Wendy S. Zopp- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-02519
District Judge Christopher M. Klein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Hank M. Spacone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
v.
No Logo Gary G. Muriset, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/29/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Unknown at time of filing

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony Asebedo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony Asebedo +1 916 925 1800
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
Amended Certificate/Proof of Service (fdis) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
    Certificate/Proof of Service (fdis) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
      Certificate/Proof of Service (fdis) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 40 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?