Vicki Lorraine Kennedy- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-02165
District Judge Robert S. Bardwil, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo J. Michael Hopper, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
v.
No Logo Vicki Lorraine Kennedy, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Unknown at time of filing

Represented by Law Offices of Matthew R. Eason

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew R. Eason +1 916 438 1819
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Pre-Trial Hearing Re: 1 Complaint; Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D (fdis) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
    Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Unknown at time of filing removed from the case. Matthew R. Eason for Vicki Lorraine Kennedy Substituted in. Filed by Defendant Vicki Lorraine Kennedy (dnes) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
      Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Held/Concluded Re: Status Conference (nwis) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
        Certificate/Proof of Service of 16 Notice of Continued Hearing (fdis) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
          Notice of Continued Status Conference Re: 1 Complaint to be held on 6/24/2010 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (fdis) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
            Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: Status Conference; Status Conference now to be held on 6/24/2010 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D (nwis) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
              Certificate/Proof of Service of 13 Notice of Withdrawal (fdis) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                Notice of Withdrawal Re: 7 Request for Entry of Default (fdis) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 11 Answer to Complaint (fdis) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                    Answer to Complaint Filed by Vicki Lorraine Kennedy. (fdis) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 7 Request for Entry of Default, 8 Declaration, 9 Exhibit(s) (fdis) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                        Exhibit(s) to 8 Declaration (fdis) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                          Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 7 Request for Entry of Default (fdis) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                            Request for Entry of Default of Vicki Lorraine Kennedy Filed by Plaintiff J. Michael Hopper (fdis) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                              Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint, 4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program, 5 Order to Confer (fdis) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (nhas) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (nhas) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                    Copy of Summons Issued. (nhas) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                      Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                        Adversary case 10-02165. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) : Complaint 10-02165 by J. Michael Hopper against Vicki Lorraine Kennedy. Fee $250 (nhas) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?