Lawrence E. Ormsby
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 05-28840
District Judge Michael S. McManus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Cindy J. Ormsby, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Helga A. White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Helga A. White +1 530 885 4433
No Logo Lawrence E. Ormsby, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Helga A. White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Helga A. White +1 530 885 4433
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
No Logo Thomas A. Aceituno, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Final Decree as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 12/14/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
    Bankruptcy case closed. Final Decree as transmitted to BNC for Service (jlas) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
      Certificate of Service of Notice of Filing Report of No Distribution as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 02/10/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
        Notice of Filing Report of No Distribution as Transmitted to BNC for Service Objections due 3/12/2007 (npem) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
          Trustee's Report of No Distribution. (npem) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
            Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 11/23/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
              Notice of Entry as Transmitted to BNC for Service (sges) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                Order Granting 70 Motion/Application To Compel Abandonment [HAW-1] (sges) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                  Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 70 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [HAW-1] GRANTED (sges) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 75 Exhibit(s), 72 Declaration, 71 Notice of Hearing, 70 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [HAW-1], 73 Declaration, 74 Request for Judicial Notice (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                      Exhibit(s) in support of 70 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [HAW-1] (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                        Request for Judicial Notice Re: 70 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [HAW-1] Filed by Debtors Cindy J. Ormsby, Lawrence E. Ormsby (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                          Declaration of Helga A. White in support of 70 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [HAW-1] (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                            Declaration of Cindy Ormsby in support of 70 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [HAW-1] (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                              Notice of Hearing Re: 70 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [HAW-1] to be held on 11/20/2006 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [HAW-1] Filed by Debtors Cindy J. Ormsby, Lawrence E. Ormsby (Fee Paid $150) (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 68 Change of Address (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                    Change of Address (sges) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                      Order Granting 59 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1] (jlas) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: 59 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1] (sges) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None
                                          Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 59 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1] GRANTED IN PART (sges) (Entered: 07/03/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 61 Declaration, 62 Movant's Informational Sheet (Section 362), 63 Request for Judicial Notice, 59 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1], 60 Notice of Hearing (nkrs) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                              Request for Judicial Notice Re: 59 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1] Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (nkrs) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                Movant's Informational Sheet (Section 362) Re: 59 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1] (nkrs) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of Teressa Jones In support of 59 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1] (nkrs) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Hearing Re: 59 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1] to be held on 7/3/2006 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (nkrs) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                      Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMS-1] Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Fee $150) (nkrs) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                        Order Granting 55 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham [DNL-1] (nkrs) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 55 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich and Cunningham as Attorney For Chapter 7 Trustee [DNL-1], 56 Declaration and Proposed Order (sges) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                            Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham In support of 55 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich and Cunningham as Attorney For Chapter 7 Trustee [DNL-1] (sges) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                              Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich and Cunningham as Attorney For Chapter 7 Trustee [DNL-1] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (shbs) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 53 Substitution of Attorney (sges) (Entered: 02/15/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Ethan K. Friedman terminated. James A. Tiemstra for First American Title Company of Nevada Substituted in. Filed by Creditor First American Title Company of Nevada (sges) (Entered: 02/15/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate of Service of Discharge of Debtor as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      Order Discharging Debtor as Transmitted to BNC for Service (Admin.) (Entered: 01/03/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of Proof of Claim (jlas) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service (sges) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            Request for Special Notice (sges) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 46 Notice (sges) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (sges) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order Granting in part, Denying in part 39 Motion/Application to Extend Time [TAA-1] (sges) (Entered: 11/16/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 39 Motion/Application to Extend Time [TAA-1] (sges) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 42 Joinder [TAA-1] (sges) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        Joinder Re: 39 Motion/Application to Extend Time Filed by Creditor United General Insurance Company (sges) Modified on 11/2/2005 (sges) [TAA-1]. (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 39 Motion/Application to Extend Time [TAA-1], 40 Notice of Hearing (sges) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Re: 39 Motion/Application to Extend Time [TAA-1] to be held on 11/4/2005 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (sges) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              Motion/Application to Extend Time [TAA-1] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (sges) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order Granting 36 Stipulation [MSR-1] (sges) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 36 Stipulation and Proposed Order [MSR-1] (sges) (Entered: 10/11/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Stipulation [MSR-1] Filed by Creditor First American Title Company of Nevada, Debtor Lawrence E. Ormsby (sges) (Entered: 10/11/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 34 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (dhes) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (dhes) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Certificate of Service of Notice to File Claims as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice of Entry as Transmitted to BNC for Service (dhes) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Civil Minute Order Granting 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (dhes) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Creditors to File Claims as Transmitted to BNC for Service (dhes) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. Meeting Held and Debtor Examined., Trustee's Notice of Assets (dhes) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Civil Minutes -- Opposed Hearing Held Re: 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay (sges) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 25 Request for Special Notice (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Request for Special Notice (sges) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 23 Response/Reply (jlas) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Response/Reply [JMO-1] Filed by Creditor Founders Title Company Of Nevada Re: 19 Opposition/Objection (sges) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 21 Request for Special Notice (nkrs) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Request for Special Notice (nkrs) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 19 Opposition/Objection [JMO-1] (pdes) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Opposition/Objection [JMO-1] Filed by Debtors Cindy J. Ormsby, Lawrence E. Ormsby Re: 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (pdes) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 17 Request for Special Notice (sges) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Request for Special Notice (sges) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. Continuance of Meeting of Creditors to be held on 9/26/2005 at 10:00 AM at Meeting Room 7-A. (sges) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Request for Special Notice (sges) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1], 10 Notice of Hearing, 11 Declaration, 12 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 13 Movant's Informational Sheet (Section 362) [JMO-1] (gfas) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Movant's Informational Sheet (Section 362) Re: 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (gfas) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Points and Authorities In support of 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (gfas) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of David R. Grundy In support of 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] [JMO-1] (gfas) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing Re: 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] to be held on 9/26/2006 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (gfas) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] Filed by Creditor Founders Title Company Of Nevada (Fee $150) (gfas) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            [8-1] Certificate Of Service Of [7-1] Notice of Appearance & Request by Douglas H. Kraft . jlas (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Douglas H. Kraft for Creditor Gold Country Bank. jlas (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                [6-1] Proof of Service Of [5-1] Notice of Request by Founders Title Company Of Nevada jlas (Entered: 08/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Request by Creditor Founders Title Company Of Nevada For Notice. shbs (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    [4-1] Court's Certificate Of Mailing [0-0] First Meeting auto (Entered: 07/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      [3-1] Master Address List. auto (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno auto (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Voluntary Petition all schedules and statements. ( Fee $ 209 Receipt # 2-5-013177 aeds) auto (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?