 19 Notice of Transfer Back/Remand and Reopening Case (CV-56). (jp) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Fred Kayne, Oppenheimer & Co., Stephen Kayne, Milton Okun, Rosemary Okun, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., Lincoln Trust Company, of New Case Order 126 , was served on 9/13/2006. (gk, ) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson : re MOTION for Order for exclude plaintiffs damages expert's report and preclude his testimony and for partial summary judgment and memorandum of points and authorities in support. 130 ., Resetting hearing as to MOTION for Order for exclude plaintiffs damages expert's report and preclude his testimony and for partial summary judgment and memorandum of points and authorities in support. 130 Motion set for hearing on 10/30/2006 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.(yc, ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of entry of order on applicaton of non-resident attorney to appear in a specifif case. filed by defendant Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. (yc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
Position Paper filed by Plaintiff Fred Kayne. (yc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
POSTION OF PAPER OF DEFENDANTS PETER jENSEN EDILBERTO POZON AND GOODWIN WANG filed by Defendant Peter Jenson. (yc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson :, Resetting Hearing as to In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 124 Status Conference set for 10/4/2006 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (yc, ) (Entered: 09/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. correcting Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 131 (yc, ) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Bruce S Kaplan re MOTION for Order for exclude plaintiffs damages expert's report and preclude his testimony and for partial summary judgment and memorandum of points and authorities in support. 130 filed by defendants Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. (yc, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION exclude plaintiffs damages expert's report and preclude his testimony and for partial summary judgment and memorandum of points and authorities in support. filed by defendants Peter Jenson. Motion set for hearing on 10/23/2006 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (yc, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION of non-resident John N Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by defendant Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. Lodged proposed order. (yc, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ENTRY of Orders on Application of Non-Resident Attorneys to Appear in a Specific Case filed by defendants Goodwin Wang, Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. (jp) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by John Orsini as counsel for Defendant Peter Jenson, Approved by Judge Stephen V. Wilson.(yc, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson ; This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court fully adheres to rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure which requires that the rules be "construed to secure the just speedy and inexpensive determination of every action.(yc, ) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, GRANTING APPLICATION for attorney Bruce S Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. 121 (shb, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court sets a Status Conference for 9/18/2006 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson, each side is ordered to file, one week before the conference, a positionpaper no more than 15 pages in length.Court Reporter: N/A (shb, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, GRANTING APPLICATION for attorney Emily A Stubbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. 120 (shb, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, GRANTING APPLICATION for attorney Philippe Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. 119 (shb, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Bruce S Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by Defendants Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. Lodged proposed order. (shb, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Emily A Stubbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by Defendants Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. Lodged proposed order. (shb, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Philippe Adler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by Defendants Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. Lodged proposed order. (shb, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 93 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 92 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 91 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 90 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 89 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 88 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 87 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 86 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 85 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 84 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 83 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 82 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 81 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James K T Hunter on behalf of Defendants Edilberto V Pozon, Peter Jenson. (jp) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 80 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 79 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 78 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 77 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 76 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 75 of 93 filed by plaintiff Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 74 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 72 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 71 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Stephen Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 70 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 69 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 68 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 67 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 66 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 65 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 64 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 63 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 62 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 61 of 93 filed by plaintiff Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 60 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 59 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 58 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 57 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 56 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 55 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 54 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 53 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 52 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 51 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 50 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 49 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 48 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 47 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 46 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 45 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 44 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 43 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 42 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 41 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 40 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 39 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 38 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing recored Volume 37 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 36 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 35 of 93 filed by plaintiff Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 34 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 33 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 32 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 31 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 30 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing recorcd Volume 29 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 28 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 27 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 26 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 25 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 24 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 23 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 22 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 21 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 20 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 19 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 18 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 17 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 16 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 15 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 14 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 13 of 93 filed by plaintiff Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 12 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 11 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 10 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 9 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 8 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 7 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 6 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 5 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 4 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 3 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 2 of 93 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing record Volume 1 of 92 filed by plaintiffs' Fred Kayne. (bp, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
Letter from Eastern District of New York. (yc, ) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 5/8/2006 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:95-cv-02499-JG-ASC from Eastern District of New York at Brooklyn. Case assigned to Clerk of Court for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with MDL1059.(yc, ) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Howard Sirata re 19 Notice of Transfer Back/Remand and Reopening Case (CV-56), and Conditional Remand Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 1059, attempted - not known, unable to forward. (gk, ) (Entered: 08/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Ronald G. Blum re 19 Notice of Transfer Back/Remand and Reopening Case (CV-56), and Conditional Remand Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 1059, attempted - not known, unable to forward. (gk, ) (Entered: 08/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
MAIL RETURNED addressed to Eric Anders Tirschwell regarding Notice of Transfer Back/Remand and Reopening Case (CV-56) 19 (ir, ) (Entered: 08/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF TRANSFER/Remand and Reopening of Case. This action has been TRANSFERRED BACK, to this court from the USDC OF NEW YORK, case number 1:95-CV-2499-JG-ASC. The case has been reopened and assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge CHARLES F. EICK. (REOPENED, MD-JS5) (yc, ) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: None
ORDER frm MDL Panel tht purs to 28 USC 1407 this cse be trans to the Eastern District of New York & w/the consent of tht crt, assigned to the Honorable John Gleeson. Case transferred to Dist of: New York (ENT 6/19/95) MD JS-6 MLD CPYS (jc) (Entered: 06/19/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/12/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Danielle Bickford by plfs re proof of svc of sms & complaint on Miko Leung & Sit Wa Leung. [See document re attempts to make proper svc on dfts.] (gk) (Entered: 05/15/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Danielle Bickford by plfs re proof of svc of summons & complaint upon Edilberto V. Pozon, Peter Jensen [8-1], Thomas Lenagh, Charles Lo, Robert Farr [7-1], Li Kam Chung [9-1], Ugo Doninelli [11-1], & Reynaldo David [10-1]. [Declarant states that, "My understanding is that Friedman & Kaplan represents all 8 dfts (dfts Li Kam Chung, Reynaldo David, Ugo Doninelli, Robert Farr, Peter Jensen, Thomas Lenagh, Charles Lo, & Edilberto V. Pozon). I told Mr. Adler that I understood he was accepting svc on behalf of the 8 individual dfts & he responded that he was." Purs to Mr. Philippe Adler's (of Friedman & Kaplan) instructions, declarant served dfts by mailing a copy of summons & complaint to Friedman & Kaplan on 3/22/95.] (gk) (Entered: 05/05/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION & PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (gk) (Entered: 04/22/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/12/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATION of John A. Case, Jr. by plfs in suppt of stip & ord effecting svc of sms & cmp upon dfts Li Kam Chung, Reynaldo David, Ugo Doninelli, Robert Farr, Peter Jensen, Thomas Lenagh, Charles Lo, & Edilberto V. Pozon; extending time to resp to cmp; & providing access to discov in another case. (gk) (Entered: 04/22/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson granting dft MTC Electronic Technologies, Co., Ltd's ex parte application for an ord extending the date by which MTC must ans or otherwise resp to cmp [4-1] to either 6/15/95; or, if the judicial panel on Multidistrict Litigation has not ruled by 6/1/95 on the mot presently bef it to transfer this actn to the Eastern District of New York purs to 28 U.S.C. 1407, to a date two weeks after the date on which the Judicial Panel rules on that mot. (gk) (Entered: 03/31/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: None
NOTICE by dft MTC Electronic Technologies, Co., Ltd. of entry of ord. (gk) (Entered: 03/31/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Susan D. Praskin re proof of svc of summons & complaint served upon Ugo Doninelli by registered mail on 1/25/95; return receipt acknowledged by addressee (signature illegible) on 2/2/95. (gk) (Entered: 03/17/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Susan Praskin & Danielle Bickford re proof of svc of summons & complaint served upon Reynaldo David by International Express mail on 1/25/95. (gk) (Entered: 03/17/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Susan D. Praskin re proof of svc of summons & complaint served upon Li Kam Chung by mailing to The Chief Secretary of Hong Kong, Government Secretariat, as the Central Authority for Hong Kong under the Hague Convention, on 1/25/95. Letter from the Government Secretariat acknowledging receipt of documents dtd 2/6/95 attached. Letter from the Government Secretariat that svc had ben made dtd 3/6/95 attached. CERTIFICATE of svc of summons & complaint upon Li Kam Chung, personally, on 2/27/95. (gk) (Entered: 03/17/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATIONS of Susan Praskin & Danielle Bickford re prof of svc of summons & complaint served upon Peter Jenson by International Express Mail on 1/25/95. (gk) (Entered: 03/17/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATIONS of Susan Praskin & Danielle Bickford re proof of svc of summons & complaint served upon Robert Farr by Internatioal Express Mail on 1/25/95. (gk) (Entered: 03/17/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Susan Praskin & Danielle Bickford re proof of svc of summons & complaint served upon MTC Electronic Technologies Co., Ltd. by International Express Mail on 1/25/95. (gk) (Entered: 03/17/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None
STATEMENT by plfs of non-opp to dft MTC Electronic Technologies, Co., Ltd's ex parte appl for an ord extending the date by which MTC must answer or otherwise resp to the cmp [4-1]. (gk) (Entered: 03/10/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/10/1995
EX PARTE APPLICATION by dft MTC Electronic Technologies, Co., Ltd. for an ord extending the date by which MTC must answer or otherwise resp to cmp; memo of PA in suppt thereof; decl of Jeffrey C. Hallam in suppt thereof. (gk) (Entered: 03/10/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson that the date by which MTC Electronic Technoloties, Co., Ltd. must resp or otherwise plead to the cmp is ext from 3/3/95 until 3/20/95. (gk) (Entered: 02/24/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that this case has been assigned to the cal of Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (gk) (Entered: 01/31/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (referred to Discovery Charles F. Eick ) Demand for jury trial (am) (Entered: 01/26/1995)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 244 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?