Thomas Holdings, LLC
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-20156
District Judge Christopher M. Klein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
No Logo Sara L. Kistler, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Allen C. Massey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen C. Massey +1 916 930 2100
No Logo Thomas A. Aceituno, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
No Logo Thomas Holdings, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Harris +1 215 988 2806 +1 215 988 2757 stephen.harris@dbr.com
  Entries (360) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013 Turn-Over of Unclaimed Funds/Dividends
Docket Text: Turn-Over of Unclaimed Funds/Dividends (fdis)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Turn-Over of Unclaimed Funds/Dividends
    Docket Text: Turn-Over of Unclaimed Funds/Dividends (stps)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Declaration
      Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas A. Aceituno Re: 350 Trustee's Final Report (TFR) (stps)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013 Order
        Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Approving The Report And Request For Fees Re: 350 Trustee's Final Report (TFR) (stps)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Certificate/Proof of Service
          Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 358 Notice of Hearing (stps)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Notice of Hearing.
            Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 350 Trustee's Final Report (TFR) to be held on 7/23/2013 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Declaration
              Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas A. Aceituno Re: 350 Trustee's Final Report (TFR) (stps)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Change in Designation of Counsel for Service.
                Docket Text: Change in Designation of Counsel for Service. Attorney Mark S. Faulkner removed from the case. (stps)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/11/2013, Entered: 5/12/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation
                  Docket Text: Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/11/2013, Entered: 5/12/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Order Fixing Deadline for Filing Objections to Trustee's Final Report
                    Docket Text: Certificate of Mailing of Order Fixing Deadline for Filing Objections to Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Final Compensation and/or Reimbursement of Expenses and Notice Thereof as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Declaration
                      Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas A. Aceituno in support of 350 Trustee's Final Report (TFR) (stps)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Order Fixing Deadline for Filing Objections to Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Final Com
                        Docket Text: Order Fixing Deadline for Filing Objections to Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Final Compensation and/or Reimbursement of Expenses and Notice Thereof as Transmitted to BNC for Service (Gordon, Bob)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation (NFR)
                          Docket Text: Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation (NFR) filed on behalf of Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno as transmitted to BNC for service. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Gordon, Bob)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Trustee's Final Report (TFR)
                            Docket Text: Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report, Application for Compensation and Applications for Compensation of Professionals filed on behalf of Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Gordon, Bob)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation
                              Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Granting 342 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-2] (msts)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 343 Notice of Hearing [TAA-2] (smis)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                  Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 342 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto LLP as Accountant(s) [TAA-2], 342 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-2] for Gonzales and Sisto LLP, Accountant(s), Fee: $3648.70, Expenses: $0.00., 343 Notice of Hearing, 344 Declaration, 345 Exhibit(s) (smis)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Exhibits
                                    Docket Text: Exhibit(s) to 342 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto LLP as Accountant(s) [TAA-2], 342 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-2] for Gonzales and Sisto LLP, Accountant(s), Fee: $3648.70, Expenses: $0.00. (smis)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Declaration
                                      Docket Text: Declaration of Gene Gonzales in support of 342 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto LLP as Accountant(s) [TAA-2], 342 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-2] for Gonzales and Sisto LLP, Accountant(s), Fee: $3648.70, Expenses: $0.00. (smis)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Notice of Hearing.
                                        Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 342 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto LLP as Accountant(s) [TAA-2], 342 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-2] for Gonzales and Sisto LLP, Accountant(s), Fee: $3648.70, Expenses: $0.00. to be held on 1/15/2013 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (smis)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Motion/Application for Compensation
                                          Docket Text: Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-2] for Gonzales and Sisto LLP, Accountant(s), Fee: $3648.70, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (smis)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/3/2012, Entered: 9/4/2012 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                            Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Granting 328 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [RAD-1] (stps)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 338 Response/Reply [RAD-1] (lars)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Response/Reply
                                                Docket Text: Response/Reply [RAD-1] Filed by Creditor Margaret Kaveney Re: 335 Opposition/Objection (lars)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Document Request
                                                  Docket Text: Document Request (jris)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                    Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 335 Opposition/Objection [RAD-1] (jgis)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Opposition/Objection
                                                      Docket Text: Opposition/Objection Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno Re: 328 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [RAD-1] (jgis)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                        Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 328 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [RAD-1], 329 Notice of Hearing, 330 Declaration, 331 Exhibit(s), 332 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (stps)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                          Docket Text: Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 328 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [RAD-1] (stps)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                            Docket Text: Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 328 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [RAD-1] (stps)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Exhibits
                                                              Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 330 Declaration [RAD-1] (stps)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Declaration
                                                                Docket Text: Declaration of Margaret Kaveney in support of 328 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [RAD-1] (stps)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 328 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [RAD-1] to be held on 8/21/2012 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                    Docket Text: Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [RAD-1] Filed by Creditor Margaret Kaveney (Fee Paid $176) (stps)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Change in Designation of Counsel for Service.
                                                                      Docket Text: Change in Designation of Counsel for Service. Attorney Michael L. Martucci removed from the case. Attorney Jenni L. Harmon for Margaret Kaveney added to the case. Filed by Creditor Margaret Kaveney (stps)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Request for special notice
                                                                        Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Margaret Kaveney (jris)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation
                                                                          Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Granting 315 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-1] (jris)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 323 Notice of Unpaid Quarterly Fees/Statement of Non-Payment of U.S. Trustee Quarterly Fees (jris)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Notice of Unpaid Quarterly Fees/Statement of Non-Payment of U.S. Trustee Quarterly Fees
                                                                              Docket Text: Amended Notice of Unpaid Quarterly Fees/Statement of Non-Payment of U.S. Trustee Quarterly Fees (jris)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 321 Request for Special Notice (mbes)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Request for special notice
                                                                                  Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Margaret Kaveney (mbes)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 315 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-1] for Thomas A. Aceituno, Chapter 7 Trustee(s), Fee: $12005.00, Expenses: $0.00., 316 Notice of Hearing, 317 Declaration, 318 Exhibit(s) (stps)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 316 Notice of Hearing [TAA-1] (stps)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                        Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 315 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-1] for Thomas A. Aceituno, Chapter 7 Trustee(s), Fee: $12005.00, Expenses: $0.00. (stps)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Declaration
                                                                                          Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas A. Aceituno in support of 315 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-1] for Thomas A. Aceituno, Chapter 7 Trustee(s), Fee: $12005.00, Expenses: $0.00. (stps)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 315 Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-1] for Thomas A. Aceituno, Chapter 7 Trustee(s), Fee: $12005.00, Expenses: $0.00. to be held on 6/21/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Motion/Application for Compensation
                                                                                              Docket Text: Motion/Application for Compensation [TAA-1] for Thomas A. Aceituno, Chapter 7 Trustee(s), Fee: $12005.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 313 Notice of Entry [DNL-8] (jris)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 310 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] (jris)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 311 Notice of Entry [DNL-7] (jris)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 308 Order on Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement, Order on Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement, Order on Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement (jris)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation
                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Granting 302 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] (jris)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Hearing Held Under Advisement
                                                                                                          Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Under Advisement Re: 302 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $12946.50, Expenses: $154.49. SUBMITTED (tjas)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Order on Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                            Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Granting 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy [DNL-7], Granting 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy [DNL-7], Granting 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy [DNL-7] (nkrs)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Request for special notice
                                                                                                              Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor First Bank (nkrs)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 302 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $7167.50, Expenses: $70.97., 302 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $12946.50, Expenses: $154.49., 303 Notice of Hearing, 304 Declaration, 305 Exhibit(s) (jris)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Exhibit(s) to 304 Declaration [DNL-8] (jris)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 302 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $7167.50, Expenses: $70.97., 302 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $12946.50, Expenses: $154.49. (jris)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 302 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $7167.50, Expenses: $70.97., 302 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $12946.50, Expenses: $154.49. to be held on 3/1/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (jris)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Motion/Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-8] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $12946.50, Expenses: $154.49. Filed by Attorney J. Russell Cunningham (jris)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with First Bank [DNL-7], 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Ilsis, Inc. [DNL-7], 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Susan K. Smith [DNL-7], 298 Notice of Hearing, 299 Declaration, 300 Exhibit(s) (jgis)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Exhibit(s) to 299 Declaration [DNL-7] (jgis)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Declaration
                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas Aceituno in support of 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with First Bank [DNL-7], 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Ilsis, Inc. [DNL-7], 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Susan K. Smith [DNL-7] (jgis)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with First Bank [DNL-7], 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Ilsis, Inc. [DNL-7], 297 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Susan K. Smith [DNL-7] to be held on 2/15/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (jgis)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Susan K. Smith [DNL-7] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (jgis)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Report of Sale/Return on Sale
                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Report of Sale by Trustee [DNL-4] (npas)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 294 Notice [DNL-6] (npas)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Entry Re: 293 Order on Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses [DNL-6] (npas)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses
                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Granting 279 Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses [DNL-6] (npas)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses
                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Granting 279 Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses [DNL-6] (npas)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2009 (npas)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2009 (npas)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Chapter 11 Final Report and Account
                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Chapter 11 Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (npas)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 287 Request for Special Notice (npas)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor First Bank (lars)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 285 Notice of Withdrawal of Claim [CL-1] (npas)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Notice of Withdrawal/Satisfaction of Claim
                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Number 10 [CL-1](npas)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Amended 283 Certificate/Proof of Service [DNL-6] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (npas)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 279 Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses [DNL-6], 280 Notice of Hearing, 281 Declaration, 282 Exhibit(s) (npas)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 281 Declaration [DNL-6] (npas)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas Aceituno in support of 279 Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses [DNL-6] (npas)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 279 Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses [DNL-6] to be held on 5/25/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (npas)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion/Application for Administrative Expenses [DNL-6] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (npas)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 277 Notice of Entry [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 276 Amended Order [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 276 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Amended Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Amended 240 Order on Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 273 Notice of Entry [SRH-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: 219 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 272 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation [SRH-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Granting 236 Motion/Application for Compensation [SRH-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 270 Notice of Entry [DNL-5] (nkrs)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 269 Order on Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy [DNL-5] (nkrs)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Order on Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Granting 262 Motion/Application To Compromise Controversy [DNL-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Hearing Withdrawn
                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 255 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [SHJ-2]. MOTION/APPLICATION/OBJECTION WITHDRAWN (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice to File Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate of Mailing of Notice to File Claims as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 262 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with River City Bank [DNL-5], 263 Notice of Hearing, 264 Declaration, 265 Exhibit(s) (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 264 Declaration [DNL-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas A. Aceituno in support of 262 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with River City Bank [DNL-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 262 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with River City Bank [DNL-5] to be held on 1/5/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with River City Bank [DNL-5] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Notice of Withdrawal/Satisfaction of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Number 15 (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Notice to Creditors to File Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice to Creditors to File Proof of Claim as Transmitted to BNC for Service Proofs of Claim due by 3/16/2010. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 255 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [SHJ-2], 256 Notice of Hearing, 257 Declaration, 258 Declaration (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Declaration of Pat McHone in support of 255 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [SHJ-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Declaration of Jacob Johnson in support of 255 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [SHJ-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 255 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [SHJ-2] to be held on 1/5/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [SHJ-2] Filed by Creditor River City Bank (Fee Paid $150) (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Status Conference Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Held/Concluded Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 236 Motion/Application for Compensation [SRH-5] for Stephen R. Harris, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $50027.50, Expenses: $1223.53. GRANTED (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Granting 229 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [HRH-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 248 Notice of Entry [SHJ-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Support Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Support Document - Certification Re: 236 Motion/Application for Compensation [SRH-5] for Stephen R. Harris, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $50027.50, Expenses: $1223.53. (stps) DCN INCORRECT ON PLEADING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 248 Notice of Entry [SHJ-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 241 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay [SHJ-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 246 Opposition/Objection [SRH-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Opposition/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor First Bank Re: 236 Motion/Application for Compensation [SRH-5] for Stephen R. Harris, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $50027.50, Expenses: $1223.53. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 244 Notice of Entry [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 240 Order on Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 242 Status Report [SC-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Status Report Filed by Creditor First Bank [SC-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting 178 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SHJ-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Sell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Granting 219 Motion/Application To Sell [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 237 Notice of Hearing [SRH-5] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Exhibit(s) to 236 Motion/Application for Compensation [SRH-5] for Stephen R. Harris, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $50027.50, Expenses: $1223.53. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 236 Motion/Application for Compensation [SRH-5] for Stephen R. Harris, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $50027.50, Expenses: $1223.53. to be held on 12/1/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Motion/Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Motion/Application for Compensation [SRH-5] for Stephen R. Harris, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $50027.50, Expenses: $1223.53. Filed by Attorney Stephen R. Harris (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 219 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4] GRANTED (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 229 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [HRH-1], 230 Notice of Hearing, 231 Declaration, 232 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362), 233 Exhibit(s) (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Exhibit(s) to 231 Declaration [HRH-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 229 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [HRH-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Declaration of Debb White in support of 229 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [HRH-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 229 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [HRH-1] to be held on 12/1/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [HRH-1] Filed by Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation (Fee Paid $150) (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 178 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SHJ-1], 178 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SHJ-1] GRANTED (tjas) Modified on 11/23/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Memorandum Re Documents/Filing Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Memorandum Re Documents/Filing Fees Re: 226 Memorandum/Letter, 226 Request to be Added to Mailing List (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Request to be Added to Mailing List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Request to be Added to Mailing List by Sports Turf Irrigation (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 219 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4], 220 Notice of Hearing, 221 Declaration, 222 Exhibit(s) (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 223 Notice of Entry [DNL-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 218 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Exhibit(s) to 219 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas Aceituno in support of 219 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 219 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4] to be held on 11/10/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 219 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Motion/Application to Sell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-4] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Granting 215 Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 215 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-3], 216 Declaration, Proposed Order (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 215 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Motion/Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-3] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 213 Notice of Unpaid Quarterly Fees/Statement of Non-Payment of U.S. Trustee Quarterly Fees (pdes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Notice of Unpaid Quarterly Fees/Statement of Non-Payment of U.S. Trustee Quarterly Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Unpaid Quarterly Fees/Statement of Non-Payment of U.S. Trustee Quarterly Fees (pdes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Conversion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Conversion as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 178 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SHJ-1], 178 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SHJ-1] continued; Hearing to be held on 11/3/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas) Modified on 10/15/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Notice of Conversion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Conversion as Transmitted to BNC for Service (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor John Thomas (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Convert Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Granting 175 Motion/Application To Convert Case [SC-4] from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Status Conference continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: 1 Voluntary Petition; Status Conference now to be held on 12/1/2009 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Think Outside The Box, Inc. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Unilateral Status Report Filed by Creditor First Bank (shbs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 201 Response/Reply [SC-4] (INCORRECT DCN ON PLEADING) (dhes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Response/Reply Filed by Creditor First Bank Re: 175 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [SC-4] (dhes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Status Conference continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: 1 Voluntary Petition; Status Conference now to be held on 9/22/2009 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 198 Status Report (nkrs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Second Status Report Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (nkrs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 196 Notice of Withdrawal [DNL-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Re: 190 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [DNL-2], 191 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 190 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [DNL-2], 191 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-2], 192 Notice of Hearing, 193 Declaration, 194 Exhibit(s), Proposed Order (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Exhibit(s) to 191 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas Aceituno in support of 191 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 191 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-2] to be held on 9/22/2009 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Motion/Application to Sell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-2] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Motion/Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion/Application to Shorten Time [DNL-2] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2009 (pdes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 178 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SHJ-1], 178 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SHJ-1], 179 Notice of Hearing, 180 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362), 181 Declaration, 182 Declaration, 183 Exhibit(s), 184 Exhibit(s) (stps) DCN MISSING FROM PLEADING Modified on 9/1/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Exhibit(s) To 182 Declaration [SHJ-1] (stps) CASE NUMBER AND DCN MISSING FROM PLEADING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Exhibit(s) To 182 Declaration [SHJ-1] (stps) CASE NUMBER AND DCN MISSING FROM PLEADING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Exhibit(s) To 182 Declaration [SHJ-1] (stps) CASE NUMBER AND DCN MISSING FROM PLEADING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Exhibit(s) To 182 Declaration [SHJ-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Exhibit(s) To 181 Declaration [SHJ-1] (stps) Modified on 9/1/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Declaration of Jacob Johnson in support of 178 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SHJ-1], 178 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SHJ-1] (stps) Modified on 9/1/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Declaration of Pat McHone in support of 178 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SHJ-1], 178 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SHJ-1] (stps) Modified on 9/1/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 178 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SHJ-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 178 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SHJ-1], 178 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SHJ-1] to be held on 9/29/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) Modified on 9/1/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SHJ-1] Filed by Creditor River City Bank (stps) Modified on 9/1/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 175 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [SC-4], 176 Notice of Hearing (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 175 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [SC-4] to be held on 9/22/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Motion/Application to Convert Case to Chapter 7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [SC-4] Filed by Creditor First Bank (Fee Paid $15) (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 173 Status Report (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Status Report Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 170 Notice of Entry [SC-3] (stps) INCORRECT DCN ON PLEADING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Exhibit(s) To 170 Notice of Entry [SC-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 165 Order [SC-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 168 Notice of Entry [DNL-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 166 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor StrawsCo (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Granting 148 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham [DNL-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Approving 155 Stipulation [SC-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Hearing Withdrawn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 72 Disclosure Statement. MOTION/APPLICATION/OBJECTION WITHDRAWN (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Status Conference continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: 1 Voluntary Petition; Status Conference now to be held on 9/15/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Hearing Withdrawn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 141 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [SRH-4]. MOTION/APPLICATION/OBJECTION WITHDRAWN (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Memorandum/Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Memorandum/Letter Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order, Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 1014(B), Regarding Venue Of Case Filed In Central District Of California (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Of Hearing Re: 72 Disclosure Statement (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Re: 141 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [SRH-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: 8/4/2009 Proof of Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Bond of Trustee (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 155 Stipulation [SC-3], Proposed Order (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Stipulation Authorizing Transfer Of Funds From Debtor-In-Possession's Account To State Court Receiver's Account [SC-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 8/1/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate of Mailing of Notice of 153 Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: 152 Order Granting 136 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1]. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Granting 136 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1]. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 148 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-1], 149 Declaration, 150 Exhibit(s), Proposed Order (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Exhibit(s) To 149 Declaration [DNL-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 148 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Motion/Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-1] Filed by Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 146 Opposition/Objection [SRH-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Opposition/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor First Bank Re: 141 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [SRH-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 144 Non-Opposition [SRH-4] (stps) DCN MISSING FROM PLEADING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Non-Opposition Filed by Creditor River City Bank Re: 141 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [SRH-4] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 141 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [SRH-4], 142 Notice of Hearing (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Re: 141 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [SRH-4] to be held on 8/11/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [SRH-4] Filed by Debtor Thomas Holdings, LLC (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2009 (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 129 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay [SC-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 135 Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, 136 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1], 137 Declaration, Proposed Order (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Declaration of Thomas A. Aceituno Re: 136 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1] Filed by U.S. Trustee Sara L. Kistler (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Thomas A. Aceituno [UST-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 132 Notice of Entry [SC-2] (stps) Modified on 8/18/2009 (stps).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Exhibit(s) Re: 132 Notice of Entry [SC-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Entry of 129 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay [SC-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] GRANTED (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 72 Disclosure Statement continued; Hearing to be held on 8/11/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Filing of Transcript and of Deadlines Related to Redaction a
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Filing of Transcript and of Deadlines Related to Redaction and Restriction as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as transmitted to BNC for Service. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of the hearing on the Status Conference held on June 23, 2009 has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period Re: 126 Transcript (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held June 23, 2009 Re: 1 Voluntary Petition Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/15/2009. Redaction Request Due By 7/29/2009. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/10/2009. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/6/2009. (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Victoria Foyt Jaglom (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Denying 38 Motion/Application to Employ [SRH-3] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Civil Minute Order Denying 32 Motion/Application to Employ [SRH-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2009 (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Ordered That A Chapter 11 Trustee Be Appointed Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 72 Disclosure Statement continued; Hearing to be held on 7/14/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Status Conference Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Held/Concluded Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] continued; Hearing to be held on 7/14/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Ordered that a Chapter 11 Trustee is Appointed Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (jlas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Opposition/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Opposition/Objection To The Court's Sua Sponte Request To Appoint Chapter 11 Trustee [SC-2] Filed by Debtor In Possession Thomas Holdings, LLC (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Response/Reply [SK-2] Filed by Debtor In Possession Thomas Holdings, LLC Re: 107 Opposition/Objection. DCN NUMBER INCORRECT ON PLEADING. (lbes)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 111 Brief/Memorandum, 112 Declaration, 113 Exhibit(s) [SC-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 111 Brief/Memorandum [SC-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Declaration of Liz Van De Vanter in support of 111 Brief/Memorandum [SC-2] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Brief /Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Brief/Memorandum in support of 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] Filed by Creditor First Bank (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 107 Opposition/Objection, 108 Request for Judicial Notice, 109 Exhibit(s) [SK-2] (shbs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 108 Request for Judicial Notice [SK-2] (shbs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Request for Judicial Notice Re: 107 Opposition/Objection [SK-2] Filed by Creditor First Bank (shbs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Opposition/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Opposition/Objection [SK-2] Filed by Creditor First Bank Re: 72 Disclosure Statement (shbs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 105 Order on Motion to Seal, 105 Order on Motion/Application for Protective Order [SK-1] (nkrs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting 96 Motion/Application For Protective Order [SK-1] (nkrs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Summary/Schedule(s)/Statement of Financial Affairs/Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Amended Summary of Schedules Schedule F Statement of Financial Affairs (Filing Fee Paid) (Fee Paid $26) (nkrs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Civil Minute Order/Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Civil Minute Order to Set/Continue Hearing Re: 1 Voluntary Petition ; Status Conference to be held on 6/23/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] continued; Hearing to be held on 6/23/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 38 Motion/Application to Employ W. Austin Cooper as Special Counsel [SRH-3] continued; Hearing to be held on 6/23/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 32 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory D. Thatch as Attorney For Special Purpose [SRH-2] continued; Hearing to be held on 6/23/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate/Proof of Service of 96 Motion/Application to Seal [SK-1], 96 Motion/Application for Protective Order [SK-1], 97 Exhibit(s), 98 Exhibit(s) (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 96 Motion/Application to Seal [SK-1], 96 Motion/Application for Protective Order [SK-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Exhibit(s) in support of 96 Motion/Application to Seal [SK-1], 96 Motion/Application for Protective Order [SK-1] (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Motion/Application for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Motion/Application for Protective Order [SK-1] Filed by Creditor First Bank (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Placer County Treasurer-Tax Collector's Office (stps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: 1 Voluntary Petition; Status Conference now to be held on 6/2/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (tjas) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 87 Response/Reply, 88 Statement of Disputed Facts, 89 Declaration, 90 Request for Judicial Notice, 91 Exhibit(s), 92 Exhibit(s) [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) in support of 90 Request for Judicial Notice [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit(s) in support of 89 Declaration [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice Re: 87 Response/Reply [SC-2] Filed by Creditor First Bank (stps) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Liz Van De Vanter in support of 87 Response/Reply [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement of Disputed Facts [SC-2] Re: 87 Response/Reply Filed by Creditor First Bank (stps) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response/Reply [SC-2] Filed by Creditor First Bank Re: 77 Opposition/Objection (stps) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 75 Notice of Hearing [SRH-3] (stps) DCN MISSING FROM PLEADING (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 77 Opposition/Objection, 78 Statement of Disputed Facts, 79 Declaration, 80 Exhibit(s), 81 Declaration, 82 Exhibit(s) [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 76 Notice of Hearing (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2009 (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit(s) To 81 Declaration [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of John Thomas in support of 77 Opposition/Objection [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit(s) To 79 Declaration [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Stephen R. Harris in support of 77 Opposition/Objection [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement of Disputed Facts In Support [SC-2] Re: 77 Opposition/Objection Filed by Debtor In Possession Thomas Holdings, LLC (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition/Objection Filed by Debtor In Possession Thomas Holdings, LLC Re: 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Re: 72 Disclosure Statement to be held on 6/23/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 38 Motion/Application to Employ W. Austin Cooper as Special Counsel [SRH-3] to be held on 6/2/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Re: 32 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory D. Thatch as Attorney For Special Purpose [SRH-2] to be held on 6/2/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Gary S. Kaveney and Margaret N. Kaveney Re: 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor In Possession Thomas Holdings, LLC (stps) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor In Possession Thomas Holdings, LLC (stps) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 57 Order on Motion/Application for Examination [SC-1] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 59 Notice of Hearing, 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2], 60 Declaration, 61 Declaration, 62 Declaration, 63 Exhibit(s), 65 Exhibit(s), 66 Exhibit(s), 67 Exhibit(s), 68 Exhibit(s) (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) in support of 60 Declaration [SC-2] (stps) SEALED BY ORDER DATED 6/5/09 Modified on 6/8/2009 (nkrs). (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit(s) in support of 60 Declaration [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit(s) in support of 62 Declaration [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit(s) in support of 62 Declaration [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit(s) in support of 61 Declaration [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Richard A. Zbranek and Timothy D. Garey in support of 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Steven Casselberry in support of 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Liz Van De Vanter in support of 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 58 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [SC-2], 58 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] to be held on 6/2/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) Modified on 5/4/2009 (stps). (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [SC-2] Filed by Creditor First Bank (stps) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting 46 Motion/Application for Examination (stps) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 49 Amended Motion/Application [SC-1] Re:, 50 Declaration, 51 Declaration, 52 Exhibit(s), 53 Exhibit(s), 54 Exhibit(s), 55 Exhibit(s), Proposed Order (stps) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit(s) in support of 50 Declaration [SC-1] (stps) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit(s) in support of 50 Declaration [SC-1] (stps) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit(s) in support of 50 Declaration [SC-1] (stps) SEALED BY ORDER DATED 6/5/09 Modified on 6/8/2009 (nkrs). (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) in support of 51 Declaration [SC-1] (stps) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Steven Casselberry in support of 46 Motion/Application for Examination [SC-1] (stps) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Liz Van De Vanter in support of 46 Motion/Application for Examination [SC-1] (stps) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Motion/Application [SC-1] Re: 46 Motion/Application for Examination Filed by Creditor First Bank (stps) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 47 Notice [SC-1] (stps) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Re: 46 Motion/Application for Examination [SC-1] (stps) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion/Application for Examination [SC-1] Filed by Creditor First Bank (stps) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 43 Opposition/Objection, 44 Exhibit(s) [SRH-3] (stps) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) in support of 43 Opposition/Objection [SRH-3] (stps) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor First Bank Re: 38 Motion/Application to Employ W. Austin Cooper as Special Counsel [SRH-3] (stps) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor First Bank Re: 32 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory D. Thatch as Attorney For Special Purpose [SRH-2] (stps) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2009 (stps) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit(s) To 38 Motion/Application to Employ W. Austin Cooper as Special Counsel [SRH-3] (jlas) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of W. Austin Cooper in support of 38 Motion/Application to Employ W. Austin Cooper as Special Counsel [SRH-3] (jlas) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion/Application to Employ W. Austin Cooper as Special Counsel [SRH-3] Filed by Debtor Thomas Holdings, LLC (jlas) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Number 2 (nkrs) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 32 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory D. Thatch as Attorney For Special Purpose [SRH-2], 33 Affidavit, 34 Exhibit(s), Proposed Order (stps) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: 1 Voluntary Petition; Status Conference now to be held on 5/26/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (tjas) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit(s) To 32 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory D. Thatch as Attorney For Special Purpose [SRH-2] (stps) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Gregory D. Thatch Re: 32 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory D. Thatch as Attorney For Special Purpose [SRH-2] (stps) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion/Application to Employ Gregory D. Thatch as Attorney For Special Purpose [SRH-2] Filed by Debtor Thomas Holdings, LLC (stps) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Narrative Supplement/Report to 30 Operating Report (stps) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2009 (stps) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing of Notice of 28 Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 03/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: 26 Order Denying 11 Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents (stps) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying 11 Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents (stps) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2009 (stps) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response/Reply Filed by Debtor Thomas Holdings, LLC Re: 11 Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents (stps) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Trustee's Report of 341 Meeting Concluded. (stps) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting 19 Motion/Application to Employ [SRH-1] (stps) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit(s) Re: 19 Motion/Application to Employ Stephen R. Harris as Attorney [SRH-1] (shbs) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Stephen R. Harris Re: 19 Motion/Application to Employ Stephen R. Harris as Attorney [SRH-1] (shbs) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion/Application to Employ Stephen R. Harris as Attorney [SRH-1] Filed by Debtor Thomas Holdings, LLC (shbs) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 17 Status Report (stps) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Report Filed by Debtor Thomas Holdings, LLC (pdes) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (stps) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing of Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 13 Request for Special Notice (stps) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor River City Bank (stps) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 8 Order Scheduling Deadlines (stps) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: Statement of Corporate Debtor . Hearing to be held on 2/24/2009 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Financial Affairs (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) (nkrs) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summary of Schedules Schedule A Schedule B Schedule D Schedule E Schedule F Schedule G Schedule H (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) (nkrs) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Scheduling Deadlines for Disclosure of Single Asset Real Estate,Filing Preliminary Status Report,Preliminary Status Conference Re: 1 Voluntary Petition; Status Conference to be held on 2/17/2009 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (stps) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Meeting of Creditors as Transmitted to BNC (pdes) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request by U.S. Trustee to Send 341 Notice; Meeting of Creditors to be held on 2/12/2009 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. Last day to oppose discharge: 4/13/2009. Proofs of Claim due by 5/13/2009. (pdes) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor First Bank (pdes) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Incomplete Filing (shbs) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Missing Document(s): Statement of Financial Affairs; Summary of schedules; Schedule A - Real Property; Schedule B - Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors; Schedule E - Unsecured Priority Creditor; Schedule F - Unsecured Nonpriority Creditors; Schedule G - Exec. Contracts & Unexpired Leases; Schedule H - Codebtors; Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor; Document(s) due by 1/21/2009. (shbs) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?