Robert A. Hawkins
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-26396
District Judge Christopher M. Klein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Elizabeth A. Hawkins, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ken Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ken Baker +1 530 898 1488
No Logo J. Michael Hopper, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
No Logo Robert A. Hawkins, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ken Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ken Baker +1 530 898 1488
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 80 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-5], 81 Notice of Hearing, 82 Declaration, 83 Exhibit(s) (jtis) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
    Exhibit(s) to 80 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-5] (jtis) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
      Declaration of J. Michael Hopper in support of 80 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-5] (jtis) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
        Notice of Hearing Re: 80 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-5] to be held on 10/25/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (jtis) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 80 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
          Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-5] Filed by Trustee J. Michael Hopper (jtis) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
            Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 77 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto as Accountant(s) [DNL-6], 78 Declaration (jtis) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
              Declaration of Gene A. Gonzales in support of 77 Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto as Accountant(s) [DNL-6] (jtis) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                Motion/Application to Employ Gonzales and Sisto as Accountant(s) [DNL-6] Filed by Trustee J. Michael Hopper (jtis) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 50 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?